Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 26895 Month
» 63648 Year
» 574750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT187
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 11/1936
For 38 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1508 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 16/12/1937 12/12/1962  
1509 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 25/01/1938 17/12/1962  
1535 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 11/02/1938 17/12/1962  
1537 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 16/02/1938 03/12/1962  
1538 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 18/02/1938 15/02/1960  
1541 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 24/02/1938 16/11/1962  
1542 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 02/03/1938 18/04/1962  
1546 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/03/1938 17/12/1962  
1548 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/03/1938 03/12/1962  
1551 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 16/03/1938 03/12/1962  
1558 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 01/04/1938 17/12/1962  
1560 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 07/04/1938 12/12/1962  
1804 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 25/03/1938 15/10/1962  
1808 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 31/03/1938 29/12/1962  
1835 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 08/04/1938 23/05/1962  
1862 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 12/04/1938 11/04/1960  
1896 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 21/04/1938 22/08/1962  
1863 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/04/1938 29/12/1962  
1898 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 25/04/1938 14/03/1960  
1903 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 29/04/1938 14/03/1960  
1922 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/05/1938 14/03/1960  
1926 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/05/1938 15/03/1960  
1927 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 11/05/1938 21/07/1962  
1928 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/05/1938 15/03/1960  
1930 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/05/1938 14/03/1960  
1933 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 31/05/1938 14/03/1960  
1940 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 30/05/1938 01/01/1960  
1942 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 03/06/1938 01/02/1960  
1943 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/06/1938 21/10/1959  
1952 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 15/06/1938 16/03/1960  
1965 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/06/1938 29/01/1962  
1971 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 28/06/1938 24/04/1961  
1974 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 02/07/1938 14/03/1960  
1977 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 08/07/1938 11/07/1960  
1980 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 20/07/1938 15/02/1960  
1984 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 28/07/1938 16/03/1960  
1996 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/08/1938 30/11/1962  
1997 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 24/08/1938 24/05/1961