Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 176 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 176 Week
» 11469 Month
» 276102 Year
» 1497667 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Beyer Peacock Ltd.


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
MR 690 0-4-4T 690 869 06/1869 06/1928
MR 690 0-4-4T 691 870 06/1869 08/1934
MR 690 0-4-4T 692 871 06/1869 07/1928
MR 690 0-4-4T 693 872 06/1869 12/1930
MR 690 0-4-4T 694 873 07/1869 08/1928
MR 690 0-4-4T 695 874 07/1869 01/1926
MCR 21 0-6-0 21   1871 07/1924
MCR 21 0-6-0 22   1872 1923
MCR 21 0-6-0 24   1873 11/1924
NSR 74 0-6-0 118 1348 1874 08/1927
NSR 74 0-6-0 119 1349 1874 12/1926
NSR 74 0-6-0 120 1350 1874 03/1930
NSR 74 0-6-0 121 1351 1874 07/1927
NSR 74 0-6-0 122 1352 1874 12/1933
NSR 74 0-6-0 123 1353 1874 12/1933
LSWR Well Tank 2-4-0WT 3314   05/1874 29/12/1962
LSWR Well Tank 2-4-0WT 3298   06/1874 29/12/1962
LSWR Well Tank 2-4-0WT 3329   11/1875 29/12/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 1192 1541 02/1876 19/05/1928
MR 1142 0-6-0 1193 1542 02/1876 03/11/1935
MR 1142 0-6-0 1194 1543 02/1876 24/03/1932
MR 1142 0-6-0 1195 1544 03/1876 28/01/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1196 1545 03/1876 30/11/1933
MR 1142 0-6-0 1197 1546 03/1876 31/12/1952
MR 1142 0-6-0 1198 1547 03/1876 08/09/1930
MR 1142 0-6-0 1199 1548 03/1876 31/12/1963
MR 1142 0-6-0 1200 1549 03/1876 08/09/1952
MR 1142 0-6-0 1201 1550 03/1876 08/09/1948
MR 1142 0-6-0 1202 1551 03/1876 21/04/1951
MR 1142 0-6-0 1203 1552 04/1876 30/11/1955
MR 1142 0-6-0 1204 1553 04/1876 03/11/1934
MR 1142 0-6-0 1205 1554 04/1876 30/11/1933
MR 1142 0-6-0 1206 1555 04/1876 11/08/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1207 1556 04/1876 16/06/1956
MR 1142 0-6-0 1208 1557 04/1876 24/03/1950
MR 1142 0-6-0 1209 1558 04/1876 24/03/1957
MR 1142 0-6-0 1210 1559 04/1876 03/11/1958
MR 1142 0-6-0 1211 1560 04/1876 16/06/1946
MR 1142 0-6-0 1212 1561 12/1876 16/06/1926
MR 1142 0-6-0 1213 1562 12/1876 06/10/1935
MR 1142 0-6-0 1214 1563 12/1876 19/05/1960
MR 1142 0-6-0 1215 1564 12/1876 24/03/1956
MR 1142 0-6-0 1216 1565 12/1876 08/09/1962
MR 1142 0-6-0 1217 1566 12/1876 11/08/1936
MR 1142 0-6-0 1218 1567 12/1876 08/09/1934
MR 1142 0-6-0 1219 1568 12/1876 25/02/1953
MR 1142 0-6-0 1220 1569 12/1876 06/10/1955
MR 1142 0-6-0 1221 1570 12/1876 03/11/1961
MCR 25 0-6-0 25 1799 06/1878 12/1930
LSWR 46   46 1832 06/1879 04/1924
LSWR 46   123 1833 06/1879 02/1924
LSWR 46   124 1834 06/1879 11/1921
LSWR 46   130 1835 07/1879 05/1924
LSWR 46   132 1836 07/1879 12/1924
LSWR 46   133 1837 07/1879 11/1921
LSWR 46   374 1838 08/1879 12/1924
LSWR 46   375 1839 08/1879 07/1925
LSWR 46   376 1840 08/1879 11/1922
LSWR 46   377 1841 08/1879 01/1925
LSWR 46   378 1842 08/1879 05/1923
LSWR 46   379 1843 08/1879 06/1923
LSWR 380 4-4-0 380 1854 09/1879 12/1924
LSWR 380 4-4-0 381 1855 09/1879 12/1924
LSWR 380 4-4-0 382 1856 09/1879 07/1924
LSWR 380 4-4-0 383 1857 09/1879 12/1913
LSWR 380 4-4-0 384 1858 09/1879 08/1924
LSWR 380 4-4-0 385 1859 10/1879 08/1924
LSWR 380 4-4-0 386 1860 10/1879 08/1924
LSWR 380 4-4-0 387 1861 11/1879 12/1913
LSWR 380 4-4-0 388 1862 11/1879 12/1925
LSWR 380 4-4-0 389 1863 11/1879 12/1925
LSWR 380 4-4-0 390 1864 11/1879 12/1924
LSWR 380 4-4-0 391 1865 11/1879 12/1913
LSWR 135 4-4-0 135 1948 11/1880 11/1921
LSWR 135 4-4-0 136 1949 11/1880 12/1913
LSWR 135 4-4-0 137 1950 12/1880 12/1913
LSWR 135 4-4-0 138 1951 12/1880 12/1913
LSWR 135 4-4-0 139 1952 12/1880 12/1924
LSWR 135 4-4-0 140 1953 12/1880 12/1924
LSWR 135 4-4-0 141 1954 12/1880 12/1913
LSWR 135 4-4-0 142 1955 12/1880 12/1913
LSWR 135 4-4-0 143 1956 12/1880 06/1923
LSWR 135 4-4-0 144 1957 01/1881 11/1921
LSWR 135 4-4-0 145 1958 01/1881 12/1913
LSWR 135 4-4-0 146 1959 01/1881 12/1913
LYR 25 0-6-0 593 1976 02/1881 10/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 594 1977 03/1881 01/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 595 1978 03/1881 26/11/1955
LYR 25 0-6-0 596 1979 03/1881 10/03/1962
LYR 25 0-6-0 597 1980 03/1881 16/08/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 598 1981 03/1881 01/09/1962
LYR 25 0-6-0 599 1982 03/1881 12/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 600 1983 04/1881 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 747 1984 04/1881 12/08/1961
LYR 25 0-6-0 748 1985 04/1881 26/01/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 749 1986 05/1881 01/1936
LYR 25 0-6-0 750 1987 05/1881 06/1938
LYR 25 0-6-0 751 1988 05/1881 05/05/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 752 1989 05/1881 05/1937
LYR 25 0-6-0 753 1990 05/1881 01/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 754 1991 06/1881 05/1932
LYR 25 0-6-0 755 1992 06/1881 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 756 1993 06/1881 01/1949
LYR 25 0-6-0 757 1994 06/1881 11/1933
LYR 25 0-6-0 758 1995 06/1881 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 759 1996 09/1881 02/1936
LYR 25 0-6-0 760 1997 09/1881 05/1949
LYR 25 0-6-0 761 1998 09/1881 21/09/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 762 1999 09/1881 25/02/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 763 2000 10/1881 06/10/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 764 2001 10/1881 06/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 765 2002 11/1881 05/1949
LYR 25 0-6-0 766 2003 11/1881 03/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 767 2004 11/1881 12/03/1955
LYR 25 0-6-0 768 2005 11/1881 05/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 769 2006 12/1881 08/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 770 2007 12/1881 06/1928
LYR 25 0-6-0 771 2008 01/1882 12/1938
LYR 25 0-6-0 772 2009 01/1882 07/1949
LYR 25 0-6-0 773 2010 01/1882 05/1949
LYR 25 0-6-0 774 2011 01/1882 13/11/1948
LYR 25 0-6-0 775 2012 02/1882 01/1936
LYR 25 0-6-0 776 2013 02/1882 12/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 777 2014 02/1882 01/1939
LYR 25 0-6-0 778 2015 02/1882 06/05/1961
LYR 25 0-6-0 779 2016 02/1882 10/1934
LYR 25 0-6-0 780 2017 02/1882 02/1942
LYR 25 0-6-0 781 2018 02/1882 12/07/1958
LYR 25 0-6-0 783 2020 03/1882 07/07/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 784 2021 03/1882 11/1933
LYR 25 0-6-0 785 2022 03/1882 12/1932
LYR 25 0-6-0 786 2023 03/1882 11/1933
LYR 25 0-6-0 787 2024 03/1882 11/04/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 788 2025 04/1882 13/06/1959
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 415 2167 08/1882 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 416 2168 08/1882 11/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 417 2169 09/1882 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 418 2170 09/1882 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 419 2171 09/1882 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 420 2172 09/1882 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 421 2173 09/1882 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 422 2174 10/1882 11/1925
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 423 2175 10/1882 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 424 2176 10/1882 06/1916
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 425 2177 11/1882 11/1921
LSWR Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 426 2178 11/1882 06/1924
LMS 2F 0-6-0     12/1882 08/08/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/1883 10/02/1962
LMS 2F 0-6-0     01/1883 18/03/1961
LMS 2F 0-6-0     02/1883 16/05/1957
LYR 25 0-6-0 782 2019 02/1883 21/03/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     10/1883 15/10/1960
LMS 2F 0-6-0     10/1883 18/03/1961
LMS 2F 0-6-0     10/1883 30/04/1949
LMS 2F 0-6-0     10/1883 11/12/1958
LMS 2F 0-6-0     10/1883 19/01/1952
LMS 2F 0-6-0     11/1883 05/1949
LMS 2F 0-6-0     11/1883 03/11/1956
LMS 2F 0-6-0     12/1883 10/10/1959
LMS 2F 0-6-0     12/1883 07/07/1962
LMS 2F 0-6-0     12/1883 20/02/1960
LMS 2F 0-6-0     11/1884 22/05/1948
LMS 2F 0-6-0     11/1884 24/03/1962
LYR 25 0-6-0 948 2831 07/1887 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 949 2832 07/1887 13/11/1948
LYR 25 0-6-0 950 2833 07/1887 23/08/1952
LYR 25 0-6-0 951 2834 07/1887 10/1947
LYR 25 0-6-0 952 2835 07/1887 06/1946
LYR 25 0-6-0 953 2836 08/1887 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 954 2837 08/1887 14/10/1950
LYR 25 0-6-0 955 2838 08/1887 04/1935
LYR 25 0-6-0 956 2839 08/1887 29/08/1953
LYR 25 0-6-0 957 2840 08/1887 07/1959
LYR 25 0-6-0 958 2841 08/1887 13/08/1955
LYR 25 0-6-0 959 2842 08/1887 07/02/1948
LYR 25 0-6-0 960 2843 08/1887 21/01/1950
LYR 25 0-6-0 961 2844 09/1887 10/1932
LYR 25 0-6-0 962 2845 09/1887 09/10/1948
LYR 25 0-6-0 963 2846 09/1887 04/1935
LYR 25 0-6-0 964 2847 09/1887 04/02/1956
LYR 25 0-6-0 965 2848 09/1887 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 966 2849 09/1887 07/03/1955
LYR 25 0-6-0 967 2850 10/1887 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 968 2851 10/1887 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 969 2852 10/1887 18/08/1951
LYR 25 0-6-0 970 2853 11/1887 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 971 2854 11/1887 08/1932
LYR 25 0-6-0 972 2855 11/1887 26/05/1951
LYR 25 0-6-0 973 2856 12/1887 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 974 2857 12/1887 12/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 975 2858 12/1887 11/1930
LYR 25 0-6-0 976 2859 12/1887 04/09/1948
LYR 25 0-6-0 977 2860 12/1887 02/12/1950
MCR 25 0-6-0 27 3284 1890 06/1928
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 518 3552 08/1893 05/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 519 3553 09/1893 26/05/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 520 3554 09/1893 16/06/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 521 3555 09/1893 11/1936
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 522 3556 09/1893 19/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 523 3557 10/1893 12/12/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 524 3558 10/1893 10/09/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 525 3559 10/1893 14/11/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 526 3560 10/1893 23/07/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 527 3561 10/1893 08/01/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 528 3562 10/1893 22/12/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 529 3563 11/1893 17/11/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 530 3564 11/1893 14/02/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 531 3565 11/1893 12/1938
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 532 3566 11/1893 12/12/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 533 3567 12/1893 25/11/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 534 3568 12/1893 26/01/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 535 3569 01/1894 26/01/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 537 3570 01/1894 03/08/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 538 3571 01/1894 17/10/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 539 3572 02/1894 26/05/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 540 3573 02/1894 27/06/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 541 3574 02/1894 26/11/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 542 3575 02/1894 19/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 543 3576 03/1894 22/12/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 544 3577 03/1894 20/11/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 545 3578 03/1894 19/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 546 3579 03/1894 13/06/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 547 3580 03/1894 22/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 548 3581 03/1894 31/08/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 744 3615 08/1894 25/07/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 745 3616 08/1894 12/06/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 746 3617 08/1894 03/08/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 747 3618 09/1894 05/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 748 3619 09/1894 26/11/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 749 3620 09/1894 11/07/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 750 3621 10/1894 23/04/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 751 3622 10/1894 20/02/1954
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 752 3623 10/1894 02/10/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 753 3624 11/1894 04/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 754 3625 11/1894 01/1914
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 755 3626 12/1894 01/1914
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 754 3813 01/1896 12/1938
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 755 3814 01/1896 08/01/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 786 3704 02/1896 03/1935
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 17 3866 02/1896 10/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 18 3867 02/1896 02/1936
MLSR J10 0-6-0 787 3705 03/1896 28/03/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 788 3706 03/1896 10/05/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 789 3707 03/1896 12/12/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 790 3708 03/1896 01/1939
MLSR J10 0-6-0 791 3709 03/1896 06/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 792 3710 04/1896 26/12/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 793 3711 04/1896 19/04/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 794 3712 04/1896 16/02/1953
MLSR J10 0-6-0 795 3713 05/1896 28/04/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 796 3714 05/1896 08/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 797 3715 06/1896 08/08/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 798 3716 06/1896 29/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 799 3717 06/1896 05/12/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 800 3718 06/1896 11/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 801 3719 07/1896 12/1937
MLSR J10 0-6-0 802 3720 07/1896 22/09/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 803 3721 07/1896 08/10/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 804 3722 07/1896 09/1937
MLSR J10 0-6-0 805 3723 07/1896 22/09/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 806 3724 07/1896 05/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 807 3725 07/1896 03/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 808 3726 08/1896 11/12/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 809 3727 09/1896 13/12/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 810 3728 09/1896 12/1934
MLSR J10 0-6-0 811 3729 09/1896 12/03/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 812 3730 10/1896 10/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 813 3731 10/1896 09/1934
MLSR J10 0-6-0 814 3732 10/1896 06/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 815 3733 11/1896 16/03/1953
MLSR J10 0-6-0 816 3734 11/1896 08/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 817 3735 11/1896 09/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 818 3736 11/1896 10/12/1947
MLSR J10 0-6-0 819 3737 11/1896 24/03/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 820 3738 12/1896 02/1947
MLSR J10 0-6-0 821 3739 12/1896 06/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 822 3740 12/1896 10/1936
MLSR J10 0-6-0 823 3741 12/1896 13/06/1953
MLSR J10 0-6-0 824 3742 12/1896 09/06/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 825 3743 01/1897 02/1939
MLSR J10 0-6-0 826 3744 01/1897 08/1933
MLSR J10 0-6-0 827 3745 01/1897 15/02/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 828 3746 01/1897 26/08/1961
MLSR J10 0-6-0 829 3747 01/1897 10/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 830 3748 01/1897 07/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 831 3749 02/1897 12/12/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 832 3750 02/1897 21/12/1957
MLSR J10 0-6-0 833 3751 02/1897 01/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 834 3752 02/1897 10/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 835 3753 02/1897 07/06/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 836 3754 02/1897 27/10/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 837 3755 02/1897 13/12/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 838 3756 02/1897 22/12/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 839 3757 03/1897 16/05/1953
MLSR J10 0-6-0 840 3758 03/1897 01/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 841 3759 03/1897 24/03/1956
MLSR J10 0-6-0 842 3760 03/1897 08/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 843 3761 03/1897 10/1938
MLSR J10 0-6-0 844 3762 03/1897 02/1935
MLSR J10 0-6-0 845 3763 04/1897 06/1937
MLSR J10 0-6-0 846 3764 04/1897 12/12/1959
MLSR J10 0-6-0 847 3765 04/1897 06/09/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 848 3766 04/1897 15/12/1952
MLSR J10 0-6-0 849 3767 05/1897 13/02/1960
MLSR J10 0-6-0 850 3768 05/1897 28/06/1958
MLSR J10 0-6-0 851 3769 05/1897 06/10/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 763 3967 03/1898 19/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 764 3968 03/1898 12/03/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 765 3969 05/1898 03/08/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 766 3970 05/1898 08/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 767 3971 05/1898 10/12/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 768 3972 05/1898 17/02/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 769 3973 07/1898 23/11/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 770 3974 07/1898 18/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 771 3975 07/1898 04/02/1952
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 772 3976 07/1898 07/10/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 773 3977 08/1898 21/03/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 774 3978 08/1898 01/1939
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 775 3979 08/1898 20/01/1960
GCR D6 4-4-0 862 3980 12/1898 05/1933
GCR D6 4-4-0 863 3981 12/1898 04/1937
MCR 25 0-6-0 28 4060 1899 08/1930
GCR D6 4-4-0 864 3982 01/1899 10/1938
GCR D6 4-4-0 865 3983 01/1899 12/1946
GCR D6 4-4-0 866 3984 01/1899 09/1930
GCR D6 4-4-0 867 3985 01/1899 09/1932
GCR D6 4-4-0 868 3986 01/1899 04/1933
GCR D6 4-4-0 869 3987 02/1899 06/1943
GCR D6 4-4-0 870 3988 02/1899 06/1931
GCR D6 4-4-0 871 3989 02/1899 06/1946
GCR D6 4-4-0 872 3990 02/1899 03/1933
GCR D6 4-4-0 873 3991 03/1899 06/1930
GCR D6 4-4-0 874 3992 03/1899 12/1947
GCR D6 4-4-0 875 3993 03/1899 11/1935
GCR D6 4-4-0 876 3994 03/1899 05/1939
GCR D6 4-4-0 877 3995 03/1899 07/1932
GCR D6 4-4-0 878 3996 03/1899 10/1938
GCR D6 4-4-0 879 3997 04/1899 11/1943
GCR D6 4-4-0 880 3998 04/1899 04/1939
GCR D6 4-4-0 881 3999 04/1899 12/1932
GCR F2 2-4-2T 776 3694 03/1900 05/1949
GCR F2 2-4-2T 777 3695 03/1900 27/08/1948
GCR F2 2-4-2T 778 3696 03/1900 31/12/1948
GCR F2 2-4-2T 779 3697 03/1900 02/1949
GCR F2 2-4-2T 780 3698 04/1900 07/1950
GCR F2 2-4-2T 781 3699 04/1900 11/1949
GCR F2 2-4-2T 783 3701 04/1900 12/1950
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 925 4185 04/1900 31/08/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 926 4186 04/1900 18/01/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 927 4187 04/1900 16/10/1956
GCR F2 2-4-2T 784 3702 05/1900 05/1949
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 928 4188 05/1900 11/06/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 929 4189 05/1900 14/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 930 4190 05/1900 12/02/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 931 4191 05/1900 21/04/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 932 4192 05/1900 23/02/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 933 4193 05/1900 11/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 934 4194 05/1900 10/11/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 935 4195 05/1900 28/04/1956
GCR F2 2-4-2T 785 3703 06/1900 04/1949
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 936 4196 06/1900 19/03/1960
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 937 4197 06/1900 08/06/1959
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 938 4198 06/1900 31/08/1958
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 939 4199 07/1900 09/07/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 940 4200 07/1900 13/08/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 941 4248 02/1901 09/02/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 942 4249 02/1901 11/08/1956
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 943 4250 02/1901 04/11/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 944 4251 02/1901 02/05/1955
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 945 4252 03/1901 02/02/1957
MLSR N5 0-6-2T 946 4253 03/1901 10/09/1960
GWR W_L 0-6-0T 822   09/1902 17/08/1961
GWR W_L 0-6-0T 823   09/1902 27/07/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 198 4521 09/1903 24/08/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 201 4522 10/1903 08/02/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 203 4523 10/1903 30/01/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 205 4524 10/1903 23/09/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 206 4525 10/1903 09/08/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0 209 4526 10/1903 07/11/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 210 4527 10/1903 13/09/1954
GCR J11 0-6-0 211 4528 10/1903 13/07/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 214 4529 11/1903 24/06/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 215 4530 11/1903 20/10/1958
GCR B18 4-6-0 195 4541 12/1903 31/12/1947
GCR C4 4-4-2 192 4539 12/1903 09/11/1950
GCR C4 4-4-2 194 4540 12/1903 28/11/1950
GCR B5 4-6-0 180 4531 01/1904 23/12/1947
GCR B5 4-6-0 181 4532 01/1904 01/05/1947
GCR B5 4-6-0 182 4533 01/1904 06/03/1948
GCR B18 4-6-0 196 4542 01/1904 31/12/1947
GCR B5 4-6-0 183 4534 02/1904 12/06/1950
GCR B5 4-6-0 184 4535 02/1904 04/07/1947
GCR B5 4-6-0 185 4536 02/1904 31/10/1949
GCR B5 4-6-0 186 4537 02/1904 19/10/1949
GCR J11 0-6-0 216 4543 02/1904 18/10/1954
GCR J11 0-6-0 218 4544 02/1904 04/08/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 219 4545 02/1904 04/02/1961
GCR B5 4-6-0 187 4538 03/1904 20/04/1948
GCR J11 0-6-0 221 4546 03/1904 14/03/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 222 4547 03/1904 17/11/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 223 4548 03/1904 02/06/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 224 4549 03/1904 17/12/1958
GCR J11 0-6-0 225 4550 04/1904 23/09/1962
GCR J11 0-6-0   4551 04/1904 21/03/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 227 4552 04/1904 11/03/1960
GCR J11 0-6-0 228 4553 04/1904 16/10/1957
GCR J11 0-6-0 229 4554 04/1904 08/08/1955
GCR J11 0-6-0 230 4555 04/1904 30/10/1959
GCR J11 0-6-0 231 4556 04/1904 29/08/1961
GCR J11 0-6-0 234 4557 04/1904 10/02/1958
GCR C4 4-4-2 263 4597 07/1904 01/04/1949
GCR C4 4-4-2 264 4598 07/1904 15/06/1949
GCR C4 4-4-2 265 4599 07/1904 12/1947
GCR C4 4-4-2 266 4600 07/1904 10/1943
GCR C4 4-4-2 267 4601 07/1904 11/1947
GCR B4 4-6-0 1095 4816 06/1906 10/02/1944
GCR B4 4-6-0 1096 4817 06/1906 04/07/1947
GCR B4 4-6-0 1097 4818 06/1906 24/11/1950
GCR B4 4-6-0 1098 4819 06/1906 26/09/1949
GCR B4 4-6-0 1099 4820 06/1906 20/11/1947
GCR B4 4-6-0 1100 4821 06/1906 04/06/1949
GCR B4 4-6-0 1101 4822 06/1906 07/10/1947
GCR B4 4-6-0 102 4823 06/1906 10/12/1947
GCR B4 4-6-0 1103 4824 07/1906 07/10/1948
GCR B4 4-6-0 1104 4825 07/1906 04/07/1947
GCR B9 4-6-0 1105 4806 09/1906 02/04/1949
GCR B9 4-6-0 1106 4807 09/1906 19/11/1948
GCR B9 4-6-0 1107 4808 09/1906 20/11/1947
GCR B9 4-6-0 1108 4809 09/1906 02/06/1947
GCR B9 4-6-0 1109 4810 09/1906 31/12/1947
GCR B9 4-6-0 1110 4811 10/1906 07/10/1947
GCR B9 4-6-0 1111 4812 10/1906 16/05/1949
GCR B9 4-6-0 1112 4813 10/1906 19/08/1948
GCR B9 4-6-0 1113 4814 10/1906 25/08/1947
GCR B9 4-6-0 1114 4815 10/1906 10/12/1947
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1120 4926 05/1907 04/07/1957
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1121 4927 05/1907 05/08/1957
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1122 4928 05/1907 30/11/1957
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1123 4929 05/1907 24/06/1957
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1124 4930 05/1907 03/07/1957
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1125 4931 05/1907 22/12/1959
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1126 4932 06/1907 27/05/1957
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1127 4933 06/1907 02/12/1958
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1128 4934 06/1907 18/06/1959
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1129 4935 06/1907 07/12/1957
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1130 4936 06/1907 23/01/1960
GCR C14 4-4-2T 1131 4937 06/1907 21/01/1957
GCR S1 0-8-4T 1170 5002 12/1907 06/01/1956
GCR S1 0-8-4T 1171 5003 12/1907 01/01/1957
GCR S1 0-8-4T 1172 5004 01/1908 13/01/1956
GCR S1 0-8-4T 1173 5005 01/1908 08/03/1954
CambR 15 0-6-0 864   03/1908 11/1952
CambR 15 0-6-0 893   03/1908 02/1953
CambR 15 0-6-0 894   03/1908 04/1953
CambR 15 0-6-0 895   03/1908 10/1954
CambR 15 0-6-0 896   03/1908 04/1953
TVR O4 0-6-2T 236   06/1908 01/1953
TVR O4 0-6-2T 286   06/1908 10/1950
TVR O4 0-6-2T 301   06/1908 12/1948
TVR O4 0-6-2T 200   07/1908 07/1948
TVR O4 0-6-2T 280   07/1908 05/1949
TVR O4 0-6-2T 282   07/1908 06/1954
TVR O4 0-6-2T 289   07/1908 08/1949
TVR O4 0-6-2T 291   07/1908 01/1950
TVR O4 0-6-2T 292   07/1908 04/1952
TVR O4 0-6-2T 297   07/1908 12/1949
TVR O4 0-6-2T 298   07/1908 07/1948
TVR O4 0-6-2T 299   07/1908 06/1951
TVR O4 0-6-2T 302   07/1908 10/04/1948
NER J27 0-6-0 1201 5104 07/1908 13/05/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1203 5105 07/1908 30/08/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1204 5106 07/1908 18/01/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1205 5107 07/1908 13/04/1959
TVR O4 0-6-2T 314   08/1908 12/1949
NER J27 0-6-0 1211 5108 08/1908 27/12/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1212 5109 08/1908 22/02/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1213 5110 08/1908 25/10/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1214 5111 08/1908 08/02/1960
NER J27 0-6-0 1216 5112 08/1908 04/09/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1219 5113 08/1908 06/05/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 1220 5114 08/1908 29/04/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 1221 5115 08/1908 27/12/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1222 5116 08/1908 23/12/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 1224 5117 08/1908 14/02/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1225 5118 08/1908 23/12/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 1226 5119 08/1908 08/1967
NER J27 0-6-0 1228 5120 08/1908 26/08/1959
NER J27 0-6-0 1229 5121 08/1908 02/04/1963
NER J27 0-6-0 1230 5122 08/1908 04/10/1965
NER J27 0-6-0 1231 5123 08/1908 04/09/1966
TVR O4 0-6-2T 207   10/1910 11/1952
TVR O4 0-6-2T 208   10/1910 07/1955
TVR O4 0-6-2T 209   10/1910 08/1952
TVR O4 0-6-2T 210   10/1910 03/1955
TVR O4 0-6-2T 290   10/1910 07/1955
TVR O4 0-6-2T 208   10/1910 07/1955
TVR O4 0-6-2T 320   10/1910 05/1955
TVR O4 0-6-2T 321   10/1910 07/1955
TVR O4 0-6-2T 324   10/1910 01/1955
TVR O4 0-6-2T 217   10/1910 09/1952
TVR O4 0-6-2T 409   10/1910 12/1952
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1990   11/1912 19/02/1959
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1991   11/1912 19/02/1959
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1992   11/1912 19/02/1959
LTSR Tilbury tanks 0-6-2T 1993   11/1912 19/02/1959
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1769   1914 07/04/1956
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1760   08/1914 17/06/1961
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1761   08/1914 01/12/1956
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1762   08/1914 06/02/1960
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1763   08/1914 09/04/1960
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1764   08/1914 25/02/1961
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1765   08/1914 25/02/1961
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1766   09/1914 25/02/1961
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1767   09/1914 18/10/1958
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1768   09/1914 09/12/1961
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1770   09/1914 14/11/1959
SR German Engines 4-4-0 1771   10/1914 09/12/1961
CambR 15 0-6-0 844   10/1918 08/1954
CambR 15 0-6-0 849   11/1918 10/1954
LMS 2P 4-4-0 477   03/1919 24/02/1951
LMS 2P 4-4-0 478   04/1919 14/10/1950
LMS 2P 4-4-0 479   04/1919 11/1949
LMS 2P 4-4-0 480   04/1919 06/02/1954
LMS 2P 4-4-0 482   05/1919 07/1957
CambR 15 0-6-0 855   05/1919 10/1954
CambR 15 0-6-0 873   06/1919 03/1954
RR R 0-6-2T 39   12/1921 08/1955
RR R 0-6-2T 40   12/1921 10/1953
RR R 0-6-2T 41   12/1921 05/1956
RR R 0-6-2T 42   12/1921 09/1957
RR R 0-6-2T 43   12/1921 02/1957
RR R 0-6-2T 44   12/1921 07/1956
GCR B7 4-6-0 31 6107 07/1922 14/05/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 32 6108 07/1922 19/08/1948
GCR B7 4-6-0 33 6109 08/1922 12/01/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 34 6110 08/1922 13/06/1949
GCR B7 4-6-0 35 6111 08/1922 09/01/1950
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2584 6211 02/1925 03/12/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2585 6212 03/1925 09/05/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2586 6213 03/1925 03/12/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2587 6214 03/1925 10/06/1958
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2588 6215 03/1925 06/04/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2589 6216 03/1925 18/12/1959
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2591 6218 03/1925 03/06/1957
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2592 6219 03/1925 18/07/1957
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2590 6217 04/1925 17/06/1957
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2593 6220 04/1925 18/10/1960
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2594 6221 04/1925 25/05/1961
GNR N2 0-6-2T 2583 6210 05/1925 02/09/1958
LNER U1 2-8-8-2T 2395 6209 21/06/1925 23/12/1955
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7997   04/1927 11/02/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7998   04/1927 25/08/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7999   04/1927 28/01/1956
GER B12 4-6-0   6487 08/1928 12/1959
GER B12 4-6-0   6488 08/1928 20/09/1961
GER B12 4-6-0   6489 08/1928 01/01/1959
GER B12 4-6-0   6490 08/1928 01/01/1957
GER B12 4-6-0   6492 08/1928 01/01/1959
GER B12 4-6-0   6491 09/1928 06/04/1959
GER B12 4-6-0   6493 09/1928 28/09/1959
GER B12 4-6-0   6494 09/1928 01/01/1957
GER B12 4-6-0   6495 09/1928 01/01/1957
GER B12 4-6-0   6496 10/1928 02/03/1959
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7967   08/1930 23/11/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7968   08/1930 07/09/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7969   08/1930 03/08/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7970   08/1930 02/07/1955
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7971   08/1930 10/11/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7972   09/1930 06/04/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7973   09/1930 13/04/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7974   09/1930 16/06/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7975   09/1930 02/07/1955
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7976   09/1930 21/04/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7977   09/1930 16/06/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7978   09/1930 16/03/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7979   09/1930 02/02/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7980   10/1930 09/02/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7981   10/1930 03/11/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7982   10/1930 28/12/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7983   10/1930 01/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7984   10/1930 25/02/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7985   10/1930 11/06/1955
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7987   10/1930 04/05/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7988   10/1930 18/08/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7989   10/1930 12/11/1955
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7986   11/1930 06/07/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7990   11/1930 28/05/1955
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7991   11/1930 31/12/1955
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7992   11/1930 10/03/1956
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7993   11/1930 31/12/1955
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7994   11/1930 14/03/1958
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7995   11/1930 06/07/1957
LMS Garratt 2-6-6-2T 7996   12/1930 16/06/1956
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8700 6680 02/1931 03/10/1963
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8701 6681 02/1931 29/03/1963
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8702 6682 02/1931 06/05/1964
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8703 6683 02/1931 01/1958
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8704 6684 02/1931 29/02/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8705 6685 02/1931 27/04/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8707 6687 02/1931 06/07/1964
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8709 6689 02/1931 27/09/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8706 6686 03/1931 04/07/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8708 6688 03/1931 19/05/1960
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8710 6690 03/1931 08/03/1963
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8711 6691 03/1931 15/03/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8712 6692 03/1931 14/01/1963
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8713 6693 03/1931 15/03/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8714 6694 03/1931 27/11/1964
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8715 6695 03/1931 02/04/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8716 6696 03/1931 20/04/1964
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8717 6697 03/1931 06/07/1964
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8718 6698 03/1931 23/07/1966
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8719 6699 03/1931 14/05/1962
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8720 6700 03/1931 28/09/1964
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8721 6701 03/1931 18/07/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8722 6702 04/1931 27/04/1961
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8723 6703 04/1931 06/07/1964
GWR 57xx 0-6-0PT 8724 6704 04/1931 18/07/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1803 6802 02/09/1936 28/09/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1813 6803 04/09/1936 12/04/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1824 6804 23/09/1936 26/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1828 6805 23/09/1936 22/03/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1854 6806 25/09/1936 05/04/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1856 6807 30/09/1936 23/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1857 6808 02/10/1936 12/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1869 6809 06/10/1936 05/12/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1870 6810 10/10/1936 21/10/1959
LNER J39 0-6-0 1532 6811 14/10/1936 21/07/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1533 6812 17/10/1936 29/03/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1534 6813 21/10/1936 25/08/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1536 6814 23/10/1936 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1539 6815 28/10/1936 30/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1540 6816 31/10/1936 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1543 6817 04/11/1936 16/11/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1544 6818 09/11/1936 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1545 6819 13/11/1936 23/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1547 6820 26/11/1936 15/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1563 6821 31/03/1937 23/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1577 6822 07/04/1937 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1580 6823 12/04/1937 15/10/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1585 6824 16/04/1937 03/12/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1586 6825 22/04/1937 21/07/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1587 6826 29/04/1937 23/11/1962
LNER J39 0-6-0 1875 6827 05/05/1937 03/07/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1880 6828 19/05/1937 22/10/1961
LNER J39 0-6-0 1894 6829 28/05/1937 03/07/1961
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70401 6981 07/1940 03/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70402 6982 07/1940 01/07/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70403 6983 08/1940 25/02/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70413 6993 10/1940 29/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8293 7037 10/1940 22/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70438 7018 06/1941 14/08/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70440 7034 07/1941 02/07/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70442 7036 08/1941 20/04/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70443 7038 11/1941 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70446 7040 12/1941 25/09/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70447 7041 12/1941 17/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 70449 7043 01/1942 24/07/1965
  D2/11 0-4-0 D2999   04/09/1960 15/10/1967
  35 B-B D7000 7894 16/05/1961 30/07/1973
  35 B-B D7001 7895 03/07/1961 16/03/1974
  35 B-B D7002 7896 19/07/1961 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7003 7897 03/08/1961 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7004 7898 15/08/1961 16/06/1972
  35 B-B D7005 7899 25/09/1961 02/07/1972
  35 B-B D7006 7900 06/10/1961 11/09/1971
  35 B-B D7007 7901 18/10/1961 19/04/1972
  35 B-B D7008 7902 24/10/1961 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7009 7903 07/11/1961 06/05/1973
  35 B-B D7010 7904 20/11/1961 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7012 7906 01/12/1961 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7011 7905 04/12/1961 02/03/1975
  35 B-B D7013 7907 14/12/1961 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7014 7908 18/12/1961 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7015 7909 22/12/1961 07/06/1972
  35 B-B D7016 7910 03/01/1962 05/07/1974
  35 B-B D7017 7911 08/01/1962 13/03/1975
  35 B-B D7018 7912 18/01/1962 16/03/1975
  35 B-B D7020 7914 08/02/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7019 7913 14/02/1962 15/09/1972
  35 B-B D7021 7915 14/02/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7023 7917 21/02/1962 09/06/1973
  35 B-B D7022 7916 26/02/1962 02/03/1975
  35 B-B D7025 7919 15/03/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7024 7918 16/03/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7026 7920 26/03/1962 06/10/1974
  35 B-B D7028 7922 05/04/1962 01/01/1975
  35 B-B D7027 7921 07/04/1962 29/11/1971
  35 B-B D7029 7923 17/04/1962 28/02/1975
  35 B-B D7030 7924 19/04/1962 06/05/1973
  35 B-B D7031 7925 25/04/1962 11/05/1973
  35 B-B D7032 7926 05/05/1962 06/05/1973
  35 B-B D7034 7928 23/05/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7033 7927 24/05/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7035 7929 04/06/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7036 7930 05/06/1962 09/06/1972
  35 B-B D7037 7931 18/06/1962 15/09/1972
  35 B-B D7038 7932 18/06/1962 02/07/1972
  35 B-B D7039 7933 22/06/1962 03/06/1972
  35 B-B D7040 7934 13/07/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7041 7935 13/07/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7042 7936 23/07/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7043 7937 24/07/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7045 7949 10/08/1962 11/11/1972
  35 B-B D7046 7950 15/08/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7047 7951 15/08/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7044 7938 18/08/1962 06/05/1973
  35 B-B D7048 7952 26/09/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7049 7953 05/10/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7050 7954 05/10/1962 01/11/1972
  35 B-B D7051 7955 06/10/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7052 7956 24/10/1962 30/11/1972
  35 B-B D7053 7957 24/10/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7055 7959 02/11/1962 09/06/1973
  35 B-B D7056 7960 13/11/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7054 7958 16/11/1962 30/12/1972
  35 B-B D7057 7961 22/11/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7058 7962 28/11/1962 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7059 7963 28/11/1962 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7060 7964 19/12/1962 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7063 7967 28/12/1962 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7061 7965 29/12/1962 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7065 7969 28/01/1963 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7064 7968 29/01/1963 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7062 7966 31/01/1963 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7066 7970 31/01/1963 29/11/1971
  35 B-B D7067 7971 06/02/1963 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7068 7972 13/02/1963 30/12/1972
  35 B-B D7069 7973 22/02/1963 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7070 7974 08/03/1963 08/09/1972
  35 B-B D7071 7975 11/03/1963 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7073 7977 11/03/1963 10/12/1971
  35 B-B D7072 7976 22/03/1963 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7074 7978 26/03/1963 30/12/1972
  35 B-B D7075 7979 29/03/1963 06/05/1973
  35 B-B D7076 7980 03/05/1963 06/05/1973
  35 B-B D7078 7982 03/05/1963 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7082 7986 05/06/1963 19/04/1972
  35 B-B D7083 7987 05/06/1963 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7085 7989 24/06/1963 11/10/1972
  35 B-B D7084 7988 26/06/1963 11/10/1972
  35 B-B D7086 7990 20/07/1963 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7087 7991 20/07/1963 07/10/1972
  35 B-B D7089 7993 23/07/1963 06/05/1973
  35 B-B D7090 7994 24/09/1963 12/06/1972
  35 B-B D7091 7995 24/09/1963 10/08/1972
  35 B-B D7088 7992 29/10/1963 01/01/1972
  35 B-B D7081 7985 12/12/1963 11/09/1971
  35 B-B D7077 7981 13/12/1963 02/07/1972
  35 B-B D7080 7984 14/12/1963 07/11/1972
  35 B-B D7093 7997 14/12/1963 26/11/1974
  35 B-B D7094 7998 14/12/1963 01/11/1972
  35 B-B D7079 7983 16/12/1963 03/10/1971
  35 B-B D7092 7996 16/12/1963 20/06/1972
  35 B-B D7096 8000 16/12/1963 30/12/1972
  35 B-B D7097 8001 16/12/1963 30/12/1972
  35 B-B D7095 7999 24/12/1963 16/10/1972
  35 B-B D7098 8002 01/01/1964 30/12/1972
  35 B-B D7099 8003 22/01/1964 15/10/1972
  35 B-B D7100 8004 05/02/1964 01/11/1972
  17 Bo-Bo D8588   20/03/1964 04/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8589   04/05/1964 06/07/1970
  17 Bo-Bo D8590   12/05/1964 27/03/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8592   12/05/1964 21/09/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8593   28/05/1964 04/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8594   03/07/1964 21/09/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8591   08/07/1964 22/12/1968
  17 Bo-Bo D8595   21/07/1964 22/12/1968
  17 Bo-Bo D8597   21/07/1964 06/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8596   28/07/1964 22/12/1968
  17 Bo-Bo D8598   06/08/1964 31/12/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8600   06/08/1964 06/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8599   28/08/1964 05/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8601   02/09/1964 06/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8603   07/09/1964 06/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8602   09/09/1964 06/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8604   15/09/1964 04/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8605   01/10/1964 28/10/1968
  17 Bo-Bo D8606   05/10/1964 27/03/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8607   16/10/1964 05/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8608   27/10/1964 05/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8609   23/11/1964 13/10/1968
  17 Bo-Bo D8610   07/12/1964 05/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8611   17/12/1964 13/10/1968
  17 Bo-Bo D8613   22/01/1965 06/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8612   27/01/1965 05/10/1971
  25 Bo-Bo D7638   30/01/1965 19/02/1987
  17 Bo-Bo D8614   11/02/1965 05/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8615   10/03/1965 05/10/1971
  17 Bo-Bo D8616   23/04/1965 21/09/1971
  25 Bo-Bo D7624   30/07/1965 02/05/1982
  25 Bo-Bo D7625   30/07/1965 18/04/1982
  25 Bo-Bo D7626   05/08/1965 01/03/1987
  25 Bo-Bo D7627   12/08/1965 15/04/1984
  25 Bo-Bo D7628   12/08/1965 01/03/1987
  25 Bo-Bo D7629   07/09/1965 18/03/1987
  25 Bo-Bo D7630   16/09/1965 01/11/1981
  25 Bo-Bo D7631   29/09/1965 01/02/1981
  25 Bo-Bo D7632   08/10/1965 10/03/1986
  25 Bo-Bo D7634   19/10/1965 21/01/1985
  25 Bo-Bo D7633   30/10/1965 01/03/1987
  25 Bo-Bo D7635   05/11/1965 17/03/1986
  25 Bo-Bo D7636   15/11/1965 01/09/1986
  25 Bo-Bo D7637   22/12/1965 02/12/1985
  25 Bo-Bo D7639   23/12/1965 17/01/1984
  25 Bo-Bo D7640   31/12/1965 04/10/1981
  25 Bo-Bo D7641   14/01/1966 03/05/1981
  25 Bo-Bo D7642   28/01/1966 18/10/1981
  25 Bo-Bo D7643   08/02/1966 01/02/1981
  25 Bo-Bo D7645   15/03/1966 10/06/1978
  25 Bo-Bo D7644   23/03/1966 10/10/1982
  25 Bo-Bo D7646   25/03/1966 01/10/1986
  25 Bo-Bo D7647   30/03/1966 01/09/1986
  25 Bo-Bo D7648   07/04/1966 19/03/1985
  25 Bo-Bo D7649   15/04/1966 04/10/1981
  25 Bo-Bo D7650   07/05/1966 02/12/1985
  25 Bo-Bo D7651   09/05/1966 11/12/1983
  25 Bo-Bo D7652   21/05/1966 14/06/1985
  25 Bo-Bo D7653   24/06/1966 19/02/1986
  25 Bo-Bo D7654   24/06/1966 28/11/1982
  25 Bo-Bo D7655   01/07/1966 01/07/1983
  25 Bo-Bo D7657   04/07/1966 01/11/1986
  25 Bo-Bo D7656   05/07/1966 25/02/1985
  25 Bo-Bo D7658   19/07/1966 16/10/1983
  25 Bo-Bo D7659   21/07/1966 01/09/1986