Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 424 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3012 Week
» 32510 Month
» 369356 Year
» 1590921 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works


Order Book
Lot Number Order Number Order Date For Company Class Wheels Number Off Info
  111A 1917 Steam Locomotives NER Q6 0-8-0 20  
  131A 1918 Steam Locomotives NER Q6 0-8-0 10  
  141A 1919 Steam Locomotives NER Q6 0-8-0 10  
  151A 1919 Steam Locomotives NER Q7 0-8-0 5  
  281A 1924 Steam Locomotives NER Q7 0-8-0 10  
  351A 1907 Steam Locomotives NER Q5 0-8-0 10 NER Class T1
  361A 1907 Steam Locomotives NER Q5 0-8-0 10 NER Class T1
  411A 1911 Steam Locomotives NER Q5 0-8-0 20 NER Class T1
  441A 1913 Steam Locomotives NER Q6 0-8-0 20  
  451A 1913 Steam Locomotives NER Q6 0-8-0 10  
  A--- 01/1901 Steam Locomotives NER G5 0-4-4T 20 Order number lost
  A177 01/01/1894 Steam Locomotives NER G5 0-4-4T 10  
  A185 01/01/1895 Steam Locomotives NER G5 0-4-4T 10  
  A201 01/01/1896 Steam Locomotives NER G5 0-4-4T 10  
  A209 01/1896 Steam Locomotives NER G5 0-4-4T 20  
  A218 01/1897 Steam Locomotives NER G5 0-4-4T 20  
  A281 01/01/1900 Steam Locomotives NER G5 0-4-4T 20  
  Unknown 10/1936 Steam Locomotives LNER K4 2-6-0 1  
  Unknown 02/1938 Steam Locomotives LNER K4 2-6-0 5  
  Unknown 1883 Steam Locomotives NER J22 0-6-0 8  
  Unknown 1884 Steam Locomotives NER J22 0-6-0 8  
  Unknown 1884 Steam Locomotives NER J22 0-6-0 8  
  Unknown 1884 Steam Locomotives NER J22 0-6-0 8  
  Unknown 1952 Steam Locomotives BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 10  
  Unknown 1885 Steam Locomotives LNER E5 2-4-0 10  
  Unknown 1893 Steam Locomotives NER N9 0-6-2T 20  
  Unknown 1890 Steam Locomotives NER J21 0-6-0 10  
  Unknown 1890 Steam Locomotives NER J21 0-6-0 10  
  Unknown 1891 Steam Locomotives NER J21 0-6-0 10  
  Unknown 01/1947 Steam Locomotives LNER A1 4-6-2 23  
  Unknown 1899 Steam Locomotives NER J25 0-6-0 20  
  Unknown 1899 Steam Locomotives NER J25 0-6-0 20  
  Unknown 1904 Steam Locomotives NER J26 0-6-0 20  
  Unknown 1905 Steam Locomotives NER J26 0-6-0 10  
  Unknown 12/1943 Steam Locomotives LNER A2 4-6-2 4 Originally due to be built as class V2 but 'hijacked' by Thompson.
  Unknown Steam Locomotives LNER V2 2-6-2 21  
  Unknown 1914 Steam Locomotives NER C7 4-4-2 10  
  Unknown 1914 Steam Locomotives NER C7 4-4-2 19  
  Unknown 1918 Steam Locomotives NER C7 4-4-2 1  
  Unknown 1910 Steam Locomotives NER C6 4-4-2 10  
  Unknown 1897 Steam Locomotives NER J24 0-6-0 20  
  Unknown 1877 Steam Locomotives NER G6 0-4-4T 4  
  Unknown 1878 Steam Locomotives NER G6 0-4-4T 5  
  Unknown 1878 Steam Locomotives NER G6 0-4-4T 2  
  Unknown 1879 Steam Locomotives NER G6 0-4-4T 6  
  Unknown 1879 Steam Locomotives NER G6 0-4-4T 2  
  Unknown 1880 Steam Locomotives NER G6 0-4-4T 6  
  Unknown 04/1926 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 10  
  Unknown 04/1926 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 10  
  Unknown 04/1926 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 6  
  Unknown 04/1926 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2  
  Unknown 02/1928 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 8  
  Unknown 12/1929 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 10  
  Unknown 12/1929 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5  
  Unknown 10/1933 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 10  
  Unknown 10/1933 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5  
  Unknown 10/1933 Steam Locomotives LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 10  
  Unknown 1881 Steam Locomotives NER J76 0-6-0T 6  
  Unknown 1881 Steam Locomotives NER J76 0-6-0T 6  
  Unknown 08/1942 Steam Locomotives LNER B1 4-6-0 10  
  Unknown 05/1944 Steam Locomotives LNER B1 4-6-0 30  
  Unknown 11/1947 Steam Locomotives LNER B1 4-6-0 10  
  Unknown 02/1949 Steam Locomotives LNER B1 4-6-0 10  
  Unknown 16/06/1925 Steam Locomotives LNER J38 0-6-0 35  
  Unknown 11/1925 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 44  
  Unknown 08/1927 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 52  
  Unknown 12/1928 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 27  
  Unknown 12/1929 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 25  
  Unknown 12/1933 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 12  
  Unknown 12/1934 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 39  
  Unknown 09/1935 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 6  
  Unknown 11/1936 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 38  
  Unknown 01/1940 Steam Locomotives LNER J39 0-6-0 18  
  Unknown 10/1923 Steam Locomotives GNR K3 2-6-0 25  
  Unknown 11/1923 Steam Locomotives GNR K3 2-6-0 25  
  Unknown 11/1924 Steam Locomotives GNR K3 2-6-0 10  
  Unknown 12/1928 Steam Locomotives GNR K3 2-6-0 9 2761 Series
  Unknown 03/1935 Steam Locomotives GNR K3 2-6-0 4  
  Unknown 09/1935 Steam Locomotives GNR K3 2-6-0 20  
  Unknown 1906 Steam Locomotives NER J27 0-6-0 20  
  Unknown 1908 Steam Locomotives NER J27 0-6-0 10  
  Unknown 1921 Steam Locomotives NER J27 0-6-0 25 Superheated
  Unknown 1923 Steam Locomotives NER J27 0-6-0 10 Superheated