Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 288 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 288 Week
» 11581 Month
» 276214 Year
» 1497779 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: BM/BE385
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Date 04/1926
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2642 305 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1927 04/12/1960  
2643 306 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1927 15/02/1960  
2644 307 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1927 29/08/1960  
2645 308 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1927 04/12/1960  
2646 309 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1927 10/09/1961  
2647 310 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1927 04/12/1960  
2648 311 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1927 24/11/1960  
2649 312 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1927 25/03/1957  
2650 313 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1927 13/01/1961  
2651 314 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1927 04/12/1960  
2652 315 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1927 16/09/1962  
2653 316 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1927 10/09/1961  
2654 317 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1927 24/11/1960  
2655 318 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1927 01/12/1958  
2656 319 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 08/1927 27/04/1961  
2657 320 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1927 16/09/1962  
2658 321 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1927 10/09/1961  
2659 322 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1927 24/11/1960  
2660 323 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1927 04/12/1960  
2661 324 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1927 04/12/1960