Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 30 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 5933 Week
» 26896 Month
» 63649 Year
» 574751 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.



Order Details for Lot No: BP/1529
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Date 10/1935
For 9 Steam locomotives
Class J39

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1803 6802 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 02/09/1936 28/09/1959  
1813 6803 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 04/09/1936 12/04/1961  
1824 6804 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 23/09/1936 26/11/1962  
1828 6805 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 23/09/1936 22/03/1961  
1854 6806 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 25/09/1936 05/04/1961  
1856 6807 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 30/09/1936 23/11/1962  
1857 6808 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 02/10/1936 12/11/1962  
1869 6809 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 06/10/1936 05/12/1959  
1870 6810 J39 LNER Gresley 0-6-0 10/10/1936 21/10/1959