Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1266 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 9007 Week
» 29449 Month
» 366295 Year
» 1587860 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Darlington Works


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
NER G6 0-4-4T 1115   06/1877 06/11/1959
NER G6 0-4-4T 1033   06/1877 11/1945
NER G6 0-4-4T 1058   08/1877 09/1922
NER G6 0-4-4T 1089   08/1877 04/1921
NER G6 0-4-4T 60   03/1878 04/1928
NER G6 0-4-4T 145   03/1878 08/1946
NER G6 0-4-4T 1019   03/1878 10/1928
NER G6 0-4-4T 1020   04/1878 12/1928
NER G6 0-4-4T 1021   04/1878 01/1933
NER G6 0-4-4T 105   09/1878 07/06/1954
NER G6 0-4-4T 63   10/1878 06/1929
NER G6 0-4-4T 612   04/1879 11/01/1960
NER G6 0-4-4T 672   05/1879 05/1928
NER G6 0-4-4T 1055   05/1879 08/1928
NER G6 0-4-4T 1116   06/1879 19/08/1957
NER G6 0-4-4T 597   06/1879 01/01/1958
NER G6 0-4-4T 595   06/1879 07/1929
NER G6 0-4-4T 605   08/1879 11/1927
NER G6 0-4-4T 596   09/1879 12/1921
NER G6 0-4-4T 615   09/1880 04/1927
NER G6 0-4-4T 638   09/1880 11/1928
NER G6 0-4-4T 585   10/1880 11/1926
NER G6 0-4-4T 586   10/1880 09/1922
NER G6 0-4-4T 591   10/1880 05/1921
NER G6 0-4-4T 623   11/1880 23/01/1956
NER J76 0-6-0T 609   07/1881 07/1911
NER J76 0-6-0T 124   08/1881 02/1926
NER J76 0-6-0T 602   08/1881 01/1929
NER J76 0-6-0T 610   08/1881 05/1917
NER J76 0-6-0T 193   09/1881 10/1928
NER J76 0-6-0T 1059   09/1881 03/1927
NER J76 0-6-0T 197   12/1881 12/1927
NER J76 0-6-0T 198   12/1881 01/1928
NER J76 0-6-0T 599   01/1882 06/1926
NER J76 0-6-0T 171   02/1882 10/1927
NER J76 0-6-0T 598   02/1882 11/1926
NER J76 0-6-0T 211   03/1882 07/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 497   09/1883 11/1924
NER J22 0-6-0 440   10/1883 12/1926
NER J22 0-6-0 208   11/1883 11/1924
NER J22 0-6-0 455   12/1883 03/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 506   12/1883 04/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 620   12/1883 01/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 235   01/1884 12/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 681   01/1884 11/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 446   03/1884 11/1924
NER J22 0-6-0 498   03/1884 12/1926
NER J22 0-6-0 369   04/1884 04/1926
NER J22 0-6-0 508   04/1884 06/1926
NER J22 0-6-0 502   05/1884 02/1929
NER J22 0-6-0 682   05/1884 12/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 567   06/1884 05/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 571   06/1884 09/1924
NER J22 0-6-0 606   07/1884 07/1926
NER J22 0-6-0 131   10/1884 12/1930
NER J22 0-6-0 522   10/1884 01/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 59   11/1884 10/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 388   11/1884 10/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 565   11/1884 03/1929
NER J22 0-6-0 812   11/1884 04/1929
NER J22 0-6-0 78   12/1884 03/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 1102   02/1885 03/1929
NER J22 0-6-0 1106   03/1885 09/1926
NER J22 0-6-0 232   05/1885 02/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 422   08/1885 08/1927
NER J22 0-6-0 491   08/1885 01/1929
NER J22 0-6-0 142   09/1885 04/1928
NER J22 0-6-0 192   09/1885 11/1925
NER J22 0-6-0 1141   03/1886 08/1926
NER N8 0-6-2T 14   06/1886 04/1932
NER N8 0-6-2T 531   06/1886 06/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T     07/1886 10/03/1952
NER N8 0-6-2T 185   07/1886 12/1932
NER N8 0-6-2T     08/1886 27/11/1950
NER N8 0-6-2T 428   08/1886 04/1930
NER N8 0-6-2T 504   09/1886 06/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T 528   09/1886 12/1929
NER N8 0-6-2T     10/1886 03/1950
NER J71 0-6-0T 165   11/1886 25/01/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 144   11/1886 05/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T 1165   11/1886 07/1939
NER J71 0-6-0T 317   12/1886 05/1936
NER J71 0-6-0T 299   12/1886 07/1951
NER J71 0-6-0T 304   01/1887 02/1936
NER J71 0-6-0T 399   01/1887 11/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 261   01/1887 04/02/1957
NER J71 0-6-0T 27   02/1887 09/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 326   02/1887 20/02/1961
NER J71 0-6-0T 533   02/1887 21/08/1954
NER J71 0-6-0T 263   04/1887 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 70   04/1887 07/11/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 168   04/1887 01/11/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 272   05/1887 07/1947
NER J71 0-6-0T 278   05/1887 11/1935
NER J71 0-6-0T 347   05/1887 10/09/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 493   06/1887 07/1939
NER J71 0-6-0T 811   06/1887 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 494   06/1887 23/11/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 499   06/1887 10/09/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 242   04/1888 10/1936
NER J71 0-6-0T 268   04/1888 08/1939
NER J71 0-6-0T 275   04/1888 07/1947
NER J71 0-6-0T 285   05/1888 12/1936
NER J71 0-6-0T 286   05/1888 04/08/1958
NER J71 0-6-0T 403   05/1888 03/1950
NER J71 0-6-0T 584   06/1888 02/1935
NER J71 0-6-0T 1163   06/1888 10/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 541   06/1888 12/04/1958
NER J71 0-6-0T 1123   06/1888 27/04/1959
NER N8 0-6-2T 855   10/1888 02/1950
NER N8 0-6-2T 857   10/1888 08/1935
NER N8 0-6-2T 858   10/1888 03/1936
NER N8 0-6-2T 860   11/1888 06/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T 219   12/1888 17/07/1952
NER N8 0-6-2T 371   12/1888 05/1931
NER N8 0-6-2T 213   12/1888 01/1936
NER N8 0-6-2T 284   12/1888 10/1936
NER N8 0-6-2T 683   12/1888 07/1939
NER N8 0-6-2T     02/1889 08/1949
NER N8 0-6-2T     02/1889 03/1949
NER N8 0-6-2T 349   02/1889 06/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T 350   03/1889 12/1936
NER N8 0-6-2T 351   03/1889 09/1930
NER N8 0-6-2T     04/1889 27/10/1954
NER N8 0-6-2T 373   04/1889 04/1933
NER N8 0-6-2T 1124   04/1889 07/1939
NER N8 0-6-2T 1145   04/1889 12/1936
NER N8 0-6-2T     05/1889 28/02/1955
NER N8 0-6-2T     05/1889 07/07/1952
NER N8 0-6-2T 445   05/1889 12/1945
NER N8 0-6-2T 523   05/1889 05/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T     06/1889 07/07/1952
NER N8 0-6-2T 509   06/1889 01/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 84   07/1889 08/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 1167   07/1889 24/11/1958
NER J71 0-6-0T 221   07/1889 08/1951
NER J71 0-6-0T 225   08/1889 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 453   08/1889 02/1939
NER J71 0-6-0T 224   08/1889 03/07/1951
NER J71 0-6-0T 492   08/1889 01/1953
NER J71 0-6-0T 496   09/1889 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 495   09/1889 06/04/1959
NER J71 0-6-0T 501   09/1889 12/01/1959
NER N8 0-6-2T 215   10/1889 01/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T 216   10/1889 12/1931
NER N8 0-6-2T     11/1889 18/10/1956
NER N8 0-6-2T     11/1889 16/02/1953
NER N8 0-6-2T 218   11/1889 09/1943
NER N8 0-6-2T 238   11/1889 07/1929
NER N8 0-6-2T     12/1889 04/05/1955
NER N8 0-6-2T     12/1889 27/10/1952
NER N8 0-6-2T 809   12/1889 03/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T 1168   12/1889 01/1931
NER N8 0-6-2T     02/1890 03/10/1955
NER N8 0-6-2T     02/1890 18/08/1952
GNR A1 4-6-2     03/1890 01/1937
GNR A1 4-6-2     03/1890 05/1934
NER N8 0-6-2T     03/1890 08/1949
NER N8 0-6-2T     03/1890 08/1949
NER N8 0-6-2T 287   03/1890 01/1937
NER N8 0-6-2T 959   03/1890 05/1934
NER N8 0-6-2T     04/1890 15/10/1951
NER N8 0-6-2T     04/1890 04/10/1948
NER N8 0-6-2T     04/1890 10/1951
NER J71 0-6-0T 1083   05/1890 15/04/1957
NER J71 0-6-0T 239   05/1890 16/09/1957
NER N8 0-6-2T     05/1890 28/08/1951
NER J71 0-6-0T 254   06/1890 05/1947
NER J71 0-6-0T 50   06/1890 07/11/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 241   06/1890 18/08/1952
NER J71 0-6-0T 244   06/1890 22/07/1954
NER J71 0-6-0T 296   07/1890 08/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 260   07/1890 09/11/1954
NER J71 0-6-0T 338   07/1890 14/09/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 400   07/1890 07/03/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 54   09/1890 03/1947
NER J71 0-6-0T 103   09/1890 25/01/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 176   09/1890 08/06/1959
NER J71 0-6-0T 177   09/1890 25/01/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 179   09/1890 31/08/1959
NER J71 0-6-0T 181   09/1890 18/02/1957
NER J71 0-6-0T 248   09/1890 14/11/1957
NER J71 0-6-0T 478   10/1890 09/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 482   10/1890 26/05/1952
NER J71 0-6-0T 802   10/1890 14/10/1960
NER J21 0-6-0 68 131 11/1890 21/11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 139 132 11/1890 27/11/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 300 133 12/1890 21/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 810 134 12/1890 29/04/1948
NER J21 0-6-0 997 135 01/1891 02/1950
NER J21 0-6-0 26 136 01/1891 05/09/1960
NER J21 0-6-0 102 137 01/1891 08/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 147 138 01/1891 02/1950
NER J21 0-6-0 148 139 02/1891 09/1929
NER J21 0-6-0 157 140 02/1891 11/1942
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1547 141 02/1891 05/1931
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1548 142 02/1891 02/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1549 143 03/1891 12/1946
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1550 144 03/1891 28/06/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1551 145 03/1891 05/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1552 146 04/1891 06/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1553 147 04/1891 24/08/1953
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1554 148 04/1891 04/03/1957
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1555 149 05/1891 11/1949
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1556 150 05/1891 05/12/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1567 151 07/1891 02/1950
NER J21 0-6-0 1568 152 07/1891 01/1937
NER J21 0-6-0 1569 153 07/1891 02/04/1951
NER J21 0-6-0 1570 154 07/1891 06/1935
NER J21 0-6-0 1571 155 08/1891 03/1936
NER J21 0-6-0 1572 156 08/1891 08/1936
NER J21 0-6-0 1573 157 08/1891 06/1947
NER J21 0-6-0 1574 158 09/1891 13/12/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1575 159 09/1891 30/12/1954
NER J21 0-6-0 1576 160 09/1891 30/10/1961
NER J71 0-6-0T 447   11/1891 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 448   11/1891 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 77   11/1891 21/11/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 161   11/1891 10/05/1954
NER J71 0-6-0T 252   11/1891 06/02/1961
NER J71 0-6-0T 280   11/1891 14/11/1957
NER J71 0-6-0T 301   01/1892 06/1947
NER J71 0-6-0T 401   01/1892 09/1936
NER J71 0-6-0T 451   01/1892 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 449   01/1892 08/02/1961
NER J71 0-6-0T 450   01/1892 19/11/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 452   01/1892 25/11/1950
NER J71 0-6-0T 572   02/1892 06/02/1961
NER J71 0-6-0T 577   02/1892 18/06/1957
NER J71 0-6-0T 1085   02/1892 02/05/1957
NER J71 0-6-0T 1103   02/1892 23/11/1953
NER J71 0-6-0T 1140   03/1892 26/10/1953
NER J71 0-6-0T 1142   03/1892 30/07/1959
NER J71 0-6-0T 1153   03/1892 10/10/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 1157   03/1892 04/10/1948
NER J71 0-6-0T 402   07/1892 09/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 1144   07/1892 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 237   07/1892 16/06/1952
NER J71 0-6-0T 240   07/1892 26/11/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 1084   07/1892 25/11/1950
NER J71 0-6-0T 1095   07/1892 20/06/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 1143   07/1892 12/01/1959
NER J71 0-6-0T 1314   08/1892 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 1151   08/1892 26/05/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 1155   08/1892 16/10/1954
NER J71 0-6-0T 1197   11/1892 10/11/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 1198   11/1892 23/02/1959
NER J71 0-6-0T 1199   11/1892 19/07/1958
NER J71 0-6-0T 1196   11/1892 10/09/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 972   01/1893 26/05/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 137   01/1893 27/03/1957
NER J71 0-6-0T 977   01/1893 01/12/1952
NER J71 0-6-0T 978   01/1893 07/03/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 969   01/1893 09/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 980   01/1893 26/11/1956
NER N9 0-6-2T 1617   05/1893 10/1950
NER N9 0-6-2T 1618   06/1893 11/1949
NER N9 0-6-2T 1640   06/1893 08/1947
NER N9 0-6-2T 1641   06/1893 12/1950
NER N9 0-6-2T 1642   07/1893 07/1950
NER N9 0-6-2T 1643   08/1893 10/1949
NER N9 0-6-2T 1644   08/1893 12/1947
NER N9 0-6-2T 1645   08/1893 06/1946
NER N9 0-6-2T 1646   09/1893 01/01/1951
NER N9 0-6-2T 1647   09/1893 02/1948
NER N9 0-6-2T 1648   10/1893 07/1949
NER N9 0-6-2T 1649   11/1893 08/1949
NER N9 0-6-2T 1650   11/1893 04/1950
NER N9 0-6-2T 1651   12/1893 07/1951
NER N9 0-6-2T 1652   12/1893 27/06/1955
NER N9 0-6-2T 1653   12/1893 11/1950
NER N9 0-6-2T 1654   12/1893 23/02/1953
NER N9 0-6-2T 1655   12/1893 27/06/1955
NER N9 0-6-2T 383   02/1894 08/1950
NER N9 0-6-2T 1705   02/1894 04/07/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1096   05/1894 16/04/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1783   06/1894 27/11/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1765   06/1894 25/06/1951
NER G5 0-4-4T 1702   06/1894 17/11/1952
NER G5 0-4-4T 1701   06/1894 19/09/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1691   06/1894 09/02/1953
NER G5 0-4-4T 1687   06/1894 08/03/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1788   06/1894 06/12/1954
NER G5 0-4-4T 1769   08/1894 17/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1791   09/1894 15/03/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 1735   11/1894 30/08/1951
NER J71 0-6-0T 1796   11/1894 13/06/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 1666   11/1894 08/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 1797   12/1894 09/11/1954
NER J71 0-6-0T 1831   12/1894 24/11/1958
NER J71 0-6-0T 1832   12/1894 19/07/1958
NER J71 0-6-0T 1833   12/1894 20/06/1955
NER J71 0-6-0T 1834   12/1894 19/05/1958
NER J71 0-6-0T 1836   12/1894 14/04/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 1835   12/1894 05/1937
NER G5 0-4-4T 1838   03/1895 26/03/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1837   03/1895 16/09/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1840   04/1895 03/12/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1839   04/1895 31/10/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1772   04/1895 10/11/1952
NER G5 0-4-4T 1795   06/1895 17/12/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1793   06/1895 28/10/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1730   06/1895 12/04/1954
NER G5 0-4-4T 1703   06/1895 08/04/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1169   06/1895 02/05/1951
NER J71 0-6-0T 1134   08/1895 12/1950
NER J71 0-6-0T 1789   09/1895 08/1951
NER J71 0-6-0T 1758   09/1895 09/1933
NER J71 0-6-0T 1688   10/1895 02/02/1959
NER J71 0-6-0T 1689   10/1895 03/09/1956
NER J71 0-6-0T 1690   10/1895 14/04/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 1861   10/1895 04/1946
NER J71 0-6-0T 1862   10/1895 05/1937
NER J71 0-6-0T 1864   11/1895 14/10/1960
NER J71 0-6-0T 1863   11/1895 05/1937
NER G5 0-4-4T 1866   02/1896 28/10/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1865   02/1896 04/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1778   02/1896 11/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1316   02/1896 24/11/1952
NER G5 0-4-4T 1780   03/1896 01/10/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1762   03/1896 27/04/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1751   03/1896 14/06/1954
NER G5 0-4-4T 1748   03/1896 06/12/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1868   03/1896 20/02/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1867   03/1896 11/07/1951
NER G5 0-4-4T 1779   06/1896 08/11/1954
NER G5 0-4-4T 1713   06/1896 07/02/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 529   06/1896 13/01/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1786   08/1896 16/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1737   08/1896 05/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 505   09/1896 10/11/1952
NER G5 0-4-4T 394   09/1896 30/10/1952
NER G5 0-4-4T 405   10/1896 22/10/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1882   11/1896 11/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1881   11/1896 30/07/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1764   12/1896 15/03/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1890   12/1896 28/06/1954
NER G5 0-4-4T 1889   12/1896 31/03/1953
NER G5 0-4-4T 1888   12/1896 08/10/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1887   12/1896 06/1950
NER G5 0-4-4T 1886   12/1896 08/10/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1885   12/1896 09/08/1954
NER G5 0-4-4T 1884   12/1896 05/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1883   12/1896 11/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1740   12/1896 22/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1911   05/1897 03/12/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1920   06/1897 04/12/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1919   06/1897 15/09/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 1918   06/1897 08/03/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1917   06/1897 08/03/1954
NER G5 0-4-4T 1916   06/1897 15/01/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1915   06/1897 04/04/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1914   06/1897 12/08/1952
NER G5 0-4-4T 1913   06/1897 16/02/1953
NER G5 0-4-4T 1912   06/1897 27/03/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1692   09/1897 06/12/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1752   09/1897 08/05/1950
NER G5 0-4-4T 1745   10/1897 23/02/1953
NER G5 0-4-4T 1739   10/1897 10/04/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 1693   10/1897 08/03/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1759   11/1897 06/1948
NER G5 0-4-4T 1755   11/1897 08/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 526   11/1897 22/02/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1775   12/1897 22/11/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1754   12/1897 23/05/1955
NER J72 0-6-0T 462   12/1898 25/01/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 1715   12/1898 02/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 1718   12/1898 23/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1721   12/1898 08/05/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1722   12/1898 16/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1732   12/1898 28/09/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1744   12/1898 09/09/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 1746   12/1898 02/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1761   12/1898 20/02/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1770   12/1898 27/06/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 1720   03/1899 16/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1728   03/1899 22/11/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 1733   03/1899 07/12/1959
NER J72 0-6-0T 1734   03/1899 20/03/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1736   03/1899 15/03/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1741   03/1899 03/10/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 1742   04/1899 14/08/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1747   04/1899 15/09/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1749   04/1899 16/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 1763   04/1899 16/10/1961
NER J25 0-6-0 536   06/1899 27/09/1954
NER J25 0-6-0 1724   06/1899 08/1938
NER J25 0-6-0 1725   06/1899 23/05/1951
NER J25 0-6-0 1726   06/1899 02/06/1958
NER J25 0-6-0 1727   06/1899 08/1938
NER J25 0-6-0 2031   08/1899 08/1933
NER J25 0-6-0 2032   09/1899 10/07/1948
NER J25 0-6-0 2033   09/1899 02/03/1959
NER J25 0-6-0 2034   09/1899 18/01/1954
NER J25 0-6-0 2035   10/1899 01/1937
NER J25 0-6-0 2036   10/1899 08/1933
NER J25 0-6-0 2037   10/1899 14/10/1958
NER J25 0-6-0 2038   10/1899 02/1947
NER J25 0-6-0 2039   10/1899 04/1933
NER J25 0-6-0 2040   11/1899 31/05/1951
NER J25 0-6-0 2041   11/1899 16/09/1957
NER J25 0-6-0 2042   11/1899 30/04/1950
NER J25 0-6-0 2043   11/1899 01/1946
NER J25 0-6-0 2044   11/1899 02/06/1958
NER J25 0-6-0 2045   12/1899 11/04/1949
NER J25 0-6-0 2046   12/1899 15/09/1959
NER J25 0-6-0 2047   12/1899 03/11/1954
NER J25 0-6-0 2048   12/1899 22/08/1959
NER J25 0-6-0 25   12/1899 08/1954
NER J25 0-6-0 463   12/1899 31/05/1954
NER J25 0-6-0 2049   03/1900 01/1934
NER J25 0-6-0 2050   03/1900 11/1938
NER J25 0-6-0 2051   03/1900 02/06/1948
NER J25 0-6-0 2052   04/1900 04/1933
NER J25 0-6-0 2053   04/1900 27/10/1954
NER J25 0-6-0 2054   04/1900 01/1937
NER J25 0-6-0 2055   05/1900 07/12/1959
NER J25 0-6-0 2056   05/1900 01/1950
NER J25 0-6-0 2057   05/1900 28/05/1956
NER J25 0-6-0 2058   06/1900 10/1945
NER J25 0-6-0 2059   06/1900 03/11/1954
NER J25 0-6-0 2060   06/1900 06/1944
NER J25 0-6-0 29   06/1900 22/08/1960
NER J25 0-6-0 257   06/1900 15/08/1960
NER J25 0-6-0 459   06/1900 09/01/1961
NER G5 0-4-4T 2081   10/1900 06/09/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 2085   11/1900 12/12/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 2084   11/1900 21/08/1951
NER G5 0-4-4T 2083   11/1900 09/04/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 2082   11/1900 02/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 2095   12/1900 11/11/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 2094   12/1900 08/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 2093   12/1900 11/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 2092   12/1900 07/01/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 2091   12/1900 20/11/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 2090   12/1900 03/12/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 2089   12/1900 05/03/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 2088   12/1900 28/08/1951
NER G5 0-4-4T 2087   12/1900 13/12/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 2086   12/1900 11/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 2097   03/1901 08/10/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 2096   03/1901 10/10/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 2100   04/1901 24/11/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 2099   04/1901 21/11/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 2098   04/1901 04/02/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1695   06/1901 11/03/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 1334   06/1901 22/03/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 1319   06/1901 10/08/1953
NER G5 0-4-4T 580   06/1901 26/03/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 540   06/1901 08/10/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 468   06/1901 12/04/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 439   06/1901 23/02/1953
NER G5 0-4-4T 381   06/1901 08/12/1952
NER G5 0-4-4T 149   09/1901 27/08/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 387   09/1901 28/04/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 380   09/1901 18/03/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 427   10/1901 27/02/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 413   10/1901 04/11/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 408   10/1901 02/12/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 384   10/1901 06/11/1958
NER G5 0-4-4T 437   11/1901 12/01/1953
NER G5 0-4-4T 436   11/1901 26/03/1956
NER G5 0-4-4T 435   11/1901 11/02/1957
NER G5 0-4-4T 433   11/1901 13/12/1955
NER G5 0-4-4T 441   12/1901 28/04/1954
NER N10 0-6-2T 1321   10/1902 19/11/1956
NER N10 0-6-2T 1667   10/1902 26/11/1956
NER N10 0-6-2T 1112   10/1902 24/09/1957
NER N10 0-6-2T 1138   10/1902 25/11/1957
NER N10 0-6-2T 1683   11/1902 06/04/1959
NER N10 0-6-2T 1697   11/1902 23/12/1957
NER N10 0-6-2T 1774   11/1902 01/07/1957
NER N10 0-6-2T 89   12/1902 25/10/1955
NER N10 0-6-2T 429   12/1902 27/12/1957
NER N10 0-6-2T 1109   12/1902 09/04/1962
NER N10 0-6-2T 1132   12/1902 10/02/1958
NER N10 0-6-2T 1148   12/1902 09/04/1962
NER N10 0-6-2T 1317   12/1902 09/02/1959
NER N10 0-6-2T 1706   12/1902 11/1948
NER N10 0-6-2T 1710   12/1902 17/03/1958
NER N10 0-6-2T 1699   03/1903 16/06/1961
NER N10 0-6-2T 1707   03/1903 17/03/1958
NER N10 0-6-2T 1711   03/1903 27/12/1957
NER N10 0-6-2T 1785   04/1903 30/07/1957
NER N10 0-6-2T 1716   04/1903 09/04/1962
NER J26 0-6-0 132   06/1904 21/01/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 243   06/1904 18/06/1962
NER J26 0-6-0 342   06/1904 04/11/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 434   06/1904 02/01/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 442   06/1904 14/10/1958
NER J26 0-6-0 543   06/1904 18/06/1962
NER J26 0-6-0 554   06/1904 20/02/1961
NER J26 0-6-0 555   06/1904 20/10/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1159   06/1904 04/02/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1172   06/1904 04/02/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1043   09/1904 28/01/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1057   10/1904 23/10/1961
NER J26 0-6-0 1098   10/1904 21/02/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1130   10/1904 04/06/1962
NER J26 0-6-0 1369   10/1904 21/02/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1671   11/1904 11/12/1961
NER J26 0-6-0 1674   11/1904 19/07/1958
NER J26 0-6-0 1676   11/1904 16/04/1962
NER J26 0-6-0 1678   12/1904 15/01/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1773   12/1904 05/03/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 835   05/1905 15/05/1961
NER J26 0-6-0 881   05/1905 19/07/1958
NER J26 0-6-0 1146   05/1905 04/06/1962
NER J26 0-6-0 1390   06/1905 29/01/1962
NER J26 0-6-0 1194   06/1905 04/03/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1200   06/1905 19/07/1958
NER J26 0-6-0 1202   06/1905 18/02/1959
NER J26 0-6-0 1208   06/1905 19/07/1958
NER J26 0-6-0 1370   06/1905 04/06/1962
NER J26 0-6-0 1781   06/1905 23/10/1961
NER J27 0-6-0 790   04/1906 24/04/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 814   04/1906 19/10/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 836   04/1906 20/11/1961
NER J27 0-6-0 839   05/1906 02/06/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 880   05/1906 27/08/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 883   06/1906 16/06/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 888   06/1906 16/04/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 891   06/1906 14/05/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 917   06/1906 05/06/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 938   06/1906 01/07/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1006   09/1906 07/08/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1016   09/1906 12/10/1964
NER J27 0-6-0 1018   09/1906 10/05/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1052   10/1906 16/04/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1189   10/1906 28/06/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1227   10/1906 12/07/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1256   11/1906 15/05/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1393   11/1906 27/11/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 1402   11/1906 02/06/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1686   12/1906 06/08/1962
NER Q5 0-8-0 578 516 06/1907 16/05/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 660 517 06/1907 31/12/1948
NER Q5 0-8-0 939 518 06/1907 18/09/1947
NER Q5 0-8-0 1031 519 08/1907 23/04/1951
NER Q5 0-8-0 1032 520 09/1907 19/07/1947
NER Q5 0-8-0 1054 521 09/1907 16/05/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 1062 522 10/1907 20/12/1948
NER Q5 0-8-0 1177 523 10/1907 16/05/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 1178 524 10/1907 12/02/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 1215 525 11/1907 07/12/1946
NER Q5 0-8-0 644 526 12/1907 11/06/1948
NER Q5 0-8-0 645 527 12/1907 29/09/1951
NER Q5 0-8-0 646 528 12/1907 22/08/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 647 529 12/1907 21/11/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 648 530 03/1908 03/09/1951
NER Q5 0-8-0 652 531 03/1908 25/03/1948
NER Q5 0-8-0 653 532 03/1908 04/04/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 654 533 04/1908 12/02/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 655 534 05/1908 27/06/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 656 535 05/1908 18/04/1951
NER J27 0-6-0 1001   06/1908 10/09/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 1003   06/1908 31/07/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1004   06/1908 07/08/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1005   06/1908 16/04/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1007   08/1908 01/07/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1013   09/1908 20/01/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 1008   10/1908 08/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1010   10/1908 14/05/1962
NER D21 4-4-0 1237   11/1908 03/1945
NER J27 0-6-0 1011   11/1908 15/03/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1012   11/1908 04/09/1966
NER D21 4-4-0 1238   12/1908 03/1945
NER D21 4-4-0 1239   12/1908 12/1942
NER D21 4-4-0 1240   03/1909 05/1944
NER D21 4-4-0 1241   06/1909 03/1943
NER D21 4-4-0 1242   06/1909 01/1946
NER D21 4-4-0 1243   06/1909 06/1945
NER D21 4-4-0 1244   07/1909 10/1944
NER D21 4-4-0 1245   08/1909 09/02/1946
NER D21 4-4-0 1246   08/1909 07/1943
NER C6 4-4-2 696   05/1910 31/12/1947
NER C6 4-4-2 697   05/1910 10/1945
NER C6 4-4-2 698   06/1910 27/12/1947
NER C6 4-4-2 699   06/1910 07/1944
NER C6 4-4-2 700   07/1910 05/1946
NER C6 4-4-2 701   07/1910 08/1944
NER C6 4-4-2 702   08/1910 07/1946
NER C6 4-4-2 703   08/1910 01/1945
NER C6 4-4-2 704   09/1910 22/11/1947
NER C6 4-4-2 705   09/1910 12/1943
NER A7 4-6-2T 1113   10/1910 13/10/1954
NER A7 4-6-2T 1114   11/1910 08/11/1954
NER A7 4-6-2T 1126   11/1910 16/12/1957
NER A7 4-6-2T 1129   12/1910 23/03/1955
NER A7 4-6-2T 1136   12/1910 23/08/1954
NER A7 4-6-2T 1170   12/1910 04/04/1952
NER Q5 0-8-0 658 1911 08/11/1948
NER A7 4-6-2T 1174   01/1911 14/06/1954
NER A7 4-6-2T 1175   01/1911 12/05/1952
NER A7 4-6-2T 1176   02/1911 03/05/1955
NER A7 4-6-2T 1179   02/1911 30/11/1954
NER A7 4-6-2T 1180   02/1911 15/11/1954
NER A7 4-6-2T 1181   03/1911 23/11/1956
NER A7 4-6-2T 1182   03/1911 16/12/1957
NER A7 4-6-2T 1183   03/1911 17/12/1956
NER A7 4-6-2T 1185   04/1911 05/03/1956
NER A7 4-6-2T 1190   04/1911 17/11/1955
NER A7 4-6-2T 1191   05/1911 16/12/1957
NER A7 4-6-2T 1192   05/1911 09/08/1954
NER A7 4-6-2T 1193   05/1911 21/11/1955
NER A7 4-6-2T 1195   06/1911 28/05/1951
NER Q5 0-8-0 642 06/1911 22/03/1947
NER Q5 0-8-0 643 06/1911 06/03/1948
NER Q5 0-8-0 657 06/1911 12/02/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 659 06/1911 16/10/1947
NER Q5 0-8-0 661 07/1911 22/03/1947
NER Q5 0-8-0 669 07/1911 06/10/1951
NER Q5 0-8-0 764 08/1911 22/11/1948
NER Q5 0-8-0 767 08/1911 13/01/1951
NER Q5 0-8-0 769 08/1911 21/12/1946
NER Q5 0-8-0 770 09/1911 28/12/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 771 09/1911 12/02/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 772 09/1911 22/03/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 773 09/1911 21/12/1950
NER Q5 0-8-0 774 10/1911 16/05/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 781 10/1911 29/08/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 783 10/1911 16/10/1950
NER Q5 0-8-0 789 11/1911 02/08/1947
NER Q5 0-8-0 793 11/1911 01/10/1949
NER Q5 0-8-0 794 11/1911 07/02/1948
NER B15 4-6-0 782 12/1911 21/12/1946
NER B15 4-6-0 786 12/1911 18/09/1937
NER B15 4-6-0 787 02/1912 21/12/1946
NER B15 4-6-0 788 02/1912 02/09/1937
NER B15 4-6-0 791 02/1912 23/10/1937
NER B15 4-6-0 795 03/1912 08/12/1945
NER B15 4-6-0 796 03/1912 18/12/1945
NER B15 4-6-0 797 05/1912 25/11/1937
NER B15 4-6-0 798 06/1912 16/10/1945
NER B15 4-6-0 799 06/1912 25/11/1937
NER B15 4-6-0 813 09/1912 18/03/1944
NER B15 4-6-0 815 09/1912 31/05/1947
NER B15 4-6-0 817 10/1912 06/04/1946
NER B15 4-6-0 819 10/1912 21/12/1946
NER B15 4-6-0 820 11/1912 27/12/1947
NER B15 4-6-0 821 11/1912 02/11/1946
NER B15 4-6-0 822 11/1912 05/02/1944
NER B15 4-6-0 823 12/1912 21/10/1944
NER B15 4-6-0 824 12/1912 27/04/1946
NER Q6 0-8-0 1247 02/1913 15/07/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 1248 02/1913 12/11/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 1249 02/1913 04/12/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 1250 02/1913 07/06/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 1251 02/1913 09/09/1967
NER B15 4-6-0 825 03/1913 26/02/1944
NER Q6 0-8-0 1252 03/1913 08/06/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 1253 03/1913 29/05/1967
NER Q6 0-8-0 1254 03/1913 18/10/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 1257 03/1913 17/06/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 1261 04/1913 05/06/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 1262 04/1913 18/06/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 1271 04/1913 25/02/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 1276 05/1913 15/07/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 1278 05/1913 21/05/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 1279 05/1913 15/07/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 1280 05/1913 03/12/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 1283 05/1913 17/05/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 1264 06/1913 18/01/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 1284 06/1913 09/03/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 1285 06/1913 27/04/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 1288 06/1913 26/06/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 1291 06/1913 07/06/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 1292 06/1913 14/11/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 1293 06/1913 04/09/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 1294 07/1913 29/04/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 1311 07/1913 10/06/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 1335 07/1913 16/05/1967
NER Q6 0-8-0 1361 08/1913 31/08/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 1362 08/1913 31/12/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 1363 09/1913 15/07/1963
NER H1 4-4-4T 2143 10/1913 21/06/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 2144 10/1913 11/11/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 2145 11/1913 04/11/1959
NER H1 4-4-4T 2146 11/1913 25/01/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 2147 12/1913 10/05/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 2148 12/1913 25/01/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 2149 12/1913 02/12/1959
NER H1 4-4-4T 2151 12/1913 10/05/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 2152 12/1913 08/02/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 2153 12/1913 14/06/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 2154 12/1913 20/06/1960
  EB1 Bo-Bo 3   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 4   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 5   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 6   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 7   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 8   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 9   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 10   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 11   1914 21/08/1950
  EB1 Bo-Bo 12   1914 21/08/1950
NER H1 4-4-4T 2150 01/1914 05/02/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 2155 02/1914 30/07/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 2156 02/1914 03/11/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 2157 02/1914 29/10/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 2158 03/1914 21/04/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 2159 03/1914 18/11/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 2160 03/1914 23/12/1959
NER H1 4-4-4T 2161 04/1914 07/11/1957
NER H1 4-4-4T 2162 04/1914 13/06/1960
NER C7 4-4-2 2163   05/1914 01/1946
NER C7 4-4-2 2164   05/1914 27/12/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2165   06/1914 02/1947
NER C7 4-4-2 2166   06/1914 30/08/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2167   06/1914 26/06/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2168   06/1914 05/1947
NER C7 4-4-2 2169   06/1914 10/07/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2170   06/1914 08/1943
NER C7 4-4-2 2171   07/1914 04/1942
NER C7 4-4-2 2172   08/1914 12/1944
NER J72 0-6-0T 2173   08/1914 20/02/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2174   09/1914 19/12/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 2175   09/1914 02/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2176   09/1914 24/08/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2177   09/1914 24/11/1959
NER J72 0-6-0T 2178   09/1914 02/04/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 2179   09/1914 30/01/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2180   09/1914 01/02/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 2181   09/1914 02/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2182   10/1914 16/12/1958
NER J72 0-6-0T 2183   10/1914 02/12/1958
NER J72 0-6-0T 2184   10/1914 05/10/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 2185   10/1914 31/08/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2186   10/1914 02/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2187   10/1914 16/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2188   11/1914 10/11/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 2189   11/1914 24/10/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 2190   11/1914 02/04/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 2191   11/1914 11/08/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2192   11/1914 26/02/1962
NER C7 4-4-2 2193   12/1914 30/08/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2194   12/1914 09/1944
NER C7 4-4-2 2195   12/1914 06/1947
NER C7 4-4-2 2196   02/1915 10/07/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2197   02/1915 24/07/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2198   03/1915 24/07/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2199   03/1915 06/1944
NER C7 4-4-2 2200   03/1915 04/1946
NER C7 4-4-2 2201   04/1915 09/1947
NER C7 4-4-2 2202   05/1915 10/1943
NER C7 4-4-2 2203   06/1915 24/07/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2204   06/1915 30/08/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2205   11/1916 02/1945
NER C7 4-4-2 2206   11/1916 08/11/1947
NER C7 4-4-2 2207   01/1917 01/11/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2208   02/1917 05/03/1948
NER C7 4-4-2 2209   04/1917 02/1944
NER Q6 0-8-0 2213 04/1917 01/06/1964
NER C7 4-4-2 2210   05/1917 10/07/1948
NER Q6 0-8-0 2214 05/1917 07/11/1965
NER C7 4-4-2 2211   06/1917 08/11/1947
NER Q6 0-8-0 2219 06/1917 01/07/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2220 06/1917 10/11/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 2221 06/1917 05/04/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 2222 06/1917 04/09/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 2215 06/1917 16/05/1960
NER Q6 0-8-0 2216 06/1917 15/07/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2217 06/1917 29/04/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2218 06/1917 19/08/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2223 07/1917 15/07/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2224 08/1917 08/12/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 2225 08/1917 18/09/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 2226 09/1917 13/04/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 2227 10/1917 02/01/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 2228 10/1917 16/10/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2229 10/1917 05/12/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 2230 11/1917 09/09/1967
NER Q6 0-8-0 2231 12/1917 16/03/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 2232 12/1917 27/12/1965
NER C7 4-4-2 2212   06/1918 10/1945
NER Q6 0-8-0 2233 08/1918 08/08/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2234 09/1918 12/04/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 2235 10/1918 18/11/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2236 10/1918 17/06/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 2237 11/1918 07/06/1967
NER Q6 0-8-0 2238 12/1918 09/09/1967
NER Q6 0-8-0 2239 12/1918 29/04/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2240 12/1918 31/05/1967
NER Q6 0-8-0 2241 12/1918 11/10/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 2242 12/1918 16/03/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 2243 05/1919 12/08/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2244 05/1919 06/04/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 2245 05/1919 16/09/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 2246 05/1919 27/07/1964
NER Q6 0-8-0 2247 06/1919 17/05/1965
NER Q6 0-8-0 2248 06/1919 14/12/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 2249 06/1919 31/07/1966
NER Q6 0-8-0 2250 07/1919 01/07/1967
NER Q6 0-8-0 2251 07/1919 02/07/1963
NER Q6 0-8-0 2252 08/1919 11/09/1966
NER Q7 0-8-0 901 10/1919 03/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 902 10/1919 10/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 903 10/1919 03/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 904 11/1919 03/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 905 11/1919 03/12/1962
NER B16 4-6-0 840 12/1919 19/10/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 841 12/1919 23/11/1959
NER B16 4-6-0 842 12/1919 05/09/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 843 12/1919 20/04/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 844 12/1919 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 846 03/1920 15/04/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 847 03/1920 16/09/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 845 04/1920 20/01/1958
NER B16 4-6-0 848 04/1920 01/02/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 849 04/1920 12/12/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1517 05/1920 24/06/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 906 06/1920 03/10/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1518 06/1920 07/11/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 1519 06/1920 16/10/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 1520 06/1920 08/02/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1523 06/1920 20/05/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1528 06/1920 20/05/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1529 06/1920 21/10/1957
NER H1 4-4-4T 1531 06/1920 30/12/1959
NER B16 4-6-0 908 08/1920 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 909 08/1920 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 911 08/1920 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 914 09/1920 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 915 09/1920 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 920 09/1920 12/05/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 921 10/1920 03/09/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 2305   10/1920 05/01/1959
NER J72 0-6-0T 2306   10/1920 16/10/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2303   10/1920 05/03/1959
NER J72 0-6-0T 2304   10/1920 21/08/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 922 11/1920 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 923 11/1920 25/09/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2307   11/1920 03/1960
NER J72 0-6-0T 2308   11/1920 26/07/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2309   11/1920 20/02/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2310   11/1920 08/11/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 924 12/1920 23/09/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 925 12/1920 13/06/1942
NER B16 4-6-0 926 12/1920 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 927 12/1920 25/09/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 2311   12/1920 30/06/1958
NER J72 0-6-0T 2312   12/1920 24/01/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 928 01/1921 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 929 02/1921 05/10/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 930 02/1921 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 931 03/1921 29/09/1959
NER B16 4-6-0 932 03/1921 07/03/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 933 03/1921 31/10/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 934 04/1921 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 936 04/1921 01/10/1959
NER B16 4-6-0 937 05/1921 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 942 06/1921 03/07/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 943 06/1921 30/11/1959
NER H1 4-4-4T 1499 06/1921 24/06/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1501 06/1921 23/06/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1502 07/1921 02/06/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 1503 07/1921 19/11/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 1524 08/1921 01/06/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1525 08/1921 04/11/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 1526 09/1921 20/06/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1527 09/1921 21/06/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1327 10/1921 16/12/1959
NER H1 4-4-4T 1329 11/1921 01/10/1958
NER J27 0-6-0 2338   11/1921 01/07/1967
NER H1 4-4-4T 1330 12/1921 30/05/1960
NER H1 4-4-4T 1521 12/1921 13/01/1958
NER J27 0-6-0 2339   12/1921 22/05/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 2340   12/1921 04/10/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 2341   12/1921 06/08/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 2342   12/1921 23/12/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2343   12/1921 05/02/1967
  EE1 2-Co-2 13   1922 21/08/1950
NER H1 4-4-4T 1328 02/1922 16/09/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 1326 02/1922 05/11/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 1500 03/1922 20/11/1958
NER J27 0-6-0 2346   03/1922 29/05/1961
NER J27 0-6-0 2344   03/1922 18/06/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 2345   03/1922 06/06/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 2347   04/1922 14/02/1967
NER H1 4-4-4T 1522 05/1922 19/11/1958
NER H1 4-4-4T 1530 05/1922 23/06/1960
NER J27 0-6-0 2348   05/1922 12/10/1964
NER J27 0-6-0 2349   05/1922 14/01/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2350   05/1922 31/01/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 2351   06/1922 30/10/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 2352   06/1922 07/08/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 2353   06/1922 25/03/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2354   06/1922 16/03/1964
NER J27 0-6-0 2355   06/1922 29/10/1962
NER J27 0-6-0 2356   06/1922 12/10/1964
NER J27 0-6-0 2357   06/1922 09/09/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 2358   08/1922 12/06/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 2359   08/1922 04/02/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2360   08/1922 09/09/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 2361   09/1922 01/04/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2362   10/1922 09/12/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 2363 11/1922 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 2364 11/1922 21/07/1964
NER A2 4-6-2 2400 12/1922 13/04/1937
NER B16 4-6-0 2365 12/1922 25/09/1961
NER A2 4-6-2 2401 30/12/1922 03/07/1936
NER B16 4-6-0 2366 04/01/1923 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 2367 17/01/1923 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 2368 19/02/1923 20/08/1962
NER B16 4-6-0 2369 08/03/1923 15/08/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 2370 12/03/1923 27/10/1959
NER B16 4-6-0 2371 28/03/1923 01/02/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 2372 17/04/1923 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 2373 04/05/1923 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 2374 19/05/1923 04/07/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 2375 23/05/1923 17/01/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 2376 29/05/1923 25/09/1961
NER J27 0-6-0 2383   06/1923 07/06/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 2384   06/1923 24/08/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 2385   06/1923 06/05/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2386   06/1923 09/12/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2387   06/1923 10/02/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 2377 06/06/1923 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 2378 29/06/1923 03/07/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 2379 30/06/1923 25/09/1961
NER J27 0-6-0 2388   07/1923 06/05/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2389   07/1923 23/12/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 2380 31/07/1923 25/09/1961
NER J27 0-6-0 2390   08/1923 07/08/1967
NER B16 4-6-0 2381 16/08/1923 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 2382 31/08/1923 17/06/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 2391   09/1923 31/07/1966
NER J27 0-6-0 2392   09/1923 09/09/1967
NER B16 4-6-0 1371 29/09/1923 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 1372 19/10/1923 09/09/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 1373 19/10/1923 01/08/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 1374 23/10/1923 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 1375 30/10/1923 02/11/1959
NER B16 4-6-0 1376 31/10/1923 25/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 1377 10/11/1923 15/09/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 1378 15/11/1923 16/09/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 1379 21/11/1923 29/05/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 1380 29/11/1923 29/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 1381 04/12/1923 16/09/1963
NER B16 4-6-0 1382 13/12/1923 25/01/1960
NER B16 4-6-0 1383 20/12/1923 24/07/1961
NER B16 4-6-0 1384 01/01/1924 08/06/1964
NER B16 4-6-0 1385 01/01/1924 16/09/1963
NER A2 4-6-2 2402 11/03/1924 25/07/1936
NER Q7 0-8-0 625 18/03/1924 03/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 624 19/03/1924 03/12/1962
NER A2 4-6-2 2403 24/03/1924 21/05/1937
NER A2 4-6-2 2404 25/03/1924 06/02/1937
NER Q7 0-8-0 626 01/04/1924 26/11/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 628 03/04/1924 26/11/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 629 08/04/1924 03/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 630 16/04/1924 03/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 632 30/04/1924 03/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 631 03/05/1924 17/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 633 03/05/1924 17/12/1962
NER Q7 0-8-0 634 08/05/1924 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 17   08/1924 15/08/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 28   08/1924 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 32   08/1924 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 33   09/1924 09/04/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 36   09/1924 27/12/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 38   10/1924 11/07/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 39   10/1924 31/05/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 46   10/1924 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 52   10/1924 05/03/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 53   10/1924 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 58   10/1924 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 69   10/1924 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 73   10/1924 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 75   11/1924 29/12/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 80   11/1924 05/07/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 91   11/1924 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 92   11/1924 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 109   11/1924 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 111   11/1924 20/03/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 112   12/1924 28/02/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 113   12/1924 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 114   12/1924 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 116   12/1924 03/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 118   12/1924 20/09/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 120   12/1924 15/05/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 121   01/1925 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 125   01/1925 08/02/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 126   01/1925 27/04/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 127   01/1925 21/03/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 134   01/1925 09/01/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 135   02/1925 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 140   02/1925 31/03/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 141   02/1925 21/08/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 143   02/1925 03/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 146   02/1925 05/06/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 153   02/1925 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 156   02/1925 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 158   02/1925 10/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 159   03/1925 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 163   03/1925 17/04/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 167   03/1925 30/06/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 170   03/1925 25/11/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 178   03/1925 18/07/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 180   03/1925 18/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 184   03/1925 29/10/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 186   03/1925 06/07/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 188   03/1925 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 191   04/1925 03/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 195   04/1925 26/04/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 200   04/1925 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 204   08/1925 16/01/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 203   08/1925 16/11/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 202   08/1925 12/01/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 206   09/1925 06/06/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 207   09/1925 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 208   09/1925 06/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 227   10/1925 19/10/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 228   10/1925 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 229   10/1925 10/05/1962
NER T1 4-8-0T 1656   11/1925 01/10/1958
NER T1 4-8-0T 1657   11/1925 21/02/1955
NER T1 4-8-0T 1658   11/1925 12/01/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 231   12/1925 03/12/1962
NER T1 4-8-0T 1659   12/1925 12/06/1961
NER T1 4-8-0T 1660   12/1925 22/10/1956
LNER J38 0-6-0 1400   28/01/1926 25/11/1963
LNER J38 0-6-0 1403   28/01/1926 28/12/1963
LNER J38 0-6-0 1401   29/01/1926 22/04/1967
LNER J38 0-6-0 1405   29/01/1926 23/07/1964
LNER J38 0-6-0 1404   30/01/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1406   30/01/1926 25/05/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1407   13/02/1926 06/08/1965
LNER J38 0-6-0 1410   15/02/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1409   24/02/1926 17/09/1964
LNER J38 0-6-0 1414   02/03/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1415   02/03/1926 06/08/1964
LNER J38 0-6-0 1408   03/03/1926 22/08/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1411   03/03/1926 14/07/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1413   03/03/1926 01/03/1967
LNER J38 0-6-0 1419   13/03/1926 30/10/1965
LNER J38 0-6-0 1416   18/03/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1420   18/03/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1421   18/03/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1422   19/03/1926 20/08/1964
LNER J38 0-6-0 1423   19/03/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1417   20/03/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1424   25/03/1926 19/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1426   26/03/1926 19/10/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1427   30/03/1926 29/12/1962
LNER J38 0-6-0 1444   04/1926 02/09/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1428   01/04/1926 29/06/1964
LNER J38 0-6-0 1434   07/04/1926 21/11/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1437   14/04/1926 26/02/1965
LNER J38 0-6-0 1441   15/04/1926 29/12/1962
LNER J38 0-6-0 1442   15/04/1926 22/04/1967
LNER J38 0-6-0 1440   15/04/1926 30/12/1964
LNER J38 0-6-0 1443   03/05/1926 02/09/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1445   17/05/1926 03/03/1966
LNER J38 0-6-0 1446   25/05/1926 17/04/1965
LNER J38 0-6-0 1447   28/05/1926 31/12/1966
LNER J39 0-6-0 1448 28/09/1926 17/04/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1449 05/10/1926 16/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1450 14/10/1926 28/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1451 15/10/1926 29/03/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1452 21/10/1926 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1454 21/10/1926 29/03/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1455 21/10/1926 29/03/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1456 28/10/1926 25/08/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1457 04/11/1926 18/08/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1458 09/11/1926 23/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1459 12/11/1926 17/04/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1481 17/11/1926 23/05/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1484 30/11/1926 04/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1492 02/12/1926 18/04/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1493 03/12/1926 22/05/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1494 10/12/1926 06/05/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1495 14/12/1926 05/04/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1270 11/03/1927 02/08/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1496 12/04/1927 10/02/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1497 14/04/1927 23/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1498 28/04/1927 08/09/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1233 03/05/1927 15/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1255 10/05/1927 15/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1263 10/05/1927 24/03/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1259 10/05/1927 08/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1265 13/05/1927 22/10/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1266 18/05/1927 22/11/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1267 20/05/1927 27/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1272 25/05/1927 22/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1273 28/05/1927 14/03/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1268 28/05/1927 16/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1269 30/05/1927 27/07/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1274 30/05/1927 25/08/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1277 08/06/1927 19/10/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1275 09/06/1927 18/05/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1281 10/06/1927 03/08/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1282 16/06/1927 10/07/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1286 23/06/1927 25/08/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1287 23/06/1927 26/10/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1289 30/06/1927 03/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1290 16/07/1927 15/09/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1295 16/07/1927 11/07/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1296 31/08/1927 21/07/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1298 02/09/1927 13/01/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 234   29/10/1927 08/10/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0     11/1927 12/11/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 251   26/11/1927 24/09/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 256   08/12/1927 24/06/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 264   14/12/1927 18/08/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 265   22/12/1927 30/11/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 266   28/12/1927 03/02/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 236   14/01/1928 06/10/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 270   20/01/1928 04/05/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 277   24/01/1928 01/01/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 245   07/02/1928 03/10/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 281   09/02/1928 01/05/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 246   20/02/1928 03/07/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 249   21/02/1928 09/09/1957
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 250   02/03/1928 26/08/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 306   06/03/1928 29/06/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 307   17/03/1928 28/04/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 309   26/03/1928 13/01/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 310   03/05/1928 24/04/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 311   05/05/1928 01/01/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 318   07/05/1928 06/10/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 320   23/05/1928 18/08/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 322   10/07/1928 20/10/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 327   11/07/1928 16/01/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2692 18/07/1928 11/11/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2691 20/07/1928 24/03/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2693 20/07/1928 20/02/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2694 01/08/1928 10/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2695 06/08/1928 01/07/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2696 08/08/1928 12/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2697 09/08/1928 13/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2698 14/08/1928 07/12/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2699 15/08/1928 01/06/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2700 17/08/1928 21/08/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2701 25/08/1928 12/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2702 27/08/1928 10/08/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 335   28/08/1928 17/12/1957
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 329   30/08/1928 10/11/1958
LNER J39 0-6-0 2703 31/08/1928 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2704 04/09/1928 26/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2705 07/09/1928 16/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2706 12/09/1928 15/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2707 17/09/1928 30/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2708 19/09/1928 06/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2709 28/09/1928 29/06/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2710 28/09/1928 29/06/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2711 09/10/1928 19/10/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2712 12/10/1928 17/08/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2713 22/11/1928 28/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2714 22/11/1928 13/01/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2715 26/11/1928 18/05/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2716 27/11/1928 21/01/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2717 29/11/1928 19/10/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2718 30/11/1928 01/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2719 04/12/1928 03/07/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2720 06/12/1928 25/08/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2753   20/02/1929 29/10/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 352   15/03/1929 18/12/1957
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2755   15/03/1929 11/12/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2756   21/03/1929 03/04/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2721 26/03/1929 15/03/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2757   28/03/1929 03/11/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2758   28/03/1929 24/04/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2754   08/04/1929 01/05/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2722 08/04/1929 26/08/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2723 10/04/1929 17/08/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2724 15/04/1929 04/01/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2725 22/04/1929 12/09/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2726 24/04/1929 20/09/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2727 30/04/1929 04/01/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2759   05/1929 04/03/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2728 10/05/1929 07/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2729 10/05/1929 15/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2730 17/05/1929 02/11/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2732 29/05/1929 12/06/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2731 30/05/1929 20/08/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 336   01/06/1929 16/01/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2733 06/06/1929 29/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2734 11/06/1929 01/06/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2735 14/06/1929 22/06/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 2760   20/06/1929 25/08/1958
LNER J39 0-6-0 2736 20/06/1929 11/07/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2737 26/06/1929 29/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2738 03/07/1929 26/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2739 03/07/1929 04/01/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2740 09/07/1929 26/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2741 12/07/1929 13/08/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2742 31/07/1929 29/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2770 28/08/1929 13/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2771 04/09/1929 28/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2772 11/09/1929 15/09/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2774 20/09/1929 21/01/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2773 30/09/1929 27/07/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2775 30/09/1929 26/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2776 07/10/1929 25/07/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2777 16/10/1929 28/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2778 18/10/1929 19/04/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2779 25/10/1929 05/10/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2780 04/11/1929 17/05/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2781 07/11/1929 05/04/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2782 12/11/1929 21/02/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2783 18/11/1929 27/01/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2784 26/11/1929 26/06/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2785 29/11/1929 30/03/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1418 11/12/1929 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1425 19/12/1929 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1466 03/01/1930 23/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1429 08/01/1930 12/08/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1470 13/01/1930 13/12/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1487 18/01/1930 29/03/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1489 30/01/1930 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1491 31/01/1930 12/09/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2786 13/02/1930 24/05/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2787 17/02/1930 16/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2788 24/02/1930 29/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2761   07/1930 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2762   07/1930 12/09/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 2763   07/1930 30/10/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 2764   07/1930 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2765   07/1930 30/10/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 2766   07/1930 18/07/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2767   08/1930 14/05/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2768   08/1930 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2769   08/1930 07/02/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2810   22/08/1930 11/01/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2811   22/08/1930 14/10/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2816   10/1930 07/09/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2817   10/1930 11/08/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2812   22/10/1930 29/09/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2813   22/10/1930 18/12/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2814   23/10/1930 08/06/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2815   29/10/1930 09/02/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2818   05/11/1930 23/01/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2819   08/11/1930 19/09/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2820   12/11/1930 25/01/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2821   21/11/1930 10/11/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2822   30/01/1931 27/09/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2823   03/02/1931 31/07/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2824   09/02/1931 16/03/1953
LNER B17 4-6-0 2825   16/02/1931 03/12/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2826   04/03/1931 11/01/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2827   18/03/1931 17/07/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2828   23/03/1931 15/09/1952
LNER B17 4-6-0 2829   08/04/1931 25/09/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2830   28/04/1931 19/08/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2831   01/05/1931 10/04/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2832   12/05/1931 02/02/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2833   28/05/1931 30/09/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2834   17/06/1931 04/08/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2835   02/07/1931 29/01/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2836   16/07/1931 21/10/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2963 16/09/1931 29/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2962 18/09/1931 05/01/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2964 29/09/1931 02/11/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2965 13/10/1931 08/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2967 29/10/1931 21/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2968 24/11/1931 18/05/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2966 09/12/1931 01/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2969 16/12/1931 08/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2970 24/12/1931 20/06/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2971 22/01/1932 28/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2972 29/01/1932 26/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2973 17/02/1932 20/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2974 19/02/1932 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2975 10/03/1932 25/04/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2976 15/03/1932 17/11/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 201   20/04/1932 19/06/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 220   03/05/1932 21/09/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 211   04/05/1932 01/01/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 232   17/05/1932 11/10/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2977 27/05/1932 26/01/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 235   02/06/1932 01/08/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2978 07/06/1932 09/10/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2979 15/06/1932 27/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2980 16/06/1932 06/10/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 247   14/07/1932 30/10/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 255   03/08/1932 12/11/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 269   23/08/1932 09/05/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1453 31/08/1932 18/04/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1469 06/10/1932 29/03/1962
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 273   12/10/1932 30/12/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1471 13/10/1932 03/12/1962
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 282   24/10/1932 16/03/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1480 09/11/1932 21/07/1961
LNER B17 4-6-0 2837   01/03/1933 24/09/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2838   02/03/1933 17/03/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2842   05/1933 15/09/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2839   11/05/1933 18/05/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2840   18/05/1933 15/11/1958
LNER J39 0-6-0 1483 19/05/1933 16/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1482 24/05/1933 16/11/1962
LNER B17 4-6-0 2841   25/05/1933 28/01/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 283   18/08/1933 16/05/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 288   21/08/1933 04/03/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 292   23/08/1933 17/12/1957
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 297   30/08/1933 02/07/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 298   01/09/1933 04/11/1958
LNER J39 0-6-0 1412 15/03/1934 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1468 17/03/1934 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1463 19/03/1934 16/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1467 22/03/1934 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1472 27/03/1934 03/12/1962
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 205   10/07/1934 13/03/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 214   14/07/1934 29/07/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 217   17/07/1934 22/09/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 222   20/07/1934 03/11/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 226   23/07/1934 12/11/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 230   10/08/1934 30/04/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 238   17/08/1934 10/12/1957
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 258   22/08/1934 11/12/1957
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 274   28/08/1934 13/01/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 279   03/09/1934 21/10/1959
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 353   12/09/1934 06/12/1957
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 357   22/09/1934 13/10/1960
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 359   28/09/1934 16/01/1961
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 361   02/10/1934 13/11/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 362   11/10/1934 16/01/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1475 19/10/1934 20/08/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1476 24/10/1934 15/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1477 29/10/1934 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1478 14/11/1934 29/03/1962
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 363   15/11/1934 30/09/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 364   19/11/1934 20/10/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 365   01/12/1934 03/11/1952
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 366   07/12/1934 12/09/1958
LNER J39 0-6-0 1479 07/12/1934 03/12/1962
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 368   12/12/1934 23/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1488 14/12/1934 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1490 20/12/1934 03/12/1962
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 370   15/01/1935 17/10/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 374   22/01/1935 24/09/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 375   26/01/1935 05/08/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 376   02/02/1935 13/11/1958
LNER Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 377   11/02/1935 04/12/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2843   03/05/1935 14/07/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2844   09/05/1935 25/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2941 07/06/1935 26/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2942 08/06/1935 18/05/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2943 13/06/1935 17/04/1961
LNER B17 4-6-0 2845   14/06/1935 26/02/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2944 19/06/1935 20/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2945 21/06/1935 28/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2946 28/06/1935 27/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2947 03/07/1935 18/02/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2948 05/07/1935 13/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2949 10/07/1935 20/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2950 11/07/1935 28/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2951 06/08/1935 11/04/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2952 07/08/1935 11/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2953 13/08/1935 24/03/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2981 21/08/1935 17/02/1961
LNER B17 4-6-0 2846   23/08/1935 09/01/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2982 30/08/1935 27/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2983 04/09/1935 20/01/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2847   10/09/1935 18/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2984 10/09/1935 27/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2985 13/09/1935 20/08/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2986 13/09/1935 21/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2987 18/09/1935 08/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2988 26/09/1935 12/05/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2989 01/10/1935 11/07/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2990 04/10/1935 19/10/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2991 09/10/1935 27/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2992 11/10/1935 27/08/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2993 17/10/1935 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2994 22/10/1935 19/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1436 31/10/1935 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1460 04/11/1935 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1464 08/11/1935 22/10/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1465 13/11/1935 31/01/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1473 15/11/1935 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1474 20/11/1935 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1485 26/11/1935 24/09/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1504 03/12/1935 18/04/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1486 05/12/1935 24/02/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1505 06/12/1935 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1506 13/12/1935 18/01/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1584 20/12/1935 15/10/1962
LNER B17 4-6-0 2848   03/03/1936 01/12/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2849   09/03/1936 10/02/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2850   09/03/1936 03/09/1958
LNER B17 4-6-0 2851   30/03/1936 14/08/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2852   02/04/1936 17/09/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2853   06/04/1936 25/01/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2854   17/04/1936 06/11/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2855   29/04/1936 09/04/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2856   06/05/1936 27/01/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2857   15/05/1936 03/06/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2858   28/05/1936 03/12/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2861   06/1936 23/07/1959
LNER B17 4-6-0 2859   11/06/1936 14/03/1960
LNER B17 4-6-0 2860   19/06/1936 02/06/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2996 05/08/1936 27/07/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 2995 06/08/1936 27/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 2997 12/08/1936 13/10/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 2998 14/08/1936 11/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 2999 19/08/1936 13/04/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 3000 21/08/1936 22/10/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 2470   10/1936 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2473   10/1936 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 2498   10/1936 20/03/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 2499   10/1936 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3813   11/1936 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3814   11/1936 02/07/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3815   11/1936 04/09/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 3816   11/1936 04/01/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3817   11/1936 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3818   11/1936 17/08/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 3819   12/1936 16/10/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 3820   12/1936 17/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3821   12/1936 04/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3822   12/1936 16/09/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3823   12/1936 10/07/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 3824   12/1936 02/11/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3825   01/1937 21/12/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3826   01/1937 28/05/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3827   01/1937 19/03/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3828   01/1937 16/11/1959
LNER K4 2-6-0 3441   01/1937 02/10/1961
GNR K3 2-6-0 3829   02/1937 19/06/1962
GNR K3 2-6-0 3830   02/1937 13/10/1960
GNR K3 2-6-0 3831   02/1937 07/05/1959
GNR K3 2-6-0 3832   02/1937 06/06/1960
LNER V2 2-6-2 4776 16/07/1937 23/12/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4777 06/08/1937 04/09/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4778 24/08/1937 19/11/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4780 31/08/1937 06/07/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4781 03/09/1937 21/11/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4779 09/09/1937 05/10/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4782 10/09/1937 23/04/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4783 18/09/1937 09/07/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4784 27/09/1937 26/09/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4785 08/10/1937 19/04/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4786 20/10/1937 05/05/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4787 26/10/1937 22/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4788 01/11/1937 16/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4789 08/11/1937 22/08/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4790 15/11/1937 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4791 23/11/1937 20/06/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4792 03/12/1937 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4793 09/12/1937 07/12/1964
LNER J39 0-6-0 1508 16/12/1937 12/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4794 21/12/1937 26/03/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4795 22/12/1937 26/09/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4796 06/01/1938 27/04/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4797 12/01/1938 12/04/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4798 18/01/1938 29/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1509 25/01/1938 17/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1535 11/02/1938 17/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1537 16/02/1938 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1538 18/02/1938 15/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1541 24/02/1938 16/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1542 02/03/1938 18/04/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1546 04/03/1938 17/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1548 09/03/1938 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1551 16/03/1938 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1804 25/03/1938 15/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4799 28/03/1938 04/10/1965
LNER J39 0-6-0 1808 31/03/1938 29/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1558 01/04/1938 17/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4800 01/04/1938 31/05/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1560 07/04/1938 12/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1835 08/04/1938 23/05/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1862 12/04/1938 11/04/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1863 13/04/1938 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4801 13/04/1938 16/06/1963
LNER J39 0-6-0 1896 21/04/1938 22/08/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1898 25/04/1938 14/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1903 29/04/1938 14/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1922 04/05/1938 14/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1926 06/05/1938 15/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1927 11/05/1938 21/07/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1928 14/05/1938 15/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1930 14/05/1938 14/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1940 30/05/1938 01/01/1960
LNER V2 2-6-2 4802 30/05/1938 06/12/1966
LNER J39 0-6-0 1933 31/05/1938 14/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1942 03/06/1938 01/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1943 09/06/1938 21/10/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1952 15/06/1938 16/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1965 17/06/1938 29/01/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1971 28/06/1938 24/04/1961
LNER K4 2-6-0 3442   07/1938 18/12/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1974 02/07/1938 14/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1977 08/07/1938 11/07/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1980 20/07/1938 15/02/1960
LNER V2 2-6-2 4803 22/07/1938 29/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1984 28/07/1938 16/03/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 1996 09/08/1938 30/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1997 24/08/1938 24/05/1961
LNER V2 2-6-2 4804 31/08/1938 25/05/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4805 09/09/1938 19/03/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4806 23/09/1938 19/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4807 23/09/1938 31/12/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4808 05/10/1938 16/11/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4809 11/10/1938 23/01/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4810 19/10/1938 22/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4811 28/10/1938 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4812 18/11/1938 22/09/1963
LNER K4 2-6-0 3443   12/1938 02/10/1961
LNER K4 2-6-0 3444   12/1938 02/10/1961
LNER V2 2-6-2 4813 09/12/1938 22/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4814 30/12/1938 04/10/1965
LNER K4 2-6-0 3445   01/1939 12/06/1961
LNER K4 2-6-0 3446   01/1939 02/10/1961
LNER V2 2-6-2 4815 03/02/1939 08/11/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4817 17/02/1939 19/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4816 22/02/1939 23/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4819 03/03/1939 16/07/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4818 06/03/1939 29/06/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4820 10/03/1939 12/04/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4821 17/03/1939 26/02/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4822 24/03/1939 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4823 31/03/1939 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4824 11/04/1939 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4825 19/04/1939 16/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4826 21/04/1939 13/04/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4827 02/05/1939 25/05/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4828 10/05/1939 17/04/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4829 16/05/1939 06/10/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4830 18/05/1939 20/09/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4831 26/05/1939 22/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4832 06/06/1939 12/08/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4833 13/06/1939 16/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4834 19/06/1939 28/04/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4835 26/06/1939 16/03/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4836 29/06/1939 14/06/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4837 06/07/1939 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4838 20/07/1939 01/05/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4839 31/07/1939 26/09/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4840 10/08/1939 16/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4841 12/08/1939 16/07/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4842 01/09/1939 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4853 07/10/1939 13/07/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4854 20/10/1939 24/02/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4855 27/10/1939 06/09/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4856 10/11/1939 06/09/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4857 18/11/1939 10/04/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4858 30/11/1939 06/07/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4859 07/12/1939 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4860 17/12/1939 11/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4861 28/12/1939 05/05/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4862 29/12/1939 12/10/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4863 11/01/1940 21/11/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4864 20/01/1940 23/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4865 20/01/1940 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4866 26/01/1940 04/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4867 03/02/1940 23/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4868 10/02/1940 11/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4869 22/02/1940 28/11/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4870 23/02/1940 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4871 02/03/1940 11/04/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4872 09/03/1940 14/06/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4873 15/03/1940 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4874 20/03/1940 10/02/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4875 03/04/1940 09/07/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4876 10/04/1940 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4877 17/04/1940 28/05/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4878 19/04/1940 28/05/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4879 29/04/1940 04/06/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4880 04/05/1940 08/06/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4881 10/05/1940 15/04/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4882 15/05/1940 03/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4883 24/05/1940 29/04/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4884 06/06/1940 12/10/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4885 14/06/1940 23/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4886 15/06/1940 26/11/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4887 24/07/1940 26/06/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4888 10/08/1940 13/04/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 3081 07/02/1941 25/06/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 3082 14/02/1941 11/12/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 3083 28/02/1941 13/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 3084 04/03/1941 31/08/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 3085 17/03/1941 29/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 3086 22/03/1941 25/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 3087 05/04/1941 04/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 3088 24/04/1941 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 3089 03/05/1941 05/01/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 3090 03/05/1941 30/12/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 3091 13/05/1941 05/02/1960
LNER J39 0-6-0 3092 21/05/1941 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 3093 05/06/1941 10/11/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 3094 18/06/1941 31/12/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 3095 03/07/1941 31/12/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 3096 18/07/1941 29/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 3097 08/08/1941 15/03/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 3098 21/08/1941 30/12/1959
LNER V2 2-6-2 4889 28/08/1941 08/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4890 07/09/1941 02/09/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 4891 04/10/1941 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4892 16/10/1941 11/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4893 31/10/1941 09/07/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4894 15/11/1941 04/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 4895 22/11/1941 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 4896 04/12/1941 25/05/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 4897 17/12/1941 01/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4898 20/12/1941 03/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 4899 29/01/1942 01/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3641 12/02/1942 12/10/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3642 21/02/1942 11/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3643 04/03/1942 06/07/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3644 13/03/1942 25/05/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3645 26/03/1942 23/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3646 17/04/1942 20/09/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3647 15/05/1942 06/07/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3648 21/05/1942 11/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3649 03/06/1942 01/10/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3650 11/06/1942 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3651 18/06/1942 26/11/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3652 26/06/1942 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3653 07/07/1942 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3654 18/07/1942 11/10/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3665 26/08/1942 28/05/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3666 05/09/1942 18/11/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3667 22/09/1942 26/09/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 3668 30/09/1942 23/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3669 07/10/1942 17/12/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3670 15/10/1942 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3671 02/11/1942 01/07/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3672 11/11/1942 26/02/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3673 02/12/1942 05/04/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 8301 12/12/1942 05/03/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3674 23/12/1942 20/09/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3675 1903 12/01/1943 29/06/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3676 1904 26/01/1943 08/05/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3677 1905 25/02/1943 29/12/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3678 1906 15/03/1943 11/06/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3679 1907 26/03/1943 10/02/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3680 1908 15/04/1943 20/05/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3685 1914 27/04/1943 24/01/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 3681 1909 29/04/1943 18/05/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3682 1910 12/05/1943 07/02/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 3683 1911 02/06/1943 29/12/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 8302 1912 12/06/1943 22/09/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3684 1913 01/07/1943 28/11/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3686 1915 19/08/1943 09/12/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3687 1917 20/09/1943 25/05/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 8303 1916 21/09/1943 24/06/1967
LNER V2 2-6-2 3688 1918 07/10/1943 26/09/1966
LNER V2 2-6-2 3689 1919 27/10/1943 26/02/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 8304 1920 22/11/1943 26/12/1965
LNER V2 2-6-2 3690 1921 09/12/1943 19/11/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 8305 1922 22/12/1943 28/12/1963
LNER V2 2-6-2 3691 1923 20/01/1944 01/10/1962
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8500   02/1944 18/12/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 8306 1925 19/02/1944 16/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3692 1926 10/03/1944 29/12/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 8307 1927 17/03/1944 22/09/1963
LNER B1 4-6-0 8308 1928 14/04/1944 06/02/1964
LNER V2 2-6-2 3693 1929 20/04/1944 15/04/1963
LNER A2 4-6-2 3696 1930 13/05/1944 12/12/1960
LNER B1 4-6-0 8309 1931 13/05/1944 09/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8501   06/1944 15/07/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 8310 1934 19/06/1944 16/09/1962
LNER V2 2-6-2 3694 1934 21/06/1944 05/10/1964
LNER A2 4-6-2 3697 1933 30/06/1944 20/02/1961
LNER V2 2-6-2 3695 1936 13/07/1944 23/09/1962
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8502   08/1944 26/11/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8503   09/1944 02/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8504   09/1944 22/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8505   09/1944 21/10/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8506   10/1944 30/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8507   10/1944 09/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8508   10/1944 19/01/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8509   11/1944 13/05/1967
LNER A2 4-6-2 3698 1944 15/11/1944 15/08/1960
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8540   12/1944 04/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8541 1947 12/1944 18/06/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8542   12/1944 24/06/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8543   01/1945 12/02/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8544   01/1945 02/03/1968
LNER A2 4-6-2 3699 1950 13/01/1945 21/11/1960
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8545   02/1945 18/02/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8546 1953 02/1945 06/07/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8547   03/1945 18/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8548   03/1945 15/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8549   03/1945 25/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8550   04/1945 30/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8551   04/1945 04/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8552   05/1945 29/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8553   05/1945 16/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8554   06/1945 06/08/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8555   06/1945 29/01/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8556   07/1945 19/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8557   07/1945 08/07/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8558   08/1945 09/10/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8559   08/1945 06/01/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3125 1967 09/1945 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3126 1968 09/1945 26/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3127 1969 10/1945 26/10/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3128 1970 10/1945 29/05/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0   1971 10/1945 03/10/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3130 1972 11/1945 14/10/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3131 1973 11/1945 13/08/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3132 1974 11/1945 13/06/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3133 1975 12/1945 31/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3134 1976 12/1945 21/01/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3135 1977 01/1946 09/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3136 1978 02/1946 28/10/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3137 1979 03/1946 02/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3138 1980 03/1946 25/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3140 1982 04/1946 04/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0   1981 05/1946 16/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3141 1983 05/1946 25/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3142 1984 05/1946 03/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3143 1985 06/1946 30/04/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3144 1986 08/1946 30/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3145 1987 08/1946 20/01/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3146 1988 09/1946 25/02/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 3147 1989 10/1946 03/08/1968
LNER B1 4-6-0 1010 1990 02/11/1946 07/11/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 1011 1991 30/11/1946 02/11/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1012 1992 30/11/1946 12/06/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 1013 1993 14/12/1946 06/12/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1014 1994 23/12/1946 31/12/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1015 1995 04/01/1947 19/11/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1016 1996 16/01/1947 31/10/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 1017 1997 28/01/1947 15/11/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1018 1998 04/02/1947 07/11/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 1019 1999 24/02/1947 12/03/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 1020 2000 28/02/1947 26/11/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1021 2001 12/03/1947 06/06/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 1022 2002 22/03/1947 25/11/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1023 2003 01/04/1947 31/10/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 1024 2004 12/04/1947 15/05/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1025 2005 22/04/1947 02/12/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1026 2006 28/04/1947 10/02/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1027 2007 11/05/1947 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1028 2008 30/05/1947 08/10/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1029 2009 07/06/1947 31/12/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1030 2010 26/06/1947 30/09/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 1031 2011 10/07/1947 09/11/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 1032 2012 07/08/1947 27/11/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1033 2013 29/08/1947 25/03/1963
LNER B1 4-6-0 1034 2014 03/10/1947 21/12/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 1035 2015 31/10/1947 12/12/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 1036 2016 20/11/1947 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 1037 2017 28/11/1947 18/05/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 1038 2018 05/12/1947 01/05/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 1039 2019 12/12/1947 27/06/1965
LNER L1 2-6-4T 9001 2020 22/01/1948 31/10/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T 9002 2021 23/01/1948 16/09/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 9003 2022 06/02/1948 28/11/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9005 2024 18/02/1948 04/12/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9004 2023 19/02/1948 04/12/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9006 2025 27/02/1948 01/07/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9007 2026 03/03/1948 04/12/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9008 2027 08/03/1948 04/12/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9009 2028 18/03/1948 13/10/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9010 2029 19/03/1948 04/12/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9011 2030 25/03/1948 04/10/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T E9012 2031 01/04/1948 05/10/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 69013 2032 09/04/1948 04/12/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T 69014 2033 09/04/1948 28/02/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 69015 2034 16/04/1948 16/09/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67717 2035 30/04/1948 07/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67718 2036 07/05/1948 18/11/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67719 2037 13/05/1948 01/07/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67720 2038 14/05/1948 12/02/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67721 2039 25/05/1948 26/11/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67722 2040 04/06/1948 05/10/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67723 2041 04/06/1948 16/09/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67724 2042 11/06/1948 16/09/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67725 2043 12/06/1948 04/12/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67726 2044 02/07/1948 28/11/1960
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67727 2045 08/07/1948 13/01/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67728 2046 09/07/1948 25/09/1961
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67729 2047 16/07/1948 16/09/1962
LNER L1 2-6-4T 67730 2048 06/08/1948 30/08/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60130 2049 28/09/1948 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60131 2050 05/10/1948 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60132 2051 18/10/1948 14/06/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60133 2052 30/10/1948 21/06/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60134 2053 05/11/1948 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60135 2054 18/11/1948 12/11/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60136 2055 26/11/1948 22/05/1963
LNER A1 4-6-2 60137 2056 03/12/1948 29/10/1962
LNER A1 4-6-2 60138 2057 10/12/1948 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60139 2058 23/12/1948 07/06/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60140 2059 24/12/1948 11/01/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60141 2060 31/12/1948 05/10/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60142 2061 02/02/1949 14/06/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60143 2062 22/02/1949 06/05/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60144 2063 02/03/1949 30/04/1963
LNER A1 4-6-2 60145 2064 23/03/1949 19/06/1966
LNER A1 4-6-2 60146 2065 11/04/1949 04/10/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60147 2066 13/04/1949 28/08/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60148 2067 25/05/1949 21/06/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60149 2068 31/05/1949 07/06/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60150 2069 15/06/1949 05/10/1964
LNER A1 4-6-2 60151 2070 30/06/1949 24/11/1965
LNER A1 4-6-2 60152 2071 08/07/1949 21/06/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 61350 2072 28/07/1949 19/11/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 61351 2073 16/08/1949 13/07/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 61352 2074 25/08/1949 22/10/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 61353 2075 06/09/1949 16/08/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 61354 2076 14/09/1949 22/04/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 61355 2077 21/09/1949 08/06/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 61356 2078 28/09/1949 23/07/1964
NER J72 0-6-0T 69001 2082 10/1949 23/09/1963
LNER B1 4-6-0 61357 2079 10/10/1949 08/06/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 61358 2080 18/10/1949 25/12/1963
LNER B1 4-6-0 61359 2081 26/10/1949 28/12/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69002 2083 11/1949 01/10/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69003 2084 11/1949 28/12/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69004 2085 11/1949 23/09/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69005 2086 11/1949 10/1964
NER J72 0-6-0T 69006 2087 11/1949 09/12/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69007 2088 11/1949 01/10/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69008 2089 12/1949 09/12/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69009 2090 12/1949 18/09/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69010 2091 12/1949 01/10/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69011 2092 12/1949 09/12/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69012 2093 12/1949 21/02/1961
NER J72 0-6-0T 69013 2094 12/1949 22/01/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69014 2095 12/1949 19/02/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69015 2096 12/1949 14/09/1961
LNER B1 4-6-0 61400 2102 30/03/1950 17/12/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 61401 2103 12/04/1950 17/04/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 61402 2104 27/04/1950 08/06/1964
LNER B1 4-6-0 61403 2105 27/04/1950 14/07/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 61404 2106 04/05/1950 09/11/1965
LNER B1 4-6-0 61405 2107 10/05/1950 16/09/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 61406 2108 20/05/1950 17/04/1966
LNER B1 4-6-0 61407 2109 10/06/1950 22/04/1967
LNER B1 4-6-0 61408 2110 13/06/1950 29/12/1962
LNER B1 4-6-0 61409 2111 15/06/1950 22/09/1963
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43070   31/08/1950 09/09/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43071   31/08/1950 06/03/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43072   06/09/1950 11/11/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43073   13/09/1950 19/08/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43074   20/09/1950 26/06/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43075   27/09/1950 29/04/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43076   04/10/1950 09/09/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43077   11/10/1950 05/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43078   19/10/1950 05/12/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43079   20/10/1950 12/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43080   26/10/1950 20/06/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43081   27/10/1950 03/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43082   03/11/1950 14/11/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43083   11/11/1950 28/12/1963
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43084   15/11/1950 09/09/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43085   21/11/1950 10/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43086   24/11/1950 26/12/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43087   29/11/1950 26/12/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43088   01/12/1950 23/12/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43089   08/12/1950 14/11/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43090   09/12/1950 11/04/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43091   13/12/1950 06/06/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43092   16/12/1950 11/04/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43093   20/12/1950 17/01/1965
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43094   22/12/1950 05/01/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43095   23/12/1950 26/11/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43096   30/12/1950 03/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43097   01/1951 03/01/1967
NER J72 0-6-0T 69016 01/1951 26/10/1964
NER J72 0-6-0T 69017 01/1951 30/04/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69018 01/1951 08/10/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69019 01/1951 09/12/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69020 01/1951 28/12/1963
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43098   31/01/1951 06/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43099   31/01/1951 07/12/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43100   28/02/1951 05/02/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43101   28/02/1951 04/1967
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43102   02/03/1951 07/12/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43103   09/03/1951 19/11/1966
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43104   16/03/1951 05/01/1964
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43105   30/03/1951 27/05/1967
NER J72 0-6-0T 69021 2149 04/1951 30/09/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69022 2150 04/1951 31/12/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69023 2151 04/1951 10/1964
NER J72 0-6-0T 69024 2152 04/1951 23/09/1963
NER J72 0-6-0T 69025 2153 04/1951 28/12/1963
LMS 4MT 2-6-0 43106   10/04/1951 22/06/1968
NER J72 0-6-0T 69026 2154 05/1951 30/04/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69027 2155 05/1951 22/10/1962
NER J72 0-6-0T 69028 2156 05/1951 26/10/1964
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46465 2157 06/1951 04/03/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46466 2158 06/1951 09/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46467 2159 06/1951 23/07/1964
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46468 2160 07/1951 18/10/1965
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46469 2161 07/1951 09/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46470 2162 07/1951 06/05/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46471 2163 07/1951 18/10/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46472 2164 07/1951 16/01/1965
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46473 2165 08/1951 16/12/1963
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46474 2166 08/1951 23/07/1964
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46475 2167 08/1951 30/07/1964
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46476 2168 09/1951 29/01/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46477 2169 09/1951 17/12/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46478 2170 09/1951 30/04/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46479 2171 09/1951 26/07/1965
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46480 2172 09/1951 06/05/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46481 2173 10/1951 14/12/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46482 2174 10/1951 28/08/1965
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46483 2175 10/1951 18/11/1963
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46484 2176 10/1951 06/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46485 2177 11/1951 06/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46486 2178 11/1951 06/05/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46487 2179 11/1951 06/05/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46488 2180 11/1951 12/06/1965
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46489 2181 11/1951 16/11/1963
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46490 2182 11/1951 06/05/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46491 2183 12/1951 06/05/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46492 2184 12/1951 06/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46493 2185 12/1951 18/10/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46494 2186 12/1951 12/09/1962
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46495 2187 01/1952 08/10/1966
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46496 2188 02/1952 02/04/1966
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46497 2189 02/1952 24/04/1965
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46498 2190 02/1952 20/09/1965
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46499 2191 03/1952 06/05/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46500 2192 03/1952 07/01/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46501 2193 03/1952 06/05/1967
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 46502 2194 03/1952 25/02/1967
  11 0-6-0 12103   22/03/1952 21/11/1971
  11 0-6-0 12104   19/04/1952 07/05/1967
  11 0-6-0 12105   19/04/1952 14/01/1971
  11 0-6-0 12106   17/05/1952 30/07/1970
  11 0-6-0 12107   17/05/1952 30/12/1967
  11 0-6-0 12108   17/05/1952 01/12/1971
  11 0-6-0 12109   04/06/1952 19/11/1972
  11 0-6-0 12110   04/06/1952 19/11/1972
  11 0-6-0 12111   19/07/1952 09/05/1971
  11 0-6-0 12112   19/07/1952 31/10/1969
  11 0-6-0 12113   19/07/1952 14/03/1971
  11 0-6-0 12114   19/07/1952 05/10/1970
  11 0-6-0 12115   23/08/1952 05/10/1970
  11 0-6-0 12116   20/09/1952 30/09/1969
  11 0-6-0 12117   20/09/1952 28/02/1969
  11 0-6-0 12118   20/09/1952 25/04/1971
  11 0-6-0 12119   20/09/1952 18/11/1968
  11 0-6-0 12120   20/09/1952 28/12/1968
  11 0-6-0 12121   18/10/1952 04/07/1971
  11 0-6-0 12122   18/10/1952 04/07/1971
  11 0-6-0 12123   18/10/1952 25/06/1967
  11 0-6-0 12124   18/10/1952 19/11/1968
  11 0-6-0 12125   18/10/1952 28/06/1969
  11 0-6-0 12126   15/11/1952 25/11/1968
  11 0-6-0 12127   15/11/1952 22/10/1972
  11 0-6-0 12128   15/11/1952 30/07/1970
  11 0-6-0 12129   15/11/1952 24/09/1967
  11 0-6-0 12130   15/11/1952 16/07/1972
  11 0-6-0 12131   15/11/1952 16/04/1969
  11 0-6-0 12132   15/11/1952 25/06/1972
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78000   12/12/1952 26/06/1965
  11 0-6-0 12133   13/12/1952 01/02/1969
  11 0-6-0 12134   13/12/1952 19/11/1972
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78001   23/12/1952 31/12/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78002   24/12/1952 11/06/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78003   31/12/1952 17/12/1966
  11 0-6-0 12135   17/01/1953 28/06/1969
  11 0-6-0 12136   17/01/1953 30/12/1971
  11 0-6-0 12137   17/01/1953 18/11/1968
  11 0-6-0 12138   17/01/1953 18/11/1968
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78004   21/01/1953 18/11/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78005   24/02/1953 28/09/1964
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78008   03/1953 22/10/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78006   06/03/1953 31/12/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78007   13/03/1953 06/05/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78009   04/1953 07/02/1964
  08 0-6-0 13060   22/08/1953 28/10/1979
  08 0-6-0 13061   22/08/1953 12/12/1977
  08 0-6-0 13064   09/09/1953 11/07/1982
  08 0-6-0 13062   10/09/1953 17/05/1981
  08 0-6-0 13063   24/10/1953 25/10/1981
  08 0-6-0 13065   24/10/1953 25/01/1981
  08 0-6-0 13066   24/10/1953 01/03/1981
  08 0-6-0 13067   21/11/1953 16/02/1980
  08 0-6-0 13068   21/11/1953 02/11/1980
  08 0-6-0 13069   21/11/1953 07/01/1973
  08 0-6-0 13070   21/11/1953 03/08/1986
  08 0-6-0 13071   21/11/1953 28/07/1976
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78010   12/1953 10/09/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78011   12/1953 18/09/1965
  08 0-6-0 13072   19/12/1953 04/04/1982
  08 0-6-0 13073   19/12/1953 21/09/1980
  08 0-6-0 13074   19/12/1953 24/06/1984
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78012   01/1954 06/05/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78013   01/1954 06/05/1967
  08 0-6-0 13075   23/01/1954 06/05/1984
  08 0-6-0 13076   23/01/1954 30/09/1984
  08 0-6-0 13077   23/01/1954 08/07/1984
  08 0-6-0 13078   23/01/1954 30/11/1972
  08 0-6-0 13079   23/01/1954 23/12/1984
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78014   02/1954 18/09/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78015   02/1954 25/11/1963
  08 0-6-0 13080   20/02/1954 04/09/1977
  08 0-6-0 13081   20/02/1954 04/09/1977
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78016   03/1954 17/08/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78017   03/1954 10/12/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78018   03/1954 12/11/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78019   03/1954 12/11/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78020   04/1954 06/05/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78021   05/1954 06/05/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78022   05/1954 17/09/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78023   05/1954 06/05/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78024   05/1954 20/02/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78025   06/1954 13/02/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78026   06/1954 24/08/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78027   06/1954 18/09/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78028   07/1954 11/02/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78029   07/1954 02/10/1965
  08 0-6-0 13127   24/07/1954 30/11/1978
  08 0-6-0 13128   31/08/1954 26/07/1981
  08 0-6-0 13129   31/08/1954 19/06/1983
  08 0-6-0 13130   31/08/1954 27/02/1983
  08 0-6-0 13131   31/08/1954 09/09/1984
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78030   09/1954 09/10/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78031   09/1954 08/10/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78032   09/1954 02/10/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78033   09/1954 02/10/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78034   10/1954 08/01/1966
  08 0-6-0 13132   30/10/1954 11/03/1981
  08 0-6-0 13133   30/10/1954 30/11/1980
  08 0-6-0 13134   30/10/1954 12/09/1982
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78035   06/11/1954 12/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78036   13/11/1954 03/12/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78037   13/11/1954 06/05/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78038   20/11/1954 20/08/1966
  08 0-6-0 13135   27/11/1954 19/12/1982
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78039   27/11/1954 01/10/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78044   12/1954 06/05/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78040   11/12/1954 22/01/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78041   18/12/1954 06/05/1967
  08 0-6-0 13136   25/12/1954 17/07/1983
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78042   25/12/1954 18/09/1965
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78043   25/12/1954 02/10/1965
  D3/5 0-6-0 13152   02/02/1955 30/09/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13153   07/02/1955 15/07/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13154   17/02/1955 15/07/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13155   17/02/1955 17/09/1967
  10 0-6-0 13137   02/03/1955 02/07/1970
  D3/5 0-6-0 13156   02/03/1955 15/07/1967
  10 0-6-0 13138   05/03/1955 23/04/1972
  10 0-6-0 13139   12/03/1955 10/06/1968
  D3/5 0-6-0 13157   18/03/1955 30/09/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13158   25/03/1955 19/02/1967
  08 0-6-0 13217   02/04/1955 05/04/1981
  08 0-6-0 13218   09/04/1955 14/10/1984
  08 0-6-0 13219   16/04/1955 02/01/1979
  08 0-6-0 13220   22/04/1955 18/07/1980
  08 0-6-0 13221   22/04/1955 19/12/1982
  10 0-6-0 13140   29/04/1955 10/06/1968
  10 0-6-0 13141   04/05/1955 05/07/1971
  10 0-6-0 13142   08/06/1955 26/06/1968
  10 0-6-0 13143   08/06/1955 08/1969
  08 0-6-0 13222   08/06/1955 13/10/1979
  10 0-6-0 13144   21/06/1955 07/1969
  10 0-6-0 13145   22/06/1955 23/04/1972
  08 0-6-0 13224   25/06/1955 02/01/1979
  08 0-6-0 13223   02/07/1955 02/01/1979
  08 0-6-0 13225   02/07/1955 09/04/1977
  08 0-6-0 13226   02/07/1955 02/01/1979
  10 0-6-0 13146   07/07/1955 12/02/1968
  10 0-6-0 13147   12/07/1955 06/05/1968
  10 0-6-0 13148   15/07/1955 05/03/1968
  10 0-6-0 13149   21/07/1955 02/07/1970
  10 0-6-0 13150   28/07/1955 10/06/1968
  10 0-6-0 13151   08/08/1955 04/12/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13159   12/08/1955 17/09/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13160   16/08/1955 14/10/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13161   07/09/1955 17/09/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13162   16/09/1955 18/11/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13163   20/09/1955 17/09/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13164   27/09/1955 18/11/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13165   06/10/1955 08/07/1967
  D3/5 0-6-0 13166   12/10/1955 15/07/1967
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78045   12/10/1955 03/01/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78046   20/10/1955 19/11/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78047   25/10/1955 02/09/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78048   28/10/1955 13/07/1964
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78049   11/1955 22/08/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78050   11/1955 03/01/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78051   11/1955 29/11/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78052   11/1955 03/01/1966
BR Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78053   11/1955 30/07/1964
BR