Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 26895 Month
» 63648 Year
» 574750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DT181
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 08/1927
For 52 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2691 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 20/07/1928 24/03/1962  
2692 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 18/07/1928 11/11/1961  
2693 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 20/07/1928 20/02/1961  
2694 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 01/08/1928 10/11/1962  
2695 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/08/1928 01/07/1961  
2696 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 08/08/1928 12/11/1962  
2697 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/08/1928 13/11/1959  
2698 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/08/1928 07/12/1959  
2699 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 15/08/1928 01/06/1959  
2700 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/08/1928 21/08/1959  
2701 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 25/08/1928 12/11/1962  
2702 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 27/08/1928 10/08/1959  
2703 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 31/08/1928 03/12/1962  
2704 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/09/1928 26/11/1962  
2705 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 07/09/1928 16/11/1962  
2706 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 12/09/1928 15/03/1960  
2707 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/09/1928 30/11/1962  
2708 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 19/09/1928 06/11/1959  
2709 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 28/09/1928 29/06/1959  
2710 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 28/09/1928 29/06/1959  
2711 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/10/1928 19/10/1960  
2712 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 12/10/1928 17/08/1960  
2713 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 22/11/1928 28/09/1959  
2714 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 22/11/1928 13/01/1961  
2715 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 26/11/1928 18/05/1959  
2716 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 27/11/1928 21/01/1960  
2717 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 29/11/1928 19/10/1960  
2718 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 30/11/1928 01/02/1960  
2719 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/12/1928 03/07/1961  
2720 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/12/1928 25/08/1959  
2721 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 26/03/1929 15/03/1960  
2722 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 08/04/1929 26/08/1960  
2723 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 10/04/1929 17/08/1959  
2724 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 15/04/1929 04/01/1960  
2725 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 22/04/1929 12/09/1960  
2726 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 24/04/1929 20/09/1961  
2727 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 30/04/1929 04/01/1960  
2728 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 10/05/1929 07/03/1960  
2729 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 10/05/1929 15/03/1960  
2730 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/05/1929 02/11/1960  
2731 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 30/05/1929 20/08/1960  
2732 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 29/05/1929 12/06/1959  
2733 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/06/1929 29/12/1962  
2734 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 11/06/1929 01/06/1959  
2735 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/06/1929 22/06/1959  
2736 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 20/06/1929 11/07/1960  
2737 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 26/06/1929 29/12/1962  
2738 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 03/07/1929 26/11/1962  
2739 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 03/07/1929 04/01/1962  
2740 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/07/1929 26/11/1959  
2741 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 12/07/1929 13/08/1962  
2742 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 31/07/1929 29/12/1962