Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 126 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6102 Week
» 12236 Month
» 240120 Year
» 1461685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DAxx3
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 11/1947
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
61350 2072 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/07/1949 19/11/1966  
61351 2073 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/08/1949 13/07/1964  
61352 2074 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 25/08/1949 22/10/1962  
61353 2075 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/09/1949 16/08/1965  
61354 2076 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/09/1949 22/04/1967  
61355 2077 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/09/1949 08/06/1964  
61356 2078 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/09/1949 23/07/1964  
61357 2079 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 10/10/1949 08/06/1965  
61358 2080 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 18/10/1949 25/12/1963  
61359 2081 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 26/10/1949 28/12/1963