Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 311 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1598 Week
» 31184 Month
» 405197 Year
» 1626762 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works



Order Details for Lot No: DA/DA471
Builder Darlington Works
Order Date 1893
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class N9

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1617   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 05/1893 10/1950  
1618   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 06/1893 11/1949  
1640   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 06/1893 08/1947  
1641   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 06/1893 12/1950  
1642   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 07/1893 07/1950  
1643   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 08/1893 10/1949  
1644   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 08/1893 12/1947  
1645   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 08/1893 06/1946  
1646   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 09/1893 01/01/1951  
1647   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 09/1893 02/1948  
1648   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 10/1893 07/1949  
1649   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 11/1893 08/1949  
1650   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 11/1893 04/1950  
1651   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 12/1893 07/1951  
1652   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 12/1893 27/06/1955  
1653   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 12/1893 11/1950  
1654   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 12/1893 23/02/1953  
1655   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 12/1893 27/06/1955  
383   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 02/1894 08/1950  
1705   N9 NER Worsdell 0-6-2T 02/1894 04/07/1955