Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 416 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8153 Week
» 19858 Month
» 351347 Year
» 427934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Crewe Works



Order Details for Lot No: CW/CW187
Builder Crewe Works
Order Date 1947
For 45 Steam locomotives
Class Black Five

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
44738   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 19/06/1948 06/1964  
44739   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 19/06/1948 01/1965  
44740   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 29/05/1948 13/04/1963  
44741   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/06/1948 03/1965  
44742   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 03/07/1948 05/1964  
44743   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 26/06/1948 01/1966  
44744   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 03/07/1948 11/1963  
44745   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 03/07/1948 24/10/1964  
44746   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 07/08/1948 02/1964  
44747   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/07/1948 04/05/1963  
4748   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 07/02/1948 09/1964  
4749   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 14/02/1948 09/1964  
4750   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 28/02/1948 09/1963  
4751   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 13/03/1948 09/1964  
4752   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 20/03/1948 04/1964  
4753   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 27/03/1948 07/1965  
44754   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/04/1948 04/1964  
44755   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 01/05/1948 11/1963  
44756   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 19/06/1948 09/1964  
44757   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 31/12/1948 13/11/1965  
4758   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1947 07/1968  
4759   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1947 11/1967  
4760   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 09/1947 10/1966  
4761   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1947 04/1968  
4762   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1947 11/1966  
4763   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 10/1947 09/1965  
4764   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 11/1947 09/1965  
4765   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1947 09/1967  
4766   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1947 08/1967  
4767   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 12/1947 12/1967  
4768   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/1947 06/1967  
4769   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/1947 07/1965  
4770   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 04/1947 10/1967  
4771   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 05/1947 03/1967  
4772   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 05/1947 10/1967  
4773   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 05/1947 12/1967  
4774   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 05/1947 08/1967  
4775   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1947 10/1967  
4776   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1947 10/1967  
4777   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1947 06/1968  
4778   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 06/1947 11/1967  
4779   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 07/1947 12/1966  
4780   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 07/1947 06/1968  
4781   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 08/1947 08/1968  
4782   Black Five LMS Stanier 4-6-0 08/1947 12/1966