Manufacturer: Derby Works
Builder | Derby Works |
Order Date | 1944 |
For | 19 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4807 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1944 | 02/03/1968 | ||
4808 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1944 | 31/12/1966 | ||
4809 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1944 | 03/08/1968 | ||
4810 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 13/08/1966 | ||
4811 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 08/10/1966 | ||
4812 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4813 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 03/09/1966 | ||
4814 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
4815 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 24/02/1968 | ||
4816 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 20/07/1968 | ||
4817 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 12/08/1967 | ||
4818 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 29/06/1968 | ||
4819 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1944 | 11/1967 | ||
4820 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 31/12/1966 | ||
4821 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 10/06/1967 | ||
4822 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 21/10/1967 | ||
4823 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 20/11/1965 | ||
4824 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 10/1967 | ||
4825 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1944 | 07/10/1967 |