Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1907 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Q5 |
Information | NER Class T1 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
578 | 516 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 06/1907 | 16/05/1949 | |
660 | 517 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 06/1907 | 31/12/1948 | |
939 | 518 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 06/1907 | 18/09/1947 | |
1031 | 519 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 08/1907 | 23/04/1951 | |
1032 | 520 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 09/1907 | 19/07/1947 | |
1054 | 521 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 09/1907 | 16/05/1949 | |
1062 | 522 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 10/1907 | 20/12/1948 | |
1177 | 523 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 10/1907 | 16/05/1949 | |
1178 | 524 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 10/1907 | 12/02/1949 | |
1215 | 525 | Q5 | NER | Worsdell | 0-8-0 | 11/1907 | 07/12/1946 |