Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 26895 Month
» 63648 Year
» 574750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/1531
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 10/1935
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1532 6811 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 14/10/1936 21/07/1961  
1533 6812 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 17/10/1936 29/03/1962  
1534 6813 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 21/10/1936 25/08/1961  
1536 6814 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 23/10/1936 03/12/1962  
1539 6815 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 28/10/1936 30/11/1962  
1540 6816 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 31/10/1936 03/12/1962  
1543 6817 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/11/1936 16/11/1961  
1544 6818 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 09/11/1936 03/12/1962  
1545 6819 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 13/11/1936 23/11/1962  
1547 6820 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 26/11/1936 15/10/1962