Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 10/1933 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | Shire/Hunt |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
353 | 1592 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 12/09/1934 | 06/12/1957 | |
357 | 1593 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 22/09/1934 | 13/10/1960 | |
359 | 1594 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 28/09/1934 | 16/01/1961 | |
361 | 1595 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 02/10/1934 | 13/11/1958 | |
362 | 1596 | Shire/Hunt | LNER | Gresley | 4-4-0 | 11/10/1934 | 16/01/1961 |