Manufacturer: Cowlairs Works
Builder | Cowlairs Works |
Order Date | 1891 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | J36 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
643 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1891 | 07/1947 | ||
644 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1891 | 23/03/1948 | ||
645 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1891 | 23/07/1959 | ||
646 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1891 | 29/11/1963 | ||
647 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1891 | 09/1947 | ||
648 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1891 | 16/05/1963 | ||
649 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 04/1891 | 14/10/1957 | ||
650 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 04/1891 | 04/1951 | ||
651 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 05/1891 | 11/08/1961 | ||
652 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 05/1891 | 29/12/1962 | ||
653 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 05/1891 | 06/05/1960 | ||
654 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 05/1891 | 08/10/1962 |