Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 30 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5933 Week
» 26896 Month
» 63649 Year
» 574751 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT188
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 01/1940
For 18 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
3081 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 07/02/1941 25/06/1962  
3082 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/02/1941 11/12/1959  
3083 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 28/02/1941 13/11/1959  
3084 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/03/1941 31/08/1960  
3085 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/03/1941 29/12/1962  
3086 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 22/03/1941 25/11/1959  
3087 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 05/04/1941 04/02/1960  
3088 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 24/04/1941 03/12/1962  
3089 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 03/05/1941 05/01/1962  
3090 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 03/05/1941 30/12/1959  
3091 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/05/1941 05/02/1960  
3092 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 21/05/1941 03/12/1962  
3093 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 05/06/1941 10/11/1959  
3094 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 18/06/1941 31/12/1959  
3095 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 03/07/1941 31/12/1959  
3096 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 18/07/1941 29/12/1962  
3097 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 08/08/1941 15/03/1961  
3098 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 21/08/1941 30/12/1959