Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 416 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8153 Week
» 19858 Month
» 351347 Year
» 427934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Crewe Works



Order Details for Lot No: CW/CW199
Builder Crewe Works
Order Date 1949
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Black Five

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
44658   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1949 11/1967  
44659   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1949 06/1967  
44660   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1949 09/1964  
44661   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/06/1949 08/1967  
44662   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/06/1949 10/1967  
44663   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 18/06/1949 05/1968  
44664   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 16/07/1949 05/1968  
44665   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 16/07/1949 03/1968  
44666   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 16/07/1949 02/1967  
44667   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/07/1949 08/1967