Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 05/1944 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | B1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1010 | 1990 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 02/11/1946 | 07/11/1965 | |
1011 | 1991 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/11/1946 | 02/11/1962 | |
1012 | 1992 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/11/1946 | 12/06/1967 | |
1013 | 1993 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 14/12/1946 | 06/12/1966 | |
1014 | 1994 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 23/12/1946 | 31/12/1966 | |
1015 | 1995 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/01/1947 | 19/11/1962 | |
1016 | 1996 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 16/01/1947 | 31/10/1965 | |
1017 | 1997 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/01/1947 | 15/11/1966 | |
1018 | 1998 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 04/02/1947 | 07/11/1965 | |
1019 | 1999 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 24/02/1947 | 12/03/1967 | |
1020 | 2000 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/02/1947 | 26/11/1962 | |
1021 | 2001 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 12/03/1947 | 06/06/1967 | |
1022 | 2002 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/03/1947 | 25/11/1966 | |
1023 | 2003 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 01/04/1947 | 31/10/1965 | |
1024 | 2004 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 12/04/1947 | 15/05/1966 | |
1025 | 2005 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 22/04/1947 | 02/12/1962 | |
1026 | 2006 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/04/1947 | 10/02/1966 | |
1027 | 2007 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 11/05/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1028 | 2008 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 30/05/1947 | 08/10/1962 | |
1029 | 2009 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 07/06/1947 | 31/12/1966 | |
1030 | 2010 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 26/06/1947 | 30/09/1967 | |
1031 | 2011 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 10/07/1947 | 09/11/1964 | |
1032 | 2012 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 07/08/1947 | 27/11/1966 | |
1033 | 2013 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 29/08/1947 | 25/03/1963 | |
1034 | 2014 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 03/10/1947 | 21/12/1964 | |
1035 | 2015 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 31/10/1947 | 12/12/1966 | |
1036 | 2016 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 20/11/1947 | 16/09/1962 | |
1037 | 2017 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 28/11/1947 | 18/05/1964 | |
1038 | 2018 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 05/12/1947 | 01/05/1964 | |
1039 | 2019 | B1 | LNER | Thompson | 4-6-0 | 12/12/1947 | 27/06/1965 |