Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1008 | 1 | 1 | 02/1889 | 18/09/1954 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1009 | 1 | 2 | 03/1889 | 23/08/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1010 | 1 | 3 | 03/1889 | 21/06/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1011 | 1 | 4 | 04/1889 | 01/1944 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1012 | 1 | 5 | 05/1889 | 09/08/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1013 | 1 | 6 | 05/1889 | 12/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1014 | 1 | 7 | 06/1889 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1015 | 1 | 8 | 06/1889 | 08/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1017 | 1 | 10 | 07/1889 | 14/10/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1016 | 1 | 9 | 07/1889 | 08/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 11 | 2 | 11 | 09/1889 | 03/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 130 | 2 | 12 | 09/1889 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 252 | 2 | 13 | 10/1889 | 06/09/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 367 | 2 | 14 | 10/1889 | 10/02/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 484 | 2 | 15 | 10/1889 | 10/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1018 | 2 | 16 | 10/1889 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1019 | 2 | 17 | 11/1889 | 22/11/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1020 | 2 | 18 | 11/1889 | 23/03/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1021 | 2 | 19 | 11/1889 | 05/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1022 | 2 | 20 | 11/1889 | 23/02/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1023 | 3 | 21 | 11/1889 | 30/06/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1024 | 3 | 22 | 12/1889 | 10/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1025 | 3 | 23 | 12/1889 | 02/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1026 | 3 | 24 | 12/1889 | 07/1935 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1027 | 3 | 25 | 01/1890 | 04/07/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1028 | 3 | 26 | 01/1890 | 02/04/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1029 | 3 | 27 | 01/1890 | 10/02/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1030 | 3 | 28 | 02/1890 | 01/09/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1031 | 3 | 29 | 02/1890 | 18/05/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1032 | 3 | 30 | 02/1890 | 28/11/1959 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1033 | 4 | 31 | 04/1890 | 20/11/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1034 | 4 | 32 | 04/1890 | 01/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1035 | 4 | 33 | 05/1890 | 08/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1036 | 4 | 34 | 05/1890 | 21/06/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1037 | 4 | 35 | 06/1890 | 18/10/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1038 | 4 | 36 | 06/1890 | 03/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1039 | 4 | 37 | 06/1890 | 19/07/1957 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1040 | 4 | 38 | 06/1890 | 02/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1041 | 4 | 39 | 07/1890 | 16/02/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1042 | 4 | 40 | 07/1890 | 17/05/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1043 | 4 | 41 | 07/1890 | 19/04/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1044 | 4 | 42 | 07/1890 | 06/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1045 | 4 | 43 | 08/1890 | 24/03/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1046 | 4 | 44 | 08/1890 | 10/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1047 | 4 | 45 | 08/1890 | 25/10/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1048 | 4 | 46 | 08/1890 | 11/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1049 | 4 | 47 | 08/1890 | 08/11/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1053 | 5 | 51 | 09/1890 | 05/02/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1054 | 5 | 52 | 09/1890 | 01/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1050 | 4 | 48 | 09/1890 | 11/1929 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1051 | 4 | 49 | 09/1890 | 03/1929 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1052 | 4 | 50 | 09/1890 | 21/02/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1055 | 5 | 53 | 10/1890 | 02/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1056 | 5 | 54 | 10/1890 | 05/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1057 | 5 | 55 | 10/1890 | 31/10/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1058 | 5 | 56 | 10/1890 | 14/01/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1059 | 5 | 57 | 10/1890 | 15/09/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1060 | 5 | 58 | 10/1890 | 23/03/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1061 | 5 | 59 | 11/1890 | 24/01/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1062 | 5 | 60 | 11/1890 | 07/05/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1063 | 5 | 61 | 11/1890 | 03/03/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1064 | 5 | 62 | 11/1890 | 25/04/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1065 | 5 | 63 | 12/1890 | 01/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1066 | 5 | 64 | 12/1890 | 07/03/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1067 | 5 | 65 | 12/1890 | 24/10/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1068 | 5 | 66 | 12/1890 | 01/1940 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1069 | 5 | 67 | 12/1890 | 27/05/1950 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1070 | 5 | 68 | 12/1890 | 10/03/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1071 | 5 | 69 | 01/1891 | 08/09/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1072 | 5 | 70 | 01/1891 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1073 | 6 | 71 | 01/1891 | 06/08/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1074 | 6 | 72 | 02/1891 | 09/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1075 | 6 | 73 | 02/1891 | 04/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1076 | 6 | 74 | 02/1891 | 03/01/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1077 | 6 | 75 | 02/1891 | 05/1945 |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1093 | 91 | 03/1891 | 03/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1094 | 92 | 03/1891 | 07/1925 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1078 | 6 | 76 | 04/1891 | 04/09/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1079 | 6 | 77 | 04/1891 | 13/10/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1080 | 6 | 78 | 04/1891 | 09/07/1958 |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1095 | 93 | 04/1891 | 09/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1096 | 94 | 04/1891 | 06/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1097 | 95 | 04/1891 | 04/1928 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1081 | 6 | 79 | 05/1891 | 08/12/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1082 | 6 | 80 | 05/1891 | 12/1937 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1083 | 6 | 81 | 05/1891 | 07/09/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1084 | 6 | 82 | 05/1891 | 23/01/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1085 | 6 | 83 | 05/1891 | 30/11/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1086 | 6 | 84 | 06/1891 | 26/05/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1087 | 6 | 85 | 06/1891 | 19/06/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1088 | 6 | 86 | 06/1891 | 01/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1089 | 6 | 87 | 06/1891 | 02/09/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1090 | 6 | 88 | 06/1891 | 12/04/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1091 | 6 | 89 | 07/1891 | 22/11/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1092 | 6 | 90 | 07/1891 | 03/1938 |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1098 | 96 | 07/1891 | 10/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1099 | 97 | 07/1891 | 07/1928 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1100 | 98 | 07/1891 | 12/1928 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1102 | 100 | 08/1891 | 11/1929 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1103 | 101 | 08/1891 | 09/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1104 | 102 | 08/1891 | 10/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1105 | 103 | 08/1891 | 12/1924 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1106 | 104 | 08/1891 | 03/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1101 | 99 | 08/1891 | 04/1928 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1107 | 105 | 09/1891 | 09/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1108 | 106 | 09/1891 | 08/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1109 | 107 | 09/1891 | 10/1925 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1110 | 108 | 09/1891 | 01/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1111 | 109 | 09/1891 | 10/1928 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1113 | 8 | 111 | 10/1891 | 02/03/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1114 | 8 | 112 | 10/1891 | 28/12/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1115 | 8 | 113 | 10/1891 | 08/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1116 | 8 | 114 | 10/1891 | 03/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1117 | 8 | 115 | 10/1891 | 07/11/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1118 | 8 | 116 | 10/1891 | 31/08/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1119 | 8 | 117 | 10/1891 | 26/06/1954 |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1112 | 110 | 10/1891 | 03/1926 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1154 | 10 | 11/1891 | 25/01/1958 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1153 | 10 | 11/1891 | 09/1926 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1155 | 10 | 11/1891 | 06/1931 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1120 | 8 | 118 | 11/1891 | 06/03/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1121 | 8 | 119 | 11/1891 | 05/02/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1122 | 8 | 120 | 11/1891 | 16/07/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1123 | 8 | 121 | 11/1891 | 26/06/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1124 | 8 | 122 | 11/1891 | 30/04/1960 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 310 | 10 | 12/1891 | 15/09/1962 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1156 | 10 | 12/1891 | 08/09/1962 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 32 | 10 | 12/1891 | 08/1935 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1125 | 8 | 123 | 12/1891 | 08/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1126 | 8 | 124 | 12/1891 | 08/12/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1127 | 8 | 125 | 12/1891 | 04/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1128 | 8 | 126 | 12/1891 | 12/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1129 | 8 | 127 | 12/1891 | 07/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1130 | 8 | 128 | 01/1892 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1131 | 8 | 129 | 01/1892 | 08/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1132 | 8 | 130 | 01/1892 | 15/05/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1133 | 9 | 131 | 01/1892 | 23/02/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1134 | 9 | 132 | 01/1892 | 05/03/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1135 | 9 | 133 | 01/1892 | 03/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1136 | 9 | 134 | 02/1892 | 05/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1137 | 9 | 135 | 02/1892 | 06/03/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1138 | 9 | 136 | 02/1892 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1139 | 9 | 137 | 02/1892 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1140 | 9 | 138 | 02/1892 | 01/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1141 | 9 | 139 | 02/1892 | 10/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1142 | 9 | 140 | 03/1892 | 20/12/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1143 | 9 | 141 | 03/1892 | 07/03/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1144 | 9 | 142 | 03/1892 | 18/04/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1145 | 9 | 143 | 03/1892 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1146 | 9 | 144 | 03/1892 | 31/05/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1147 | 9 | 145 | 03/1892 | 06/07/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1148 | 9 | 146 | 04/1892 | 01/10/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1149 | 9 | 147 | 04/1892 | 02/04/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1150 | 9 | 148 | 04/1892 | 31/08/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1151 | 9 | 149 | 04/1892 | 04/06/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1152 | 9 | 150 | 04/1892 | 06/04/1957 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1157 | 11 | 151 | 04/1892 | 19/11/1955 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1158 | 11 | 152 | 05/1892 | 11/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1159 | 11 | 153 | 05/1892 | 06/10/1956 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1160 | 11 | 154 | 05/1892 | 17/12/1955 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1161 | 11 | 155 | 05/1892 | 13/10/1956 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1162 | 11 | 156 | 05/1892 | 04/02/1956 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1163 | 11 | 157 | 06/1892 | 28/04/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1164 | 11 | 158 | 06/1892 | 11/08/1956 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1065 | 11 | 159 | 06/1892 | 12/03/1955 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1066 | 11 | 160 | 06/1892 | 08/1940 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10 | 11 | 161 | 06/1892 | 03/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1167 | 11 | 162 | 06/1892 | 11/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1168 | 11 | 163 | 07/1892 | 29/03/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1169 | 11 | 164 | 07/1892 | 03/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 287 | 11 | 165 | 07/1892 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 289 | 11 | 166 | 07/1892 | 02/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 321 | 11 | 167 | 07/1892 | 02/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 323 | 11 | 168 | 07/1892 | 08/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 334 | 11 | 169 | 07/1892 | 01/1944 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 337 | 11 | 170 | 07/1892 | 20/03/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1170 | 12 | 171 | 08/1892 | 12/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1171 | 12 | 172 | 08/1892 | 01/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1172 | 12 | 173 | 08/1892 | 04/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1173 | 12 | 174 | 08/1892 | 15/03/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1174 | 12 | 175 | 09/1892 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1175 | 12 | 176 | 09/1892 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1176 | 12 | 177 | 09/1892 | 05/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1177 | 12 | 178 | 09/1892 | 31/12/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1178 | 12 | 179 | 09/1892 | 03/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1179 | 12 | 180 | 09/1892 | 04/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 16 | 12 | 181 | 09/1892 | 26/12/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 26 | 12 | 182 | 09/1892 | 10/1928 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 37 | 12 | 183 | 10/1892 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 301 | 12 | 184 | 10/1892 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 340 | 12 | 185 | 10/1892 | 05/07/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 345 | 12 | 186 | 10/1892 | 10/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 349 | 12 | 187 | 10/1892 | 06/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 638 | 12 | 188 | 10/1892 | 09/1930 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1180 | 13 | 191 | 11/1892 | 27/10/1956 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 651 | 12 | 189 | 11/1892 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 680 | 12 | 190 | 11/1892 | 20/08/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1181 | 13 | 192 | 12/1892 | 17/03/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1182 | 13 | 193 | 12/1892 | 01/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1183 | 13 | 194 | 12/1892 | 20/12/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1184 | 13 | 195 | 12/1892 | 18/09/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1185 | 13 | 196 | 12/1892 | 20/05/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1186 | 13 | 197 | 01/1893 | 02/11/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1187 | 13 | 198 | 01/1893 | 05/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1188 | 13 | 199 | 01/1893 | 25/09/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1189 | 13 | 200 | 01/1893 | 19/10/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1190 | 13 | 201 | 02/1893 | 27/10/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1191 | 13 | 202 | 02/1893 | 08/12/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1192 | 13 | 203 | 02/1893 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1193 | 13 | 204 | 02/1893 | 06/08/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1194 | 13 | 205 | 02/1893 | 22/11/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1195 | 13 | 206 | 02/1893 | 18/06/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1196 | 13 | 207 | 02/1893 | 13/05/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1197 | 13 | 208 | 02/1893 | 21/11/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1198 | 13 | 209 | 03/1893 | 10/12/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1199 | 13 | 210 | 03/1893 | 12/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1200 | 14 | 211 | 03/1893 | 08/08/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1201 | 14 | 212 | 03/1893 | 10/1935 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1202 | 14 | 213 | 03/1893 | 13/04/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1203 | 14 | 214 | 03/1893 | 08/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1204 | 14 | 215 | 03/1893 | 21/08/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1205 | 14 | 216 | 03/1893 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1206 | 14 | 217 | 04/1893 | 08/12/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1207 | 14 | 218 | 04/1893 | 26/11/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1208 | 14 | 219 | 04/1893 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1209 | 14 | 220 | 04/1893 | 06/08/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 13 | 14 | 221 | 05/1893 | 02/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 184 | 14 | 222 | 05/1893 | 05/01/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 186 | 14 | 223 | 05/1893 | 15/09/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 279 | 14 | 224 | 05/1893 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 290 | 14 | 225 | 05/1893 | 05/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 336 | 14 | 226 | 05/1893 | 02/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 437 | 14 | 227 | 05/1893 | 04/02/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 502 | 14 | 228 | 06/1893 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 521 | 14 | 229 | 06/1893 | 01/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 606 | 14 | 230 | 06/1893 | 16/03/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 21 | 15 | 231 | 06/1893 | 01/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 22 | 15 | 232 | 06/1893 | 03/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 30 | 15 | 233 | 06/1893 | 30/11/1945 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 42 | 15 | 234 | 06/1893 | 04/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 50 | 15 | 235 | 07/1893 | 29/04/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 78 | 15 | 236 | 07/1893 | 04/11/1950 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 82 | 15 | 237 | 07/1893 | 11/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 101 | 15 | 238 | 07/1893 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 105 | 15 | 239 | 07/1893 | 06/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 106 | 15 | 240 | 07/1893 | 13/09/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 291 | 15 | 241 | 07/1893 | 08/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 326 | 15 | 242 | 08/1893 | 06/12/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 327 | 15 | 243 | 08/1893 | 18/04/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 335 | 15 | 244 | 08/1893 | 05/03/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 347 | 15 | 246 | 08/1893 | 01/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 438 | 15 | 247 | 08/1893 | 12/07/1957 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 45 | 16 | 251 | 08/1893 | 05/1928 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 341 | 15 | 245 | 09/1893 | 06/11/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 607 | 15 | 248 | 09/1893 | 28/04/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 608 | 15 | 249 | 09/1893 | 07/04/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 624 | 15 | 250 | 09/1893 | 28/05/1955 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 46 | 16 | 252 | 09/1893 | 05/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 54 | 16 | 253 | 10/1893 | 01/1940 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 58 | 16 | 254 | 10/1893 | 09/1927 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 119 | 16 | 255 | 10/1893 | 09/08/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 147 | 16 | 256 | 10/1893 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 189 | 16 | 257 | 10/1893 | 12/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 206 | 16 | 258 | 11/1893 | 10/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 208 | 16 | 259 | 11/1893 | 03/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 299 | 16 | 260 | 11/1893 | 04/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1210 | 16 | 261 | 11/1893 | 19/07/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1211 | 16 | 262 | 11/1893 | 02/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1212 | 16 | 263 | 11/1893 | 17/05/1952 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 504 | 20 | 12/1893 | 17/03/1962 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 729 | 20 | 12/1893 | 06/1931 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 654 | 20 | 12/1893 | 08/1926 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1230 | 20 | 12/1893 | 04/1930 | |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1213 | 16 | 264 | 12/1893 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1214 | 16 | 265 | 12/1893 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1215 | 16 | 266 | 12/1893 | 11/1936 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1216 | 16 | 267 | 12/1893 | 11/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1217 | 16 | 268 | 12/1893 | 08/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1218 | 16 | 269 | 12/1893 | 21/03/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1219 | 16 | 270 | 12/1893 | 02/1946 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1232 | 20 | 01/1894 | 24/08/1957 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1231 | 20 | 01/1894 | 08/1932 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1220 | 271 | 01/1894 | 09/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1221 | 272 | 01/1894 | 10/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1222 | 273 | 01/1894 | 05/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1223 | 274 | 01/1894 | 10/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1224 | 275 | 02/1894 | 10/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1225 | 276 | 02/1894 | 09/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1226 | 277 | 02/1894 | 09/1928 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1227 | 278 | 02/1894 | 08/1925 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1228 | 279 | 02/1894 | 05/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 1229 | 280 | 03/1894 | 10/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 318 | 281 | 03/1894 | 10/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 338 | 282 | 03/1894 | 06/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 339 | 283 | 03/1894 | 08/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 344 | 284 | 03/1894 | 03/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 368 | 285 | 03/1894 | 04/1930 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 429 | 286 | 03/1894 | 04/1928 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 53 | 18 | 291 | 04/1894 | 19/02/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 92 | 18 | 292 | 04/1894 | 11/1931 |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 430 | 287 | 04/1894 | 06/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 455 | 288 | 04/1894 | 06/1926 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 488 | 289 | 04/1894 | 04/1927 | |
LYR | 1093 | 4-4-0 | 498 | 290 | 04/1894 | 04/1927 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 121 | 18 | 293 | 05/1894 | 05/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 210 | 18 | 294 | 05/1894 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 286 | 18 | 295 | 05/1894 | 30/11/1945 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 315 | 18 | 296 | 05/1894 | 31/12/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 358 | 18 | 297 | 05/1894 | 10/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 440 | 18 | 298 | 06/1894 | 10/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1233 | 18 | 299 | 06/1894 | 01/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1234 | 18 | 300 | 06/1894 | 09/07/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1235 | 18 | 301 | 06/1894 | 22/04/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1236 | 18 | 302 | 06/1894 | 01/11/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1237 | 18 | 303 | 06/1894 | 19/09/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1238 | 18 | 304 | 06/1894 | 03/11/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1239 | 18 | 305 | 07/1894 | 05/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1240 | 18 | 306 | 07/1894 | 12/08/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1241 | 18 | 307 | 07/1894 | 20/09/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1242 | 18 | 308 | 07/1894 | 14/03/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 445 | 18 | 309 | 07/1894 | 14/07/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 469 | 18 | 310 | 07/1894 | 18/02/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1243 | 19 | 311 | 07/1894 | 15/04/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1244 | 19 | 312 | 08/1894 | 03/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1245 | 19 | 313 | 08/1894 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1246 | 19 | 314 | 08/1894 | 23/05/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1247 | 19 | 315 | 08/1894 | 10/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1248 | 19 | 316 | 08/1894 | 10/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1249 | 19 | 317 | 08/1894 | 20/11/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1250 | 19 | 318 | 08/1894 | 07/03/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1251 | 19 | 319 | 08/1894 | 18/10/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1252 | 19 | 320 | 09/1894 | 17/03/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1253 | 19 | 321 | 09/1894 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1254 | 19 | 322 | 09/1894 | 27/10/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1255 | 19 | 323 | 09/1894 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1256 | 19 | 324 | 09/1894 | 10/11/1960 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 212 | 10/1894 | 21/02/1948 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1257 | 19 | 325 | 10/1894 | 26/06/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 47 | 19 | 326 | 10/1894 | 31/01/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 161 | 19 | 327 | 10/1894 | 29/08/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 212 | 19 | 328 | 10/1894 | 21/02/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 217 | 19 | 329 | 10/1894 | 08/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 410 | 19 | 330 | 10/1894 | 07/08/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 44 | 21 | 331 | 10/1894 | 01/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 57 | 21 | 332 | 11/1894 | 01/04/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 62 | 21 | 333 | 11/1894 | 10/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 66 | 21 | 334 | 11/1894 | 14/02/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 72 | 21 | 335 | 11/1894 | 02/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 73 | 21 | 336 | 11/1894 | 08/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 77 | 21 | 337 | 11/1894 | 31/01/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 158 | 21 | 338 | 11/1894 | 13/12/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 187 | 21 | 339 | 12/1894 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 198 | 21 | 340 | 12/1894 | 21/03/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 231 | 21 | 341 | 12/1894 | 21/11/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 232 | 21 | 342 | 12/1894 | 21/01/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 270 | 21 | 343 | 12/1894 | 05/08/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 320 | 21 | 344 | 12/1894 | 27/06/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 333 | 21 | 345 | 01/1895 | 04/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 343 | 21 | 346 | 01/1895 | 27/10/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 355 | 21 | 347 | 01/1895 | 07/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 422 | 21 | 348 | 01/1895 | 13/10/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 427 | 21 | 349 | 01/1895 | 07/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 474 | 21 | 350 | 01/1895 | 08/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 36 | 22 | 351 | 02/1895 | 25/10/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 39 | 22 | 352 | 02/1895 | 08/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1258 | 22 | 353 | 02/1895 | 09/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1259 | 22 | 354 | 02/1895 | 08/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1260 | 22 | 355 | 02/1895 | 04/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1261 | 22 | 356 | 03/1895 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1262 | 22 | 357 | 03/1895 | 06/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1263 | 22 | 358 | 03/1895 | 03/1959 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1264 | 22 | 359 | 03/1895 | 03/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1265 | 22 | 360 | 03/1895 | 08/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1266 | 22 | 361 | 03/1895 | 05/02/1955 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1267 | 22 | 362 | 04/1895 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1268 | 22 | 363 | 04/1895 | 10/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1269 | 22 | 364 | 04/1895 | 03/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 25 | 23 | 371 | 05/1895 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1270 | 22 | 365 | 05/1895 | 01/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1271 | 22 | 366 | 05/1895 | 29/12/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1272 | 22 | 367 | 05/1895 | 14/01/1961 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1273 | 22 | 368 | 05/1895 | 12/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1274 | 22 | 369 | 05/1895 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1275 | 22 | 370 | 05/1895 | 05/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1379 | 34 | 583 | 05/1895 | 20/12/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1380 | 34 | 584 | 05/1895 | 11/1930 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 40 | 23 | 372 | 06/1895 | 18/07/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 51 | 23 | 373 | 06/1895 | 28/03/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52 | 23 | 374 | 06/1895 | 06/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 100 | 23 | 375 | 06/1895 | 24/03/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 200 | 23 | 376 | 06/1895 | 04/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 205 | 23 | 377 | 06/1895 | 18/08/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 213 | 23 | 378 | 07/1895 | 06/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 214 | 23 | 379 | 07/1895 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 228 | 23 | 380 | 07/1895 | 29/09/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1276 | 23 | 381 | 07/1895 | 06/12/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1277 | 23 | 382 | 07/1895 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1278 | 23 | 383 | 07/1895 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1279 | 23 | 384 | 07/1895 | 06/10/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1280 | 23 | 385 | 07/1895 | 10/10/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1281 | 23 | 386 | 07/1895 | 19/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1282 | 23 | 387 | 07/1895 | 12/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1283 | 23 | 388 | 08/1895 | 12/1935 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1284 | 23 | 389 | 08/1895 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1285 | 23 | 390 | 08/1895 | 21/09/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 269 | 24 | 391 | 08/1895 | 20/08/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 317 | 24 | 392 | 08/1895 | 13/04/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 348 | 24 | 393 | 08/1895 | 16/06/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 354 | 24 | 394 | 08/1895 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 364 | 24 | 395 | 09/1895 | 10/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 365 | 24 | 396 | 09/1895 | 04/09/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 372 | 24 | 397 | 09/1895 | 07/01/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 417 | 24 | 398 | 09/1895 | 04/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 420 | 24 | 399 | 09/1895 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 441 | 24 | 400 | 09/1895 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 444 | 24 | 401 | 09/1895 | 24/01/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 449 | 24 | 402 | 09/1895 | 12/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 450 | 24 | 403 | 10/1895 | 10/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 466 | 24 | 404 | 10/1895 | 23/03/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 471 | 24 | 405 | 10/1895 | 07/1937 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 472 | 24 | 406 | 10/1895 | 08/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 475 | 24 | 407 | 10/1895 | 23/01/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 477 | 24 | 408 | 10/1895 | 05/1933 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1287 | 26 | 11/1895 | 08/1930 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1286 | 26 | 11/1895 | 05/1934 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1288 | 26 | 11/1895 | 04/1938 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 478 | 24 | 409 | 11/1895 | 03/03/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 482 | 24 | 410 | 11/1895 | 01/09/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1291 | 25 | 411 | 11/1895 | 01/1937 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1292 | 25 | 412 | 11/1895 | 09/1934 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1290 | 26 | 12/1895 | 03/11/1961 | |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 1289 | 26 | 12/1895 | 08/12/1956 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1293 | 25 | 413 | 12/1895 | 01/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1294 | 25 | 414 | 12/1895 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1295 | 25 | 415 | 12/1895 | 04/06/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1296 | 25 | 416 | 12/1895 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1297 | 25 | 417 | 12/1895 | 10/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1298 | 25 | 418 | 12/1895 | 05/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1299 | 25 | 419 | 12/1895 | 27/02/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1300 | 25 | 420 | 12/1895 | 06/08/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1301 | 25 | 421 | 01/1896 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1302 | 25 | 422 | 01/1896 | 29/03/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1303 | 25 | 423 | 01/1896 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1304 | 25 | 424 | 01/1896 | 06/1935 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1305 | 25 | 425 | 01/1896 | 31/12/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1306 | 25 | 426 | 02/1896 | 02/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1307 | 25 | 427 | 02/1896 | 17/12/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1308 | 25 | 428 | 02/1896 | 23/11/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1309 | 25 | 429 | 02/1896 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1310 | 25 | 430 | 02/1896 | 15/12/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 24 | 27 | 431 | 03/1896 | 02/10/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 31 | 27 | 432 | 03/1896 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 38 | 27 | 433 | 03/1896 | 01/1929 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 63 | 27 | 434 | 03/1896 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 76 | 27 | 435 | 03/1896 | 07/08/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 84 | 27 | 436 | 03/1896 | 10/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 88 | 27 | 437 | 03/1896 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 97 | 27 | 438 | 04/1896 | 05/11/1955 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 104 | 27 | 439 | 04/1896 | 06/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 107 | 27 | 440 | 04/1896 | 08/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 110 | 27 | 441 | 04/1896 | 03/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 129 | 27 | 442 | 04/1896 | 06/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 156 | 27 | 443 | 04/1896 | 12/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 185 | 27 | 444 | 04/1896 | 06/12/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 296 | 27 | 445 | 05/1896 | 16/07/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 319 | 27 | 446 | 05/1896 | 11/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 329 | 27 | 447 | 05/1896 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 362 | 27 | 448 | 05/1896 | 04/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 369 | 27 | 449 | 05/1896 | 04/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 415 | 27 | 450 | 06/1896 | 06/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1311 | 28 | 451 | 06/1896 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1312 | 28 | 452 | 06/1896 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1313 | 28 | 453 | 06/1896 | 18/02/1961 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1314 | 28 | 454 | 06/1896 | 11/1936 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1315 | 28 | 455 | 06/1896 | 09/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1316 | 28 | 456 | 06/1896 | 26/01/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1317 | 28 | 457 | 06/1896 | 10/12/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1318 | 28 | 458 | 07/1896 | 01/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1319 | 28 | 459 | 07/1896 | 12/08/1957 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1320 | 28 | 460 | 07/1896 | 05/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1321 | 28 | 461 | 07/1896 | 03/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1322 | 28 | 462 | 08/1896 | 07/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1323 | 28 | 463 | 08/1896 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1324 | 28 | 464 | 08/1896 | 11/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1325 | 28 | 465 | 08/1896 | 10/1928 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1326 | 28 | 466 | 08/1896 | 03/01/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1327 | 28 | 467 | 08/1896 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1 | 29 | 471 | 09/1896 | 29/09/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4 | 29 | 472 | 09/1896 | 27/08/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 15 | 29 | 473 | 09/1896 | 05/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 27 | 29 | 474 | 09/1896 | 18/04/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1328 | 28 | 468 | 09/1896 | 08/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1329 | 28 | 469 | 09/1896 | 19/12/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1330 | 28 | 470 | 09/1896 | 07/1938 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 211 | 10/1896 | 20/03/1948 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 116 | 29 | 475 | 10/1896 | 01/01/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 127 | 29 | 476 | 10/1896 | 02/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 199 | 29 | 477 | 10/1896 | 14/03/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 211 | 29 | 478 | 10/1896 | 20/03/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 272 | 29 | 479 | 10/1896 | 08/06/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 328 | 29 | 480 | 10/1896 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 331 | 29 | 481 | 10/1896 | 23/02/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 342 | 29 | 482 | 11/1896 | 04/10/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 350 | 29 | 483 | 11/1896 | 19/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 352 | 29 | 484 | 11/1896 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 357 | 29 | 485 | 11/1896 | 11/08/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 359 | 29 | 486 | 11/1896 | 09/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 360 | 29 | 487 | 12/1896 | 22/09/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 363 | 29 | 488 | 12/1896 | 11/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 366 | 29 | 489 | 12/1896 | 05/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 370 | 29 | 490 | 12/1896 | 01/08/1959 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1331 | 30 | 491 | 01/1897 | 07/07/1956 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1332 | 30 | 492 | 01/1897 | 12/06/1954 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1333 | 30 | 493 | 01/1897 | 25/08/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1334 | 30 | 494 | 02/1897 | 12/1936 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1335 | 30 | 495 | 02/1897 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1336 | 30 | 496 | 02/1897 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1337 | 30 | 497 | 02/1897 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1338 | 30 | 498 | 02/1897 | 04/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1339 | 30 | 499 | 02/1897 | 07/1936 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1340 | 30 | 500 | 03/1897 | 09/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1341 | 30 | 501 | 03/1897 | 06/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1342 | 30 | 502 | 03/1897 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1343 | 30 | 503 | 03/1897 | 20/12/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1344 | 30 | 504 | 03/1897 | 03/10/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1345 | 30 | 505 | 03/1897 | 07/03/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1346 | 30 | 506 | 04/1897 | 07/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1347 | 30 | 507 | 04/1897 | 06/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1348 | 30 | 508 | 04/1897 | 06/02/1960 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1349 | 30 | 509 | 04/1897 | 01/1940 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1350 | 30 | 510 | 04/1897 | 10/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 414 | 31 | 511 | 05/1897 | 25/09/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 418 | 31 | 512 | 05/1897 | 20/12/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 419 | 31 | 513 | 05/1897 | 15/08/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 425 | 31 | 514 | 05/1897 | 19/10/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 439 | 31 | 515 | 05/1897 | 29/12/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 447 | 31 | 516 | 05/1897 | 02/11/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 451 | 31 | 517 | 05/1897 | 24/01/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 456 | 31 | 518 | 05/1897 | 12/04/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 457 | 31 | 519 | 06/1897 | 30/08/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 458 | 31 | 520 | 06/1897 | 15/12/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 459 | 31 | 521 | 06/1897 | 03/12/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 464 | 31 | 522 | 06/1897 | 08/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 465 | 31 | 523 | 06/1897 | 08/11/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 470 | 31 | 524 | 07/1897 | 08/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 479 | 31 | 525 | 07/1897 | 15/11/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 483 | 31 | 526 | 07/1897 | 09/04/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 486 | 31 | 527 | 07/1897 | 27/10/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 487 | 31 | 528 | 07/1897 | 03/01/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 489 | 31 | 529 | 08/1897 | 13/02/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 491 | 31 | 530 | 08/1897 | 12/04/1958 |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1351 | 531 | 08/1897 | 1917 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1352 | 532 | 09/1897 | 09/1926 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1353 | 533 | 09/1897 | 02/1928 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1354 | 534 | 09/1897 | 12/1914 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1355 | 535 | 09/1897 | 01/09/1956 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1356 | 536 | 09/1897 | 02/01/1954 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1357 | 537 | 10/1897 | 1917 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1358 | 538 | 10/1897 | 21/09/1961 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1359 | 539 | 10/1897 | 12/1932 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 1360 | 540 | 10/1897 | 09/1926 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 493 | 541 | 10/1897 | 12/1914 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 494 | 542 | 11/1897 | 01/1931 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 495 | 543 | 11/1897 | 07/1926 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 496 | 544 | 11/1897 | 01/1931 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 499 | 545 | 11/1897 | 12/1932 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 601 | 546 | 11/1897 | 07/06/1959 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 503 | 547 | 11/1897 | 1914 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 508 | 33 | 551 | 12/1897 | 30/03/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 509 | 33 | 552 | 12/1897 | 20/07/1957 |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 505 | 548 | 12/1897 | 03/1936 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 506 | 549 | 12/1897 | 17/01/1959 | |
LYR | 1351 | 0-6-0T | 507 | 550 | 12/1897 | 12/1914 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 510 | 33 | 553 | 01/1898 | 16/06/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 523 | 33 | 554 | 01/1898 | 08/1932 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 524 | 33 | 555 | 01/1898 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 602 | 33 | 556 | 01/1898 | 11/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 609 | 33 | 557 | 01/1898 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 619 | 33 | 558 | 01/1898 | 07/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 620 | 33 | 559 | 01/1898 | 18/09/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 622 | 33 | 560 | 01/1898 | 08/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 648 | 33 | 561 | 02/1898 | 07/1935 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 650 | 33 | 562 | 02/1898 | 24/04/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 662 | 33 | 563 | 02/1898 | 12/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 677 | 33 | 564 | 02/1898 | 15/10/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 682 | 33 | 565 | 02/1898 | 06/04/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 683 | 33 | 566 | 02/1898 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 684 | 33 | 567 | 02/1898 | 18/02/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 685 | 33 | 568 | 03/1898 | 02/05/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 690 | 33 | 569 | 03/1898 | 23/02/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 692 | 33 | 570 | 03/1898 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1361 | 34 | 571 | 03/1898 | 07/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1362 | 34 | 572 | 03/1898 | 11/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1367 | 34 | 573 | 03/1898 | 09/1940 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1370 | 34 | 574 | 04/1898 | 06/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1371 | 34 | 575 | 04/1898 | 11/08/1956 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1372 | 34 | 576 | 04/1898 | 02/1936 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1373 | 34 | 577 | 04/1898 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1374 | 34 | 578 | 04/1898 | 01/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1375 | 34 | 579 | 04/1898 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1376 | 34 | 580 | 05/1898 | 02/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1377 | 34 | 581 | 05/1898 | 09/1928 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1378 | 34 | 582 | 05/1898 | 16/11/1959 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1381 | 34 | 585 | 05/1898 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1382 | 34 | 586 | 05/1898 | 07/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1383 | 34 | 587 | 06/1898 | 16/08/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1384 | 34 | 588 | 06/1898 | 07/08/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1385 | 34 | 589 | 06/1898 | 04/12/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1386 | 34 | 590 | 06/1898 | 05/07/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1387 | 35 | 591 | 06/1898 | 10/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1388 | 35 | 592 | 07/1898 | 02/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1389 | 35 | 593 | 07/1898 | 04/1940 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1390 | 35 | 594 | 07/1898 | 23/02/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1391 | 35 | 595 | 07/1898 | 05/1955 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 686 | 35 | 596 | 07/1898 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 693 | 35 | 597 | 07/1898 | 11/1929 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 696 | 35 | 598 | 07/1898 | 06/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 699 | 35 | 599 | 08/1898 | 02/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 701 | 35 | 600 | 08/1898 | 10/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 703 | 35 | 601 | 08/1898 | 10/05/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 721 | 35 | 602 | 08/1898 | 05/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 723 | 35 | 603 | 08/1898 | 12/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 724 | 35 | 604 | 08/1898 | 02/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 725 | 35 | 605 | 09/1898 | 02/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 728 | 35 | 606 | 09/1898 | 08/1935 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 730 | 35 | 607 | 09/1898 | 03/10/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 732 | 35 | 608 | 09/1898 | 20/12/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 733 | 35 | 609 | 09/1898 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 734 | 35 | 610 | 09/1898 | 08/1944 |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 120 | 10/1898 | 08/04/1950 | ||
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 5 | 36 | 611 | 10/1898 | 11/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 34 | 36 | 612 | 10/1898 | 04/12/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 48 | 36 | 613 | 10/1898 | 07/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 90 | 36 | 614 | 10/1898 | 10/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 98 | 36 | 615 | 10/1898 | 01/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 120 | 36 | 616 | 10/1898 | 08/04/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 183 | 36 | 617 | 10/1898 | 01/1944 |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 332 | 11/1898 | 19/06/1948 | ||
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 191 | 36 | 618 | 11/1898 | 02/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 192 | 36 | 619 | 11/1898 | 12/04/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 267 | 36 | 620 | 11/1898 | 08/11/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 297 | 36 | 621 | 11/1898 | 01/1937 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 316 | 36 | 622 | 11/1898 | 11/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 332 | 36 | 623 | 11/1898 | 19/06/1948 |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 371 | 12/1898 | 07/08/1948 | ||
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 356 | 12/1898 | 21/08/1948 | ||
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 346 | 36 | 624 | 12/1898 | 06/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 351 | 36 | 625 | 12/1898 | 02/1929 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 353 | 36 | 626 | 12/1898 | 08/1936 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 356 | 36 | 627 | 12/1898 | 21/08/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 371 | 36 | 628 | 12/1898 | 07/08/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 379 | 36 | 629 | 12/1898 | 08/1940 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 380 | 36 | 630 | 12/1898 | 12/1945 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1400 | 631 | 02/1899 | 07/1933 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1392 | 632 | 03/1899 | 11/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1393 | 633 | 03/1899 | 10/1927 | |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 627 | 38 | 651 | 04/1899 | 10/1928 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 629 | 38 | 652 | 04/1899 | 02/1937 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1394 | 634 | 04/1899 | 04/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1395 | 635 | 04/1899 | 02/1926 | |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 630 | 38 | 653 | 05/1899 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 643 | 38 | 654 | 05/1899 | 03/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 644 | 38 | 655 | 05/1899 | 06/1940 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1396 | 636 | 05/1899 | 05/1928 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1397 | 637 | 05/1899 | 08/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1398 | 638 | 05/1899 | 08/1933 | |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 645 | 38 | 656 | 06/1899 | 12/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 646 | 38 | 657 | 06/1899 | 23/02/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 649 | 38 | 658 | 06/1899 | 11/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 653 | 38 | 659 | 06/1899 | 11/1946 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1399 | 639 | 06/1899 | 04/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1401 | 640 | 06/1899 | 06/1933 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1402 | 641 | 06/1899 | 08/1933 | |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 658 | 38 | 660 | 07/1899 | 25/08/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 661 | 38 | 661 | 07/1899 | 01/1944 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 664 | 38 | 662 | 07/1899 | 11/1945 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1403 | 642 | 07/1899 | 05/1932 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1404 | 643 | 07/1899 | 06/1930 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 700 | 644 | 07/1899 | 12/1927 | |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 670 | 08/1899 | 01/1950 | ||
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 667 | 38 | 663 | 08/1899 | 09/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 668 | 38 | 664 | 08/1899 | 07/1936 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 670 | 38 | 665 | 08/1899 | 01/1950 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 702 | 645 | 08/1899 | 09/1926 | |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 671 | 38 | 666 | 09/1899 | 06/12/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 672 | 38 | 667 | 09/1899 | 04/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 674 | 38 | 668 | 09/1899 | 02/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 675 | 38 | 669 | 09/1899 | 11/1961 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 708 | 646 | 09/1899 | 09/1930 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 711 | 647 | 09/1899 | 03/1934 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 80 | 39 | 671 | 10/1899 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 678 | 38 | 670 | 10/1899 | 10/1938 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 718 | 648 | 10/1899 | 07/1931 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 735 | 649 | 10/1899 | 04/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 737 | 650 | 10/1899 | 07/1930 | |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 152 | 39 | 672 | 11/1899 | 13/12/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 361 | 39 | 673 | 11/1899 | 03/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 393 | 39 | 674 | 11/1899 | 10/05/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 397 | 39 | 675 | 11/1899 | 15/03/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 409 | 39 | 676 | 11/1899 | 21/11/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 416 | 39 | 677 | 12/1899 | 25/08/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 421 | 39 | 678 | 12/1899 | 06/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 426 | 39 | 679 | 12/1899 | 10/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 446 | 39 | 680 | 12/1899 | 07/08/1954 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 462 | 39 | 681 | 12/1899 | 03/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 468 | 39 | 682 | 12/1899 | 03/06/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 473 | 39 | 683 | 12/1899 | 12/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 485 | 39 | 684 | 01/1900 | 19/07/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 490 | 39 | 685 | 01/1900 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 492 | 39 | 686 | 01/1900 | 25/06/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 520 | 39 | 687 | 01/1900 | 06/1933 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 681 | 02/1900 | 24/01/1948 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 526 | 39 | 688 | 02/1900 | 24/04/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 610 | 39 | 689 | 02/1900 | 10/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 681 | 39 | 690 | 02/1900 | 24/01/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 33 | 40 | 691 | 02/1900 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 103 | 40 | 692 | 02/1900 | 10/12/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 135 | 40 | 693 | 02/1900 | 25/04/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 193 | 40 | 694 | 03/1900 | 22/12/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 195 | 40 | 695 | 03/1900 | 30/10/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 215 | 40 | 696 | 03/1900 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 330 | 40 | 697 | 03/1900 | 27/01/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 375 | 40 | 698 | 03/1900 | 27/08/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 382 | 40 | 699 | 03/1900 | 05/02/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 388 | 40 | 700 | 04/1900 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 391 | 40 | 701 | 04/1900 | 09/01/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 398 | 40 | 702 | 04/1900 | 10/11/1960 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 91 | 43 | 751 | 04/1900 | 04/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 500 | 43 | 752 | 04/1900 | 05/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 325 | 43 | 753 | 05/1900 | 03/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 381 | 43 | 754 | 05/1900 | 04/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 383 | 43 | 755 | 05/1900 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 392 | 43 | 756 | 05/1900 | 06/1944 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 395 | 43 | 757 | 06/1900 | 08/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 407 | 43 | 758 | 06/1900 | 09/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 433 | 43 | 759 | 06/1900 | 09/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 448 | 43 | 760 | 06/1900 | 04/1928 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 463 | 43 | 761 | 07/1900 | 08/1933 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 635 | 43 | 762 | 07/1900 | 02/1937 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 659 | 43 | 763 | 07/1900 | 10/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 676 | 43 | 764 | 07/1900 | 04/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 687 | 43 | 765 | 08/1900 | 07/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 736 | 43 | 766 | 08/1900 | 11/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 738 | 43 | 767 | 08/1900 | 09/07/1949 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 745 | 43 | 768 | 08/1900 | 01/1931 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 401 | 40 | 703 | 09/1900 | 23/03/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 424 | 40 | 704 | 09/1900 | 12/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 428 | 40 | 705 | 09/1900 | 08/12/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 432 | 40 | 706 | 09/1900 | 11/03/1961 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 59 | 43 | 769 | 09/1900 | 01/1928 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 190 | 43 | 770 | 09/1900 | 05/1927 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 442 | 10/1900 | 14/02/1948 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 435 | 40 | 707 | 10/1900 | 07/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 442 | 40 | 708 | 10/1900 | 14/02/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 453 | 40 | 709 | 10/1900 | 08/11/1952 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 513 | 40 | 710 | 10/1900 | 30/06/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 514 | 41 | 711 | 10/1900 | 17/01/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 515 | 41 | 712 | 11/1900 | 12/1936 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 516 | 41 | 713 | 11/1900 | 11/1939 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 525 | 41 | 714 | 11/1900 | 09/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 632 | 41 | 715 | 11/1900 | 08/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 641 | 41 | 716 | 11/1900 | 10/1944 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 669 | 41 | 717 | 12/1900 | 20/12/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 689 | 41 | 718 | 12/1900 | 04/1940 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 705 | 41 | 719 | 12/1900 | 28/11/1953 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 707 | 41 | 720 | 12/1900 | 08/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 714 | 41 | 721 | 12/1900 | 10/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 716 | 41 | 722 | 12/1900 | 09/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 719 | 41 | 723 | 12/1900 | 18/12/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 722 | 41 | 724 | 01/1901 | 11/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 740 | 41 | 725 | 01/1901 | 04/1944 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 741 | 41 | 726 | 01/1901 | 03/10/1958 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 742 | 41 | 727 | 01/1901 | 07/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 81 | 42 | 731 | 02/1901 | 12/01/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 102 | 42 | 732 | 02/1901 | 07/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 220 | 42 | 733 | 02/1901 | 31/12/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 743 | 41 | 728 | 02/1901 | 12/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 746 | 41 | 729 | 02/1901 | 09/1938 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 790 | 41 | 730 | 02/1901 | 05/11/1955 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 274 | 03/1901 | 06/03/1948 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 225 | 42 | 734 | 03/1901 | 06/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 274 | 42 | 735 | 03/1901 | 06/03/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 288 | 42 | 736 | 03/1901 | 04/1937 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 302 | 42 | 737 | 03/1901 | 20/04/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 374 | 42 | 738 | 03/1901 | 31/01/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 376 | 42 | 739 | 03/1901 | 22/08/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 385 | 42 | 740 | 04/1901 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 386 | 42 | 741 | 04/1901 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 400 | 42 | 742 | 04/1901 | 31/05/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 431 | 42 | 743 | 04/1901 | 15/09/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 452 | 42 | 744 | 04/1901 | 08/10/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 497 | 42 | 745 | 04/1901 | 22/12/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 605 | 42 | 746 | 05/1901 | 21/11/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 647 | 42 | 747 | 05/1901 | 22/11/1958 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 652 | 42 | 748 | 05/1901 | 08/09/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 726 | 42 | 749 | 05/1901 | 03/1938 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 727 | 42 | 750 | 05/1901 | 10/07/1954 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 69 | 44 | 771 | 06/1901 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 154 | 44 | 772 | 06/1901 | 02/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 159 | 44 | 773 | 06/1901 | 18/10/1947 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 201 | 44 | 774 | 06/1901 | 08/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 384 | 44 | 775 | 06/1901 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 390 | 44 | 776 | 07/1901 | 12/1939 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 405 | 44 | 777 | 07/1901 | 07/1935 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 406 | 44 | 778 | 07/1901 | 09/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 411 | 44 | 779 | 08/1901 | 10/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 443 | 44 | 780 | 08/1901 | 05/1928 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 511 | 44 | 781 | 08/1901 | 07/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 611 | 44 | 782 | 08/1901 | 11/1932 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 666 | 44 | 783 | 09/1901 | 11/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 695 | 44 | 784 | 09/1901 | 08/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 704 | 44 | 785 | 09/1901 | 07/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 706 | 44 | 786 | 09/1901 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 68 | 46 | 811 | 10/1901 | 07/09/1964 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 709 | 44 | 787 | 10/1901 | 09/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 710 | 44 | 788 | 10/1901 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 715 | 44 | 789 | 10/1901 | 04/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 717 | 44 | 790 | 10/1901 | 06/1927 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 113 | 46 | 812 | 11/1901 | 07/1930 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 139 | 46 | 813 | 11/1901 | 01/1924 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 155 | 46 | 814 | 11/1901 | 07/01/1960 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 377 | 46 | 815 | 12/1901 | 06/03/1962 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 389 | 46 | 816 | 12/1901 | 05/1933 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 399 | 46 | 817 | 12/1901 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 402 | 46 | 818 | 12/1901 | 12/1932 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 403 | 46 | 819 | 12/1901 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 476 | 46 | 820 | 12/1901 | 09/1960 |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1405 | 791 | 01/1902 | 08/1933 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1406 | 792 | 02/1902 | 01/1932 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1407 | 793 | 02/1902 | 09/1933 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1408 | 794 | 02/1902 | 10/1929 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1409 | 795 | 03/1902 | 04/1932 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1410 | 796 | 03/1902 | 11/1930 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1411 | 797 | 03/1902 | 12/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1412 | 798 | 03/1902 | 11/1929 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1413 | 799 | 04/1902 | 11/1929 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1414 | 800 | 04/1902 | 07/1928 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1415 | 801 | 04/1902 | 03/1928 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1416 | 802 | 04/1902 | 07/1930 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1417 | 803 | 05/1902 | 11/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1418 | 804 | 05/1902 | 11/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1419 | 805 | 05/1902 | 11/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1420 | 806 | 05/1902 | 11/1933 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1421 | 807 | 06/1902 | 10/1929 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1422 | 808 | 06/1902 | 08/1930 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1423 | 809 | 06/1902 | 09/1927 | |
LYR | 1400 | 4-4-2 | 1424 | 810 | 06/1902 | 04/1932 | |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 65 | 47 | 821 | 07/1902 | 04/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 95 | 47 | 822 | 07/1902 | 05/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 378 | 47 | 823 | 08/1902 | 11/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 412 | 47 | 824 | 08/1902 | 02/1932 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 656 | 47 | 825 | 08/1902 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 739 | 47 | 826 | 08/1902 | 03/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 792 | 47 | 827 | 09/1902 | 09/1935 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 822 | 47 | 828 | 09/1902 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 827 | 47 | 829 | 09/1902 | 02/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 987 | 47 | 830 | 09/1902 | 01/1947 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1425 | 47 | 831 | 10/1902 | 03/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1426 | 47 | 832 | 10/1902 | 03/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1427 | 47 | 833 | 10/1902 | 03/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1428 | 47 | 834 | 10/1902 | 09/03/1946 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1429 | 47 | 835 | 10/1902 | 07/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1430 | 47 | 836 | 11/1902 | 01/1937 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1431 | 47 | 837 | 11/1902 | 08/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1432 | 47 | 838 | 11/1902 | 06/1928 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1433 | 47 | 839 | 02/1903 | 14/10/1950 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1434 | 47 | 840 | 02/1903 | 01/1926 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 114 | 48 | 841 | 03/1903 | 02/09/1950 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 157 | 48 | 842 | 04/1903 | 09/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 169 | 48 | 843 | 04/1903 | 08/1937 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 373 | 48 | 844 | 04/1903 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 394 | 48 | 845 | 05/1903 | 08/1926 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 408 | 48 | 846 | 05/1903 | 09/1932 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 423 | 48 | 847 | 05/1903 | 03/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 434 | 48 | 848 | 05/1903 | 05/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 436 | 48 | 849 | 05/1903 | 03/1932 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 396 | 48 | 850 | 05/1903 | 05/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 512 | 48 | 851 | 06/1903 | 04/1928 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 522 | 48 | 852 | 06/1903 | 03/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 612 | 48 | 853 | 06/1903 | 06/1929 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 720 | 48 | 854 | 07/1903 | 08/1946 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 1435 | 48 | 855 | 07/1903 | 05/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 1436 | 48 | 856 | 07/1903 | 10/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 1437 | 48 | 857 | 07/1903 | 10/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 1438 | 48 | 858 | 08/1903 | 11/1928 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 1439 | 48 | 859 | 08/1903 | 04/1927 |
LYR | 392 | 0-8-0 | 1440 | 48 | 860 | 08/1903 | 09/1946 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 202 | 49 | 861 | 10/1903 | 12/1920 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 387 | 49 | 862 | 11/1903 | 05/1925 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 404 | 49 | 863 | 11/1903 | 12/1920 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 454 | 49 | 864 | 11/1903 | 01/1926 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 467 | 49 | 865 | 12/1903 | 05/1925 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 527 | 49 | 866 | 01/1904 | 03/1926 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 712 | 49 | 867 | 02/1904 | 08/1926 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 744 | 49 | 868 | 02/1904 | 08/1926 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 837 | 49 | 869 | 03/1904 | 06/1925 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 125 | 49 | 870 | 03/1904 | 05/1923 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1441 | 49 | 871 | 04/1904 | 08/1926 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1442 | 49 | 872 | 04/1904 | 07/1925 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1443 | 49 | 873 | 05/1904 | 06/1925 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1444 | 49 | 874 | 05/1904 | 01/1925 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1445 | 49 | 875 | 06/1904 | 09/1924 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1446 | 49 | 876 | 06/1904 | 08/1926 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1447 | 49 | 877 | 07/1904 | 07/1926 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1448 | 49 | 878 | 07/1904 | 02/1925 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1449 | 49 | 879 | 07/1904 | 1924 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1451 | 50 | 881 | 08/1904 | 01/1946 |
LYR | 202 | 2-6-2T | 1450 | 49 | 880 | 08/1904 | 08/1926 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1452 | 50 | 882 | 09/1904 | 09/1926 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1453 | 50 | 883 | 09/1904 | 07/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1454 | 50 | 884 | 09/1904 | 01/1926 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1455 | 50 | 885 | 09/1904 | 12/1936 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1456 | 50 | 886 | 10/1904 | 04/1928 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1457 | 50 | 887 | 10/1904 | 08/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1458 | 50 | 888 | 10/1904 | 12/1935 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1459 | 50 | 889 | 10/1904 | 11/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1460 | 50 | 890 | 11/1904 | 06/1926 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 117 | 50 | 891 | 11/1904 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 413 | 50 | 892 | 11/1904 | 04/1932 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 461 | 50 | 893 | 11/1904 | 09/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 820 | 50 | 894 | 12/1904 | 06/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 831 | 50 | 895 | 12/1904 | 05/1932 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 835 | 50 | 896 | 01/1905 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 841 | 50 | 897 | 01/1905 | 05/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 880 | 50 | 898 | 02/1905 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 866 | 50 | 899 | 02/1905 | 11/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 870 | 50 | 900 | 03/1905 | 06/1930 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 816 | 51 | 901 | 04/1905 | 05/1943 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 817 | 51 | 902 | 04/1905 | 06/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 819 | 51 | 903 | 04/1905 | 22/03/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 833 | 51 | 904 | 05/1905 | 01/03/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 839 | 51 | 905 | 05/1905 | 08/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 842 | 51 | 906 | 05/1905 | 22/05/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 867 | 51 | 907 | 05/1905 | 03/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 868 | 51 | 908 | 06/1905 | 05/1931 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 869 | 51 | 909 | 06/1905 | 03/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 878 | 51 | 910 | 06/1905 | 05/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1461 | 51 | 911 | 06/1905 | 01/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1462 | 51 | 912 | 06/1905 | 10/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1463 | 51 | 913 | 07/1905 | 06/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1464 | 51 | 914 | 07/1905 | 08/1944 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1465 | 51 | 915 | 07/1905 | 10/1944 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1466 | 51 | 916 | 07/1905 | 11/1944 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1467 | 51 | 917 | 08/1905 | 10/1947 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1468 | 51 | 918 | 09/1905 | 29/12/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1469 | 51 | 919 | 09/1905 | 19/10/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1470 | 51 | 920 | 10/1905 | 14/12/1957 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 260 | 52 | 921 | 12/1905 | 11/1932 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 813 | 52 | 922 | 12/1905 | 21/01/1961 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 814 | 52 | 923 | 01/1906 | 12/1958 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 821 | 52 | 924 | 01/1906 | 07/1959 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 823 | 52 | 925 | 02/1906 | 07/1963 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 825 | 52 | 926 | 02/1906 | 10/1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 832 | 52 | 927 | 02/1906 | 19/10/1957 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 840 | 52 | 928 | 02/1906 | 10/1958 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 865 | 52 | 929 | 03/1906 | 05/1934 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 879 | 52 | 930 | 03/1906 | 25/05/1963 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 41 | 53 | 931 | 03/1906 | 08/10/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 55 | 53 | 932 | 04/1906 | 09/02/1946 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 115 | 05/1906 | 05/05/1956 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 115 | 53 | 933 | 05/1906 | 05/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 123 | 53 | 934 | 05/1906 | 14/04/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 246 | 53 | 935 | 06/1906 | 27/08/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 247 | 53 | 936 | 06/1906 | 14/02/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 255 | 53 | 937 | 07/1906 | 01/09/1962 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 824 | 53 | 938 | 07/1906 | 03/09/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 881 | 53 | 939 | 07/1906 | 21/11/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 890 | 53 | 940 | 07/1906 | 22/02/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 60 | 53 | 941 | 08/1906 | 17/03/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 99 | 53 | 942 | 08/1906 | 26/11/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 261 | 53 | 943 | 08/1906 | 14/07/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 604 | 53 | 944 | 08/1906 | 10/12/1955 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 829 | 53 | 945 | 08/1906 | 06/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 834 | 53 | 946 | 08/1906 | 24/11/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 838 | 53 | 947 | 09/1906 | 02/11/1957 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 871 | 53 | 948 | 09/1906 | 14/11/1953 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 898 | 11/1906 | 12/12/1962 | ||
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 49 | 55 | 957 | 11/1906 | 05/1937 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 83 | 55 | 958 | 11/1906 | 11/1928 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 86 | 55 | 959 | 11/1906 | 05/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 836 | 55 | 960 | 11/1906 | 01/1937 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 876 | 55 | 961 | 12/1906 | 03/1932 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 877 | 55 | 962 | 12/1906 | 08/1935 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 894 | 55 | 963 | 01/1907 | 11/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 108 | 55 | 964 | 01/1907 | 02/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 74 | 55 | 965 | 02/1907 | 05/1928 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 79 | 55 | 966 | 02/1907 | 02/1932 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1471 | 56 | 967 | 04/1907 | 09/1926 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1472 | 56 | 968 | 04/1907 | 09/1926 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1473 | 56 | 969 | 04/1907 | 07/1926 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1474 | 56 | 970 | 05/1907 | 02/1927 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1475 | 56 | 971 | 05/1907 | 09/1926 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1476 | 56 | 972 | 05/1907 | 07/1926 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1477 | 56 | 973 | 06/1907 | 09/1926 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1478 | 56 | 974 | 06/1907 | 09/1926 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1479 | 56 | 975 | 06/1907 | 09/1926 |
LYR | 1452 | 0-8-0 | 1480 | 56 | 976 | 06/1907 | 04/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1481 | 58 | 984 | 07/1907 | 10/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1482 | 58 | 985 | 07/1907 | 12/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1483 | 58 | 986 | 07/1907 | 05/1927 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1484 | 58 | 987 | 08/1907 | 06/1926 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1485 | 58 | 988 | 08/1907 | 10/1926 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1486 | 58 | 989 | 08/1907 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1487 | 58 | 990 | 09/1907 | 10/1926 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1488 | 58 | 991 | 09/1907 | 10/1931 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1489 | 58 | 992 | 09/1907 | 06/1925 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1490 | 58 | 993 | 10/1907 | 08/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1491 | 58 | 994 | 10/1907 | 03/1932 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1492 | 58 | 995 | 10/1907 | 02/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1493 | 58 | 996 | 11/1907 | 03/1939 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1494 | 58 | 997 | 11/1907 | 02/1930 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1495 | 58 | 998 | 11/1907 | 11/1936 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1497 | 58 | 1000 | 12/1907 | 12/1934 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1498 | 58 | 1001 | 12/1907 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1496 | 58 | 999 | 12/1907 | 03/1935 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1499 | 58 | 1002 | 01/1908 | 01/1929 |
LYR | 91 | 0-8-0 | 1500 | 58 | 1003 | 01/1908 | 08/1929 |
LYR | 1501 | 0-8-2T | 1501 | 59 | 1004 | 03/1908 | 08/1925 |
LYR | 1501 | 0-8-2T | 1502 | 59 | 1005 | 03/1908 | 06/1927 |
LYR | 1501 | 0-8-2T | 1503 | 59 | 1006 | 03/1908 | 06/1926 |
LYR | 1501 | 0-8-2T | 1504 | 59 | 1007 | 04/1908 | 10/1929 |
LYR | 1501 | 0-8-2T | 1505 | 59 | 1008 | 04/1908 | 02/1927 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1506 | 60 | 1009 | 06/1908 | 09/1934 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1507 | 60 | 1010 | 07/1908 | 05/1925 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1508 | 60 | 1011 | 07/1908 | 01/1926 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1509 | 60 | 1012 | 07/1908 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1510 | 60 | 1013 | 08/1908 | 07/1935 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1511 | 60 | 1014 | 08/1908 | 06/1936 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1512 | 60 | 1015 | 08/1908 | 01/1926 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1513 | 60 | 1016 | 08/1908 | 08/1925 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1514 | 60 | 1017 | 09/1908 | 01/1937 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1515 | 60 | 1018 | 09/1908 | 08/1925 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1516 | 60 | 1019 | 10/1908 | 02/1949 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1517 | 60 | 1020 | 10/1908 | 03/1936 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1518 | 60 | 1021 | 11/1908 | 01/1934 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1519 | 60 | 1022 | 11/1908 | 01/1934 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1520 | 60 | 1023 | 12/1908 | 05/1936 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1521 | 60 | 1024 | 12/1908 | 12/1935 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1522 | 60 | 1025 | 01/1909 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1523 | 60 | 1026 | 01/1909 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1524 | 60 | 1027 | 02/1909 | 10/1926 |
LYR | 1506 | 4-6-0 | 1525 | 60 | 1028 | 03/1909 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 85 | 04/1909 | 05/1958 | ||
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 89 | 04/1909 | 02/1949 | ||
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 109 | 05/1909 | 24/05/1957 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 863 | 62 | 1034 | 05/1909 | 13/11/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 864 | 62 | 1035 | 05/1909 | 17/03/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 872 | 62 | 1036 | 05/1909 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 634 | 06/1909 | 12/03/1955 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 874 | 62 | 1037 | 06/1909 | 23/06/1960 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 875 | 62 | 1038 | 06/1909 | 10/1935 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 636 | 07/1909 | 22/09/1962 | ||
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 642 | 07/1909 | 14/08/1954 | ||
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 815 | 07/1909 | 18/04/1953 | ||
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 826 | 07/1909 | 25/03/1961 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 884 | 62 | 1044 | 07/1909 | 03/1936 |
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 61 | 08/1909 | 22/08/1959 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 885 | 62 | 1045 | 08/1909 | 07/01/1956 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 887 | 62 | 1046 | 08/1909 | 12/12/1953 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 888 | 62 | 1047 | 08/1909 | 20/08/1949 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 889 | 62 | 1048 | 08/1909 | 12/1935 |
LYR | 898 | 0-6-0 | 625 | 09/1909 | 27/11/1948 | ||
LYR | 27 | 0-6-0 | 633 | 09/1909 | 02/03/1957 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 873 | 62 | 1054 | 09/1909 | 21/11/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 882 | 62 | 1055 | 09/1909 | 03/05/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 886 | 62 | 1056 | 10/1909 | 01/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 891 | 62 | 1057 | 10/1909 | 08/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 892 | 62 | 1058 | 10/1909 | 13/10/1962 |
LYR | 898 | 0-6-0 | 893 | 11/1909 | 13/03/1948 | ||
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 893 | 62 | 1064 | 11/1909 | 13/03/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 895 | 62 | 1065 | 11/1909 | 08/05/1948 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 896 | 62 | 1066 | 11/1909 | 05/09/1959 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 897 | 62 | 1067 | 11/1909 | 23/12/1961 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 899 | 62 | 1068 | 12/1909 | 16/06/1951 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1526 | 64 | 1072 | 01/1910 | 03/1946 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1527 | 64 | 1073 | 01/1910 | 10/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1528 | 64 | 1074 | 01/1910 | 03/1947 |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 1531 | 02/1910 | 04/03/1950 | ||
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 1533 | 02/1910 | 14/08/1948 | ||
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1529 | 64 | 1075 | 02/1910 | 10/1929 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1530 | 64 | 1076 | 02/1910 | 03/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1531 | 64 | 1077 | 02/1910 | 04/03/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1532 | 64 | 1078 | 02/1910 | 05/1942 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1533 | 64 | 1079 | 02/1910 | 14/08/1948 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1534 | 64 | 1080 | 02/1910 | 07/1946 |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 1537 | 03/1910 | 29/04/1950 | ||
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 1536 | 03/1910 | 09/08/1952 | ||
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1535 | 64 | 1081 | 03/1910 | 05/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1536 | 64 | 1082 | 03/1910 | 09/08/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1537 | 64 | 1083 | 03/1910 | 29/04/1950 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1538 | 64 | 1084 | 03/1910 | 08/1931 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1539 | 64 | 1085 | 03/1910 | 03/1928 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1540 | 64 | 1086 | 03/1910 | 04/1932 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1541 | 64 | 1087 | 03/1910 | 04/12/1948 |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 1543 | 04/1910 | 01/1949 | ||
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 2 | 65 | 1092 | 04/1910 | 1924 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 3 | 65 | 1093 | 04/1910 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1542 | 64 | 1088 | 04/1910 | 11/1945 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1543 | 64 | 1089 | 04/1910 | 01/1949 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1544 | 64 | 1090 | 04/1910 | 23/02/1952 |
LYR | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 1545 | 64 | 1091 | 04/1910 | 23/10/1948 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 8 | 65 | 1094 | 05/1910 | 24/04/1957 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 12 | 65 | 1095 | 05/1910 | 18/01/1962 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 17 | 65 | 1096 | 05/1910 | 06/1930 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 19 | 65 | 1097 | 05/1910 | 09/1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 28 | 65 | 1098 | 05/1910 | 06/03/1962 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 43 | 65 | 1099 | 05/1910 | 1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 56 | 65 | 1100 | 06/1910 | 07/10/1961 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 64 | 65 | 1101 | 06/1910 | 12/1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 71 | 65 | 1102 | 06/1910 | 09/1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 75 | 65 | 1103 | 06/1910 | 03/1936 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 118 | 65 | 1104 | 06/1910 | 08/1932 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 226 | 65 | 1105 | 06/1910 | 04/1933 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 271 | 65 | 1106 | 06/1910 | 07/1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 298 | 65 | 1107 | 06/1910 | 22/06/1963 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 481 | 65 | 1108 | 06/1910 | 08/1931 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 517 | 65 | 1109 | 06/1910 | 12/1934 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 613 | 65 | 1110 | 07/1910 | 01/1934 |
LYR | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 614 | 65 | 1111 | 07/1910 | 10/1937 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 9 | 66 | 1112 | 07/1910 | 04/1928 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 29 | 66 | 1113 | 08/1910 | 09/1930 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 35 | 66 | 1114 | 08/1910 | 02/1935 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 67 | 66 | 1115 | 08/1910 | 12/1927 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 87 | 66 | 1116 | 08/1910 | 07/1928 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 96 | 66 | 1117 | 09/1910 | 11/06/1949 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 616 | 66 | 1118 | 09/1910 | 10/1931 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 617 | 66 | 1119 | 10/1910 | 04/1928 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 628 | 66 | 1120 | 10/1910 | 09/1931 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 713 | 66 | 1121 | 10/1910 | 01/1935 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 902 | 66 | 1122 | 11/1910 | 06/1929 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 905 | 66 | 1123 | 11/1910 | 02/1930 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 906 | 66 | 1124 | 11/1910 | 02/1931 |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 719 | 12/1910 | 18/12/1948 | ||
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 908 | 66 | 1125 | 12/1910 | 07/1927 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 909 | 66 | 1126 | 12/1910 | 06/1932 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 910 | 66 | 1127 | 12/1910 | 10/1929 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 911 | 66 | 1128 | 01/1911 | 03/1930 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 912 | 66 | 1129 | 01/1911 | 04/1932 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 913 | 66 | 1130 | 02/1911 | 07/1932 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 914 | 66 | 1131 | 02/1911 | 12/1929 |
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 70 | 03/1911 | 20/03/1948 | ||
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 112 | 03/1911 | 14/02/1948 | ||
LYR | 6 | 2-4-2T | 224 | 05/1911 | 17/03/1951 | ||
LYR | 898 | 0-6-0 | 907 | 04/1912 | 16/07/1949 | ||
LYR | 898 | 0-6-0 | 917 | 04/1912 | 03/1950 | ||
LYR | 898 | 0-6-0 | 1364 | 05/1912 | 13/11/1948 | ||
LYR | 898 | 0-6-0 | 239 | 06/1912 | 06/11/1954 | ||
LYR | 898 | 0-6-0 | 20 | 06/1912 | 23/03/1957 | ||
LYR | 898 | 0-6-0 | 237 | 08/1912 | 25/10/1952 | ||
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1546 | 70 | 1174 | 11/1912 | 01/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1547 | 70 | 1175 | 12/1912 | 13/03/1948 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1548 | 70 | 1176 | 12/1912 | 12/1930 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1549 | 70 | 1177 | 01/1913 | 12/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1550 | 70 | 1178 | 01/1913 | 03/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1551 | 70 | 1179 | 01/1913 | 09/1930 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1552 | 70 | 1180 | 02/1913 | 11/1932 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1553 | 70 | 1181 | 02/1913 | 09/1931 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1554 | 70 | 1182 | 03/1913 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1555 | 70 | 1183 | 03/1913 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1556 | 70 | 1184 | 03/1913 | 11/1930 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1557 | 70 | 1185 | 04/1913 | 09/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1558 | 70 | 1186 | 04/1913 | 07/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1559 | 70 | 1187 | 05/1913 | 03/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1560 | 70 | 1188 | 05/1913 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1561 | 70 | 1189 | 05/1913 | 08/1931 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1562 | 70 | 1190 | 05/1913 | 06/05/1950 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1563 | 70 | 1191 | 06/1913 | 22/12/1951 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1564 | 70 | 1192 | 06/1913 | 02/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1656 | 70 | 1193 | 07/1913 | 02/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1566 | 71 | 1194 | 07/1913 | 08/1938 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1567 | 71 | 1195 | 07/1913 | 09/11/1946 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1568 | 71 | 1196 | 08/1913 | 04/1932 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1569 | 71 | 1197 | 08/1913 | 08/1931 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1570 | 71 | 1198 | 09/1913 | 05/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1571 | 71 | 1199 | 09/1913 | 03/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1572 | 71 | 1200 | 09/1913 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1573 | 71 | 1201 | 10/1913 | 09/1931 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1574 | 71 | 1202 | 10/1913 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1575 | 71 | 1203 | 10/1913 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1576 | 71 | 1204 | 11/1913 | 22/09/1951 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1577 | 71 | 1205 | 11/1913 | 01/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1578 | 71 | 1206 | 11/1913 | 04/1932 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1579 | 71 | 1207 | 12/1913 | 08/05/1948 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1580 | 71 | 1208 | 12/1913 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1581 | 71 | 1209 | 12/1913 | 09/03/1946 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1582 | 71 | 1210 | 12/1913 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1583 | 71 | 1211 | 01/1914 | 02/10/1948 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1584 | 71 | 1212 | 01/1914 | 02/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1585 | 71 | 1213 | 02/1914 | 12/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 6 | 72 | 1214 | 03/1914 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 7 | 72 | 1215 | 03/1914 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 134 | 72 | 1216 | 04/1914 | 02/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 141 | 72 | 1217 | 05/1914 | 03/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 142 | 72 | 1218 | 06/1914 | 08/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 150 | 72 | 1219 | 07/1914 | 05/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 229 | 72 | 1220 | 08/1914 | 09/07/1949 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 259 | 72 | 1221 | 09/1914 | 08/1945 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 281 | 72 | 1222 | 11/1914 | 02/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 460 | 72 | 1223 | 12/1914 | 05/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 216 | 73 | 1224 | 09/1916 | 20/09/1947 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 235 | 73 | 1225 | 11/1916 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 241 | 73 | 1226 | 11/1916 | 12/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 265 | 73 | 1227 | 12/1916 | 10/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 312 | 73 | 1228 | 04/1917 | 30/09/1950 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 493 | 73 | 1229 | 04/1917 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 603 | 73 | 1233 | 04/1917 | 30/09/1950 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 503 | 73 | 1230 | 05/1917 | 12/1933 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 507 | 73 | 1231 | 05/1917 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 601 | 73 | 1232 | 05/1917 | 03/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 626 | 73 | 1234 | 06/1917 | 06/1931 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 631 | 73 | 1235 | 06/1917 | 11/02/1950 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 640 | 73 | 1236 | 06/1917 | 03/1934 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 660 | 73 | 1237 | 07/1917 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 919 | 75 | 1264 | 08/1917 | 12/11/1962 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 673 | 73 | 1238 | 08/1917 | 25/11/1950 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 921 | 75 | 1265 | 09/1917 | 04/1938 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 694 | 73 | 1239 | 09/1917 | 10/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 697 | 73 | 1240 | 09/1917 | 03/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 698 | 73 | 1241 | 09/1917 | 01/1936 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 923 | 75 | 1266 | 10/1917 | 09/08/1952 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 789 | 73 | 1242 | 10/1917 | 08/1946 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 915 | 73 | 1243 | 10/1917 | 03/1937 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 925 | 75 | 1267 | 11/1917 | 01/1947 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 926 | 75 | 1268 | 11/1917 | 22/04/1961 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 927 | 74 | 1244 | 12/1917 | 12/03/1949 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1351 | 74 | 1245 | 01/1918 | 28/10/1950 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1354 | 74 | 1246 | 01/1918 | 04/1937 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1365 | 74 | 1247 | 02/1918 | 08/1934 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1357 | 74 | 1248 | 02/1918 | 02/1947 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1368 | 74 | 1249 | 03/1918 | 18/03/1950 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1369 | 74 | 1250 | 03/1918 | 07/1936 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1586 | 74 | 1251 | 04/1918 | 13/08/1949 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1587 | 74 | 1252 | 04/1918 | 07/05/1949 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1588 | 74 | 1253 | 05/1918 | 08/1935 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1589 | 74 | 1254 | 06/1918 | 07/1939 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1590 | 74 | 1255 | 07/1918 | 03/02/1951 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1599 | 75 | 1269 | 08/1918 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1591 | 74 | 1256 | 08/1918 | 08/1935 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1592 | 74 | 1257 | 08/1918 | 06/1939 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1600 | 75 | 1270 | 09/1918 | 02/07/1955 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1593 | 74 | 1258 | 09/1918 | 12/03/1949 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1594 | 74 | 1259 | 09/1918 | 01/1937 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1601 | 75 | 1271 | 10/1918 | 11/1935 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1602 | 75 | 1272 | 10/1918 | 22/10/1960 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1595 | 74 | 1260 | 10/1918 | 05/1937 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1596 | 74 | 1261 | 11/1918 | 03/04/1948 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1597 | 74 | 1262 | 11/1918 | 06/1946 |
LYR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 1603 | 75 | 1273 | 12/1918 | 22/05/1948 |
LYR | 9 | 0-8-0 | 1598 | 74 | 1263 | 12/1918 | 29/10/1949 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1604 | 76 | 1274 | 01/1919 | 08/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1605 | 76 | 1275 | 02/1919 | 04/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1606 | 76 | 1276 | 02/1919 | 07/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1607 | 76 | 1277 | 02/1919 | 10/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1608 | 76 | 1278 | 03/1919 | 06/09/1947 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1628 | 77 | 1298 | 03/1919 | 29/11/1947 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1609 | 76 | 1279 | 04/1919 | 02/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1610 | 76 | 1280 | 05/1919 | 11/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1611 | 76 | 1281 | 05/1919 | 11/1933 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1612 | 76 | 1282 | 06/1919 | 03/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1613 | 76 | 1283 | 06/1919 | 07/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1614 | 76 | 1284 | 07/1919 | 01/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1615 | 76 | 1285 | 07/1919 | 26/06/1948 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1616 | 76 | 1286 | 07/1919 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1617 | 76 | 1287 | 08/1919 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1618 | 76 | 1288 | 09/1919 | 11/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1619 | 76 | 1289 | 09/1919 | 02/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1620 | 76 | 1290 | 10/1919 | 10/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1621 | 76 | 1291 | 10/1919 | 06/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1622 | 76 | 1292 | 11/1919 | 04/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1623 | 76 | 1293 | 11/1919 | 06/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1624 | 77 | 1294 | 12/1919 | 10/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1625 | 77 | 1295 | 12/1919 | 26/05/1951 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1626 | 77 | 1296 | 01/1920 | 09/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1627 | 77 | 1297 | 01/1920 | 05/1939 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1629 | 77 | 1299 | 03/1920 | 07/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1630 | 77 | 1300 | 04/1920 | 06/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1631 | 77 | 1301 | 05/1920 | 06/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1632 | 77 | 1302 | 05/1920 | 02/04/1949 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1633 | 77 | 1303 | 05/1920 | 09/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1634 | 77 | 1304 | 06/1920 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1635 | 77 | 1305 | 06/1920 | 12/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1636 | 77 | 1306 | 07/1920 | 14/01/1950 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1637 | 77 | 1307 | 07/1920 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1638 | 77 | 1308 | 08/1920 | 11/1945 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1639 | 77 | 1309 | 08/1920 | 07/1939 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1640 | 77 | 1310 | 08/1920 | 10/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1641 | 77 | 1311 | 09/1920 | 10/1936 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1642 | 77 | 1312 | 09/1920 | 01/07/1950 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1643 | 77 | 1313 | 10/1920 | 04/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1645 | 78 | 1315 | 11/1920 | 09/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1644 | 78 | 1314 | 12/1920 | 09/03/1946 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1646 | 78 | 1316 | 12/1920 | 09/1935 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1647 | 78 | 1317 | 12/1920 | 04/1937 |
LYR | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 1648 | 78 | 1318 | 01/1921 | 07/1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1649 | 80 | 1319 | 08/1921 | 03/1937 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1650 | 80 | 1320 | 08/1921 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1651 | 80 | 1321 | 08/1921 | 04/1937 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1652 | 80 | 1322 | 08/1921 | 03/07/1948 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1653 | 80 | 1323 | 09/1921 | 06/1934 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1655 | 80 | 1325 | 09/1921 | 08/1934 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1654 | 80 | 1324 | 10/1921 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1656 | 80 | 1326 | 10/1921 | 10/1934 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1657 | 80 | 1327 | 03/1922 | 12/1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1658 | 80 | 1328 | 05/1922 | 10/04/1948 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1659 | 81 | 1329 | 11/1922 | 05/1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1660 | 81 | 1330 | 12/1922 | 01/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1661 | 81 | 1331 | 12/1922 | 03/1949 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1662 | 81 | 1332 | 12/1922 | 03/1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1663 | 81 | 1333 | 01/1923 | 08/1934 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1664 | 81 | 1334 | 01/1923 | 02/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1665 | 81 | 1335 | 02/1923 | 11/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1666 | 81 | 1336 | 02/1923 | 10/1946 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1667 | 81 | 1337 | 03/1923 | 06/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1668 | 81 | 1338 | 04/1923 | 10/1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1669 | 81 | 1339 | 04/1923 | 05/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1670 | 81 | 1340 | 05/1923 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1671 | 81 | 1341 | 05/1923 | 08/1950 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1672 | 81 | 1342 | 05/1923 | 04/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1673 | 81 | 1343 | 05/1923 | 02/1937 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1674 | 81 | 1344 | 06/1923 | 02/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1675 | 81 | 1345 | 06/1923 | 06/1946 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1676 | 81 | 1346 | 06/1923 | 11/1934 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1677 | 81 | 1347 | 07/1923 | 10/1949 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 1678 | 81 | 1348 | 08/1923 | 03/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10450 | 81 | 1349 | 08/1923 | 06/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10451 | 81 | 1350 | 08/1923 | 08/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10452 | 81 | 1351 | 08/1923 | 06/1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10453 | 81 | 1352 | 09/1923 | 04/1934 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10454 | 81 | 1353 | 09/1923 | 1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10455 | 83 | 1364 | 04/1924 | 06/10/1951 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10456 | 83 | 1365 | 04/1924 | 1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10457 | 83 | 1366 | 05/1924 | 1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10458 | 83 | 1367 | 05/1924 | 1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10459 | 83 | 1368 | 06/1924 | 1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10460 | 83 | 1369 | 06/1924 | 1947 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10461 | 83 | 1370 | 07/1924 | 1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10462 | 83 | 1371 | 07/1924 | 1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10463 | 83 | 1372 | 08/1924 | 1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10464 | 83 | 1373 | 08/1924 | 1939 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10465 | 83 | 1374 | 09/1924 | 1937 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10466 | 83 | 1375 | 09/1924 | 1935 |
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1075 | 10/1924 | 10/04/1957 | ||
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10467 | 83 | 1376 | 10/1924 | 1937 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10468 | 83 | 1377 | 10/1924 | 1936 |
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1076 | 11/1924 | 14/05/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1077 | 11/1924 | 20/04/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1078 | 11/1924 | 06/09/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1079 | 11/1924 | 03/11/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1080 | 11/1924 | 23/01/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1081 | 11/1924 | 12/11/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1082 | 11/1924 | 03/04/1954 | ||
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10469 | 83 | 1378 | 11/1924 | 1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10470 | 83 | 1379 | 11/1924 | 1935 |
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1084 | 12/1924 | 19/06/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1083 | 12/1924 | 20/12/1958 | ||
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10471 | 83 | 1380 | 12/1924 | 1936 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10472 | 83 | 1381 | 12/1924 | 02/1935 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10473 | 83 | 1382 | 01/1925 | 1937 |
LYR | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10474 | 83 | 1383 | 01/1925 | 1935 |
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1085 | 05/1925 | 26/01/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1086 | 05/1925 | 05/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1087 | 06/1925 | 30/10/1954 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1088 | 06/1925 | 08/12/1956 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1089 | 06/1925 | 06/07/1957 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1091 | 07/1925 | 09/04/1955 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1090 | 07/1925 | 20/12/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1092 | 07/1925 | 16/07/1953 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1093 | 07/1925 | 30/06/1958 | ||
LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1094 | 07/1925 | 05/01/1959 | ||
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13000 | 84 | 19/06/1926 | 19/03/1966 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13001 | 84 | 08/07/1926 | 12/12/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13002 | 84 | 03/09/1926 | 24/01/1966 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13003 | 84 | 08/10/1926 | 03/10/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13004 | 84 | 08/10/1926 | 28/09/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13005 | 84 | 23/12/1926 | 26/12/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13006 | 84 | 31/12/1926 | 30/11/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13007 | 84 | 15/01/1927 | 19/09/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13008 | 84 | 04/02/1927 | 04/07/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13009 | 84 | 17/02/1927 | 11/04/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13010 | 84 | 25/02/1927 | 07/08/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13011 | 84 | 04/03/1927 | 17/08/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13013 | 84 | 05/03/1927 | 30/11/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13012 | 84 | 05/03/1927 | 26/02/1966 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13014 | 84 | 17/03/1927 | 29/09/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13015 | 84 | 14/04/1927 | 26/02/1966 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13016 | 84 | 05/05/1927 | 10/04/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13017 | 84 | 14/05/1927 | 17/10/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13018 | 84 | 28/05/1927 | 18/05/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13019 | 84 | 17/06/1927 | 01/02/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13020 | 84 | 23/06/1927 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13021 | 84 | 03/08/1927 | 12/10/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13022 | 84 | 26/08/1927 | 30/01/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13023 | 84 | 17/09/1927 | 31/08/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13024 | 84 | 06/10/1927 | 18/08/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13025 | 84 | 12/10/1927 | 10/10/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13026 | 84 | 31/10/1927 | 27/10/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13027 | 84 | 31/10/1927 | 07/01/1967 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13028 | 84 | 18/11/1927 | 16/02/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13029 | 84 | 13/12/1927 | 12/10/1963 | |
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4458 | 03/1928 | 11/10/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4457 | 03/1928 | 23/12/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4459 | 04/1928 | 12/03/1960 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4464 | 05/1928 | 02/05/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4460 | 05/1928 | 31/10/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4461 | 05/1928 | 05/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4462 | 05/1928 | 13/11/1965 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4463 | 05/1928 | 19/09/1964 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4465 | 06/1928 | 07/1963 | ||
MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4466 | 07/1928 | 21/05/1965 | ||
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13110 | 87 | 25/04/1929 | 14/12/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13111 | 87 | 08/05/1929 | 14/07/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13112 | 87 | 17/05/1929 | 18/06/1966 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13113 | 87 | 28/05/1929 | 09/11/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13114 | 87 | 06/06/1929 | 21/08/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13115 | 87 | 18/06/1929 | 26/09/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13116 | 87 | 27/06/1929 | 03/10/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13117 | 87 | 08/07/1929 | 24/04/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13118 | 87 | 24/07/1929 | 05/05/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13119 | 87 | 07/08/1929 | 25/09/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13120 | 87 | 20/08/1929 | 18/04/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13121 | 87 | 30/08/1929 | 23/03/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13122 | 87 | 13/09/1929 | 02/06/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13123 | 87 | 01/10/1929 | 22/02/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13124 | 87 | 10/10/1929 | 07/07/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13125 | 87 | 18/10/1929 | 30/06/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13126 | 87 | 29/10/1929 | 26/09/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13127 | 87 | 12/11/1929 | 21/08/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13128 | 87 | 22/11/1929 | 16/10/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13129 | 87 | 09/12/1929 | 30/06/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13130 | 88 | 29/04/1930 | 10/11/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13131 | 88 | 09/05/1930 | 18/12/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13132 | 88 | 20/05/1930 | 06/03/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13133 | 88 | 30/05/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13134 | 88 | 11/06/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13135 | 88 | 23/06/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13136 | 88 | 03/07/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13137 | 88 | 22/07/1930 | 29/12/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13138 | 88 | 01/08/1930 | 30/03/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13139 | 88 | 03/08/1930 | 06/06/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13140 | 88 | 25/08/1930 | 12/09/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13141 | 88 | 03/09/1930 | 06/03/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13142 | 88 | 17/09/1930 | 27/06/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13143 | 88 | 29/09/1930 | 30/03/1963 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13144 | 88 | 09/10/1930 | 28/08/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13145 | 88 | 21/10/1930 | 29/08/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13146 | 88 | 31/10/1930 | 19/09/1964 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13147 | 88 | 12/11/1930 | 30/06/1962 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13148 | 88 | 25/11/1930 | 13/03/1965 | |
LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 13149 | 88 | 05/12/1930 | 10/07/1965 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16750 | 82 | 04/1931 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16751 | 82 | 05/1931 | 08/10/1966 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16752 | 82 | 05/1931 | 20/02/1965 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16753 | 82 | 06/1931 | 22/10/1960 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16754 | 82 | 06/1931 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16755 | 82 | 06/1931 | 19/03/1960 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16756 | 82 | 07/1931 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16757 | 82 | 07/1931 | 17/12/1966 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16760 | 82 | 08/1931 | 06/11/1965 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16759 | 82 | 08/1931 | 14/08/1965 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16758 | 82 | 08/1931 | 04/1966 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16761 | 82 | 09/1931 | 20/01/1962 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16762 | 82 | 09/1931 | 10/08/1963 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16764 | 82 | 10/1931 | 07/08/1965 | |
LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 16763 | 82 | 10/1931 | 17/07/1965 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8331 | 09/1943 | 26/02/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8332 | 10/1943 | 28/10/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8333 | 11/1943 | 26/06/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8334 | 11/1943 | 27/01/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8335 | 11/1943 | 30/03/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8336 | 12/1943 | 09/12/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8337 | 12/1943 | 09/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8338 | 01/1944 | 08/06/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8339 | 01/1944 | 08/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8340 | 01/1944 | 03/08/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8341 | 02/1944 | 19/04/1964 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8342 | 02/1944 | 09/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8343 | 02/1944 | 18/02/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8344 | 03/1944 | 30/03/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8345 | 03/1944 | 02/03/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8346 | 03/1944 | 16/07/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8347 | 03/1944 | 29/07/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8348 | 04/1944 | 03/08/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8349 | 04/1944 | 15/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8350 | 04/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8351 | 05/1944 | 20/01/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8352 | 05/1944 | 04/11/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8353 | 06/1944 | 10/09/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8354 | 06/1944 | 19/11/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8355 | 06/1944 | 04/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8356 | 06/1944 | 29/06/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8357 | 06/1944 | 04/09/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8358 | 07/1944 | 04/09/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8359 | 07/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8360 | 07/1944 | 03/07/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8361 | 08/1944 | 08/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8362 | 08/1944 | 23/12/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8363 | 08/1944 | 18/11/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8364 | 08/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8365 | 09/1944 | 04/05/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8366 | 09/1944 | 11/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8367 | 09/1944 | 09/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8368 | 09/1944 | 29/06/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8369 | 10/1944 | 29/06/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8370 | 10/1944 | 26/11/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8371 | 10/1944 | 14/10/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8372 | 10/1944 | 17/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8373 | 11/1944 | 22/06/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8374 | 11/1944 | 15/06/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8375 | 11/1944 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8376 | 11/1944 | 22/07/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8377 | 12/1944 | 21/10/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8378 | 12/1944 | 07/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8379 | 12/1944 | 18/03/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8380 | 12/1944 | 25/05/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8381 | 12/1944 | 25/11/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8382 | 01/1945 | 28/10/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8383 | 01/1945 | 15/01/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8384 | 01/1945 | 25/05/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8385 | 02/1945 | 03/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8386 | 02/1945 | 26/08/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8387 | 03/1945 | 23/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8388 | 03/1945 | 15/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8389 | 03/1945 | 21/08/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8390 | 03/1945 | 11/05/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8391 | 04/1945 | 18/12/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8392 | 04/1945 | 22/06/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8393 | 04/1945 | 03/08/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8394 | Lot 175 | 05/1945 | 24/06/1967 | |
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8395 | 05/1945 | 09/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8396 | 05/1945 | 19/01/1964 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8397 | 06/1945 | 08/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8398 | 06/1945 | 02/04/1966 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8399 | 06/1945 | 09/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8490 | 06/1945 | 11/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8491 | 07/1945 | 29/06/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8492 | 07/1945 | 10/02/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8493 | 08/1945 | 03/08/1968 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8494 | 08/1945 | 01/04/1967 | ||
LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8495 | 08/1945 | 21/10/1967 | ||
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4932 | 174 | 09/1945 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4933 | 174 | 10/1945 | 14/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4934 | 174 | 10/1945 | 30/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4935 | 174 | 10/1945 | 15/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4936 | 174 | 11/1945 | 12/08/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4940 | 174 | 11/1945 | 16/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4939 | 174 | 11/1945 | 12/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4937 | 174 | 11/1945 | 13/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4938 | 174 | 11/1945 | 14/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4941 | 174 | 12/1945 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4942 | 174 | 12/1945 | 22/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4943 | 174 | 12/1945 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4944 | 174 | 01/1946 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4945 | 174 | 01/1946 | 29/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4946 | 174 | 01/1946 | 22/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4947 | 174 | 02/1946 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4948 | 174 | 02/1946 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4949 | 174 | 02/1946 | 29/06/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4950 | 174 | 03/1946 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 174 | 03/1946 | 14/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4952 | 174 | 03/1946 | 19/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4953 | 174 | 03/1946 | 10/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4956 | 174 | 04/1946 | 14/06/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4955 | 174 | 04/1946 | 07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4954 | 174 | 04/1946 | 23/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4957 | 174 | 05/1946 | 05/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4958 | 174 | 05/1946 | 04/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4959 | 174 | 05/1946 | 10/07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4960 | 174 | 05/1946 | 17/01/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4961 | 174 | 15/06/1946 | 29/06/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4962 | 174 | 15/06/1946 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4963 | 174 | 22/06/1946 | 20/07/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4964 | 174 | 07/1946 | 14/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4965 | 174 | 08/1946 | 04/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4966 | 174 | 08/1946 | 17/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4984 | 183 | 09/1946 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 183 | 09/1946 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4982 | 183 | 09/1946 | 06/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4986 | 183 | 10/1946 | 07/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4985 | 183 | 10/1946 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4987 | 183 | 11/1946 | 22/10/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4989 | 183 | 12/1946 | 04/02/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4990 | 183 | 12/1946 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4988 | 183 | 12/1946 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4992 | 183 | 01/1947 | 31/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4993 | 183 | 01/1947 | 16/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4994 | 183 | 01/1947 | 13/07/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4995 | 183 | 02/1947 | 29/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4996 | 183 | 02/1947 | 17/04/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4783 | 187 | 03/1947 | 05/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4997 | 187 | 03/1947 | 01/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4998 | 187 | 03/1947 | 04/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4999 | 187 | 03/1947 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4784 | 187 | 04/1947 | 06/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4785 | 187 | 04/1947 | 29/06/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4786 | 187 | 04/1947 | 17/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4789 | 187 | 05/1947 | 10/12/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4788 | 187 | 05/1947 | 29/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4787 | 187 | 05/1947 | 22/11/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4790 | 187 | 06/1947 | 18/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4791 | 187 | 06/1947 | 29/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4792 | 187 | 07/1947 | 23/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4793 | 187 | 08/1947 | 10/12/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4794 | 187 | 08/1947 | 22/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4795 | 187 | 08/1947 | 29/07/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4796 | 187 | 09/1947 | 01/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4797 | 187 | 09/1947 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4798 | 187 | 10/1947 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4799 | 187 | 10/1947 | 03/07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4991 | 183 | 12/1947 | 01/05/1967 | |
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3000 | 06/12/1947 | 09/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3001 | 20/12/1947 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3002 | 31/12/1947 | 30/12/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3003 | 17/01/1948 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3004 | 24/01/1948 | 09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3005 | 07/02/1948 | 06/11/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3006 | 14/02/1948 | 02/03/1968 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3007 | 21/02/1948 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3008 | 28/02/1948 | 02/03/1968 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3009 | 06/03/1948 | 26/11/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 20/03/1948 | 30/12/1967 | |||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43011 | 25/03/1948 | 11/02/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43012 | 10/04/1948 | 05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43013 | 17/04/1948 | 16/10/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43014 | 24/04/1948 | 03/04/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43015 | 07/05/1948 | 01/07/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43016 | 15/05/1948 | 30/01/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43017 | 22/05/1948 | 02/12/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43018 | 29/05/1948 | 22/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43019 | 12/06/1948 | 04/05/1968 | ||
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44698 | 192 | 03/07/1948 | 14/07/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44699 | 192 | 10/07/1948 | 01/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44700 | 192 | 31/07/1948 | 14/07/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44701 | 192 | 07/08/1948 | 18/06/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44702 | 192 | 21/08/1948 | 26/06/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44703 | 192 | 28/08/1948 | 10/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44704 | 192 | 04/09/1948 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44705 | 192 | 11/09/1948 | 02/09/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44706 | 192 | 18/09/1948 | 28/12/1963 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44707 | 192 | 25/09/1948 | 24/01/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44708 | 192 | 02/10/1948 | 20/01/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44709 | 192 | 09/10/1948 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44710 | 192 | 16/10/1948 | 24/12/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44711 | 192 | 23/10/1948 | 04/05/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44712 | 192 | 30/10/1948 | 12/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44713 | 192 | 06/11/1948 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44714 | 192 | 13/11/1948 | 19/11/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44715 | 192 | 20/11/1948 | 27/01/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44716 | 192 | 27/11/1948 | 31/07/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44717 | 192 | 04/12/1948 | 26/08/1967 | |
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43020 | 17/12/1948 | 08/10/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43021 | 22/12/1948 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43022 | 30/12/1948 | 19/11/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43023 | 08/01/1949 | 30/12/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43024 | 21/01/1949 | 27/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43025 | 28/01/1949 | 18/09/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43026 | 10/02/1949 | 24/09/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43027 | 19/02/1949 | 04/05/1968 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43028 | 03/03/1949 | 02/12/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43029 | 15/03/1949 | 30/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43030 | 25/03/1949 | 11/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43031 | 05/04/1949 | 12/03/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43032 | 14/04/1949 | 10/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43033 | 05/05/1949 | 02/03/1968 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43034 | 18/05/1949 | 03/06/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43035 | 26/05/1949 | 20/11/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43036 | 03/06/1949 | 07/05/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43037 | 15/06/1949 | 11/04/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43039 | 16/07/1949 | 07/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43038 | 16/07/1949 | 23/05/1964 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43040 | 30/07/1949 | 26/11/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43041 | 18/08/1949 | 12/08/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43042 | 27/08/1949 | 19/02/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43043 | 15/09/1949 | 10/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43044 | 29/09/1949 | 30/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43045 | 10/10/1949 | 03/09/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43046 | 19/10/1949 | 25/11/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43047 | 02/11/1949 | 30/12/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43048 | 12/11/1949 | 10/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43049 | 25/11/1949 | 05/08/1967 | ||
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44668 | 199 | 24/12/1949 | 09/04/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44669 | 199 | 31/12/1949 | 14/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44670 | 199 | 31/01/1950 | 15/01/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44671 | 199 | 28/02/1950 | 18/02/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44672 | 199 | 28/02/1950 | 02/03/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44673 | 199 | 28/02/1950 | 15/05/1965 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44674 | 199 | 31/03/1950 | 30/12/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44675 | 199 | 31/03/1950 | 23/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44677 | 199 | 30/04/1950 | 28/10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44676 | 199 | 30/04/1950 | 04/07/1964 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44678 | 199 | 31/05/1950 | 25/11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44679 | 199 | 31/05/1950 | 23/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44681 | 199 | 17/06/1950 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44682 | 199 | 17/06/1950 | 11/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44680 | 199 | 30/06/1950 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44683 | 199 | 31/07/1950 | 13/04/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44684 | 199 | 31/07/1950 | 16/09/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44685 | 199 | 31/08/1950 | 22/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44688 | 199 | 31/08/1950 | 20/08/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44689 | 199 | 30/09/1950 | 04/03/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44691 | 199 | 31/10/1950 | 01/04/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44692 | 199 | 31/10/1950 | 14/05/1966 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44690 | 199 | 31/10/1950 | 03/08/1968 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44693 | 199 | 11/1950 | 29/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44694 | 199 | 11/1950 | 10/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44695 | 199 | 30/11/1950 | 24/06/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44696 | 199 | 30/11/1950 | 13/05/1967 | |
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44697 | 199 | 30/11/1950 | 18/11/1967 | |
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43112 | 29/03/1951 | 16/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43113 | 13/04/1951 | 03/09/1966 | ||
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44686 | 199 | 30/04/1951 | 16/10/1965 | |
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43114 | 09/05/1951 | 25/11/1963 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43115 | 19/05/1951 | 27/05/1967 | ||
LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44687 | 199 | 31/05/1951 | 22/01/1966 | |
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43116 | 01/06/1951 | 22/05/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43117 | 09/06/1951 | 01/07/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43118 | 21/06/1951 | 18/11/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43119 | 30/06/1951 | 12/08/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43120 | 11/07/1951 | 26/08/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43121 | 10/08/1951 | 18/11/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43122 | 21/08/1951 | 18/03/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43123 | 28/08/1951 | 01/07/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43124 | 30/09/1951 | 07/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43125 | 30/09/1951 | 09/09/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43127 | 12/10/1951 | 10/01/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43129 | 31/10/1951 | 07/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43130 | 31/10/1951 | 07/1967 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43128 | 31/10/1951 | 12/07/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43131 | 30/11/1951 | 09/12/1963 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43132 | 30/11/1951 | 01/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43133 | 30/11/1951 | 01/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43134 | 30/11/1951 | 24/02/1965 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43126 | 05/12/1951 | 05/04/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43135 | 31/12/1951 | 11/1966 | ||
LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43136 | 31/12/1951 | 20/07/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76000 | 01/12/1952 | 01/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76001 | 05/12/1952 | 17/08/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76002 | 11/12/1952 | 31/12/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76003 | 19/12/1952 | 25/03/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76004 | 24/12/1952 | 19/10/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76005 | 31/12/1952 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76006 | 16/01/1953 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76007 | 30/01/1953 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76008 | 02/1953 | 14/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76009 | 26/02/1953 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76010 | 09/03/1953 | 04/09/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76011 | 23/03/1953 | 09/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76012 | 31/03/1953 | 04/09/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76013 | 15/04/1953 | 04/09/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76014 | 28/04/1953 | 04/09/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76015 | 13/05/1953 | 03/10/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76016 | 26/05/1953 | 02/10/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76017 | 13/06/1953 | 04/07/1965 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76018 | 26/06/1953 | 02/10/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76019 | 11/07/1953 | 20/02/1966 | ||
LMS | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47005 | 28/10/1953 | 25/12/1966 | ||
LMS | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47006 | 06/11/1953 | 06/08/1966 | ||
LMS | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47007 | 19/11/1953 | 21/12/1963 | ||
LMS | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47008 | 12/1953 | 05/09/1964 | ||
LMS | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47009 | 30/01/1954 | 05/09/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76075 | 14/12/1956 | 07/10/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76076 | 19/12/1956 | 26/11/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76077 | 27/12/1956 | 02/12/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76078 | 29/12/1956 | 03/12/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76079 | 30/01/1957 | 02/12/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76080 | 08/02/1957 | 02/12/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76081 | 21/02/1957 | 22/07/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76082 | 03/1957 | 08/10/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76083 | 20/03/1957 | 22/10/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76084 | 28/03/1957 | 02/12/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76085 | 10/04/1957 | 06/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76086 | 23/04/1957 | 24/09/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76087 | 07/05/1957 | 07/01/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76088 | 16/05/1957 | 10/06/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76089 | 25/05/1957 | 24/09/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76090 | 06/06/1957 | 31/12/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76091 | 19/06/1957 | 31/12/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76092 | 28/06/1957 | 09/08/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76093 | 11/07/1957 | 22/02/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76095 | 08/1957 | 04/03/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76094 | 08/08/1957 | 01/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76096 | 04/09/1957 | 10/12/1966 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76097 | 25/09/1957 | 13/07/1964 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76098 | 17/10/1957 | 01/05/1967 | ||
BR | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76099 | 27/11/1957 | 06/08/1966 | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3593 | 20/08/1958 | 27/04/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3594 | 01/09/1958 | 08/11/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3595 | 12/09/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3596 | 19/09/1958 | 31/08/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3597 | 26/09/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3598 | 03/10/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3599 | 10/10/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3600 | 20/10/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3601 | 24/10/1958 | 27/11/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3602 | 29/10/1958 | 23/02/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3603 | 31/10/1958 | 16/02/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3604 | 07/11/1958 | 30/09/2008 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3605 | 14/11/1958 | 18/12/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3606 | 19/11/1958 | 29/09/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3607 | 26/11/1958 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3803 | 05/12/1958 | 27/07/1980 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3804 | 11/12/1958 | 09/08/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3805 | 18/12/1958 | 11/12/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3806 | 23/12/1958 | 30/10/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3807 | 29/12/1958 | 14/11/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3808 | 16/01/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3809 | 23/01/1959 | 31/05/2006 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3810 | 30/01/1959 | 2001 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3811 | 04/02/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3812 | 13/02/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3813 | 20/02/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3814 | 26/02/1959 | 02/04/1997 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3815 | 04/03/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3816 | 10/03/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3817 | 18/03/1959 | 01/08/1989 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3818 | 20/03/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3819 | 26/03/1959 | 20/06/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3820 | 02/04/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3821 | 08/04/1959 | 25/10/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3822 | 15/04/1959 | 31/08/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3823 | 24/04/1959 | 05/02/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3824 | 30/04/1959 | 22/11/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3825 | 05/05/1959 | 05/02/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3826 | 13/05/1959 | 24/06/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3827 | 19/05/1959 | 08/11/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3828 | 22/05/1959 | 31/01/2003 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3829 | 29/05/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3830 | 05/06/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3831 | 12/06/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3842 | 27/06/1959 | 31/08/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3843 | 04/07/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3844 | 11/07/1959 | 10/06/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3845 | 01/08/1959 | 30/10/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3846 | 08/08/1959 | 19/06/1976 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3847 | 15/08/1959 | 06/07/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3848 | 22/08/1959 | 29/10/1985 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3849 | 29/08/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3850 | 05/09/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3851 | 12/09/1959 | 07/12/1986 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3852 | 19/09/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3853 | 26/09/1959 | 22/11/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3854 | 03/10/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3855 | 10/10/1959 | 01/03/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3856 | 17/10/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3857 | 24/10/1959 | 12/10/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3858 | 31/10/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3859 | 07/11/1959 | 31/01/1994 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3860 | 14/11/1959 | 16/06/2000 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3861 | 21/11/1959 | 30/09/2008 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3862 | 28/11/1959 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3863 | 05/12/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3864 | 19/12/1959 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3865 | 19/12/1959 | 04/10/1981 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3866 | 14/01/1960 | 22/10/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3867 | 20/01/1960 | 29/06/2001 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3868 | 05/02/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3869 | 12/02/1960 | 28/02/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3870 | 17/02/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3871 | 29/02/1960 | 05/11/1990 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4021 | 19/06/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4022 | 21/06/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4023 | 26/06/1960 | 23/07/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4024 | 04/07/1960 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3922 | 12/01/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3923 | 20/01/1961 | 10/09/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3924 | 27/01/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3925 | 01/02/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3926 | 08/02/1961 | 30/06/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3927 | 16/02/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3928 | 22/02/1961 | 14/02/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3929 | 01/03/1961 | 20/03/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3930 | 06/03/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3931 | 10/03/1961 | 06/10/1989 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3932 | 17/03/1961 | 06/05/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3933 | 23/03/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3934 | 28/03/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3935 | 06/04/1961 | 31/01/1994 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3936 | 13/04/1961 | 31/08/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4011 | 20/04/1961 | 22/02/1990 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4012 | 26/04/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4013 | 02/05/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4017 | 14/05/1961 | 01/10/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4014 | 16/05/1961 | 13/10/1989 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4015 | 17/05/1961 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4016 | 18/05/1961 | 15/05/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4018 | 01/06/1961 | 11/12/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4019 | 05/06/1961 | 07/02/1990 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4020 | 12/06/1961 | 03/08/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4025 | 10/07/1961 | 21/10/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4026 | 09/08/1961 | 01/10/1994 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4027 | 15/08/1961 | 11/12/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4095 | 23/08/1961 | 01/02/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4096 | 30/08/1961 | 30/06/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4097 | 08/09/1961 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4098 | 11/09/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4099 | 19/09/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4100 | 26/09/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4101 | 03/10/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4102 | 12/10/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4103 | 26/10/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4104 | 26/10/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4105 | 07/11/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4106 | 13/11/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4107 | 16/11/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4108 | 23/11/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4109 | 29/11/1961 | 31/12/2007 | |||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4110 | 08/12/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4111 | 15/12/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4112 | 22/12/1961 | ||||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4113 | 04/01/1962 | 31/08/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4115 | 18/01/1962 | 07/05/1993 | |||
09 | 0-6-0 | D4114 | 21/01/1962 | 01/10/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4116 | 26/01/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4117 | 02/02/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4118 | 16/02/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4119 | 22/02/1962 | 06/03/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4120 | 28/02/1962 | 30/09/2008 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4121 | 07/03/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4122 | 16/03/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4123 | 20/03/1962 | 26/06/1998 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4124 | 29/03/1962 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4125 | 05/04/1962 | 10/09/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4126 | 12/04/1962 | 01/02/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4127 | 19/04/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4128 | 30/04/1962 | 07/12/1988 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4129 | 07/05/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4130 | 14/05/1962 | 30/09/2008 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4131 | 18/05/1962 | 26/06/1998 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4132 | 28/05/1962 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4133 | 01/06/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4134 | 07/06/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4135 | 18/06/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4136 | 22/06/1962 | 31/08/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4137 | 29/06/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4138 | 05/07/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4139 | 11/07/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4140 | 02/08/1962 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4141 | 08/08/1962 | 01/05/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4142 | 17/08/1962 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4143 | 23/08/1962 | 01/11/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4144 | 31/08/1962 | 30/06/2005 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4145 | 11/09/1962 | 01/02/2004 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4146 | 19/09/1962 | 29/10/1992 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4147 | 25/09/1962 | 22/11/1991 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4148 | 25/09/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4149 | 15/10/1962 | 30/09/2008 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4150 | 22/10/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4151 | 26/10/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4152 | 02/11/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4153 | 13/11/1962 | 10/06/1993 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4154 | 13/12/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4155 | 14/12/1962 | ||||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4156 | 21/12/1962 | 28/02/2007 | |||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4157 | 28/12/1962 | 01/06/2005 |