Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 610 | Y14 | 07/1883 | 10/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 611 | Y14 | 07/1883 | 08/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 612 | Y14 | 07/1883 | 01/1932 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 613 | Y14 | 08/1883 | 06/1931 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 614 | Y14 | 08/1883 | 09/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 615 | Y14 | 09/1883 | 10/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 616 | Y14 | 09/1883 | 07/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 617 | Y14 | 09/1883 | 10/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 618 | Y14 | 10/1883 | 07/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 619 | Y14 | 10/1883 | 05/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 629 | K15 | 03/1884 | 09/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 628 | K15 | 03/1884 | 12/1931 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 627 | K15 | 03/1884 | 11/1933 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 626 | K15 | 03/1884 | 10/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 625 | K15 | 03/1884 | 06/1932 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 624 | K15 | 03/1884 | 05/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 623 | K15 | 03/1884 | 07/1933 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 622 | K15 | 03/1884 | 10/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 621 | K15 | 03/1884 | 07/1932 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 620 | K15 | 03/1884 | 10/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 631 | K15 | 05/1884 | 12/1933 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 632 | K15 | 05/1884 | 05/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 630 | K15 | 05/1884 | 06/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 634 | K15 | 06/1884 | 01/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 635 | K15 | 06/1884 | 04/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 633 | K15 | 06/1884 | 08/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 651 | M15 | 07/1884 | 12/1914 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 650 | M15 | 07/1884 | 06/1927 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 638 | K15 | 07/1884 | 06/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 637 | K15 | 07/1884 | 05/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 636 | K15 | 07/1884 | 05/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 652 | M15 | 08/1884 | 10/1913 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 639 | K15 | 08/1884 | 06/1928 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 655 | M15 | 09/1884 | 10/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 654 | M15 | 09/1884 | 11/1927 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 653 | M15 | 09/1884 | 08/1923 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 656 | M15 | 11/1884 | 12/1922 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 659 | M15 | 11/1884 | 09/1925 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 658 | M15 | 11/1884 | 06/1914 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 657 | M15 | 11/1884 | 05/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 660 | E16 | 12/1884 | 01/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 661 | E16 | 01/1885 | 09/1913 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 684 | N16 | 02/1885 | 06/1932 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 680 | N16 | 02/1885 | 06/1932 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 681 | N16 | 02/1885 | 10/1932 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 682 | N16 | 02/1885 | 01/1932 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 683 | N16 | 02/1885 | 11/1931 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 685 | N16 | 02/1885 | 10/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 686 | N16 | 02/1885 | 06/1928 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 687 | N16 | 02/1885 | 05/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 688 | N16 | 02/1885 | 08/1923 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 689 | N16 | 02/1885 | 06/1936 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 662 | E16 | 03/1885 | 11/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 663 | E16 | 03/1885 | 09/1925 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 664 | E16 | 04/1885 | 09/1915 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 665 | E16 | 05/1885 | 08/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 666 | E16 | 06/1885 | 03/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 667 | E16 | 07/1885 | 12/1922 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 668 | E16 | 07/1885 | 03/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 669 | E16 | 07/1885 | 09/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 670 | E16 | 08/1885 | 09/1927 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 671 | E16 | 09/1885 | 12/1922 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 672 | E16 | 10/1885 | 09/1913 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 674 | E16 | 10/1885 | 02/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 690 | P17 | 11/1885 | 06/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 691 | P17 | 11/1885 | 03/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 673 | E16 | 12/1885 | 12/1914 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 675 | E16 | 12/1885 | 08/1927 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 692 | P17 | 12/1885 | 04/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 693 | P17 | 12/1885 | 07/1928 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 696 | P17 | 12/1885 | 03/1938 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 676 | E16 | 01/1886 | 02/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 694 | P17 | 01/1886 | 10/1931 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 695 | P17 | 01/1886 | 03/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 697 | P17 | 01/1886 | 10/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 677 | E16 | 02/1886 | 04/1925 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 679 | E16 | 02/1886 | 07/1925 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 698 | P17 | 02/1886 | 10/1936 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 678 | E16 | 03/1886 | 11/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 699 | P17 | 03/1886 | 07/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 800 | M18 | 04/1886 | 10/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 801 | M18 | 04/1886 | 01/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 804 | M18 | 05/1886 | 05/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 803 | M18 | 05/1886 | 12/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 802 | M18 | 05/1886 | 01/1929 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 276 | T18 | 05/1886 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 280 | T18 | 06/1886 | 07/1936 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 282 | T18 | 06/1886 | 02/1940 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 275 | T18 | 06/1886 | 06/1938 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 277 | T18 | 06/1886 | 07/1938 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 278 | T18 | 06/1886 | 10/1936 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 279 | T18 | 06/1886 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 281 | T18 | 06/1886 | ||
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 805 | M18 | 07/1886 | 04/1928 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 806 | M18 | 07/1886 | 10/1939 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 807 | M18 | 07/1886 | 03/1929 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 283 | T18 | 07/1886 | 07/1939 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 284 | T18 | 07/1886 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 808 | M18 | 08/1886 | 05/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 809 | M18 | 08/1886 | 08/1936 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 800 | O18 | 09/1886 | 02/1927 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 791 | O18 | 09/1886 | 11/1924 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 792 | O18 | 10/1886 | 10/1926 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 793 | O18 | 10/1886 | 08/1923 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 795 | O18 | 11/1886 | 06/1927 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 794 | O18 | 11/1886 | 06/1925 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 810 | X18 | 11/1886 | 01/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 796 | O18 | 12/1886 | 10/1924 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 811 | X18 | 12/1886 | 03/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 814 | X18 | 12/1886 | 08/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 813 | X18 | 12/1886 | 02/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 812 | X18 | 12/1886 | 02/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 797 | O18 | 01/1887 | 05/1927 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 798 | O18 | 01/1887 | 03/1927 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 799 | O18 | 01/1887 | 03/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 815 | X18 | 01/1887 | 06/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 816 | X18 | 01/1887 | 01/1930 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 817 | X18 | 02/1887 | 03/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 818 | X18 | 02/1887 | 11/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 819 | X18 | 02/1887 | 04/1938 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 285 | K19 | 02/1887 | 10/1939 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 286 | K19 | 02/1887 | 09/1939 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 288 | K19 | 03/1887 | 19/04/1954 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 287 | K19 | 03/1887 | 10/1936 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 289 | K19 | 03/1887 | 02/1951 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 292 | K19 | 04/1887 | 10/1936 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 290 | K19 | 04/1887 | 28/01/1952 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 291 | K19 | 04/1887 | 02/1939 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 294 | K19 | 04/1887 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 295 | K19 | 05/1887 | 12/1938 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 293 | K19 | 05/1887 | 14/06/1954 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 298 | K19 | 06/1887 | 07/1951 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 297 | K19 | 06/1887 | 05/1939 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 828 | D20 | 09/1887 | 12/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 829 | D20 | 09/1887 | 08/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 820 | D20 | 09/1887 | 07/1928 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 821 | D20 | 09/1887 | 05/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 822 | D20 | 09/1887 | 10/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 823 | D20 | 09/1887 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 824 | D20 | 09/1887 | 01/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 825 | D20 | 09/1887 | 29/05/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 826 | D20 | 09/1887 | 09/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 827 | D20 | 09/1887 | 02/1929 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 304 | K19 | 09/1887 | 05/1951 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 303 | K19 | 09/1887 | 10/1936 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 302 | K19 | 09/1887 | 05/1939 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 301 | K19 | 09/1887 | 08/1939 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 300 | K19 | 09/1887 | 04/1939 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 299 | K19 | 09/1887 | 06/1937 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 528 | U20 | 10/1887 | 02/1930 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 527 | U20 | 10/1887 | 02/1951 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 296 | K19 | 10/1887 | 24/11/1952 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 529 | U20 | 11/1887 | 12/1931 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 530 | U20 | 11/1887 | 04/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 531 | U20 | 11/1887 | 08/1928 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 532 | U20 | 01/1888 | 08/04/1957 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 533 | U20 | 01/1888 | 05/1928 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 534 | U20 | 01/1888 | 05/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 535 | U20 | 01/1888 | 03/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 536 | U20 | 01/1888 | 08/1923 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 307 | H21 | 06/1888 | 09/1952 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 308 | H21 | 06/1888 | 10/1936 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 312 | H21 | 07/1888 | 01/1939 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 309 | H21 | 07/1888 | 20/11/1950 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 310 | H21 | 07/1888 | 03/1952 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 311 | H21 | 07/1888 | 10/1950 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 313 | H21 | 08/1888 | 06/1952 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 314 | H21 | 08/1888 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 316 | H21 | 08/1888 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 541 | R21 | 10/1888 | 09/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 537 | R21 | 10/1888 | 08/1923 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 538 | R21 | 10/1888 | 12/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 539 | R21 | 10/1888 | 06/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 540 | R21 | 10/1888 | 09/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 830 | R21 | 10/1888 | 08/1947 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 831 | R21 | 10/1888 | 11/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 832 | R21 | 10/1888 | 08/1923 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 833 | R21 | 10/1888 | 05/12/1955 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 834 | R21 | 10/1888 | 11/1947 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 315 | H21 | 11/1888 | 02/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 317 | T21 | 11/1888 | 06/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 318 | T21 | 11/1888 | 03/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 319 | T21 | 11/1888 | 17/10/1955 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 320 | T21 | 11/1888 | 04/1950 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 321 | T21 | 11/1888 | 04/06/1951 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 326 | T21 | 12/1888 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 323 | T21 | 12/1888 | 02/1951 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 324 | T21 | 12/1888 | 28/04/1952 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 325 | T21 | 12/1888 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J66 | 0-6-0T | 322 | T21 | 12/1888 | 04/1950 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 150 | E22 | 02/1889 | 06/1937 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 151 | E22 | 02/1889 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 152 | E22 | 02/1889 | 10/1935 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 153 | E22 | 02/1889 | 09/1931 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 154 | E22 | 02/1889 | 04/1932 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 155 | E22 | 02/1889 | 23/11/1953 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 158 | E22 | 03/1889 | 03/1932 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 157 | E22 | 03/1889 | 11/1947 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 156 | E22 | 03/1889 | 08/1937 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 159 | E22 | 06/1889 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 838 | T22 | 07/1889 | 07/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 837 | T22 | 07/1889 | 07/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 836 | T22 | 07/1889 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 835 | T22 | 07/1889 | 09/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 839 | T22 | 07/1889 | 07/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 844 | T22 | 07/1889 | 08/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 840 | T22 | 07/1889 | 08/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 841 | T22 | 07/1889 | 06/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 842 | T22 | 07/1889 | 11/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 843 | T22 | 07/1889 | 06/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 845 | R23 | 10/1889 | 12/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 856 | T23 | 10/1889 | 10/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 855 | T23 | 10/1889 | 25/11/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 854 | R23 | 10/1889 | 09/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 853 | R23 | 10/1889 | 12/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 852 | R23 | 10/1889 | 26/05/1956 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 851 | R23 | 10/1889 | 10/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 850 | R23 | 10/1889 | 02/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 849 | R23 | 10/1889 | 29/05/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 848 | R23 | 10/1889 | 01/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 847 | R23 | 10/1889 | 02/06/1952 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 846 | R23 | 10/1889 | 07/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 864 | T23 | 11/1889 | 04/1939 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 857 | T23 | 11/1889 | 25/11/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 858 | T23 | 11/1889 | 03/1923 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 859 | T23 | 11/1889 | 06/1939 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 860 | T23 | 11/1889 | 11/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 861 | T23 | 11/1889 | 09/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 863 | T23 | 11/1889 | 10/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 865 | Y23 | 11/1889 | 06/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 862 | T23 | 11/1889 | 11/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 870 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 10/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 874 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 25/11/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 873 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 12/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 872 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 13/01/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 871 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 09/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 869 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 23/04/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 868 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 12/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 867 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 866 | Y23 | 12/1889 | 02/1951 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 330 | R24 | 03/1890 | 10/1954 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 331 | R24 | 03/1890 | 08/04/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 327 | R24 | 03/1890 | 07/05/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 328 | R24 | 03/1890 | 03/06/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 329 | R24 | 03/1890 | 22/06/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 332 | R24 | 04/1890 | 07/05/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 333 | R24 | 04/1890 | 09/1939 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 334 | R24 | 04/1890 | 14/05/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 335 | R24 | 04/1890 | 19/09/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 336 | R24 | 04/1890 | 03/08/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 337 | S24 | 04/1890 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 345 | S24 | 05/1890 | 06/06/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 344 | S24 | 05/1890 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 343 | S24 | 05/1890 | 11/11/1953 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 342 | S24 | 05/1890 | 23/01/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 341 | S24 | 05/1890 | 03/01/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 340 | S24 | 05/1890 | 06/02/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 339 | S24 | 05/1890 | 16/08/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 338 | S24 | 05/1890 | 13/01/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 346 | S24 | 05/1890 | 02/02/1961 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 877 | U25 | 08/1890 | 28/03/1955 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 876 | U25 | 08/1890 | 06/02/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 879 | U25 | 08/1890 | 04/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 878 | U25 | 08/1890 | 27/11/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 875 | U25 | 08/1890 | 03/1952 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 884 | U25 | 09/1890 | 07/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 880 | U25 | 09/1890 | 01/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 881 | U25 | 09/1890 | 08/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 882 | U25 | 09/1890 | 07/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 883 | U25 | 09/1890 | 22/05/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 885 | Y25 | 09/1890 | 05/1922 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 888 | Y25 | 10/1890 | 01/12/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 889 | Y25 | 10/1890 | 10/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 886 | Y25 | 10/1890 | 12/04/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 887 | Y25 | 10/1890 | 13/12/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 890 | Y25 | 10/1890 | 02/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 891 | Y25 | 11/1890 | 01/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 892 | Y25 | 11/1890 | 05/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 893 | Y25 | 11/1890 | 08/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 894 | Y25 | 11/1890 | 29/05/1948 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 397 | A26 | 11/1890 | 22/03/1954 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 398 | A26 | 11/1890 | 28/09/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 402 | A26 | 11/1890 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 401 | A26 | 11/1890 | 18/10/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 400 | A26 | 11/1890 | 01/04/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 399 | A26 | 11/1890 | 14/12/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 407 | B26 | 12/1890 | 29/04/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 408 | B26 | 12/1890 | 01/03/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 409 | B26 | 12/1890 | 18/02/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 406 | A26 | 12/1890 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 405 | A26 | 12/1890 | 09/01/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 404 | A26 | 12/1890 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 403 | A26 | 12/1890 | 25/07/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 411 | B26 | 01/1891 | 17/08/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 412 | B26 | 01/1891 | 17/08/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 413 | B26 | 01/1891 | 06/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 414 | B26 | 01/1891 | 17/03/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 415 | B26 | 01/1891 | 05/12/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 416 | B26 | 01/1891 | 06/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 410 | B26 | 01/1891 | 06/08/1958 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 417 | T26 | 02/1891 | 01/1930 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 418 | T26 | 03/1891 | 09/1934 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 419 | T26 | 03/1891 | 05/1926 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 423 | T26 | 03/1891 | 07/1926 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 424 | T26 | 03/1891 | 01/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 425 | T26 | 03/1891 | 02/1927 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 426 | T26 | 03/1891 | 10/1926 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 421 | T26 | 04/1891 | 11/1938 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 420 | T26 | 04/1891 | 03/1927 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 422 | T26 | 04/1891 | 09/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 427 | Y26 | 04/1891 | 26/09/1955 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 428 | Y26 | 04/1891 | 05/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 430 | Y26 | 04/1891 | 04/1926 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 431 | Y26 | 04/1891 | 06/1926 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 432 | Y26 | 04/1891 | 07/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 434 | Y26 | 04/1891 | 12/1933 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 435 | Y26 | 04/1891 | 03/1928 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 429 | Y26 | 04/1891 | 10/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 438 | A27 | 05/1891 | 05/1926 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 441 | A27 | 05/1891 | 06/1937 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 440 | A27 | 05/1891 | 06/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 437 | A27 | 05/1891 | 02/1927 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 436 | Y26 | 05/1891 | 06/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 433 | Y26 | 05/1891 | 04/1927 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 439 | A27 | 06/1891 | 08/1927 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 442 | A27 | 06/1891 | 12/1927 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 443 | A27 | 06/1891 | 10/1931 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 444 | A27 | 06/1891 | 06/1934 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 445 | A27 | 06/1891 | 01/1927 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 446 | A27 | 06/1891 | 04/1926 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 900 | L28 | 09/1891 | 12/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 898 | L28 | 09/1891 | 09/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 895 | L28 | 09/1891 | 05/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 896 | L28 | 09/1891 | 03/1939 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 897 | L28 | 09/1891 | 03/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 899 | L28 | 09/1891 | 01/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 907 | N28 | 10/1891 | 25/11/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 905 | N28 | 10/1891 | 03/1939 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 904 | L28 | 10/1891 | 18/02/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 906 | N28 | 10/1891 | 09/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 901 | L28 | 10/1891 | 18/02/1952 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 902 | L28 | 10/1891 | 12/03/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 903 | L28 | 10/1891 | 02/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 908 | N28 | 10/1891 | 08/1947 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 914 | N28 | 11/1891 | 05/04/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 913 | N28 | 11/1891 | 04/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 912 | N28 | 11/1891 | 10/1938 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 911 | N28 | 11/1891 | 16/08/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 910 | N28 | 11/1891 | 10/1956 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 909 | N28 | 11/1891 | 01/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 916 | P28 | 11/1891 | 04/1937 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 917 | P28 | 11/1891 | 03/1939 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 918 | P28 | 11/1891 | 11/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 915 | P28 | 11/1891 | 10/12/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 929 | S28 | 12/1891 | 12/03/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 930 | S28 | 12/1891 | 01/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 927 | S28 | 12/1891 | 12/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 926 | S28 | 12/1891 | 05/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 925 | S28 | 12/1891 | 11/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 924 | P28 | 12/1891 | 25/11/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 923 | P28 | 12/1891 | 10/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 922 | P28 | 12/1891 | 24/10/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 921 | P28 | 12/1891 | 15/04/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 919 | P28 | 12/1891 | 06/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 920 | P28 | 12/1891 | 06/02/1948 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 928 | S28 | 12/1891 | 20/08/1956 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 931 | S28 | 01/1892 | 02/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 932 | S28 | 01/1892 | 01/08/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 933 | S28 | 01/1892 | 03/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 934 | S28 | 01/1892 | 17/03/1948 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 347 | P29 | 02/1892 | 16/06/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 348 | P29 | 02/1892 | 14/12/1953 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 350 | P29 | 03/1892 | 20/06/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 351 | P29 | 03/1892 | 28/10/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 349 | P29 | 03/1892 | 03/10/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 352 | P29 | 03/1892 | 18/08/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 353 | P29 | 03/1892 | 14/02/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 354 | P29 | 03/1892 | 08/10/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 355 | P29 | 03/1892 | 16/12/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 356 | P29 | 03/1892 | 14/07/1953 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 361 | R29 | 04/1892 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 357 | R29 | 04/1892 | 30/08/1954 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 358 | R29 | 04/1892 | 20/08/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 359 | R29 | 04/1892 | 21/02/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 360 | R29 | 04/1892 | 20/06/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 362 | R29 | 04/1892 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 363 | R29 | 05/1892 | 16/01/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 364 | R29 | 05/1892 | 01/1931 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 365 | R29 | 05/1892 | 12/08/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 366 | R29 | 05/1892 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 937 | X28 | 08/1892 | 04/07/1955 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 941 | X28 | 08/1892 | 18/12/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 940 | X28 | 08/1892 | 25/11/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 939 | X28 | 08/1892 | 02/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 938 | X28 | 08/1892 | 10/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 936 | X28 | 08/1892 | 04/1937 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 447 | Z30 | 09/1892 | 09/1926 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 448 | Z30 | 09/1892 | 01/1930 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 449 | Z30 | 09/1892 | 02/1930 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 450 | Z30 | 09/1892 | 05/1927 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 451 | Z30 | 09/1892 | 02/1929 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 942 | X28 | 09/1892 | 01/10/1956 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 943 | X28 | 09/1892 | 21/05/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 944 | X28 | 09/1892 | 02/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 455 | Z30 | 10/1892 | 03/1934 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 454 | Z30 | 10/1892 | 06/1928 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 453 | Z30 | 10/1892 | 03/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 452 | Z30 | 10/1892 | 09/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 464 | A31 | 11/1892 | 12/1933 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 456 | Z30 | 11/1892 | 12/1928 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 457 | A31 | 11/1892 | 06/1931 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 458 | A31 | 11/1892 | 08/1937 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 459 | A31 | 11/1892 | 03/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 460 | A31 | 11/1892 | 04/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 461 | A31 | 11/1892 | 09/1931 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 462 | A31 | 11/1892 | 05/1937 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 463 | A31 | 11/1892 | 02/01/1956 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 945 | X28 | 11/1892 | 25/11/1950 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 471 | C31 | 12/1892 | 09/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 472 | C31 | 12/1892 | 05/1938 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 466 | A31 | 12/1892 | 29/11/1954 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 467 | C31 | 12/1892 | 04/1937 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 468 | C31 | 12/1892 | 08/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 469 | C31 | 12/1892 | 06/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 470 | C31 | 12/1892 | 05/1934 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 465 | A31 | 12/1892 | 07/1928 | |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 979 | H33 | 763 | 1893 | 1913 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 980 | H33 | 764 | 1893 | 09/1923 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 981 | H33 | 765 | 1893 | 04/1925 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 982 | H33 | 766 | 1893 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 983 | H33 | 767 | 1893 | 01/1925 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 984 | H33 | 768 | 1893 | 02/1925 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 985 | H33 | 769 | 1893 | 12/1923 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 986 | H33 | 770 | 1893 | 1922 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 987 | H33 | 771 | 1893 | 04/1925 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 988 | H33 | 772 | 1893 | 1911 |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 473 | C31 | 01/1893 | 12/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 476 | C31 | 01/1893 | 03/1937 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 475 | C31 | 01/1893 | 05/1931 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 474 | C31 | 01/1893 | 04/1929 | |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 999 | N31 | 722 | 01/1893 | 1920 |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 245 | B32 | 02/1893 | 01/1931 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 246 | B32 | 02/1893 | 12/1930 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 247 | B32 | 02/1893 | 06/02/1948 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 248 | B32 | 03/1893 | 05/1936 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 250 | B32 | 03/1893 | 22/10/1956 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 249 | B32 | 03/1893 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 252 | B32 | 03/1893 | 08/1935 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 251 | B32 | 03/1893 | 12/1931 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 253 | B32 | 04/1893 | 05/1949 | |
GER | J65 | 0-6-0T | 254 | B32 | 04/1893 | 06/1937 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1093 | C32 | 05/1893 | 13/05/1948 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1092 | C32 | 05/1893 | 12/03/1948 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1097 | C32 | 06/1893 | 18/02/1948 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1095 | C32 | 06/1893 | 13/05/1948 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1075 | O33 | 12/1893 | 03/1950 | |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 977 | E34 | 821 | 1894 | 01/1924 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 978 | E34 | 822 | 1894 | 07/1924 |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1079 | O33 | 01/1894 | 08/04/1953 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1078 | O33 | 01/1894 | 01/1950 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1081 | R33 | 02/1894 | 04/12/1950 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 367 | N33 | 04/1894 | 02/11/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 368 | N33 | 04/1894 | 31/01/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 369 | N33 | 04/1894 | 03/02/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 370 | N33 | 05/1894 | 05/05/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 373 | N33 | 05/1894 | 11/02/1962 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 371 | N33 | 05/1894 | 21/04/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 372 | N33 | 05/1894 | 09/11/1953 | |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 989 | L33 | 773 | 06/1894 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 990 | L33 | 774 | 06/1894 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 991 | L33 | 775 | 06/1894 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 992 | L33 | 776 | 06/1894 | 1922 |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 376 | N33 | 06/1894 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 375 | N33 | 06/1894 | 21/06/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 374 | N33 | 06/1894 | 25/07/1961 | |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 993 | L33 | 777 | 07/1894 | 08/1923 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 994 | L33 | 778 | 07/1894 | 1916 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 995 | L33 | 779 | 07/1894 | 1922 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 996 | L33 | 780 | 07/1894 | 1912 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 997 | L33 | 781 | 07/1894 | 1911 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 998 | L33 | 782 | 07/1894 | 03/1925 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 969 | E34 | 813 | 09/1894 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 970 | E34 | 814 | 09/1894 | 12/1923 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 971 | E34 | 815 | 09/1894 | 1908 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 972 | E34 | 816 | 09/1894 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 973 | E34 | 817 | 09/1894 | 03/1925 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 974 | E34 | 818 | 09/1894 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 975 | E34 | 819 | 09/1894 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 976 | E34 | 820 | 09/1894 | 08/1923 |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 479 | I34 | 10/1894 | 03/1938 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 480 | I34 | 10/1894 | 01/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 481 | I34 | 10/1894 | 06/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 478 | I34 | 10/1894 | 30/05/1955 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 477 | I34 | 10/1894 | 13/12/1954 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 485 | I34 | 11/1894 | 01/1940 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 486 | I34 | 11/1894 | 06/1931 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 484 | I34 | 11/1894 | 03/1936 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 483 | I34 | 11/1894 | 06/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 482 | I34 | 11/1894 | 09/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 489 | X34 | 12/1894 | 03/1936 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 488 | X34 | 12/1894 | 12/1928 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 487 | X34 | 12/1894 | 12/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 496 | X34 | 01/1895 | 04/03/1958 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 492 | X34 | 01/1895 | 30/07/1956 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 491 | X34 | 01/1895 | 01/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 490 | X34 | 01/1895 | 07/12/1959 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 493 | X34 | 01/1895 | 07/1929 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 494 | X34 | 01/1895 | 20/11/1956 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 495 | X34 | 01/1895 | 05/1928 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1061 | G35 | 05/1895 | 29/05/1948 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1067 | G35 | 05/1895 | 12/1950 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1068 | G35 | 05/1895 | 03/1949 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 377 | F36 | 10/1895 | 20/12/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 378 | F36 | 10/1895 | 25/07/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 379 | F36 | 10/1895 | 05/05/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 380 | F36 | 10/1895 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 381 | F36 | 10/1895 | 20/10/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 385 | F36 | 11/1895 | 14/07/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 384 | F36 | 11/1895 | 10/01/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 383 | F36 | 11/1895 | 04/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 382 | F36 | 11/1895 | 13/01/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 390 | Y36 | 12/1895 | 05/09/1962 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 387 | Y36 | 12/1895 | 03/10/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 388 | Y36 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 389 | Y36 | 12/1895 | 06/08/1962 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 386 | F36 | 12/1895 | 15/08/1956 | |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 959 | N37 | 903 | 01/1896 | 12/1923 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 960 | N37 | 904 | 01/1896 | 1911 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 961 | N37 | 905 | 01/1896 | 1911 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 962 | N37 | 906 | 01/1896 | 1910 |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 391 | Y36 | 01/1896 | 18/08/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 392 | Y36 | 01/1896 | 08/05/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 394 | Y36 | 01/1896 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 393 | Y36 | 01/1896 | 02/06/1960 | |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 963 | N37 | 907 | 02/1896 | 07/1924 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 964 | N37 | 908 | 02/1896 | 02/1924 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 965 | N37 | 909 | 02/1896 | 1921 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 966 | N37 | 910 | 02/1896 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 967 | N37 | 911 | 02/1896 | 1912 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 968 | N37 | 912 | 02/1896 | 1912 |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 396 | Y36 | 02/1896 | 29/11/1954 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 395 | Y36 | 02/1896 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 267 | C37 | 04/1896 | 06/10/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 268 | C37 | 04/1896 | 12/03/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 266 | C37 | 04/1896 | 19/01/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 265 | C37 | 04/1896 | 01/08/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 269 | C37 | 05/1896 | 10/11/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 270 | C37 | 05/1896 | 16/01/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 271 | C37 | 05/1896 | 18/01/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 273 | C37 | 06/1896 | 28/09/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 272 | C37 | 06/1896 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 274 | C37 | 06/1896 | 10/1940 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 497 | L37 | 07/1896 | 02/12/1957 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 499 | L37 | 08/1896 | 03/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 500 | L37 | 08/1896 | 06/1936 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 498 | L37 | 08/1896 | 01/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 501 | L37 | 09/1896 | 10/1938 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 502 | L37 | 09/1896 | 01/1939 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 503 | L37 | 09/1896 | 02/01/1956 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 504 | L37 | 10/1896 | 11/1938 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 505 | L37 | 10/1896 | 02/1931 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 506 | L37 | 10/1896 | 04/04/1955 | |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 602 | O41 | 937 | 1897 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 603 | O41 | 938 | 1897 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 604 | O41 | 939 | 1897 | 03/1925 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 605 | O41 | 940 | 1897 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 606 | O41 | 941 | 1897 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 607 | O41 | 942 | 1897 | 1913 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 608 | O41 | 943 | 1897 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 946 | O41 | 944 | 01/1897 | 1915 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 947 | O41 | 945 | 01/1897 | 1914 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 948 | O41 | 946 | 01/1897 | 1922 |
GER | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | 226 | 06/1897 | 08/1911 | ||
GER | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | 227 | 06/1897 | 12/1911 | ||
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 949 | H40 | 927 | 07/1897 | 1912 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 950 | H40 | 928 | 07/1897 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 951 | H40 | 929 | 07/1897 | 02/1924 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 952 | H40 | 930 | 07/1897 | 1912 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 953 | H40 | 931 | 07/1897 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 954 | H40 | 932 | 07/1897 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 955 | H40 | 933 | 07/1897 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 956 | H40 | 934 | 08/1897 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 957 | H40 | 935 | 08/1897 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 958 | H40 | 936 | 08/1897 | 1911 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 542 | G42 | 947 | 1898 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 543 | G42 | 948 | 1898 | 1920 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 544 | G42 | 949 | 1898 | 1912 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 545 | G42 | 950 | 1898 | 1914 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 546 | G42 | 951 | 1898 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 547 | G42 | 952 | 1898 | 1911 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 548 | G42 | 953 | 1898 | 1922 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 549 | G42 | 954 | 1898 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 550 | G42 | 955 | 1898 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 551 | G42 | 956 | 1898 | 1911 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 562 | K43 | 957 | 1898 | 1911 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 563 | K43 | 958 | 1898 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 564 | K43 | 959 | 1898 | 1914 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 565 | K43 | 960 | 1898 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 566 | K43 | 961 | 1898 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 567 | K43 | 962 | 1898 | 1911 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 568 | K43 | 963 | 1898 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 569 | K43 | 964 | 1898 | 1910 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 570 | K43 | 965 | 1898 | 1909 |
GER | J14 | 0-6-0 | 571 | K43 | 966 | 1898 | 1909 |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 260 | H45 | 03/1899 | 21/05/1956 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 259 | H45 | 03/1899 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 258 | H45 | 03/1899 | 06/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 257 | H45 | 03/1899 | 13/08/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 256 | H45 | 03/1899 | 26/04/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 255 | H45 | 03/1899 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 262 | H45 | 04/1899 | 01/05/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 264 | H45 | 04/1899 | 29/09/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 261 | H45 | 04/1899 | 01/10/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 263 | H45 | 04/1899 | 30/01/1956 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 507 | I45 | 05/1899 | 01/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 508 | I45 | 05/1899 | 08/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 509 | I45 | 05/1899 | 25/11/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 510 | I45 | 05/1899 | 02/01/1956 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 511 | I45 | 05/1899 | 05/03/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 512 | I45 | 05/1899 | 10/03/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 513 | I45 | 05/1899 | 08/1920 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 514 | I45 | 05/1899 | 08/02/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 515 | I45 | 06/1899 | 16/11/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 521 | S45 | 06/1899 | 06/1939 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 520 | S45 | 06/1899 | 09/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 519 | S45 | 06/1899 | 12/1934 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 518 | S45 | 06/1899 | 04/1937 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 517 | S45 | 06/1899 | 12/1949 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 516 | I45 | 06/1899 | 15/10/1956 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 640 | X45 | 07/1899 | 10/10/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 642 | X45 | 07/1899 | 19/05/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 643 | X45 | 07/1899 | 07/12/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 644 | X45 | 07/1899 | 20/10/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 641 | X45 | 07/1899 | 08/10/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 645 | X45 | 08/1899 | 01/08/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 646 | X45 | 08/1899 | 19/12/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 647 | X45 | 08/1899 | 13/04/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 648 | X45 | 09/1899 | 07/03/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 649 | X45 | 09/1899 | 14/12/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 523 | S45 | 09/1899 | 19/07/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 522 | S45 | 19/09/1899 | 03/1936 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 526 | S45 | 10/1899 | 11/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 525 | S45 | 10/1899 | 10/1935 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 524 | S45 | 10/1899 | 03/1936 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 202 | G47 | 12/1899 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 201 | G47 | 12/1899 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 200 | G47 | 12/1899 | 07/03/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 199 | G47 | 12/1899 | 07/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 203 | G47 | 12/1899 | 04/01/1960 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 206 | G47 | 12/1899 | 20/01/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 205 | G47 | 12/1899 | 05/1937 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 204 | G47 | 12/1899 | 28/07/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 208 | G47 | 01/1900 | 12/01/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 207 | G47 | 01/1900 | 18/11/1955 | |
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1900 | 03/1900 | 05/1947 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1890 | 04/1900 | 25/06/1951 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1891 | 04/1900 | 04/02/1952 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1892 | 04/1900 | 12/02/1951 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1894 | 05/1900 | 19/11/1951 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1893 | 05/1900 | 06/1948 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1897 | 06/1900 | 10/1950 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1896 | 06/1900 | 21/04/1952 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1895 | 06/1900 | 21/04/1952 | ||
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 189 | S48 | 06/1900 | 06/11/1959 | |
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1898 | 07/1900 | 22/09/1952 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1899 | 07/1900 | 07/10/1957 | ||
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 195 | S48 | 07/1900 | 28/10/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 194 | S48 | 07/1900 | 01/10/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 193 | S48 | 07/1900 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 190 | S48 | 07/1900 | 11/10/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 191 | S48 | 07/1900 | 11/05/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 192 | S48 | 07/1900 | 02/11/1959 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 198 | S48 | 08/1900 | 04/07/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 197 | S48 | 08/1900 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 196 | S48 | 08/1900 | 05/03/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1152 | F48 | 09/1900 | 01/09/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1151 | F48 | 09/1900 | 29/01/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1150 | F48 | 09/1900 | 03/03/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1153 | F48 | 09/1900 | 22/08/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1154 | F48 | 10/1900 | 27/10/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1155 | F48 | 10/1900 | 06/11/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1157 | F48 | 10/1900 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1156 | F48 | 10/1900 | 22/08/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1163 | H50 | 11/1900 | 21/03/1961 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1159 | F48 | 11/1900 | 27/01/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1160 | H50 | 11/1900 | 21/03/1955 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1161 | H50 | 11/1900 | 28/11/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1162 | H50 | 11/1900 | 07/12/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1158 | F48 | 11/1900 | 03/06/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1164 | H50 | 12/1900 | 04/01/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1168 | H50 | 01/1901 | 17/09/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1167 | H50 | 01/1901 | 09/05/1955 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1166 | H50 | 01/1901 | 07/03/1955 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1165 | H50 | 01/1901 | 15/09/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1169 | H50 | 02/1901 | 10/03/1960 | |
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1880 | 04/1901 | 17/12/1959 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1881 | 05/1901 | 08/1950 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1882 | 05/1901 | 03/11/1958 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1883 | 05/1901 | 11/03/1957 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1884 | 05/1901 | 01/04/1958 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1885 | 05/1901 | 18/08/1957 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1887 | 06/1901 | 13/10/1958 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1888 | 06/1901 | 01/01/1957 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1889 | 06/1901 | 27/08/1951 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1886 | 06/1901 | 28/09/1959 | ||
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 163 | R50 | 06/1901 | 07/01/1957 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 160 | R50 | 06/1901 | 05/05/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 161 | R50 | 06/1901 | 15/10/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 162 | R50 | 06/1901 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 164 | R50 | 06/1901 | 25/07/1955 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 165 | R50 | 07/1901 | 26/06/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 166 | R50 | 07/1901 | 17/09/1961 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 167 | R50 | 07/1901 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 169 | R50 | 08/1901 | 27/11/1958 | |
GER | J67 | 0-6-0T | 168 | R50 | 08/1901 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1170 | L52 | 09/1901 | 22/02/1961 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1171 | L52 | 09/1901 | 11/02/1962 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1172 | L52 | 09/1901 | 29/09/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1178 | L52 | 10/1901 | 14/11/1961 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1176 | L52 | 10/1901 | 10/08/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1177 | L52 | 10/1901 | 17/04/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1179 | L52 | 10/1901 | 12/05/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1175 | L52 | 10/1901 | 13/04/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1174 | L52 | 10/1901 | 21/03/1955 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1173 | L52 | 10/1901 | 13/05/1957 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1182 | P52 | 11/1901 | 11/02/1962 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1183 | P52 | 11/1901 | 04/01/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1184 | P52 | 11/1901 | 05/05/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1181 | P52 | 11/1901 | 21/04/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1180 | P52 | 11/1901 | 11/01/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1185 | P52 | 12/1901 | 05/05/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1188 | P52 | 12/1901 | 17/04/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1187 | P52 | 12/1901 | 28/01/1957 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1186 | P52 | 12/1901 | 17/03/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1189 | P52 | 02/1902 | 22/08/1960 | |
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1870 | 03/1902 | 10/02/1958 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1871 | 03/1902 | 04/08/1958 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1872 | 03/1902 | 27/08/1956 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1873 | 03/1902 | 10/03/1960 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1874 | 03/1902 | 19/09/1955 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1877 | 04/1902 | 25/06/1951 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1875 | 04/1902 | 21/05/1957 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1876 | 04/1902 | 07/07/1952 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1878 | 05/1902 | 23/11/1959 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1879 | 05/1902 | 22/09/1958 | ||
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1040 | D53 | 05/1902 | 29/05/1948 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1042 | D53 | 05/1902 | 22/07/1948 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1253 | S50 | 06/1902 | 01/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1250 | S50 | 06/1902 | 18/06/1956 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1251 | S50 | 06/1902 | 28/02/1955 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1252 | S50 | 06/1902 | 22/08/1955 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1254 | S50 | 06/1902 | 07/03/1955 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1048 | D53 | 06/1902 | 18/07/1949 | |
GER | F3 | 2-4-2T | 1049 | D53 | 06/1902 | 10/1949 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1257 | S50 | 07/1902 | 13/05/1957 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1256 | S50 | 07/1902 | 10/1931 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1255 | S50 | 07/1902 | 08/1935 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1258 | S50 | 08/1902 | 06/1937 | |
GER | E4 | 2-4-0 | 1259 | S50 | 08/1902 | 17/03/1958 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1190 | B54 | 09/1902 | 13/04/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1191 | B54 | 09/1902 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1192 | B54 | 09/1902 | 04/05/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1193 | B54 | 09/1902 | 02/05/1955 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1194 | B54 | 09/1902 | 23/11/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1195 | B54 | 10/1902 | 26/10/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1196 | B54 | 10/1902 | 04/01/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1197 | B54 | 10/1902 | 06/09/1954 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1198 | B54 | 10/1902 | 07/03/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1200 | P54 | 11/1902 | 11/1944 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1199 | B54 | 11/1902 | 19/12/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1201 | P54 | 12/1902 | 10/02/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1202 | P54 | 12/1902 | 10/01/1955 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1203 | P54 | 12/1902 | 21/04/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1204 | P54 | 12/1902 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1205 | P54 | 01/1903 | 17/03/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1206 | P54 | 01/1903 | 16/03/1961 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1207 | P54 | 02/1903 | 22/04/1959 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1208 | P54 | 02/1903 | 04/01/1960 | |
GER | J16 | 0-6-0 | 1209 | P54 | 02/1903 | 16/11/1959 | |
GER | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | 230 | 1221 | 03/1903 | 15/04/1948 | |
GER | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | 7231 | 1222 | 04/1903 | 16/07/1931 | |
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1860 | 05/1903 | 21/03/1955 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1861 | 05/1903 | 12/11/1956 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1862 | 05/1903 | 23/09/1957 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1863 | 06/1903 | 11/11/1958 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1864 | 06/1903 | 25/11/1957 | ||
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 140 | P55 | 06/1903 | 03/1932 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 141 | P55 | 06/1903 | 29/12/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 142 | P55 | 06/1903 | 20/12/1956 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 143 | P55 | 06/1903 | 23/11/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 144 | P55 | 06/1903 | 21/11/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 146 | P55 | 07/1903 | 01/1930 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 145 | P55 | 07/1903 | 21/04/1958 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 147 | P55 | 07/1903 | 04/11/1957 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 149 | P55 | 08/1903 | 05/1931 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 148 | P55 | 08/1903 | 08/1931 | |
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1866 | 09/1903 | 09/1945 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1865 | 09/1903 | 25/07/1955 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1868 | 10/1903 | 28/10/1957 | ||
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1867 | 10/1903 | 28/04/1952 | ||
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 135 | C53 | 10/1903 | 30/11/1953 | |
GER | D14 | 4-4-0 | 1869 | 11/1903 | 24/08/1959 | ||
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 136 | C53 | 11/1903 | 09/03/1953 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1852 | 12/1903 | 13/10/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1853 | 12/1903 | 24/11/1959 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1850 | 12/1903 | 17/10/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1851 | 12/1903 | 15/10/1956 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1854 | 01/1904 | 22/09/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1855 | 02/1904 | 18/06/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1858 | 03/1904 | 12/12/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1857 | 03/1904 | 08/10/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1856 | 03/1904 | 02/1951 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1859 | 04/1904 | 11/1946 | ||
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 55 | S56 | 05/1904 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 54 | S56 | 05/1904 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 53 | S56 | 05/1904 | 30/10/1961 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 52 | S56 | 05/1904 | 18/08/1958 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 51 | S56 | 05/1904 | 14/07/1958 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 60 | S56 | 06/1904 | 03/05/1962 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 59 | S56 | 06/1904 | 01/01/1959 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 58 | S56 | 06/1904 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 57 | S56 | 06/1904 | 14/02/1961 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 56 | S56 | 06/1904 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 81 | P57 | 08/1904 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 82 | P57 | 08/1904 | 24/02/1958 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 84 | P57 | 08/1904 | 01/01/1959 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 85 | P57 | 08/1904 | 28/07/1958 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 83 | P57 | 08/1904 | 26/11/1959 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 86 | P57 | 09/1904 | 08/05/1958 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 87 | P57 | 09/1904 | 24/11/1960 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 88 | P57 | 09/1904 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 89 | P57 | 09/1904 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J69 | 0-6-0T | 90 | P57 | 09/1904 | 01/01/1959 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 781 | D58 | 10/1904 | 10/1956 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 788 | D58 | 11/1904 | 17/12/1956 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 787 | D58 | 11/1904 | 20/12/1957 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 786 | D58 | 11/1904 | 05/02/1957 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 785 | D58 | 11/1904 | 15/08/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 784 | D58 | 11/1904 | 14/03/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 783 | D58 | 11/1904 | 07/03/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 782 | D58 | 11/1904 | 06/05/1958 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 789 | D58 | 12/1904 | 10/03/1958 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 790 | D58 | 12/1904 | 06/11/1956 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1212 | G58 | 04/1905 | 25/08/1958 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1211 | G58 | 04/1905 | 07/12/1959 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1210 | G58 | 04/1905 | 05/06/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1218 | G58 | 05/1905 | 22/09/1958 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1216 | G58 | 05/1905 | 04/07/1960 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1217 | G58 | 05/1905 | 06/08/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1215 | G58 | 05/1905 | 05/04/1960 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1214 | G58 | 05/1905 | 17/08/1960 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1213 | G58 | 05/1905 | 01/01/1960 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1219 | G58 | 06/1905 | 21/02/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 91 | R58 | 07/1905 | 16/12/1957 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 94 | R58 | 07/1905 | 16/12/1957 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 93 | R58 | 07/1905 | 05/1932 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 92 | R58 | 07/1905 | 04/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 95 | R58 | 08/1905 | 27/09/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 97 | R58 | 09/1905 | 12/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 98 | R58 | 09/1905 | 11/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 96 | R58 | 09/1905 | 23/11/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 99 | R58 | 10/1905 | 05/1932 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 100 | R58 | 10/1905 | 27/09/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 101 | C59 | 11/1905 | 11/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 106 | C59 | 11/1905 | 02/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 102 | C59 | 11/1905 | 02/1931 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 105 | C59 | 11/1905 | 03/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 104 | C59 | 11/1905 | 10/01/1957 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 103 | C59 | 11/1905 | 06/12/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 110 | C59 | 01/1906 | 10/1956 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 108 | C59 | 01/1906 | 18/02/1957 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1224 | S59 | 01/1906 | 19/04/1955 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1220 | S59 | 01/1906 | 22/04/1960 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1221 | S59 | 01/1906 | 11/02/1958 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1222 | S59 | 01/1906 | 02/12/1957 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1223 | S59 | 01/1906 | 08/10/1958 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 109 | C59 | 02/1906 | 04/07/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 107 | C59 | 02/1906 | 12/1929 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1225 | S59 | 02/1906 | 04/02/1958 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1226 | S59 | 02/1906 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1227 | S59 | 02/1906 | 11/02/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1228 | S59 | 03/1906 | 05/03/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1229 | S59 | 03/1906 | 29/11/1954 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 552 | A60 | 05/1906 | 26/10/1961 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 553 | A60 | 05/1906 | 28/09/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 555 | A60 | 06/1906 | 06/08/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 554 | A60 | 06/1906 | 07/12/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 559 | A60 | 06/1906 | 11/02/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 558 | A60 | 06/1906 | 08/09/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 557 | A60 | 06/1906 | 18/03/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 556 | A60 | 06/1906 | 22/05/1959 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 238 | I60 | 07/1906 | 07/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 237 | I60 | 07/1906 | 09/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 236 | I60 | 07/1906 | 28/08/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 780 | I60 | 07/1906 | 05/05/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 561 | A60 | 07/1906 | 10/02/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 560 | A60 | 07/1906 | 31/10/1961 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 240 | I60 | 08/1906 | 06/1937 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 239 | I60 | 08/1906 | 11/1929 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 241 | I60 | 08/1906 | 10/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 244 | I60 | 09/1906 | 04/02/1952 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 242 | I60 | 09/1906 | 10/1937 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 243 | I60 | 09/1906 | 12/1934 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1840 | 11/1906 | 16/07/1956 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1841 | 11/1906 | 25/10/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1842 | 11/1906 | 01/01/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1843 | 11/1906 | 28/11/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1844 | 11/1906 | 24/03/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1845 | 11/1906 | 01/01/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1846 | 12/1906 | 31/10/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1847 | 12/1906 | 06/05/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1849 | 01/1907 | 24/09/1948 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1848 | 01/1907 | 12/12/1955 | ||
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 572 | A62 | 02/1907 | 03/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 573 | A62 | 03/1907 | 07/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 574 | A62 | 03/1907 | 03/09/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 575 | A62 | 03/1907 | 01/1931 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 576 | A62 | 03/1907 | 05/1937 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 580 | A62 | 04/1907 | 07/1937 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 579 | A62 | 04/1907 | 11/1950 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 578 | A62 | 04/1907 | 14/08/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 577 | A62 | 04/1907 | 01/1931 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 581 | A62 | 05/1907 | 08/06/1956 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 582 | D63 | 05/1907 | 03/1936 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 583 | D63 | 05/1907 | 05/1937 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 584 | D63 | 05/1907 | 13/01/1953 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 585 | D63 | 05/1907 | 03/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 589 | D63 | 06/1907 | 05/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 588 | D63 | 06/1907 | 04/1950 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 587 | D63 | 06/1907 | 10/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 586 | D63 | 06/1907 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 591 | D63 | 07/1907 | 03/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 590 | D63 | 07/1907 | 05/05/1958 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 212 | G63 | 08/1907 | 12/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 211 | G63 | 08/1907 | 08/1934 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 217 | G63 | 09/1907 | 04/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 216 | G63 | 09/1907 | 03/1934 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 215 | G63 | 09/1907 | 05/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 214 | G63 | 09/1907 | 15/08/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 213 | G63 | 09/1907 | 12/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 218 | G63 | 10/1907 | 03/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 220 | G63 | 10/1907 | 05/1934 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 219 | G63 | 10/1907 | 12/12/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 223 | H63 | 11/1907 | 02/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 111 | H63 | 11/1907 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 221 | H63 | 11/1907 | 06/1934 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 232 | H63 | 11/1907 | 15/01/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 225 | H63 | 11/1907 | 05/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 224 | H63 | 11/1907 | 02/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 222 | H63 | 11/1907 | 27/08/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 235 | H63 | 12/1907 | 06/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 234 | H63 | 12/1907 | 04/1933 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 233 | H63 | 12/1907 | 09/04/1951 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1832 | 03/1908 | 06/08/1948 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1831 | 03/1908 | 22/10/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1830 | 03/1908 | 10/02/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1833 | 04/1908 | 24/03/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1834 | 04/1908 | 01/01/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1835 | 05/1908 | 02/12/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1836 | 05/1908 | 17/12/1956 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1837 | 06/1908 | 28/04/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1839 | 07/1908 | 24/11/1959 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1838 | 07/1908 | 26/11/1956 | ||
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 170 | S64 | 08/1908 | 19/09/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 174 | S64 | 09/1908 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 173 | S64 | 09/1908 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 171 | S64 | 09/1908 | 04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 172 | S64 | 09/1908 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 137 | C64 | 09/1908 | 09/1949 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 138 | C64 | 09/1908 | 01/1942 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 178 | S64 | 10/1908 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 177 | S64 | 10/1908 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 176 | S64 | 10/1908 | 04/1943 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 175 | S64 | 10/1908 | 01/08/1951 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 139 | C64 | 10/1908 | 31/08/1953 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 181 | A65 | 11/1908 | 11/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 180 | A65 | 11/1908 | 13/12/1954 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 179 | S64 | 11/1908 | 17/12/1956 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 183 | A65 | 12/1908 | 10/1934 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 184 | A65 | 12/1908 | 01/08/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 182 | A65 | 12/1908 | 01/1931 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 185 | A65 | 01/1909 | 22/07/1953 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 186 | A65 | 01/1909 | 12/03/1951 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 187 | A65 | 02/1909 | 18/08/1952 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 188 | A65 | 02/1909 | 21/11/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 189 | A65 | 02/1909 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 71 | I65 | 03/1909 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 72 | I65 | 03/1909 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 73 | I65 | 03/1909 | 03/1935 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 74 | I65 | 03/1909 | 12/01/1953 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 75 | I65 | 04/1909 | 04/1950 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 76 | I65 | 04/1909 | 08/12/1952 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 77 | I65 | 04/1909 | 24/04/1948 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 78 | I65 | 04/1909 | 22/07/1953 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 79 | I65 | 05/1909 | 18/08/1955 | |
GER | F4 | 2-4-2T | 80 | I65 | 05/1909 | 02/1936 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1821 | 06/1909 | 28/07/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1820 | 06/1909 | 01/01/1959 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1822 | 09/1909 | 24/10/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1824 | 11/1909 | 29/05/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1823 | 11/1909 | 05/12/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1825 | 11/1909 | 09/09/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1828 | 12/1909 | 07/03/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1826 | 12/1909 | 10/1956 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1827 | 12/1909 | 21/10/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1829 | 12/1909 | 09/06/1958 | ||
GER | F7 | 2-4-2T | 1308 | A67 | 12/1909 | 08/11/1948 | |
GER | F7 | 2-4-2T | 1310 | A67 | 01/1910 | 08/11/1948 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1810 | 03/1910 | 09/03/1953 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1811 | 03/1910 | 01/01/1959 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1812 | 03/1910 | 23/11/1948 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1813 | 04/1910 | 23/12/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1814 | 04/1910 | 11/04/1955 | ||
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 130 | I67 | 04/1910 | 23/02/1953 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1815 | 05/1910 | 05/03/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1819 | 06/1910 | 28/01/1952 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1818 | 06/1910 | 18/05/1959 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1816 | 06/1910 | 17/12/1956 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1817 | 06/1910 | 13/10/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1801 | 07/1910 | 01/04/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1800 | 07/1910 | 17/04/1950 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1802 | 08/1910 | 07/10/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1803 | 08/1910 | 03/1949 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1804 | 08/1910 | 11/1946 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1806 | 09/1910 | 04/01/1960 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1805 | 09/1910 | 28/10/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1808 | 10/1910 | 15/09/1958 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1807 | 10/1910 | 12/05/1952 | ||
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1230 | T67 | 10/1910 | 16/11/1959 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1809 | 11/1910 | 12/06/1948 | ||
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1235 | T67 | 11/1910 | 01/11/1954 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1234 | T67 | 11/1910 | 02/02/1960 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1233 | T67 | 11/1910 | 11/02/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1232 | T67 | 11/1910 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1231 | T67 | 11/1910 | 25/04/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1236 | T67 | 12/1910 | 17/04/1962 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1237 | T67 | 12/1910 | 01/12/1958 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1238 | T67 | 01/1911 | 29/05/1961 | |
GER | J17 | 0-6-0 | 1239 | T67 | 01/1911 | 02/01/1961 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1790 | 02/1911 | 01/01/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1792 | 03/1911 | 03/09/1951 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1791 | 03/1911 | 23/09/1948 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1793 | 04/1911 | 05/02/1960 | ||
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 61 | G69 | 04/1911 | 25/07/1955 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 63 | G69 | 04/1911 | 17/08/1955 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 62 | G69 | 04/1911 | 31/10/1957 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1794 | 05/1911 | 06/06/1957 | ||
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 68 | G69 | 05/1911 | 08/05/1958 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 67 | G69 | 05/1911 | 14/11/1955 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 66 | G69 | 05/1911 | 28/05/1956 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 65 | G69 | 05/1911 | 19/11/1956 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 64 | G69 | 05/1911 | 13/12/1955 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 70 | G69 | 06/1911 | 18/03/1958 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 69 | G69 | 06/1911 | 21/04/1958 | |
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1795 | 07/1911 | 28/09/1959 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1797 | 07/1911 | 01/01/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1796 | 07/1911 | 28/11/1955 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1798 | 08/1911 | 04/02/1957 | ||
GER | D15 | 4-4-0 | 1799 | 08/1911 | 01/01/1959 | ||
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 2 | A71 | 10/1911 | 14/03/1958 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 1 | A71 | 10/1911 | 13/05/1958 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5 | A71 | 11/1911 | 17/08/1956 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4 | A71 | 11/1911 | 13/12/1955 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 3 | A71 | 11/1911 | 14/11/1955 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1500 | S69 | 12/1911 | 23/06/1948 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 7 | A71 | 12/1911 | 17/08/1955 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 6 | A71 | 12/1911 | 16/01/1956 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 10 | A71 | 01/1912 | 30/12/1955 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 9 | A71 | 01/1912 | 07/11/1955 | |
GER | F6 | 2-4-2T | 8 | A71 | 01/1912 | 08/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1501 | S69 | 02/1912 | 20/05/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1502 | S69 | 02/1912 | 30/04/1954 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 562 | B70 | 02/1912 | 05/09/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 563 | B70 | 02/1912 | 14/04/1960 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1503 | S69 | 03/1912 | 20/05/1951 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 565 | B70 | 03/1912 | 18/11/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 564 | B70 | 03/1912 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 567 | B70 | 03/1912 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 566 | B70 | 03/1912 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 568 | B70 | 04/1912 | 28/07/1958 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 569 | B70 | 04/1912 | 03/02/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1504 | S69 | 05/1912 | 16/06/1950 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 571 | B70 | 05/1912 | 01/08/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 570 | B70 | 05/1912 | 30/09/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 43 | C72 | 06/1912 | 17/04/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 42 | C72 | 06/1912 | 24/02/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 41 | C72 | 06/1912 | 10/1940 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 45 | C72 | 07/1912 | 06/11/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 44 | C72 | 07/1912 | 22/04/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 47 | C72 | 08/1912 | 16/11/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 46 | C72 | 08/1912 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 48 | C72 | 09/1912 | 28/11/1960 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 49 | C72 | 09/1912 | 06/11/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 50 | C72 | 09/1912 | 10/09/1961 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1245 | E72 | 11/1912 | 12/12/1958 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1244 | E72 | 11/1912 | 27/07/1959 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1243 | E72 | 11/1912 | 23/11/1961 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1242 | E72 | 11/1912 | 30/03/1960 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1241 | E72 | 11/1912 | 25/01/1960 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1246 | E72 | 11/1912 | 26/10/1961 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1240 | E72 | 11/1912 | 26/11/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1506 | 12/1912 | 07/1913 | ||
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1248 | E72 | 12/1912 | 11/08/1959 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1247 | E72 | 12/1912 | 30/03/1960 | |
LNER | J18 | 0-6-0 | 1249 | E72 | 01/1913 | 01/01/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1505 | A73 | 02/1913 | 25/03/1952 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1508 | A73 | 03/1913 | 30/04/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1507 | A73 | 03/1913 | 26/02/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1510 | A73 | 04/1913 | 06/1949 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1509 | A73 | 04/1913 | 15/10/1948 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1511 | A73 | 05/1913 | 05/05/1952 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1514 | A73 | 06/1913 | 07/10/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1513 | A73 | 06/1913 | 18/02/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1512 | A73 | 06/1913 | 01/01/1957 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 542 | G73 | 06/1913 | 07/12/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 543 | G73 | 06/1913 | 17/06/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 544 | G73 | 06/1913 | 05/12/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 545 | G73 | 06/1913 | 17/03/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 546 | G73 | 07/1913 | 08/02/1960 | |
GER | Y4 | 0-4-0T | 227 | 1554 | 07/1913 | 19/09/1955 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 549 | G73 | 08/1913 | 08/02/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 548 | G73 | 08/1913 | 05/09/1962 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 547 | G73 | 08/1913 | 01/09/1959 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 551 | G73 | 09/1913 | 15/08/1960 | |
GER | J15 | 0-6-0 | 550 | G73 | 09/1913 | 26/10/1961 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1517 | E75 | 11/1913 | 21/10/1948 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1516 | E75 | 11/1913 | 14/07/1958 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1515 | E75 | 11/1913 | 12/11/1951 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1519 | E75 | 12/1913 | 23/12/1957 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1518 | E75 | 12/1913 | 12/1947 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 21 | G75 | 12/1913 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 22 | G75 | 12/1913 | 24/08/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 23 | G75 | 12/1913 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 24 | G75 | 12/1913 | 11/10/1960 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 25 | G75 | 12/1913 | 19/05/1958 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 26 | G75 | 12/1913 | 28/09/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 27 | G75 | 12/1913 | 28/07/1958 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 28 | G75 | 01/1914 | 11/03/1960 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 29 | G75 | 01/1914 | 24/11/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 30 | G75 | 02/1914 | 04/04/1960 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1521 | R75 | 04/1914 | 15/07/1952 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1520 | R75 | 04/1914 | 24/06/1957 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1522 | R75 | 04/1914 | 08/1947 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1524 | R75 | 05/1914 | 05/11/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1523 | R75 | 05/1914 | 21/03/1955 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1526 | R75 | 06/1914 | 26/10/1951 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1525 | R75 | 06/1914 | 06/08/1951 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 127 | P75 | 06/1914 | 21/05/1951 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 128 | P75 | 06/1914 | 01/1955 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 131 | P75 | 06/1914 | 19/07/1955 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1527 | R75 | 08/1914 | 09/1947 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1528 | R75 | 08/1914 | 01/07/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1529 | R75 | 09/1914 | 03/02/1950 | |
GER | Y4 | 0-4-0T | 226 | 1583 | 09/1914 | 23/04/1956 | |
GER | Y4 | 0-4-0T | 228 | 1584 | 10/1914 | 23/10/1957 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1530 | M77 | 11/1914 | 09/11/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1531 | M77 | 11/1914 | 11/1947 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1532 | M77 | 12/1914 | 01/07/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1533 | M77 | 12/1914 | 03/11/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1000 | L77 | 01/1915 | 03/02/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1534 | M77 | 02/1915 | 06/1945 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1001 | L77 | 02/1915 | 05/05/1958 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1535 | M77 | 03/1915 | 11/12/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1536 | B78 | 05/1915 | 30/12/1949 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1537 | B78 | 07/1915 | 22/04/1957 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1538 | B78 | 07/1915 | 01/01/1957 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1142 | T77 | 08/1916 | 17/01/1961 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1141 | T77 | 08/1916 | 01/01/1959 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1140 | T77 | 08/1916 | 11/10/1960 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1143 | T77 | 09/1916 | 13/01/1961 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1144 | T77 | 10/1916 | 25/01/1960 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1145 | T77 | 11/1916 | 03/08/1961 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1146 | T77 | 11/1916 | 09/05/1960 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1147 | T77 | 11/1916 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1148 | T77 | 12/1916 | 09/11/1959 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1149 | T77 | 01/1917 | 01/04/1960 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1539 | B78 | 06/1917 | 10/11/1954 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1540 | B78 | 07/1917 | 28/10/1957 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1260 | H80 | 12/1917 | 29/08/1960 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1261 | H80 | 12/1917 | 24/08/1959 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1262 | H80 | 01/1918 | 19/01/1959 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1263 | H80 | 03/1918 | 11/10/1960 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1264 | H80 | 09/1918 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1266 | X80 | 11/1918 | 13/01/1961 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1265 | X80 | 11/1918 | 14/12/1959 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1267 | X80 | 12/1918 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1268 | X80 | 01/1919 | 14/12/1959 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1269 | X80 | 03/1919 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1561 | H82 | 03/1920 | 30/09/1958 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1564 | H82 | 04/1920 | 24/11/1958 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1563 | H82 | 04/1920 | 10/04/1953 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1562 | H82 | 04/1920 | 08/08/1955 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1270 | D81 | 04/1920 | 14/12/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1566 | H82 | 05/1920 | 26/01/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1565 | H82 | 05/1920 | 01/01/1957 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1567 | H82 | 05/1920 | 11/11/1958 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1568 | H82 | 06/1920 | 03/08/1959 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1569 | H82 | 06/1920 | 01/01/1957 | |
GER | B12 | 4-6-0 | 1570 | H82 | 06/1920 | 31/03/1958 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1250 | A81 | 09/1920 | 24/11/1959 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1252 | A81 | 10/1920 | 01/01/1959 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1251 | A81 | 10/1920 | 11/02/1962 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1253 | A81 | 10/1920 | 06/08/1962 | |
GER | J19 | 0-6-0 | 1254 | A81 | 11/1920 | 16/01/1961 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1273 | D81 | 12/1920 | 23/09/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1274 | D81 | 12/1920 | 13/01/1961 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1271 | D81 | 12/1920 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1272 | D81 | 12/1920 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | Y4 | 0-4-0T | 210 | 1628 | 01/1921 | 12/1963 | |
GER | Y4 | 0-4-0T | 229 | 1629 | 01/1921 | 08/10/1956 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 129 | D85 | 03/1921 | 02/08/1955 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 125 | D85 | 03/1921 | 24/03/1952 | |
GER | J70 | 0-6-0T | 126 | D85 | 03/1921 | 08/03/1955 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1002 | K85 | 07/1921 | 27/07/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1003 | K85 | 07/1921 | 27/07/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1004 | K85 | 09/1921 | 10/08/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1005 | K85 | 09/1921 | 06/10/1958 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1006 | K85 | 09/1921 | 11/08/1958 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1008 | K85 | 10/1921 | 11/08/1958 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1009 | K85 | 10/1921 | 28/04/1958 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1007 | K85 | 10/1921 | 22/07/1958 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1010 | K85 | 11/1921 | 01/01/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 1011 | K85 | 11/1921 | 24/11/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1275 | M87 | 09/1922 | 13/01/1961 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1279 | M87 | 09/1922 | 27/06/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1278 | M87 | 09/1922 | 11/1959 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1277 | M87 | 09/1922 | 23/09/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1276 | M87 | 09/1922 | 02/11/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1280 | M87 | 10/1922 | 06/10/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1281 | M87 | 10/1922 | 22/08/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1282 | M87 | 10/1922 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1284 | M87 | 11/1922 | 13/01/1961 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1283 | M87 | 11/1922 | 12/01/1959 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1290 | Y87 | 12/1922 | 12/01/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1291 | Y87 | 12/1922 | 06/04/1962 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1289 | Y87 | 12/1922 | 06/01/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1288 | Y87 | 12/1922 | 22/08/1960 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1287 | Y87 | 12/1922 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1286 | Y87 | 12/1922 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1285 | Y87 | 12/1922 | 16/09/1962 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1292 | Y87 | 01/1923 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1293 | Y87 | 01/1923 | 20/03/1961 | |
GER | J20 | 0-6-0 | 1294 | Y87 | 01/1923 | 16/09/1962 | |
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1780 | 06/1923 | 01/01/1957 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1782 | 06/1923 | 25/10/1960 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1781 | 06/1923 | 24/11/1959 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1784 | 07/1923 | 13/10/1958 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1785 | 07/1923 | 23/02/1953 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1783 | 07/1923 | 18/08/1958 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1786 | 08/1923 | 20/05/1957 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1787 | 08/1923 | 23/11/1959 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1788 | 09/1923 | 07/10/1957 | ||
LNER | D16 | 4-4-0 | 1789 | 09/1923 | 10/10/1955 | ||
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 31E | I89 | 10/1923 | 18/08/1958 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 32E | I89 | 10/1923 | 17/04/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 35E | I89 | 10/1923 | 18/12/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 34E | I89 | 10/1923 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 33E | I89 | 10/1923 | 18/08/1958 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 40E | I89 | 11/1923 | 18/08/1958 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 39E | I89 | 11/1923 | 07/12/1959 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 38E | I89 | 11/1923 | 02/09/1958 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 37E | I89 | 11/1923 | 11/10/1960 | |
GER | J68 | 0-6-0T | 36E | I89 | 11/1923 | 18/08/1958 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 992 | K89 | 12/1923 | 04/12/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 991 | K89 | 12/1923 | 09/11/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 990 | K89 | 12/1923 | 03/08/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 996 | K89 | 01/1924 | 10/09/1961 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 993 | K89 | 01/1924 | 12/09/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 994 | K89 | 01/1924 | 01/01/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 995 | K89 | 01/1924 | 04/07/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 997 | K89 | 02/1924 | 16/02/1959 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 998 | K89 | 02/1924 | 24/11/1960 | |
GER | N7 | 0-6-2T | 999 | K89 | 03/1924 | 11/09/1962 |