Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 11/1925 |
For | 44 Steam locomotives |
Class | J39 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1448 | 1335 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/09/1926 | 17/04/1961 | |
1449 | 1336 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 05/10/1926 | 16/11/1962 | |
1450 | 1337 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 14/10/1926 | 28/09/1959 | |
1451 | 1338 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 15/10/1926 | 29/03/1962 | |
1452 | 1339 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 21/10/1926 | 03/12/1962 | |
1454 | 1340 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 21/10/1926 | 29/03/1962 | |
1455 | 1341 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 21/10/1926 | 29/03/1962 | |
1456 | 1342 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/10/1926 | 25/08/1961 | |
1457 | 1343 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 04/11/1926 | 18/08/1960 | |
1458 | 1344 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 09/11/1926 | 23/11/1962 | |
1459 | 1345 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 12/11/1926 | 17/04/1961 | |
1481 | 1346 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 17/11/1926 | 23/05/1962 | |
1484 | 1347 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/11/1926 | 04/02/1960 | |
1492 | 1348 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 02/12/1926 | 18/04/1962 | |
1493 | 1349 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/12/1926 | 22/05/1959 | |
1494 | 1350 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 10/12/1926 | 06/05/1959 | |
1495 | 1351 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 14/12/1926 | 05/04/1961 | |
1270 | 1352 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 11/03/1927 | 02/08/1960 | |
1496 | 1353 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 12/04/1927 | 10/02/1962 | |
1497 | 1354 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 14/04/1927 | 23/11/1962 | |
1498 | 1355 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/04/1927 | 08/09/1961 | |
1233 | 1356 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 03/05/1927 | 15/02/1960 | |
1255 | 1357 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 10/05/1927 | 15/02/1960 | |
1263 | 1358 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 10/05/1927 | 24/03/1961 | |
1259 | 1359 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 10/05/1927 | 08/02/1960 | |
1265 | 1360 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 13/05/1927 | 22/10/1961 | |
1266 | 1361 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 18/05/1927 | 22/11/1960 | |
1267 | 1362 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 20/05/1927 | 27/10/1962 | |
1272 | 1363 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 25/05/1927 | 22/02/1960 | |
1273 | 1364 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/05/1927 | 14/03/1961 | |
1268 | 1365 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 28/05/1927 | 16/11/1962 | |
1269 | 1366 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/05/1927 | 27/07/1959 | |
1274 | 1367 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/05/1927 | 25/08/1961 | |
1277 | 1368 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 08/06/1927 | 19/10/1961 | |
1275 | 1369 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 09/06/1927 | 18/05/1959 | |
1281 | 1370 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 10/06/1927 | 03/08/1959 | |
1282 | 1371 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 16/06/1927 | 10/07/1961 | |
1286 | 1372 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 23/06/1927 | 25/08/1959 | |
1287 | 1373 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 23/06/1927 | 26/10/1960 | |
1289 | 1374 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 30/06/1927 | 03/11/1962 | |
1290 | 1375 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 16/07/1927 | 15/09/1962 | |
1295 | 1376 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 16/07/1927 | 11/07/1960 | |
1296 | 1377 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 31/08/1927 | 21/07/1962 | |
1298 | 1378 | J39 | LNER | Gresley | 0-6-0 | 02/09/1927 | 13/01/1961 |