Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 117 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19028 Week
» 83982 Month
» 286646 Year
» 3313499 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Book
Lot Number |
Order Number |
Order Date |
For |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number Off |
Info |
|
02105 |
1922 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
B7 |
4-6-0 |
5 |
|
|
112 |
08/04/1924 |
Steam Locomotives |
LNER |
U1 |
2-8-8-2T |
1 |
|
|
1513 |
01/1928 |
Steam Locomotives |
GER |
B12 |
4-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
1529 |
10/1935 |
Steam Locomotives |
LNER |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
9 |
|
|
1531 |
10/1935 |
Steam Locomotives |
LNER |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
1532 |
10/1935 |
Steam Locomotives |
LNER |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
9 |
|
|
3661 |
1878 |
Steam Locomotives |
MCR |
25 |
0-6-0 |
1 |
|
|
7347 |
1890 |
Steam Locomotives |
MCR |
25 |
0-6-0 |
1 |
|
|
8340 |
1899 |
Steam Locomotives |
MCR |
25 |
0-6-0 |
1 |
|
|
9032 |
01/1904 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
B5 |
4-6-0 |
8 |
The Tenders were order 9033 |
|
9034 |
1903 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
C4 |
4-4-2 |
2 |
|
|
9233 |
1904 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
C4 |
4-4-2 |
5 |
|
|
9456 |
1906 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
B9 |
4-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
9458 |
|
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
B4 |
4-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
9655 |
1907 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
S1 |
0-8-4T |
4 |
|
|
Unknown |
1871 |
Steam Locomotives |
MCR |
21 |
0-6-0 |
3 |
|
|
Unknown |
1874 |
Steam Locomotives |
NSR |
74 |
0-6-0 |
6 |
|
|
Unknown |
1908 |
Steam Locomotives |
NER |
J27 |
0-6-0 |
20 |
|
|
Unknown |
07/1888 |
Steam Locomotives |
LYR |
978 |
4-4-0 |
30 |
|
|
Unknown |
1912 |
Steam Locomotives |
LTSR |
Tilbury tanks |
0-6-2T |
4 |
|
|
Unknown |
1931 |
Steam Locomotives |
GWR |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
25 |
|
|
Unknown |
1963 |
Diesel Locomotives |
BR |
Hymek |
|
6 |
|
|
Unknown |
1961 |
Diesel Locomotives |
BR |
Hymek |
|
50 |
|
|
Unknown |
1960 |
Diesel Locomotives |
BR |
Hymek |
|
45 |
|
|
Unknown |
1907 |
Steam Locomotives |
TVR |
O4 |
0-6-2T |
14 |
1st 7 were £3,165 each. Remainder were £3,050 each. |
|
Unknown |
1910 |
Steam Locomotives |
TVR |
O4 |
0-6-2T |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1930 |
Steam Locomotives |
LMS |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
30 |
|
|
Unknown |
1927 |
Steam Locomotives |
LMS |
Garratt |
2-6-6-2T |
3 |
|
|
Unknown |
1871 |
Steam Locomotives |
MR |
3P |
4-4-0 |
7 |
|
|
Unknown |
1872 |
Steam Locomotives |
MR |
3P |
4-4-0 |
9 |
|
|
Unknown |
02/1900 |
Steam Locomotives |
MR |
2203 |
4-4-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
04/1924 |
Steam Locomotives |
GNR |
N2 |
0-6-2T |
12 |
N2/2 |
|
Unknown |
07/08/1878 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
46 |
|
12 |
Penalty clause of £100 per month if not delivered on time - last engine arrived at Nine Elms with 3 days to spare! |
|
Unknown |
27/11/1878 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
380 |
4-4-0 |
12 |
|
|
Unknown |
07/01/1880 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
135 |
4-4-0 |
12 |
|
|
Unknown |
09/11/1881 |
Steam Locomotives |
LSWR |
Radial Tanks |
4-4-2T |
12 |
|
|
Unknown |
1898 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
F2 |
2-4-2T |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1896 |
Steam Locomotives |
MLSR |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
66 |
|
|
Unknown |
1880 |
Steam Locomotives |
LYR |
568 |
0-6-0 |
50 |
|
|
Unknown |
1887 |
Steam Locomotives |
LYR |
568 |
0-6-0 |
30 |
|
|
Unknown |
1903 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
J11 |
0-6-0 |
10 |
|
|
Unknown |
1904 |
Steam Locomotives |
GCR |
J11 |
0-6-0 |
15 |
|
|
M8238/a |
04/05/1875 |
Steam Locomotives |
BR |
|
|
20 |
|
|
M8275/b |
01/06/1875 |
Steam Locomotives |
BR |
|
|
10 |
|