Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Builder | Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Date | 1963 |
For | 6 Diesel locomotives |
Class | Hymek |
Administration | Swindon Works order #457 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D7095 | 7999 | 35 | BR | B-B | 24/12/1963 | 16/10/1972 | ||
D7096 | 8000 | 35 | BR | B-B | 16/12/1963 | 30/12/1972 | ||
D7097 | 8001 | 35 | BR | B-B | 16/12/1963 | 30/12/1972 | ||
D7098 | 8002 | 35 | BR | B-B | 01/01/1964 | 30/12/1972 | ||
D7099 | 8003 | 35 | BR | B-B | 22/01/1964 | 05/10/1972 | ||
D7100 | 8004 | 35 | BR | B-B | 05/02/1964 | 01/11/1972 |