Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1897 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | J36 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
717 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 04/1897 | 05/06/1967 | ||
718 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 04/1897 | 03/1948 | ||
719 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 04/1897 | 01/08/1963 | ||
720 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 29/11/1950 | ||
721 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 16/02/1951 | ||
722 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 10/11/1962 | ||
723 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 03/1950 | ||
724 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 05/04/1961 | ||
725 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 26/02/1962 | ||
726 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 03/01/1966 | ||
727 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 16/03/1951 | ||
728 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 10/1947 |