Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 253 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 253 Week
» 11546 Month
» 276179 Year
» 1497744 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/BP373
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 04/1924
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class N2
Information N2/2

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2583 6210 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 05/1925 02/09/1958  
2584 6211 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1925 03/12/1958  
2585 6212 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1925 09/05/1960  
2586 6213 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1925 03/12/1959  
2587 6214 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1925 10/06/1958  
2588 6215 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1925 06/04/1959  
2589 6216 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1925 18/12/1959  
2590 6217 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1925 17/06/1957  
2591 6218 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1925 03/06/1957  
2592 6219 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1925 18/07/1957  
2593 6220 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1925 18/10/1960  
2594 6221 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 04/1925 25/05/1961