Manufacturer: Doncaster Works
Builder | Doncaster Works |
Order Date | 05/1901 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | C12 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1521 | 924 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 06/1901 | 22/05/1958 | |
1522 | 925 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 06/1901 | 06/1937 | |
1523 | 926 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 06/1901 | 07/1949 | |
1524 | 927 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 10/1901 | 01/01/1948 | |
1525 | 928 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 08/1901 | 10/06/1958 | |
1526 | 929 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 09/1901 | 04/1937 | |
1527 | 930 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 06/1901 | 30/05/1958 | |
1528 | 931 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 11/1901 | 21/01/1952 | |
1529 | 932 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 10/1901 | 06/04/1955 | |
1530 | 933 | C12 | GNR | Ivatt | 4-4-2T | 11/1901 | 01/1955 |