Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1904 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | J88 |
Information | Safety valves on Dome, Non-lifting injectors, 2 coal rails. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
836 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 12/1904 | 06/06/1960 | ||
837 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 12/1904 | 20/06/1958 | ||
838 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 12/1904 | 18/12/1958 | ||
839 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 12/1904 | 05/10/1956 | ||
840 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 01/1905 | 03/07/1958 | ||
841 | J88 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-0T | 01/1905 | 20/03/1961 |