Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 169 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2314 Week
» 16571 Month
» 244455 Year
» 1466020 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Derby Works



Order Details for Lot No: DE/232
Builder Derby Works
Order Date 1951
For 25 Diesel locomotives
Class 08

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
13005   08 BR   0-6-0 14/11/1952 04/09/1977  
13006   08 BR   0-6-0 27/12/1952 26/11/1972  
13007   08 BR   0-6-0 27/12/1952 12/12/1977  
13008   08 BR   0-6-0 27/12/1952 21/08/1983  
13009   08 BR   0-6-0 27/12/1952 15/10/1978  
13010   08 BR   0-6-0 17/12/1952 24/02/1980  
13011   08 BR   0-6-0 19/12/1952 01/10/1972  
13012   08 BR   0-6-0 23/12/1952 01/01/1973  
13013   08 BR   0-6-0 23/12/1952 01/10/1972  
13014   08 BR   0-6-0 24/12/1952 01/10/1972  
13015   08 BR   0-6-0 24/01/1953 27/11/1983  
13016   08 BR   0-6-0 24/01/1953 30/11/1975  
13017   08 BR   0-6-0 21/03/1953 18/12/1977  
13018   08 BR   0-6-0 21/03/1953 13/12/1991  
13019   08 BR   0-6-0 21/03/1953 01/06/1973  
13020   08 BR   0-6-0 18/04/1953 01/12/1973  
13021   08 BR   0-6-0 16/05/1953 18/05/1980  
13022   08 BR   0-6-0 16/05/1953 21/09/1980  
13023   08 BR   0-6-0 13/06/1953 18/05/1980  
13024   08 BR   0-6-0 13/06/1953 01/08/1973