Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 01/1896 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | G5 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
529 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1896 | 13/01/1958 | ||
1713 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1896 | 07/02/1955 | ||
1779 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 06/1896 | 08/11/1954 | ||
1737 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 08/1896 | 05/1957 | ||
1786 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 08/1896 | 16/12/1958 | ||
394 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 09/1896 | 30/10/1952 | ||
505 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 09/1896 | 10/11/1952 | ||
405 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 10/1896 | 22/10/1957 | ||
1881 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 11/1896 | 30/07/1957 | ||
1882 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 11/1896 | 11/1956 | ||
1740 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 22/12/1958 | ||
1883 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 11/12/1958 | ||
1884 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 05/1957 | ||
1885 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 09/08/1954 | ||
1886 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 08/10/1956 | ||
1887 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 06/1950 | ||
1888 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 08/10/1956 | ||
1889 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 31/03/1953 | ||
1890 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 28/06/1954 | ||
1764 | G5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-4-4T | 12/1896 | 15/03/1955 |