Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 893 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6498 Week
» 18045 Month
» 417727 Year
» 494314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Crewe Works



Order Details for Lot No: CW/CW192
Builder Crewe Works
Order Date 1949
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class Black Five

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
44718   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1949 11/1966  
44719   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1949 10/1964  
44720   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1949 10/1966  
44721   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1949 07/1965  
44722   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1949 04/1967  
44723   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1949 10/1966  
44724   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1949 10/1966  
44725   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 30/04/1949 10/1967  
44726   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1949 10/1966  
44727   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/05/1949 10/1967  
44728   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/01/1949 01/1968  
44729   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/01/1949 10/1966  
44730   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1949 11/1967  
44731   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1949 05/1966  
44732   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1949 07/1967  
44733   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1949 06/1967  
44734   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1949 12/1967  
44735   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1949 08/1968  
44736   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1949 09/1967  
44737   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/03/1949 01/1967