Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 332 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5840 Week
» 26742 Month
» 26742 Year
» 1248307 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works



Order Details for Lot No: CO/CO340
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Date 1923
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class N15
Information The first 16 locos in this order were given an NBR number with a B suffix - the remaining 4 were numbered straight into the LNER 1924 system. The final locomotive, 9227, was the last engine built at Cowlairs.

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
71   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 12/1923 29/12/1962  
19   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 10/1923 17/05/1960  
23   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 11/1923 17/02/1960  
31   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 11/1923 25/11/1959  
52   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 11/1923 22/10/1960  
55   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 11/1923 29/10/1957  
60   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 11/1923 01/10/1962  
67   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 12/1923 01/10/1962  
74   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 12/1923 19/10/1959  
75   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 12/1923 07/05/1959  
76   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 12/1923 28/11/1959  
77   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 12/1923 12/02/1962  
78   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 02/1924 16/10/1959  
79   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 02/1924 01/10/1962  
99   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 02/1924 05/12/1961  
125   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 03/1924 18/11/1958  
9147   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 03/1924 19/07/1961  
9174   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 03/1924 22/05/1959  
9225   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 03/1924 13/08/1960  
9227   N15 NBR Reid 0-6-2T 04/1924 01/10/1962