Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Builder | Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Date | 1903 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
198 | 4521 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1903 | 24/08/1962 | |
201 | 4522 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1903 | 08/02/1957 | |
203 | 4523 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1903 | 30/01/1960 | |
205 | 4524 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1903 | 23/09/1962 | |
206 | 4525 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1903 | 09/08/1962 | |
209 | 4526 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1903 | 07/11/1955 | |
210 | 4527 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1903 | 13/09/1954 | |
211 | 4528 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1903 | 13/07/1959 | |
214 | 4529 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 11/1903 | 24/06/1961 | |
215 | 4530 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 11/1903 | 20/10/1958 |