Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 113 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6089 Week
» 12223 Month
» 240107 Year
» 1461672 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DAxx1
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 08/1942
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
8301 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/12/1942 05/03/1962  
8302 1912 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 12/06/1943 22/09/1963  
8303 1916 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/09/1943 24/06/1967  
8304 1920 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 22/11/1943 26/12/1965  
8305 1922 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 22/12/1943 28/12/1963  
8306 1925 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 19/02/1944 16/09/1962  
8307 1927 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 17/03/1944 22/09/1963  
8308 1928 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/04/1944 06/02/1964  
8309 1931 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 13/05/1944 09/12/1966  
8310 1934 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 19/06/1944 16/09/1962