Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 887 Today
» 1151 Yesterday
» 3109 Week
» 19760 Month
» 213604 Year
» 724706 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works



Order Details for Lot No: CO/CO320
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Date 1898
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class J36

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
741   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 10/1898 05/1943  
742   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 10/1898 16/07/1962  
743   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 10/1898 02/1947  
744   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 10/1898 07/1947  
745   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 10/1898 29/12/1962  
746   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 10/1898 08/10/1962  
747   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 12/1898 26/02/1962  
748   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 01/1899 16/07/1962  
749   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 01/1899 12/1963  
750   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 01/1899 06/1951  
751   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 01/1899 06/1964  
752   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 01/1899 16/07/1962