Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 619 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 4074 Week
» 15367 Month
» 280000 Year
» 1501565 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works



Order Details for Lot No: CO/CO318
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Date 1896
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class J36

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
705   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 06/1896 08/03/1961  
706   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 06/1896 06/06/1963  
707   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 06/1896 21/01/1952  
708   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 06/1896 19/03/1951  
709   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 06/1896 21/05/1962  
710   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 06/1896 13/07/1961  
711   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 11/1896 03/01/1966  
712   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 11/1896 08/12/1952  
713   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 11/1896 07/1947  
714   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 11/1896 29/11/1963  
715   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 12/1896 09/02/1952  
716   J36 NBR Holmes 0-6-0 12/1896 27/06/1963