Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 582 Today
» 1212 Yesterday
» 582 Week
» 28973 Month
» 154450 Year
» 231037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

List of Manufacturers


Code Builder Name Location Date Opened Date Closed Type Steam Diesel Electric Map Web
AB Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock   1859-12-31   Private 38 50      
AW Armstrong Whitworth   1897-00-00   Private 550        
AS Ashford Works         396 33 2    
AEI Associated Electrical Industries       Private          
AEC Associated Equipment Company       Private          
BA Bagnall       Private 47        
BY Barclay       Private          
BW Barry Works       Private          
BM Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow       Private 218        
BP Beyer Peacock Ltd.       Private 533 167 10    
BC Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company       Private 25 214 25    
BS Borsig (Germany)       Private 10        
BO Bow Works   1853-00-00 1960-00-00   14        
BK Bricklayer's Arms       SR          
BN Brighton Works         738        
BR British Railways       Private          
BE British Railways Engineering Ltd.                  
BT British Thompson Houston Co. Ltd.       Private   44      
BB Brown Boveri, Switzerland       Private          
BH Brush Traction, Loughborough       Private   675      
CP Caerphilly Works   1899-00-00 1963-06-29 Private          
CL Clayton Equipment Co. Ltd., Hatton, Derby       Private   88      
CO Cowlairs Works   1841-00-00 1968-12-00   513        
CW Crewe Works         3156 543 44    
DU Dübs & Co Polmadie, Glasgow 1864-00-00 1903-04-01 Private 203        
DA Darlington Works     1966-04-02   1768 506      
DE Derby Works         1906 987      
DIS Didcot Shops (GWR)                  
DO Doncaster Works         1217 252 105    
DR Drewry Car Co. Ltd.       Private   141      
EH Eastleigh Works         319   7    
EL Electroputere, Craiova, Romania       Private   30      
EE English Electric Vulcan Foundry       Private 118 641 118    
EP English Electric, Preston       Private          
HI F.C. Hibberd & Co.       Private   1      
FE Fell Developments Ltd. / BR Derby       Private          
FO Fowler       Private          
GD Gateshead Works Gateshead       177        
GA General Motors - Alstom at Valencia, Spain       Private          
GC General Motors EMD, London, Ontario, Canada       Private          
GM General Motors, La Grange, Illinois, U.S.A.       Private          
GCW Gloucester Carriage and Wagon Company       Private          
GO Gorton Works   1845-12-00 1963-05-00   486   64    
HP H K Porter USA     Private 1        
HL Hawthorne Leslie       Private 76 1      
HO Horwich Works         894 169      
HC Hudswell Clarke       Private 57 20      
HU Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.       Private 103 72      
IV Inverurie Works       Private 7        
KS Kerr Stuart       Private 87        
KM Kilmarnock Works       Private          
KI Kitson       Private 285        
LAS Laira Shops       Private          
LG Lochgorm Works Lochgorm, Inverness     HR 4        
LH Longhedge Works         19        
MW Manning, Wardle & Co.       Private 14        
MC Metropolitan Cammell Birmingham 1863-00-00 2005-00-00 Private          
MV Metropolitan Vickers       Private   21      
NW Nasmyth Wilson Patricroft, Greater Manchester 1867-12-00 1939-12-00 Private 46        
NEA Neasden       Private          
NS Neilson, Reid & Co. Springburn, Glasgow 1876-00-00 1903-04-01 Private 339        
NAS Newton Abbot       Private          
NE Nine Elms Works       LSWR 464        
NB North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow Polmadie and Springburn, Glasgow 1903-04-01 1963-04-03 Private 2263 260 10    
OS Oswestry Works       Private          
RS Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Darlington     Private 387 180      
RR Rolls Royce       Private          
RH Ruston & Hornsby Lincoln     Private   20      
SE Sentinel       Private 7        
SS Sharp Stewart Springburn, Glasgow 1828-00-00 1903-04-01 Private 356        
SI Simplex, Bedford       Private 7 3      
SAC Societe Alsacienne des Constructions Mechaniques Belfort, Alsace, France     Private          
SA Southern Railway - Ashford & Brighton Works                  
SR St. Rollox Works Glasgow 1853-00-00     684        
ST Stratford Works   1847-00-00 1962-00-00   1147        
SW Swindon Works         3727 279      
TH Thomas Hill       Private          
?? Unknown Works       Private          
VF Vulcan Foundry       Private 1035        
VI Vulcan Ironwork (USA) USA     Private 13        
WW Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)   1855-00-00 1964-06-01 GWR 189        
WO Worcester Works       GWR          
YE Yorkshire Engine Company       Private 135 21