Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 124 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 2713 Week
» 24755 Month
» 131069 Year
» 642171 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works



Order Details for Lot No: CO/CO321
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Date 1899
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class J36

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
753   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 03/1899 11/1963  
754   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 03/1899 10/11/1962  
755   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 03/1899 30/07/1962  
756   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 04/1899 08/1955  
757   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 04/1899 30/04/1962  
758   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 04/1899 29/12/1962  
759   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 05/1899 07/1960  
760   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 05/1899 31/05/1962  
761   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 05/1899 09/1966  
762   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 05/1899 30/04/1962  
763   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 05/1899 10/11/1962  
764   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 06/1899 07/1951