Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 30 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5933 Week
» 26896 Month
» 63649 Year
» 574751 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT184
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 12/1933
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1412 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 15/03/1934 03/12/1962  
1463 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 19/03/1934 16/11/1962  
1467 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 22/03/1934 03/12/1962  
1468 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/03/1934 03/12/1962  
1472 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 27/03/1934 03/12/1962  
1488 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/12/1934 03/12/1962  
1490 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 20/12/1934 03/12/1962  
1475 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 19/10/1934 20/08/1962  
1476 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 24/10/1934 15/10/1962  
1477 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 29/10/1934 03/12/1962  
1478 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/11/1934 29/03/1962  
1479 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 07/12/1934 03/12/1962