Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 26895 Month
» 63648 Year
» 574750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT185
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 12/1934
For 39 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1436 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 31/10/1935 03/12/1962  
1460 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/11/1935 03/12/1962  
1464 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 08/11/1935 22/10/1961  
1465 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/11/1935 31/01/1962  
1473 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 15/11/1935 03/12/1962  
1474 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 20/11/1935 03/12/1962  
1485 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 26/11/1935 24/09/1962  
1486 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 05/12/1935 24/02/1962  
1504 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 03/12/1935 18/04/1962  
1505 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/12/1935 03/12/1962  
1506 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/12/1935 18/01/1962  
1584 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 20/12/1935 15/10/1962  
2941 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 07/06/1935 26/11/1962  
2942 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 08/06/1935 18/05/1959  
2943 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/06/1935 17/04/1961  
2944 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 19/06/1935 20/10/1962  
2945 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 21/06/1935 28/09/1959  
2946 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 28/06/1935 27/10/1962  
2947 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 03/07/1935 18/02/1961  
2948 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 05/07/1935 13/11/1962  
2949 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 10/07/1935 20/10/1962  
2950 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 11/07/1935 28/09/1959  
2951 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/08/1935 11/04/1961  
2952 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 07/08/1935 11/03/1960  
2953 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/08/1935 24/03/1962  
2981 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 21/08/1935 17/02/1961  
2982 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 30/08/1935 27/11/1962  
2983 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/09/1935 20/01/1960  
2984 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 10/09/1935 27/10/1962  
2985 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/09/1935 20/08/1960  
2986 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/09/1935 21/03/1960  
2987 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 18/09/1935 08/02/1960  
2988 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 26/09/1935 12/05/1961  
2989 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 01/10/1935 11/07/1960  
2990 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/10/1935 19/10/1959  
2991 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/10/1935 27/10/1962  
2992 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 11/10/1935 27/08/1960  
2993 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/10/1935 03/12/1962  
2994 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 22/10/1935 19/02/1960