Manufacturer: Brush Traction, Loughborough
Company | Class | Wheels | Number as Built | Order Number | Works Number | Date Built | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ES1 | Bo-Bo | 1 | 1902 | 14/09/1964 | |||
ES1 | Bo-Bo | 2 | 1902 | 14/09/1964 | |||
PM | P&M ST | 0-4-0ST | 5 | 301 | 1903 | 06/1929 | |
PM | P&M ST | 0-4-0ST | 6 | 314 | 1906 | 09/1928 | |
30 | A1A-A1A | D5500 | 10/10/1957 | 10/07/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5501 | 25/11/1957 | 10/07/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5502 | 16/12/1957 | 01/01/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5503 | 09/01/1958 | 03/02/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5504 | 30/01/1958 | 05/10/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5505 | 20/02/1958 | 03/02/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5506 | 13/03/1958 | 05/01/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5508 | 17/04/1958 | 01/10/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5507 | 19/04/1958 | 04/11/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5509 | 01/05/1958 | 10/07/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5510 | 16/05/1958 | 10/07/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5511 | 05/06/1958 | 10/07/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5512 | 19/06/1958 | 04/11/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5513 | 13/07/1958 | 01/03/1979 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5514 | 24/07/1958 | 01/11/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5515 | 31/07/1958 | 04/05/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5516 | 04/09/1958 | 10/07/1976 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5517 | 25/09/1958 | 04/05/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5518 | 16/10/1958 | 11/01/1993 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5519 | 12/12/1958 | 05/10/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5520 | 26/02/1959 | 11/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5521 | 05/03/1959 | 05/10/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5522 | 12/03/1959 | 06/10/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5523 | 19/03/1959 | 01/05/1997 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5524 | 26/03/1959 | 01/11/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5525 | 09/04/1959 | 31/10/2008 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5526 | 16/04/1959 | 27/09/1991 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5527 | 23/04/1959 | 11/03/1988 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5528 | 30/04/1959 | 31/05/2006 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5529 | 07/05/1959 | 12/06/1983 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5530 | 14/05/1959 | 01/05/1997 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5531 | 21/05/1959 | 30/07/2004 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5532 | 04/06/1959 | 01/11/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5533 | 04/06/1959 | 01/02/2001 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5534 | 11/06/1959 | 04/02/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5535 | 18/06/1959 | 11/03/1987 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5536 | 18/06/1959 | 20/02/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5537 | 25/06/1959 | 09/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5538 | 02/07/1959 | 27/09/1991 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5539 | 09/07/1959 | 01/09/1988 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5540 | 16/07/1959 | 22/01/1987 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5541 | 23/07/1959 | 16/03/1992 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5542 | 30/07/1959 | 25/05/1990 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5543 | 30/07/1959 | 12/1994 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5544 | 20/08/1959 | 14/01/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5546 | 27/08/1959 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5547 | 27/08/1959 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5548 | 03/09/1959 | 08/1997 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5549 | 10/09/1959 | 22/03/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5551 | 10/09/1959 | 01/12/1998 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5552 | 17/09/1959 | 14/01/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5550 | 24/09/1959 | 16/06/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5553 | 24/09/1959 | 04/02/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5554 | 01/10/1959 | 24/08/1980 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5555 | 01/10/1959 | 01/12/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5545 | 08/10/1959 | 21/06/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5556 | 08/10/1959 | 02/02/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5557 | 15/10/1959 | 01/09/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5558 | 22/10/1959 | 01/03/1997 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5559 | 22/10/1959 | 25/01/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5560 | 29/10/1959 | 05/05/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5561 | 29/10/1959 | 12/12/1988 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5562 | 05/11/1959 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5563 | 12/11/1959 | 14/01/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5564 | 12/11/1959 | 24/03/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5565 | 19/11/1959 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5566 | 19/11/1959 | 01/07/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5567 | 26/11/1959 | 05/05/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5568 | 03/12/1959 | 04/10/1975 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5569 | 03/12/1959 | 01/10/1986 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5570 | 10/12/1959 | 01/06/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5571 | 10/12/1959 | 01/05/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5572 | 17/12/1959 | 31/05/2006 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5573 | 17/12/1959 | 26/05/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5574 | 23/12/1959 | 28/02/1992 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5575 | 23/12/1959 | 01/05/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5576 | 31/12/1959 | 07/07/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5577 | 31/12/1959 | 12/06/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5578 | 07/01/1960 | 14/01/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5579 | 07/01/1960 | 01/07/1991 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5580 | 14/01/1960 | 01/05/1992 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5581 | 14/01/1960 | 19/01/1999 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5582 | 21/01/1960 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5583 | 21/01/1960 | 21/01/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5584 | 25/01/1960 | 19/01/1999 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5585 | 25/01/1960 | 27/09/1988 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5586 | 04/02/1960 | 20/12/1991 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5587 | 04/02/1960 | 01/02/1994 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5588 | 11/02/1960 | 08/01/1990 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5589 | 11/02/1960 | 31/03/1988 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5590 | 18/02/1960 | 31/10/2003 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5591 | 18/02/1960 | 01/01/2001 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5592 | 25/02/1960 | 20/03/1992 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5593 | 25/02/1960 | 14/04/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5594 | 03/03/1960 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5595 | 03/03/1960 | 02/03/1987 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5596 | 10/03/1960 | 04/02/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5597 | 10/03/1960 | 27/04/1987 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5598 | 17/03/1960 | 01/07/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5599 | 17/03/1960 | 23/06/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5600 | 24/03/1960 | 01/11/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5601 | 24/03/1960 | 03/03/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5602 | 31/03/1960 | 13/03/2003 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5603 | 31/03/1960 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5604 | 07/04/1960 | 08/07/1988 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5605 | 07/04/1960 | 21/02/1991 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5606 | 14/04/1960 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5607 | 14/04/1960 | 04/02/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5608 | 21/04/1960 | 31/03/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5609 | 21/04/1960 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5610 | 28/04/1960 | 03/03/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5611 | 28/04/1960 | 24/01/1999 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5612 | 05/05/1960 | 26/05/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5613 | 05/05/1960 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5614 | 12/05/1960 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5615 | 12/05/1960 | 10/10/1982 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5616 | 19/05/1960 | 04/01/1991 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5617 | 19/05/1960 | 01/05/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5618 | 26/05/1960 | 01/02/1999 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5619 | 26/05/1960 | 04/02/1988 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5620 | 02/06/1960 | 26/02/1993 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5621 | 02/06/1960 | 01/09/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5622 | 09/06/1960 | 16/03/1990 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5623 | 223 | 09/06/1960 | 05/05/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5624 | 224 | 16/06/1960 | 30/06/2007 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5625 | 225 | 16/06/1960 | 24/03/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5626 | 226 | 23/06/1960 | 28/10/1988 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5627 | 227 | 23/06/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5628 | 228 | 30/06/1960 | 01/03/1987 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5629 | 229 | 30/06/1960 | 18/02/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5630 | 230 | 07/07/1960 | 30/11/2006 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5631 | 231 | 07/07/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5632 | 232 | 14/07/1960 | 13/03/1990 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5633 | 233 | 14/07/1960 | 15/05/2003 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5634 | 234 | 21/07/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5635 | 235 | 21/07/1960 | 01/01/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5636 | 236 | 28/07/1960 | 16/12/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5637 | 237 | 28/07/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5638 | 238 | 11/08/1960 | 15/05/1983 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5639 | 239 | 11/08/1960 | 04/06/1993 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5640 | 240 | 18/08/1960 | 31/05/2006 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5641 | 241 | 18/08/1960 | 01/03/1998 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5642 | 242 | 18/08/1960 | 08/07/1993 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5643 | 243 | 25/08/1960 | 20/04/1988 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5644 | 244 | 25/08/1960 | 18/02/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5645 | 245 | 01/09/1960 | 01/03/1996 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5646 | 246 | 01/09/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5647 | 247 | 01/09/1960 | 30/08/1991 | ||
D2/11 | 0-4-0 | D2999 | 04/09/1960 | 15/10/1967 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5648 | 248 | 08/09/1960 | 13/10/1988 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5649 | 249 | 08/09/1960 | 16/12/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5650 | 250 | 15/09/1960 | 30/06/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5651 | 251 | 15/09/1960 | 07/03/1989 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5652 | 252 | 22/09/1960 | 03/01/1989 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5653 | 253 | 22/09/1960 | 16/12/1988 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5654 | 254 | 29/09/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5655 | 255 | 29/09/1960 | 10/08/2001 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5656 | 256 | 06/10/1960 | 04/01/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5657 | 257 | 06/10/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5658 | 258 | 13/10/1960 | 22/01/1990 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5671 | 271 | 13/10/1960 | 08/04/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5659 | 259 | 20/10/1960 | 26/05/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5660 | 260 | 20/10/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5661 | 261 | 27/10/1960 | 11/06/1993 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5662 | 262 | 27/10/1960 | 26/05/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5663 | 263 | 03/11/1960 | 01/07/1995 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5664 | 264 | 03/11/1960 | 16/06/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5665 | 265 | 10/11/1960 | 14/01/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5666 | 266 | 10/11/1960 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5667 | 267 | 17/11/1960 | 17/01/1990 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5668 | 268 | 17/11/1960 | 14/03/1982 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5669 | 269 | 24/11/1960 | 30/06/2003 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5672 | 272 | 24/11/1960 | 31/05/1983 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5673 | 273 | 01/12/1960 | 05/01/1987 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5674 | 274 | 01/12/1960 | 01/09/1996 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5675 | 275 | 08/12/1960 | 04/02/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5676 | 276 | 08/12/1960 | 31/03/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5677 | 277 | 15/12/1960 | 16/12/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5678 | 278 | 15/12/1960 | 11/02/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5679 | 279 | 22/12/1960 | 01/09/1993 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5680 | 281 | 22/12/1960 | 31/03/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5670 | 270 | 05/01/1961 | 14/12/1998 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5681 | 282 | 05/01/1961 | 01/01/1995 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5682 | 283 | 12/01/1961 | 01/12/1979 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5683 | 284 | 19/01/1961 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5684 | 285 | 26/01/1961 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5685 | 286 | 02/02/1961 | 10/09/1990 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5686 | 287 | 09/02/1961 | 01/11/1998 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5687 | 288 | 16/02/1961 | 02/03/1989 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5688 | 289 | 23/02/1961 | 12/01/1990 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5689 | 290 | 02/03/1961 | 05/01/1987 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5690 | 291 | 09/03/1961 | 29/05/1983 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5691 | 292 | 16/03/1961 | 30/11/2005 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5692 | 293 | 23/03/1961 | 31/05/2006 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5693 | 294 | 30/03/1961 | 10/08/2001 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5694 | 295 | 13/04/1961 | 08/04/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5695 | 296 | 20/04/1961 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5699 | 300 | 27/04/1961 | 01/11/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5696 | 297 | 04/05/1961 | 01/12/1992 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5697 | 298 | 11/05/1961 | 01/12/1995 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5698 | 299 | 18/05/1961 | 11/02/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5800 | 301 | 01/06/1961 | 26/05/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5801 | 302 | 08/06/1961 | 01/05/1997 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5802 | 303 | 15/06/1961 | 15/08/1995 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5803 | 304 | 22/06/1961 | 12/04/2001 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5804 | 305 | 29/06/1961 | 01/09/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5805 | 306 | 06/07/1961 | 31/01/2005 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5806 | 307 | 13/07/1961 | 11/02/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5807 | 308 | 20/07/1961 | 01/02/1995 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5808 | 309 | 20/07/1961 | 29/03/1989 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5809 | 310 | 27/07/1961 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5810 | 311 | 03/08/1961 | 24/10/1988 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5811 | 312 | 24/08/1961 | 15/05/1989 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5812 | 313 | 31/08/1961 | 01/05/1997 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5813 | 314 | 07/09/1961 | 17/01/1994 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5814 | 315 | 14/09/1961 | 01/02/1999 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5815 | 316 | 21/09/1961 | 03/11/1989 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5816 | 317 | 28/09/1961 | 30/08/1989 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5817 | 318 | 05/10/1961 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5818 | 319 | 12/10/1961 | 20/12/1991 | ||
53 | Co-Co | D0280 | 280 | 13/10/1961 | 05/10/1975 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5819 | 320 | 19/10/1961 | 09/09/1987 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5820 | 321 | 26/10/1961 | 08/04/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5821 | 322 | 02/11/1961 | 01/03/1992 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5822 | 323 | 09/11/1961 | 04/02/2000 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5823 | 324 | 16/11/1961 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5824 | 325 | 23/11/1961 | 01/07/1995 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5825 | 326 | 30/11/1961 | 07/02/1990 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5826 | 07/12/1961 | 09/11/1990 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5827 | 14/12/1961 | 04/02/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5828 | 28/12/1961 | 01/01/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5829 | 04/01/1962 | 01/12/1993 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5830 | 11/01/1962 | 01/02/1998 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5831 | 18/01/1962 | 06/07/1987 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5832 | 01/02/1962 | 10/10/1990 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5833 | 15/02/1962 | 01/05/1997 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5834 | 01/03/1962 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5836 | 12/04/1962 | 01/01/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5837 | 19/04/1962 | 14/01/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5835 | 26/04/1962 | 14/01/2000 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5838 | 26/04/1962 | 08/11/1991 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5839 | 03/05/1962 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5840 | 10/05/1962 | 01/03/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5841 | 17/05/1962 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5842 | 24/05/1962 | 01/10/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5843 | 31/05/1962 | 08/04/1991 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5844 | 07/06/1962 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5845 | 14/06/1962 | 07/02/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5846 | 21/06/1962 | 14/01/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5847 | 28/06/1962 | 31/05/1983 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5848 | 05/07/1962 | 19/09/1982 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5849 | 12/07/1962 | 01/04/1998 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5850 | 18/07/1962 | 01/11/1995 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5851 | 26/07/1962 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5852 | 02/08/1962 | 01/03/1996 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5853 | 23/08/1962 | 30/04/2007 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5854 | 23/08/1962 | 28/04/1990 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5855 | 30/08/1962 | ||||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5856 | 30/08/1962 | 30/11/2005 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5857 | 06/09/1962 | 28/07/1989 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5858 | 20/09/1962 | 08/06/1989 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1500 | 342 | 28/09/1962 | 05/06/1992 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5859 | 04/10/1962 | 16/04/1993 | |||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5860 | 396 | 11/10/1962 | 01/01/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5861 | 397 | 18/10/1962 | 01/09/1991 | ||
30 | A1A-A1A | D5862 | 25/10/1962 | ||||
47 | Co-Co | D1501 | 343 | 13/11/1962 | 01/06/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1502 | 344 | 30/11/1962 | 28/09/1986 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1503 | 345 | 31/12/1962 | 05/06/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1504 | 346 | 03/01/1963 | 02/03/1986 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1505 | 347 | 11/01/1963 | 13/08/1990 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1506 | 348 | 18/01/1963 | 13/08/1990 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1507 | 349 | 18/01/1963 | 20/07/1986 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1508 | 350 | 23/01/1963 | 31/08/1986 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1509 | 351 | 04/02/1963 | 05/06/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1510 | 352 | 26/02/1963 | 30/06/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1511 | 353 | 28/02/1963 | 12/05/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1512 | 354 | 08/03/1963 | 09/08/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1513 | 355 | 15/03/1963 | 07/03/1986 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1514 | 356 | 22/03/1963 | 30/04/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1515 | 357 | 29/03/1963 | 07/03/1986 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1516 | 358 | 10/04/1963 | 24/02/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1517 | 359 | 19/04/1963 | 04/02/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1519 | 361 | 26/04/1963 | 05/06/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1518 | 360 | 10/05/1963 | 11/02/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1520 | 413 | 05/06/1963 | 27/09/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1521 | 414 | 07/06/1963 | 25/11/1986 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1523 | 416 | 12/06/1963 | 05/07/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1522 | 415 | 14/06/1963 | 24/06/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1524 | 417 | 14/06/1963 | 31/08/2006 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1525 | 418 | 14/06/1963 | 01/08/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1526 | 419 | 21/06/1963 | 04/11/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1527 | 420 | 03/07/1963 | 27/07/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1528 | 421 | 05/07/1963 | 27/09/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1529 | 422 | 05/07/1963 | 27/09/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1530 | 423 | 15/07/1963 | 17/10/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1531 | 424 | 15/07/1963 | 18/01/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1532 | 425 | 26/07/1963 | 01/03/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1533 | 426 | 06/08/1963 | 15/12/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1534 | 427 | 16/08/1963 | 15/12/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1535 | 428 | 22/08/1963 | 05/02/1990 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1536 | 429 | 22/08/1963 | 25/01/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1537 | 430 | 31/08/1963 | 11/12/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1538 | 431 | 07/09/1963 | 03/04/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1539 | 432 | 07/09/1963 | 15/12/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1540 | 433 | 14/09/1963 | 25/02/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1542 | 435 | 20/09/1963 | 21/02/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1541 | 434 | 27/09/1963 | 26/01/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1543 | 436 | 27/09/1963 | 05/07/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1544 | 437 | 05/10/1963 | 11/05/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1545 | 438 | 05/10/1963 | 27/07/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1548 | 441 | 17/10/1963 | 03/05/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1546 | 439 | 18/10/1963 | 12/12/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1547 | 440 | 24/10/1963 | 14/04/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1549 | 442 | 26/10/1963 | 31/12/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1682 | 444 | 31/10/1963 | 22/09/1995 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1683 | 445 | 31/10/1963 | 06/10/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1685 | 447 | 08/11/1963 | 22/06/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1686 | 448 | 08/11/1963 | 12/11/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1684 | 446 | 11/11/1963 | 04/04/1990 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1687 | 449 | 16/11/1963 | 17/07/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1688 | 450 | 21/11/1963 | 13/03/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1689 | 451 | 21/11/1963 | 06/07/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1690 | 452 | 29/11/1963 | 22/09/1995 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1691 | 453 | 29/11/1963 | 14/07/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1692 | 454 | 30/11/1963 | 10/06/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1693 | 455 | 06/12/1963 | 13/12/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1694 | 456 | 11/12/1963 | 29/02/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1695 | 457 | 11/12/1963 | 22/06/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1696 | 458 | 12/12/1963 | 17/03/1994 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1697 | 459 | 21/12/1963 | 10/08/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1699 | 461 | 28/12/1963 | 28/02/1986 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1701 | 463 | 11/01/1964 | 19/01/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1707 | 469 | 11/01/1964 | 07/12/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1698 | 460 | 13/01/1964 | 02/05/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1700 | 462 | 13/01/1964 | 22/11/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1709 | 471 | 17/01/1964 | 01/03/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1708 | 470 | 18/01/1964 | 15/05/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1710 | 472 | 20/01/1964 | 24/09/1996 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1711 | 473 | 20/01/1964 | 03/09/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1712 | 474 | 28/01/1964 | 07/07/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1713 | 475 | 28/01/1964 | 30/06/2008 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1714 | 476 | 01/02/1964 | 05/06/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1715 | 477 | 08/02/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1716 | 478 | 18/02/1964 | 31/10/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1718 | 480 | 18/02/1964 | 01/09/1996 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1719 | 481 | 25/02/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1717 | 479 | 28/02/1964 | 01/01/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1720 | 482 | 06/03/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1721 | 483 | 06/03/1964 | 04/03/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1722 | 484 | 13/03/1964 | 23/02/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1723 | 485 | 17/03/1964 | 01/05/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1724 | 486 | 17/03/1964 | 01/08/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1725 | 487 | 24/03/1964 | 01/07/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1726 | 488 | 24/03/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1727 | 489 | 09/04/1964 | 01/02/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1729 | 491 | 09/04/1964 | 03/08/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1728 | 490 | 21/04/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1736 | 498 | 22/04/1964 | 01/12/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1730 | 492 | 28/04/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1732 | 494 | 28/04/1964 | 29/02/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1734 | 496 | 23/05/1964 | 19/03/1965 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1735 | 497 | 23/05/1964 | 28/04/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1758 | 520 | 23/05/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1737 | 499 | 25/05/1964 | 25/08/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1738 | 500 | 28/05/1964 | 01/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1742 | 504 | 29/05/1964 | 01/01/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1739 | 501 | 04/06/1964 | 30/06/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1741 | 503 | 09/06/1964 | 22/07/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1733 | 495 | 12/06/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1740 | 502 | 12/06/1964 | 28/04/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1731 | 493 | 16/06/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1743 | 505 | 19/06/1964 | 31/07/2008 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1744 | 506 | 19/06/1964 | 01/10/1995 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1745 | 507 | 01/07/1964 | 31/07/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1748 | 510 | 01/07/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1746 | 508 | 03/07/1964 | 01/06/2002 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1747 | 509 | 03/07/1964 | 01/06/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1750 | 512 | 07/07/1964 | 30/09/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1749 | 511 | 10/07/1964 | 31/01/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1751 | 513 | 14/07/1964 | 01/03/2001 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1752 | 514 | 21/07/1964 | 17/05/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1753 | 515 | 21/07/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1755 | 517 | 14/08/1964 | 01/02/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1754 | 516 | 19/08/1964 | 01/12/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1759 | 521 | 25/08/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1761 | 523 | 01/09/1964 | 01/11/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1762 | 524 | 01/09/1964 | 01/04/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1756 | 518 | 04/09/1964 | 14/01/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1760 | 522 | 08/09/1964 | 01/02/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1764 | 526 | 08/09/1964 | 01/11/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1763 | 525 | 12/09/1964 | 01/06/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1757 | 519 | 17/09/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1766 | 528 | 22/09/1964 | 01/12/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1765 | 527 | 05/10/1964 | 01/02/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1770 | 532 | 05/10/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1772 | 534 | 05/10/1964 | 01/08/1995 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1771 | 533 | 14/10/1964 | 01/11/1996 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1774 | 536 | 19/10/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1769 | 531 | 22/10/1964 | 01/12/1996 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1776 | 538 | 22/10/1964 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1775 | 537 | 23/10/1964 | 01/03/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1778 | 540 | 23/10/1964 | 01/02/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1767 | 529 | 29/10/1964 | 01/02/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1779 | 541 | 29/10/1964 | 01/02/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1768 | 530 | 30/10/1964 | 01/05/2001 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1780 | 542 | 30/10/1964 | 01/09/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1777 | 539 | 06/11/1964 | 01/11/2001 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1781 | 543 | 07/11/1964 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1784 | 546 | 07/11/1964 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1782 | 544 | 14/11/1964 | 31/01/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1783 | 545 | 14/11/1964 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1786 | 548 | 26/11/1964 | 31/01/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1787 | 549 | 26/11/1964 | 31/05/2006 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1789 | 551 | 27/11/1964 | 31/01/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1785 | 547 | 09/12/1964 | 16/06/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1788 | 550 | 09/12/1964 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1790 | 552 | 10/12/1964 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1791 | 553 | 10/12/1964 | 28/02/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1793 | 555 | 11/12/1964 | 28/02/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1794 | 556 | 11/12/1964 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1797 | 559 | 06/01/1965 | 31/12/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1795 | 557 | 08/01/1965 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1796 | 558 | 08/01/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1792 | 554 | 14/01/1965 | 22/11/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1800 | 562 | 14/01/1965 | 14/07/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1801 | 563 | 14/01/1965 | 10/08/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1799 | 561 | 21/01/1965 | 30/07/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1803 | 565 | 21/01/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1805 | 567 | 21/01/1965 | 17/07/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1802 | 564 | 22/01/1965 | 22/09/1995 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1807 | 569 | 25/01/1965 | 31/08/2006 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1806 | 568 | 26/01/1965 | 07/03/1996 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1809 | 571 | 27/01/1965 | 30/06/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1798 | 560 | 29/01/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1808 | 570 | 30/01/1965 | 19/02/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1812 | 574 | 02/02/1965 | 31/07/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1810 | 572 | 09/02/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1811 | 573 | 09/02/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1816 | 578 | 09/02/1965 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1819 | 581 | 12/02/1965 | 30/04/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1804 | 566 | 16/02/1965 | 30/06/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1820 | 582 | 17/02/1965 | 21/01/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1815 | 577 | 18/02/1965 | 30/09/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1818 | 580 | 18/02/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1813 | 575 | 22/02/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1814 | 576 | 25/02/1965 | 21/01/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1817 | 579 | 01/03/1965 | 28/06/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1822 | 584 | 05/03/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1823 | 585 | 05/03/1965 | 25/11/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1829 | 591 | 05/03/1965 | 30/11/2006 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1821 | 583 | 10/03/1965 | 01/06/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1824 | 586 | 10/03/1965 | 29/06/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1828 | 590 | 10/03/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1826 | 588 | 11/03/1965 | 30/06/2006 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1827 | 589 | 18/03/1965 | 28/01/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1830 | 592 | 18/03/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1825 | 587 | 22/03/1965 | 01/07/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1834 | 596 | 31/03/1965 | 30/09/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1832 | 594 | 07/04/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1836 | 598 | 07/04/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1839 | 601 | 21/04/1965 | 16/03/1989 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1831 | 593 | 27/04/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1833 | 595 | 27/04/1965 | 14/07/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1841 | 603 | 27/04/1965 | 25/06/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1835 | 597 | 30/04/1965 | 31/03/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1837 | 599 | 04/05/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1838 | 600 | 10/05/1965 | 31/08/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1864 | 626 | 11/05/1965 | 11/11/1994 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1862 | 624 | 13/05/1965 | 31/01/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1865 | 627 | 28/05/1965 | 01/03/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1866 | 628 | 28/05/1965 | 01/04/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1868 | 630 | 28/05/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1873 | 635 | 28/05/1965 | 31/01/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1863 | 625 | 11/06/1965 | 31/08/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1870 | 632 | 11/06/1965 | 02/07/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1877 | 639 | 11/06/1965 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1878 | 640 | 11/06/1965 | 28/01/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1869 | 631 | 17/06/1965 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1872 | 634 | 17/06/1965 | 25/08/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1871 | 633 | 18/06/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1874 | 636 | 18/06/1965 | 31/10/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1876 | 638 | 18/06/1965 | 11/05/2001 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1881 | 643 | 18/06/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1840 | 602 | 29/06/1965 | 11/11/1994 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1867 | 629 | 02/07/1965 | 30/06/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1875 | 637 | 02/07/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1882 | 644 | 02/07/1965 | 31/10/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1884 | 646 | 06/07/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1879 | 641 | 07/07/1965 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1883 | 645 | 09/07/1965 | 01/12/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1885 | 647 | 09/07/1965 | 28/01/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1889 | 651 | 23/07/1965 | 01/01/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1890 | 652 | 23/07/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1888 | 650 | 30/07/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1891 | 653 | 06/08/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1892 | 654 | 06/08/1965 | 05/06/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1893 | 655 | 13/08/1965 | 31/07/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1887 | 649 | 17/08/1965 | 31/10/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1898 | 660 | 24/08/1965 | 14/01/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1886 | 648 | 26/08/1965 | 31/12/2002 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1899 | 661 | 26/08/1965 | 30/07/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1895 | 657 | 01/09/1965 | 31/12/2002 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1897 | 659 | 02/09/1965 | 25/08/1998 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1900 | 662 | 02/09/1965 | 05/06/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1896 | 658 | 07/09/1965 | 31/07/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1903 | 665 | 09/09/1965 | 06/05/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1904 | 666 | 09/09/1965 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1773 | 535 | 15/09/1965 | 01/02/2004 | ||
48 | Co-Co | D1703 | 465 | 17/09/1965 | 09/04/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1907 | 669 | 17/09/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1901 | 663 | 20/09/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1905 | 667 | 23/09/1965 | 31/12/2006 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1902 | 664 | 06/10/1965 | 28/02/2007 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1906 | 668 | 07/10/1965 | 14/01/1987 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1908 | 670 | 07/10/1965 | 12/08/1969 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1909 | 671 | 19/10/1965 | 01/09/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1910 | 672 | 22/10/1965 | 04/02/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1911 | 673 | 26/10/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1912 | 674 | 26/10/1965 | 25/11/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1913 | 675 | 28/10/1965 | 31/05/2006 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1914 | 676 | 01/11/1965 | |||
48 | Co-Co | D1702 | 464 | 04/11/1965 | 30/09/2004 | ||
48 | Co-Co | D1705 | 467 | 04/11/1965 | 17/07/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1918 | 680 | 16/11/1965 | 30/06/2005 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1916 | 678 | 18/11/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1919 | 681 | 22/11/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1920 | 682 | 30/11/1965 | 01/03/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1894 | 656 | 03/12/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1915 | 677 | 03/12/1965 | 05/10/2001 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1917 | 679 | 03/12/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1921 | 683 | 03/12/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1922 | 684 | 09/12/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1923 | 685 | 16/12/1965 | 01/10/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1924 | 686 | 20/12/1965 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1925 | 687 | 22/12/1965 | 01/01/2004 | ||
48 | Co-Co | D1706 | 468 | 31/12/1965 | 01/03/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1926 | 688 | 01/01/1966 | 07/03/1996 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1928 | 690 | 21/01/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1927 | 689 | 31/01/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1929 | 691 | 07/02/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1880 | 642 | 10/02/1966 | 31/08/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1930 | 692 | 12/02/1966 | 01/11/1996 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1931 | 693 | 21/02/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1932 | 694 | 24/02/1966 | 01/12/2003 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1933 | 695 | 02/03/1966 | 01/04/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1934 | 696 | 18/03/1966 | 28/01/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1935 | 697 | 18/03/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1936 | 698 | 26/03/1966 | 01/04/1995 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1937 | 699 | 07/04/1966 | 01/05/1997 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1939 | 701 | 15/04/1966 | 01/06/1999 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1938 | 700 | 27/04/1966 | 30/09/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1940 | 702 | 16/06/1966 | 01/09/1996 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1942 | 704 | 16/06/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1943 | 705 | 27/06/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1944 | 706 | 29/06/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1945 | 707 | 30/06/1966 | 01/03/1997 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1947 | 709 | 04/07/1966 | 01/04/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1946 | 708 | 06/07/1966 | 01/03/2000 | ||
48 | Co-Co | D1704 | 466 | 21/07/1966 | 27/07/1990 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1941 | 703 | 27/07/1966 | 01/06/2000 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1948 | 610 | 01/08/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1949 | 611 | 25/08/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1950 | 612 | 09/09/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1951 | 613 | 14/10/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1952 | 614 | 27/10/1966 | 14/05/1993 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1954 | 616 | 11/11/1966 | 01/07/1988 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1953 | 615 | 16/11/1966 | 27/11/1992 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1955 | 617 | 29/11/1966 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1956 | 618 | 22/12/1966 | 01/04/1995 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1957 | 619 | 28/01/1967 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1958 | 620 | 25/02/1967 | 01/10/1991 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1959 | 621 | 25/02/1967 | 28/02/2004 | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1960 | 622 | 11/11/1967 | |||
KESTREL | Co-Co | HS4000 | 711 | 28/01/1968 | |||
47 | Co-Co | D1961 | 623 | 03/05/1968 | 28/03/1991 | ||
60 | Co-Co | 60017 | 30/10/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60018 | 30/10/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60023 | 08/11/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60028 | 09/11/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60030 | 21/11/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60029 | 26/11/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60019 | 03/12/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60032 | 03/12/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60025 | 12/12/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60026 | 12/12/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60034 | 12/12/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60024 | 17/12/1990 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60010 | 21/01/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60022 | 21/01/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60020 | 31/01/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60027 | 07/02/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60094 | 20/02/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60033 | 22/02/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60038 | 04/03/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60050 | 08/03/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60045 | 25/03/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60048 | 03/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60037 | 04/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60046 | 04/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60047 | 04/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60051 | 10/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60006 | 23/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60035 | 23/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60005 | 25/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60053 | 25/04/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60031 | 02/05/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60054 | 03/05/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60049 | 07/05/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60058 | 07/05/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60039 | 09/05/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60052 | 09/05/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60056 | 24/05/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60042 | 29/05/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60057 | 01/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60055 | 06/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60061 | 06/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60004 | 08/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60063 | 13/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60062 | 17/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60041 | 20/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60036 | 25/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60043 | 26/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60060 | 28/06/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60044 | 03/07/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60059 | 05/07/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60066 | 22/08/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60064 | 28/08/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60001 | 29/08/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60069 | 02/09/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60065 | 17/09/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60071 | 19/09/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60067 | 20/09/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60011 | 11/10/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60068 | 16/10/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60072 | 21/10/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60070 | 28/10/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60012 | 22/11/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60073 | 22/11/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60076 | 22/11/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60077 | 22/11/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60080 | 23/11/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60074 | 25/11/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60078 | 26/11/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60081 | 03/12/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60082 | 03/12/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60075 | 04/12/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60085 | 13/12/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60021 | 14/12/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60087 | 18/12/1991 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60089 | 08/01/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60086 | 16/01/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60079 | 17/01/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60099 | 18/01/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60088 | 20/01/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60003 | 30/01/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60092 | 31/01/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60090 | 03/02/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60091 | 03/02/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60007 | 05/02/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60040 | 06/02/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60093 | 21/02/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60095 | 13/03/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60083 | 27/03/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60096 | 13/05/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60002 | 08/12/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60008 | 08/12/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60100 | 09/12/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60097 | 22/12/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60098 | 22/12/1992 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60014 | 06/01/1993 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60084 | 11/01/1993 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60013 | 29/01/1993 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60016 | 09/02/1993 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60009 | 11/02/1993 | ||||
60 | Co-Co | 60015 | 24/03/1993 |