Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 103 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6079 Week
» 12213 Month
» 240097 Year
» 1461662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DAxx4
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 02/1949
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
61400 2102 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/03/1950 17/12/1964  
61401 2103 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/04/1950 17/04/1964  
61402 2104 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/04/1950 08/06/1964  
61403 2105 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/04/1950 14/07/1966  
61404 2106 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/05/1950 09/11/1965  
61405 2107 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/05/1950 16/09/1962  
61406 2108 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 20/05/1950 17/04/1966  
61407 2109 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/06/1950 22/04/1967  
61408 2110 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 13/06/1950 29/12/1962  
61409 2111 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 15/06/1950 22/09/1963