Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 30 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5933 Week
» 26896 Month
» 63649 Year
» 574751 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/1532
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 10/1935
For 9 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1563 6821 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 31/03/1937 23/11/1962  
1577 6822 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 07/04/1937 03/12/1962  
1580 6823 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 12/04/1937 15/10/1962  
1585 6824 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 16/04/1937 03/12/1962  
1586 6825 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 22/04/1937 21/07/1961  
1587 6826 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 29/04/1937 23/11/1962  
1875 6827 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 05/05/1937 03/07/1961  
1880 6828 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 19/05/1937 22/10/1961  
1894 6829 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 28/05/1937 03/07/1961