Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3661 Week
» 6243 Month
» 270876 Year
» 1492441 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Brighton Works


Locomotives built
Company Class Wheels Number as Built Works Number Date Built Date Withdrawn
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T     14/09/1865 09/1956
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2636   09/1872 04/11/1963
SR Terriers 0-6-0T KESR3   12/1872 04/11/1963
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2299   01/1874 05/1949
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2605   01/1874 11/1948
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2610   12/1874 04/1956
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2694   03/1875 29/07/1961
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2215   05/1875 02/1950
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2662   10/1875 04/11/1963
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2661   10/1875 28/04/1963
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2659   10/1875 08/1953
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 6   12/1875 01/1940
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2655   12/1875 28/05/1960
SR Terriers 0-6-0T     28/02/1876 06/1962
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2695   09/1876 04/1957
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2697   09/1876 28/11/1959
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2606   10/1876 08/1956
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2696   10/1876 07/01/1956
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2608   11/1876 11/05/1957
SR Terriers 0-6-0T     12/1876 04/11/1963
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2647   12/1876 10/1951
SR Terriers 0-6-0T     01/1877 04/11/1963
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2609   03/1877 06/1948
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2112   04/1877 17/12/1949
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2113   05/1877 09/1958
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 5   06/1877 03/1954
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2644   06/1877 07/04/1951
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2640   03/1878 22/09/1963
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2699   06/1878 02/1948
SR Terriers 0-6-0T     06/1878 31/03/1963
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2122   08/1878 05/1948
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2124   08/1878 31/01/1959
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2127   10/1878 12/1949
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2128   10/1878 03/1952
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2129   10/1878 09/06/1951
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T     11/1878 22/10/1960
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2133   12/1878 12/1952
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2135   01/1879 02/1959
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2138   01/1879 03/11/1956
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T     01/1879 03/1957
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2139   03/1879 10/01/1959
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2141   03/1879 10/1949
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2142   03/1879 11/1950
SR D Tanks 0-4-2T 2286   07/1879 07/1948
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2289   07/1879 07/1948
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2145   10/1879 02/06/1951
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2147   10/1879 12/1951
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2283   10/1879 11/1948
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2274   12/1879 02/1950
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2269   05/1880 07/1948
SR Terriers 0-6-0T 2678   07/1880 06/10/1963
SR Terriers 0-6-0T     07/1880 12/09/1959
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2151   12/1880 30/01/1960
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2153   03/1881 05/1949
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2156   03/1881 05/1951
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T     03/1881 06/1959
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2689   05/1883 27/02/1960
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2690   05/1883 01/1950
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2691   10/1883 12/1951
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2094   11/1883 05/1955
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2095   11/1883 24/11/1956
SR El Radials 0-6-2T 2096   12/1883 10/11/1956
SR Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2097   12/1883 12/1949
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2358   11/1886 11/1948
SR D Tanks 0-4-2T 2359   12/1886 07/1951
SR D1M 0-4-2T 2361   01/1887 03/1948
SR E1-1 0-6-0T 2160   07/1891 12/1951
SR E1-1 0-6-0T 2162   11/1891 11/1949
SR E1-1 0-6-0T 2164   12/1891 06/1948
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2364   06/1892 10/1952
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2365   06/1892 13/12/1952
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2366   07/1892 03/1949
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2367   07/1892 02/1949
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2368   08/1892 03/1953
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2370   10/1892 09/1948
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2371   12/1892 10/1948
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2372   12/1892 05/1953
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2373   12/1892 11/1948
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2374   12/1892 02/1949
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2376   04/1893 05/1953
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2377   05/1893 09/1948
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2378   05/1893 07/08/1952
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2379   07/1893 12/1952
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2380   07/1893 05/1953
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2383   12/1893 12/1948
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2384   12/1893 11/1953
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2385   12/1893 18/07/1953
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2386   12/1893 06/1952
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2387   04/1894 03/1949
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2388   05/1894 15/12/1951
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2389   05/1894 12/03/1949
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2390   05/1894 01/10/1955
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2391   06/1894 12/1952
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2165   11/1894 07/11/1959
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2166   11/1894 26/09/1959
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2167   12/1894 01/10/1955
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2168   12/1894 28/01/1956
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2169   12/1894 08/1955
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2170   12/1894 13/07/1957
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2453   04/1895 08/1955
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2454   05/1895 29/03/1958
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2455   05/1895 24/02/1958
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2456   05/1895 15/08/1959
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2457   12/1895 05/1949
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2458   12/1895 09/03/1957
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2459   12/1895 02/06/1956
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2460   12/1895 04/1956
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2461   12/1895 06/04/1957
SR Small Radials 0-6-2T 2462   12/1895 11/05/1957
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2393   04/1896 10/1951
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2394   04/1896 12/1951
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2395   05/1896 30/06/1949
SR D3X 0-4-4T 2397   11/1896 07/1948
SR Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 2398   11/1896 12/03/1949
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2463   12/1897 09/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2464   12/1897 04/02/1956
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2465   04/1898 04/1955
SR E4X 0-6-2T 2466   04/1898 13/12/1958
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2467   05/1898 26/04/1958
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2468   05/1898 20/01/1963
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2469   06/1898 07/10/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2470   06/1898 23/06/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2471   06/1898 12/09/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2472   06/1898 30/06/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2473   06/1898 27/10/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2474   08/1898 19/05/1963
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2475   10/1898 24/06/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2476   10/1898 20/04/1957
SR E4X 0-6-2T 2477   10/1898 17/01/1959
SR E4X 0-6-2T 2478   11/1898 08/1956
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2479   12/1898 02/06/1963
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2480   12/1898 07/11/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2481   12/1898 12/04/1958
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2482   12/1898 11/1955
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2484   05/1899 17/09/1960
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2485   05/1899 07/12/1957
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2486   05/1899 24/01/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2487   06/1899 23/12/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2488   06/1899 08/06/1957
SR E4X 0-6-2T 2489   06/1899 07/05/1955
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2490   06/1899 17/12/1955
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2491   09/1899 14/01/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2492   10/1899 04/05/1957
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2493   11/1899 08/02/1958
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2494   11/1899 19/09/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2495   11/1899 17/09/1960
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2052   12/1899 12/1951
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2496   12/1899 11/1955
SR Scotchmen 4-4-0 2054   05/1900 06/1951
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2497   05/1900 07/11/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2498   05/1900 11/11/1961
SR Scotchmen 4-4-0 2044   06/1900 09/1948
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2499   06/1900 01/06/1957
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2500   06/1900 27/01/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2501   06/1900 08/1955
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2502   06/1900 08/02/1958
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2503   08/1900 14/04/1963
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2504   09/1900 25/11/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2505   10/1900 25/03/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2506   10/1900 24/06/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2507   12/1900 04/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2508   12/1900 30/01/1960
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2509   12/1900 31/03/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2510   12/1900 29/09/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2556   01/1901 09/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2511   02/1901 10/1956
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2512   02/1901 27/05/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2513   03/1901 14/01/1956
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2514   03/1901 10/1956
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2515   04/1901 20/05/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2516   04/1901 15/10/1955
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2517   06/1901 06/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2518   06/1901 04/06/1955
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2519   06/1901 12/09/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2520   06/1901 12/01/1957
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2557   09/1901 23/12/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2558   10/1901 11/1956
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2559   10/1901 06/1960
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2560   11/1901 08/1958
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2561   11/1901 06/1956
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2562   12/1901 06/08/1960
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2563   12/1901 08/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2564   12/1901 23/09/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2565   05/1902 06/1961
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2045   06/1902 12/1951
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2566   06/1902 25/04/1959
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2567   10/1902 11/1949
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2568   10/1902 12/02/1955
SR E5X 0-6-2T 2570   11/1902 14/01/1956
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2571   12/1902 14/01/1956
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2572   12/1902 03/1949
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2573   02/1903 08/1953
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2574   02/1903 23/06/1951
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2575   03/1903 12/1951
SR E5X 0-6-2T 2576   03/1903 09/07/1955
SR Greybacks 4-4-0 2043   06/1903 12/1951
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2577   06/1903 24/10/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2578   06/1903 22/04/1961
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2579   07/1903 14/11/1959
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2580   07/1903 17/04/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2581   09/1903 17/04/1962
SR Radials 0-6-2T 2582   09/1903 29/10/1956
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2583   11/1903 21/01/1956
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2584   11/1903 02/1951
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2585   12/1903 06/1954
SR E5X 0-6-2T 2586   12/1903 04/1955
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2587   12/1903 11/1954
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2588   12/1903 12/12/1953
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2589   03/1904 01/1949
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2590   04/1904 09/1951
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2591   04/1904 27/11/1954
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2592   04/1904 05/1953
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2593   05/1904 14/01/1956
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2399   06/1904 07/1953
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2400   06/1904 01/12/1951
SR E5X 0-6-2T 2401   06/1904 08/1954
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2594   06/1904 03/1951
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2402   09/1904 03/1951
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2404   10/1904 12/1951
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2405   11/1904 12/1951
SR Large Radials 0-6-2T 2406   11/1904 09/1951
SR E6X 0-6-2T 2407   12/1904 11/1957
SR E6 0-6-2T 2408   12/1904 23/12/1962
SR E6 0-6-2T 2409   12/1904 18/01/1958
SR E6 0-6-2T 2410   03/1905 17/06/1961
SR E6X 0-6-2T 2411   05/1905 14/02/1959
SR E6 0-6-2T 2412   07/1905 07/09/1957
SR E6 0-6-2T 2413   07/1905 02/1958
SR E6 0-6-2T 2414   10/1905 07/06/1958
SR E6 0-6-2T 2415   10/1905 23/09/1961
SR E6 0-6-2T 2416   11/1905 10/02/1962
SR E6 0-6-2T 2417   12/1905 23/12/1962
SR E6 0-6-2T 2418   12/1905 23/12/1962
SR Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2300   03/1906 14/07/1951
SR Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2301   06/1906 03/1951
SR Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2303   06/1906 10/1951
SR Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2302   08/1906 12/01/1952
SR Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2307   08/1906 05/1949
SR Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2309   09/1906 01/1949
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2595   09/1906 06/1951
SR Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2308   11/1906 11/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2596   11/1906 06/1951
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2598   12/1906 07/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2599   01/1907 09/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2601   03/1907 02/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2602   04/1907 06/1951
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2604   04/1907 09/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2001   06/1907 07/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2603   06/1907 04/1951
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2002   07/1907 07/1951
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2003   07/1907 07/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2004   08/1907 11/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2005   09/1907 09/06/1951
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2006   10/1907 07/1948
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2007   10/1907 09/1948
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2021   10/1907 10/1951
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2008   11/1907 06/1951
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2009   12/1907 05/1951
SR I1X 4-4-2T 2010   12/1907 07/1948
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2022   03/1908 05/05/1951
SR Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2306   08/1908 12/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2023   02/1909 28/07/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2025   03/1909 01/1950
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2026   03/1909 09/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2027   05/1909 02/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2028   12/1909 10/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2029   12/1909 03/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2030   03/1910 09/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2075   03/1910 12/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2076   03/1910 09/12/1950
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2077   10/1910 03/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2078   11/1910 02/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2079   11/1910 04/11/1950
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2080   12/1910 03/1950
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2081   12/1910 09/1951
SR Pacific Tanks 4-6-2T 2325   12/1910 30/06/1951
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2421   06/1911 25/08/1956
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2422   07/1911 10/1956
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2423   09/1911 05/1949
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2424   09/1911 04/1958
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2425   12/1911 10/1956
SR Atlantics 4-4-2 2426   01/1912 25/08/1956
SR Pacific Tanks 4-6-2T 2326   03/1912 02/06/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2085   06/1912 24/06/1950
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2082   08/1912 23/06/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2083   08/1912 23/06/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2084   08/1912 03/03/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2086   09/1912 06/10/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2087   11/1912 11/1950
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2088   11/1912 11/1950
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2089   12/1912 14/04/1951
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2090   03/1913 12/1950
SR Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2091   03/1913 06/1952
SR E2 0-6-0T 2100   06/1913 11/11/1961
SR E2 0-6-0T 2101   08/1913 15/09/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2337   09/1913 08/12/1962
SR E2 0-6-0T 2102   10/1913 07/10/1961
SR E2 0-6-0T 2103   12/1913 06/10/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2338   12/1913 30/12/1962
SR E2 0-6-0T 2104   01/1914 28/04/1963
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2339   03/1914 10/11/1962
SR Rememberance 4-6-0 2327   04/1914 07/01/1956
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2340   06/1914 23/12/1962
SR Rememberance 4-6-0 2328   09/1914 02/1955
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2341   11/1914 30/12/1962
SR E2 0-6-0T 2105   08/1915 15/09/1962
SR E2 0-6-0T 2106   09/1915 06/10/1962
SR E2 0-6-0T 2107   03/1916 25/02/1961
SR E2 0-6-0T 2108   07/1916 06/1961
SR E2 0-6-0T 2109   10/1916 28/04/1963
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2342   10/1916 30/12/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2343   11/1916 23/12/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2344   12/1916 24/11/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2345   12/1916 29/12/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2346   12/1916 24/11/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2347   12/1920 22/12/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2348   12/1920 10/11/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2349   12/1920 24/11/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2350   12/1920 24/11/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2351   01/1921 24/11/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2352   02/1921 24/11/1962
SR Moguls 2-6-0 2353   03/1921 30/12/1962
SR Rememberance 4-6-0 2329   10/1921 08/1956
SR Rememberance 4-6-0 2330   12/1921 13/08/1955
SR Rememberance 4-6-0 2331   12/1921 20/07/1957
SR Rememberance 4-6-0 2333   04/1922 14/04/1956
SR Rememberance 4-6-0 2332   09/1922 14/01/1956
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1809   02/1928 02/01/1966
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1613   06/1928 05/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1803   06/1928 13/03/1966
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1804   06/1928 14/06/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1806   06/1928 05/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1807   06/1928 05/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1612   07/1928 12/05/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1614   07/1928 30/11/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1808   07/1928 05/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1610   08/1928 30/12/1962
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1611   08/1928 20/10/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1615   08/1928 06/10/1963
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1616   09/1928 14/06/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1617   10/1928 05/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1618   10/1928 12/01/1964
SR U Boats 2-6-0 1619   12/1928 19/12/1965
SR Z 0-8-0T 956   03/1929 22/12/1962
SR Z 0-8-0T 950   04/1929 20/10/1962
SR Z 0-8-0T 951   05/1929 24/11/1962
SR Z 0-8-0T 952   05/1929 24/11/1962
SR Z 0-8-0T 953   06/1929 15/12/1962
SR Z 0-8-0T 955   07/1929 12/1962
SR Z 0-8-0T 957   08/1929 17/11/1962
SR Z 0-8-0T 954   09/1929 08/12/1962
SR Q1 0-6-0 C1   03/1942 17/05/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C2   05/1942 07/07/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C3   05/1942 14/06/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C4   06/1942 03/01/1965
SR Q1 0-6-0 C5   06/1942 16/06/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C6   06/1942 09/01/1966
SR Q1 0-6-0 C7   07/1942 26/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C8   07/1942 25/08/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C9   07/1942 26/09/1965
SR Q1 0-6-0 C10   08/1942 05/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C11   09/1942 25/08/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C12   09/1942 22/11/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C13   10/1942 07/07/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C14   10/1942 05/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C15   11/1942 15/11/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C16   11/1942 25/08/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C37   11/1942 06/10/1963
SR Q1 0-6-0 C38   12/1942 05/01/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C39   12/1942 14/06/1964
SR Q1 0-6-0 C40   12/1942 14/06/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8625   04/1943 18/06/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8626   05/1943 20/01/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8627   05/1943 05/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8628   05/1943 24/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8629   06/1943 09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8630   06/1943 31/07/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8631   06/1943 24/02/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8632   06/1943 02/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8613   07/1943 29/07/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8633   07/1943 05/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8614   08/1943 27/04/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8634   08/1943 14/08/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8635   08/1943 08/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8636   08/1943 02/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8615   09/1943 05/02/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8637   09/1943 16/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8638   09/1943 22/01/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8639   09/1943 03/02/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8616   10/1943 22/10/1960
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8640   10/1943 13/05/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8641   10/1943 15/11/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8642   10/1943 19/04/1964
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8617   11/1943 02/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8643   11/1943 10/06/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8644   11/1943 22/01/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8645   11/1943 27/05/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8646   11/1943 25/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8647   12/1943 23/04/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8648   12/1943 22/07/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8649   12/1943 06/02/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8679   12/1943 22/10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8680   12/1943 24/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8681   01/1944 22/07/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8682   01/1944 25/09/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8683   01/1944 17/02/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8684   01/1944 27/04/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8663   02/1944 03/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8664   02/1944 04/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8685   02/1944 22/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8686   02/1944 19/11/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8687   02/1944 25/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8688   02/1944 24/07/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8689   02/1944 05/07/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8665   03/1944 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8675   03/1944 16/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8690   03/1944 11/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8691   03/1944 19/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8692   03/1944 29/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8693   03/1944 22/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8666   04/1944 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8667   04/1944 19/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8676   04/1944 21/10/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8694   04/1944 12/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8695   04/1944 12/08/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8696   04/1944 30/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8697   04/1944 23/12/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8668   05/1944 31/12/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8669   05/1944 04/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8677   05/1944 13/01/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8698   05/1944 02/04/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8699   05/1944 16/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8700   05/1944 09/03/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8701   05/1944 04/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8702   05/1944 04/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8678   06/1944 29/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8703   06/1944 25/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8704   06/1944 11/09/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7651   06/1944 04/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7652   06/1944 12/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7653   06/1944 15/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7654   06/1944 15/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7655   06/1944 15/07/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 8670   07/1944 10/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7656   07/1944 17/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7657   07/1944 07/01/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7658   07/1944 10/06/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7659   07/1944 05/03/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7660 933 07/1944 04/11/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7661   07/1944 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0     07/1944 21/08/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0     07/1944 01/04/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7664   08/1944 23/04/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7665   08/1944 21/08/1965
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7666   08/1944 29/06/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7667   08/1944 09/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7668   08/1944 11/05/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7669   08/1944 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7670   09/1944 28/10/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7671   09/1944 02/09/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7672   09/1944 17/09/1966
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7673   09/1944 03/08/1968
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7674   09/1944 11/03/1967
LMS 8F 2-8-0 7675   09/1944 23/12/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C102   06/1945 02/04/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C101   06/1945 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C104   06/1945 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C103   06/1945 20/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C105   07/1945 02/10/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C107   08/1945 17/10/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C106   08/1945 19/03/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C110   09/1945 07/03/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C109   09/1945 02/10/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C108   09/1945 25/06/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C113   10/1945 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C112   10/1945 11/12/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C111   10/1945 30/11/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C116   11/1945 14/06/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C115   11/1945 16/04/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C114   11/1945 21/03/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C120   12/1945 14/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C119   12/1945 19/03/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C118   12/1945 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C117   12/1945 02/10/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C122   01/1946 25/04/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C121   01/1946 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C124   02/1946 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C123   02/1946 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C125   03/1946 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C128   04/1946 31/05/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C127   04/1946 09/08/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C126   04/1946 18/09/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C130   05/1946 14/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C129   05/1946 13/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C133   06/1946 19/12/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C132   06/1946 02/10/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C131   06/1946 07/02/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C134   07/1946 02/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C136   07/1946 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C135   07/1946 01/06/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C137   08/1946 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C141   09/1946 23/01/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C140   09/1946 02/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C139   09/1946 09/05/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C138   09/1946 12/06/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C145   10/1946 28/06/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C144   10/1946 21/05/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C143   10/1946 29/06/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C142   10/1946 03/10/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C148   11/1946 13/03/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C147   11/1946 25/06/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C146   11/1946 10/10/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C152   12/1946 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C151   12/1946 10/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C150   12/1946 29/08/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C149   12/1946 12/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C154   01/1947 14/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C153   01/1947 17/10/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C156   02/1947 07/05/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C155   02/1947 09/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C158   03/1947 11/10/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C157   03/1947 07/05/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C161   04/1947 16/08/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C160   04/1947 06/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C159   04/1947 29/05/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C163   05/1947 15/08/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C162   05/1947 08/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C165   07/1947 13/04/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C164   07/1947 22/05/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C166   09/1947 04/09/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C167   09/1947 02/11/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C169   10/1947 30/11/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C168   10/1947 12/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C170   11/1947 10/08/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34072   04/1948 25/10/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2     04/1948 30/04/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34074   05/1948 01/06/1963
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34073   05/1948 28/06/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34076   06/1948 09/01/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34075   06/1948 13/04/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34079   07/1948 27/02/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34078   07/1948 14/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34077   07/1948 26/03/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34080   08/1948 14/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34082   09/1948 24/04/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34081   09/1948 16/08/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34083   10/1948 08/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34085   11/1948 26/09/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34084   11/1948 03/10/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34089   12/1948 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34088   12/1948 19/03/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34087   12/1948 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34086   12/1948 19/06/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34090   02/1949 09/07/1967
SR Leader 0-6-6-0T 36001   06/1949 11/1950
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34092   09/1949 29/11/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34091   09/1949 20/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34094   10/1949 30/08/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34093   10/1949 09/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34096   11/1949 14/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34098   12/1949 25/06/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34100   12/1949 02/07/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34103   02/1950 26/09/1965
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34106   03/1950 14/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34105   03/1950 04/10/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34108   04/1950 25/06/1967
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34107   04/1950 14/09/1964
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34109   05/1950 14/09/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42096   15/07/1950 24/12/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42097   21/07/1950 08/12/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42098   28/07/1950 23/02/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42099   18/08/1950 05/12/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42100   25/08/1950 02/03/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42101   01/09/1950 09/02/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42102   08/09/1950 17/12/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42103   14/09/1950 22/05/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42104   20/09/1950 02/10/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42105   27/09/1950 17/12/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42106   03/10/1950 08/05/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42066   10/10/1950 09/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42067   13/10/1950 23/02/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42068   20/10/1950 14/12/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42069   26/10/1950 19/11/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42070   02/11/1950 26/06/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42071   06/11/1950 18/03/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42072   12/11/1950 10/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42073   17/11/1950 10/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42074   24/11/1950 04/09/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42075   30/11/1950 22/05/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42076   07/12/1950 18/03/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42077   14/12/1950 27/06/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42078   21/12/1950 18/06/1966
SR West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34110   01/1951 30/11/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42079   04/01/1951 06/05/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42080   12/01/1951 14/01/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42081   24/01/1951 06/05/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42082   01/02/1951 19/06/1965
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42083   09/02/1951 10/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42084   19/02/1951 05/12/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42085   27/02/1951 10/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42086   10/03/1951 01/04/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42087   17/03/1951 08/10/1966
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42088   30/03/1951 03/11/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42089   06/04/1951 24/10/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42090   15/04/1951 13/06/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42091   25/04/1951 19/10/1963
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42092   03/05/1951 25/07/1964
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42093   22/05/1951 10/1967
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42094   01/06/1951 16/11/1962
LMS 4P 2-6-4T 42095   09/06/1951 04/06/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80010   10/07/1951 14/06/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80011   21/07/1951 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80012   17/08/1951 19/03/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80013   28/08/1951 19/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80014   05/09/1951 02/05/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80015   14/09/1951 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80016   20/09/1951 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80017   08/10/1951 13/09/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80018   13/10/1951 11/04/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80019   20/10/1951 19/03/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80020   27/10/1951 26/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80021   10/11/1951 13/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80022   20/11/1951 26/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80023   27/11/1951 02/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80024   07/12/1951 24/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80025   13/12/1951 24/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80026   20/12/1951 02/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80027   04/01/1952 29/11/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80028   11/01/1952 26/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80029   22/01/1952 16/12/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80031   02/02/1952 20/09/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80030   05/02/1952 08/06/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80032   04/03/1952 29/01/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80033   18/03/1952 02/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80034   05/04/1952 02/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80035   17/05/1952 21/04/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80036   24/05/1952 09/11/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80037   24/05/1952 07/03/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80038   07/06/1952 07/09/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80039   18/06/1952 21/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80040   27/06/1952 06/05/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80041   05/07/1952 07/03/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80042   15/07/1952 06/02/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80043   24/07/1952 07/03/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80044   21/08/1952 14/11/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80045   04/09/1952 01/05/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80046   17/09/1952 01/05/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80047   30/09/1952 24/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80048   13/10/1952 17/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80049   24/10/1952 08/06/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80050   06/11/1952 21/11/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80051   21/11/1952 17/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80052   05/12/1952 07/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80053   22/12/1952 07/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80059   03/03/1953 18/11/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80060   19/03/1953 07/02/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80061   08/04/1953 31/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80062   29/04/1953 12/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80063   19/05/1953 24/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80064   09/06/1953 25/08/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80065   25/06/1953 04/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80066   15/07/1953 13/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80067   04/08/1953 03/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80068   21/08/1953 02/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80069   30/09/1953 23/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80070   09/10/1953 20/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80071   21/10/1953 30/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80072   03/11/1953 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80073   13/11/1953 30/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80074   27/11/1953 30/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80075   10/12/1953 30/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80076   23/12/1953 30/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80077   12/01/1954 12/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80078   02/02/1954 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80079   05/03/1954 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80080   18/03/1954 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80081   31/03/1954 08/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80082   15/04/1954 04/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80083   03/05/1954 07/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80084   14/05/1954 13/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80117   19/05/1954 03/03/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80085   28/05/1954 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80086   14/06/1954 01/05/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80087   29/06/1954 14/06/1964
  D16/2 1Co-Co1 10203   07/1954 07/12/1963
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80088   14/07/1954 13/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80089   03/08/1954 02/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80090   12/08/1954 27/03/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80091   10/09/1954 29/11/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80092   24/09/1954 26/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80093   11/10/1954 26/09/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80094   25/10/1954 31/07/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80095   13/11/1954 02/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80096   23/11/1954 26/12/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80097   09/12/1954 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80098   22/12/1954 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80099   17/01/1955 08/05/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80100   31/01/1955 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80101   07/02/1955 17/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80102   01/03/1955 05/12/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80103   16/03/1955 29/08/1962
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80104   31/03/1955 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80105   19/04/1955 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80116   04/05/1955 01/05/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80118   15/06/1955 29/11/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80119   21/06/1955 29/05/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80120   06/07/1955 01/05/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80121   22/07/1955 02/06/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80122   08/08/1955 31/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80123   09/09/1955 17/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80124   22/09/1955 09/12/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80125   06/10/1955 10/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80126   20/10/1955 19/11/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80127   07/11/1955 30/07/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80128   23/11/1955 04/04/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80129   09/12/1955 10/10/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80130   22/12/1955 17/08/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80131   02/03/1956 08/05/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80132   15/03/1956 09/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80133   28/03/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80134   20/04/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80135   30/04/1956 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80136   11/05/1956 24/07/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80137   28/05/1956 31/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80138   12/06/1956 02/10/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80139   26/06/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80140   10/07/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80141   25/07/1956 09/01/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80142   09/08/1956 03/03/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80143   10/09/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80144   25/09/1956 15/05/1966
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80145   16/10/1956 25/06/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80146   30/10/1956 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80147   15/11/1956 13/06/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80148   29/11/1956 14/06/1964
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80149   13/12/1956 07/03/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80150   28/12/1956 17/10/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80151   18/01/1957 07/05/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80152   06/02/1957 09/07/1967
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80153   25/02/1957 07/03/1965
BR Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80154   26/03/1957 02/04/1967