Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 26895 Month
» 63648 Year
» 574750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT183
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 12/1929
For 25 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2962 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 18/09/1931 05/01/1961  
2963 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 16/09/1931 29/03/1960  
2964 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 29/09/1931 02/11/1961  
2965 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/10/1931 08/02/1960  
2966 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/12/1931 01/02/1960  
2967 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 29/10/1931 21/03/1960  
2968 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 24/11/1931 18/05/1959  
2969 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 16/12/1931 08/02/1960  
2970 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 24/12/1931 20/06/1961  
2971 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 22/01/1932 28/09/1959  
2972 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 29/01/1932 26/11/1962  
2973 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/02/1932 20/11/1959  
2974 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 19/02/1932 03/12/1962  
2975 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 10/03/1932 25/04/1962  
2976 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 15/03/1932 17/11/1961  
2977 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 27/05/1932 26/01/1960  
2978 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 07/06/1932 09/10/1961  
2979 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 15/06/1932 27/11/1962  
2980 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 16/06/1932 06/10/1959  
1453 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 31/08/1932 18/04/1962  
1469 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/10/1932 29/03/1962  
1471 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/10/1932 03/12/1962  
1480 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/11/1932 21/07/1961  
1482 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 24/05/1933 16/11/1962  
1483 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 19/05/1933 16/11/1962