Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 26895 Month
» 63648 Year
» 574750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT186
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 09/1935
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2995 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/08/1936 27/10/1962  
2996 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 05/08/1936 27/07/1959  
2997 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 12/08/1936 13/10/1961  
2998 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/08/1936 11/03/1960  
2999 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 19/08/1936 13/04/1962  
3000 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 21/08/1936 22/10/1961