Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 10/1923 |
For | 25 Steam locomotives |
Class | K3 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1235 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1924 | 15/08/1962 | |
28 | 1236 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1924 | 04/11/1962 | |
32 | 1237 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1924 | 16/09/1962 | |
33 | 1238 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1924 | 09/04/1962 | |
36 | 1239 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1924 | 27/12/1961 | |
38 | 1240 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1924 | 11/07/1960 | |
39 | 1241 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1924 | 31/05/1962 | |
46 | 1242 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1924 | 16/09/1962 | |
52 | 1243 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1924 | 05/03/1962 | |
53 | 1244 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1924 | 17/12/1962 | |
58 | 1245 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1924 | 04/11/1962 | |
69 | 1246 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1924 | 16/09/1962 | |
73 | 1247 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 10/1924 | 04/11/1962 | |
75 | 1248 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1924 | 29/12/1959 | |
80 | 1249 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1924 | 05/07/1961 | |
91 | 1250 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1924 | 16/09/1962 | |
92 | 1251 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1924 | 16/09/1962 | |
109 | 1252 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1924 | 16/09/1962 | |
111 | 1253 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 11/1924 | 20/03/1961 | |
112 | 1254 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 12/1924 | 28/02/1962 | |
113 | 1255 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 12/1924 | 04/11/1962 | |
114 | 1256 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 12/1924 | 16/09/1962 | |
116 | 1257 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 12/1924 | 03/11/1962 | |
118 | 1258 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 12/1924 | 20/09/1961 | |
120 | 1259 | K3 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 12/1924 | 15/05/1962 |