Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Builder | Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Date | 1904 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | J11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
216 | 4543 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 02/1904 | 18/10/1954 | |
218 | 4544 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 02/1904 | 04/08/1958 | |
219 | 4545 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 02/1904 | 04/02/1961 | |
221 | 4546 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1904 | 14/03/1955 | |
222 | 4547 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1904 | 17/11/1958 | |
223 | 4548 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1904 | 02/06/1958 | |
224 | 4549 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1904 | 17/12/1958 | |
225 | 4550 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 23/09/1962 | |
4551 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 21/03/1955 | ||
227 | 4552 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 11/03/1960 | |
228 | 4553 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 16/10/1957 | |
229 | 4554 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 08/08/1955 | |
230 | 4555 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 30/10/1959 | |
231 | 4556 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 29/08/1961 | |
234 | 4557 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1904 | 10/02/1958 |