Manufacturer: Darlington Works
Builder | Darlington Works |
Order Date | 1919 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Q6 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2243 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1919 | 12/08/1963 | ||
2244 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1919 | 06/04/1964 | ||
2245 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1919 | 16/09/1964 | ||
2246 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 05/1919 | 27/07/1964 | ||
2247 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1919 | 17/05/1965 | ||
2248 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1919 | 14/12/1966 | ||
2249 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 06/1919 | 31/07/1966 | ||
2250 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 07/1919 | 01/07/1967 | ||
2251 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 07/1919 | 02/07/1963 | ||
2252 | Q6 | NER | Raven | 0-8-0 | 08/1919 | 11/09/1966 |