Miscellaneous Reports
Number | Date To Service | Depot When New | Info | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D5500 | 10/10/1957 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5501 | 25/11/1957 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5502 | 16/12/1957 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 01/01/1980 | |||
D5503 | 09/01/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 03/02/1980 | |||
D5504 | 30/01/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 05/10/1980 | |||
D5505 | 20/02/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 03/02/1980 | |||
D5506 | 13/03/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 05/01/1980 | |||
D5507 | 19/04/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 04/11/1976 | |||
D5508 | 17/04/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 01/10/1980 | |||
D5509 | 01/05/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5510 | 16/05/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5511 | 05/06/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5512 | 19/06/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 04/11/1976 | |||
D5513 | 13/07/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 01/03/1979 | |||
D5514 | 24/07/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 01/11/1976 | |||
D5515 | 31/07/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 04/05/1980 | |||
D5516 | 04/09/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 10/07/1976 | |||
D5517 | 25/09/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 04/05/1980 | |||
D5518 | 16/10/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators. Involved in a collision in 1967 and was rebuilt as a class 31/1 using parts from D5658. This included 4-digit route indicators and electro-pneumatic control gear. | 11/01/1993 | |||
D5519 | 12/12/1958 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 05/10/1980 | |||
D5520 | 26/02/1959 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 11/1996 | |||
D5521 | 05/03/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | 05/10/1980 | |||
D5522 | 12/03/1959 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 06/10/1995 | |||
D5523 | 19/03/1959 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5524 | 26/03/1959 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 01/11/1995 | |||
D5525 | 09/04/1959 | March | Disc Indicators | 31/10/2008 | |||
D5526 | 16/04/1959 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 27/09/1991 | |||
D5527 | 23/04/1959 | Stratford | Disc Indicators | 11/03/1988 | |||
D5528 | 30/04/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | Disc Indicators | 31/05/2006 | |||
D5529 | 07/05/1959 | March | Disc Indicators | 12/06/1983 | |||
D5530 | 14/05/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5531 | 21/05/1959 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 30/07/2004 | |||
D5532 | 04/06/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 01/11/1995 | |||
D5533 | 04/06/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 01/02/2001 | |||
D5534 | 11/06/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5535 | 18/06/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | Disc Indicators | 11/03/1987 | |||
D5536 | 18/06/1959 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 20/02/1989 | |||
D5537 | 25/06/1959 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 09/1995 | |||
D5538 | 02/07/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 27/09/1991 | |||
D5539 | 09/07/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | 01/09/1988 | |||
D5540 | 16/07/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 22/01/1987 | |||
D5541 | 23/07/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 16/03/1992 | |||
D5542 | 30/07/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | 25/05/1990 | |||
D5543 | 30/07/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 12/1994 | |||
D5544 | 20/08/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5545 | 08/10/1959 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 21/06/1989 | |||
D5546 | 27/08/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5547 | 27/08/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | ||||
D5548 | 03/09/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 08/1997 | |||
D5549 | 10/09/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 22/03/1989 | |||
D5550 | 24/09/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 16/06/2000 | |||
D5551 | 10/09/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | 01/12/1998 | |||
D5552 | 17/09/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5553 | 24/09/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5554 | 01/10/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 24/08/1980 | |||
D5555 | 01/10/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | 01/12/1995 | |||
D5556 | 08/10/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | 02/02/1989 | |||
D5557 | 15/10/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 01/09/1995 | |||
D5558 | 22/10/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 01/03/1997 | |||
D5559 | 22/10/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | 25/01/1989 | |||
D5560 | 29/10/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 05/05/2000 | |||
D5561 | 29/10/1959 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 12/12/1988 | |||
D5562 | 05/11/1959 | Ipswich | Disc Indicators | ||||
D5563 | 12/11/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5564 | 12/11/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 24/03/2000 | |||
D5565 | 19/11/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5566 | 19/11/1959 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 01/07/1995 | |||
D5567 | 26/11/1959 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 05/05/2000 | |||
D5568 | 03/12/1959 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 04/10/1975 | |||
D5569 | 03/12/1959 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 01/10/1986 | |||
D5570 | 10/12/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 01/06/1989 | |||
D5571 | 10/12/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 01/05/1996 | |||
D5572 | 17/12/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 31/05/2006 | |||
D5573 | 17/12/1959 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 26/05/2000 | |||
D5574 | 23/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 28/02/1992 | |||
D5575 | 23/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 01/05/1996 | |||
D5576 | 31/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 07/07/2000 | |||
D5577 | 31/12/1959 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 12/06/1996 | |||
D5578 | 07/01/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators. Delivered in Electric Blue livery. | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5579 | 07/01/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators. Delivered in Bronze Gold livery. | 01/07/1991 | |||
D5580 | 14/01/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 01/05/1992 | |||
D5581 | 14/01/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 19/01/1999 | |||
D5582 | 21/01/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5583 | 21/01/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 21/01/2000 | |||
D5584 | 25/01/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 19/01/1999 | |||
D5585 | 25/01/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 27/09/1988 | |||
D5586 | 04/02/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 20/12/1991 | |||
D5587 | 04/02/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 01/02/1994 | |||
D5588 | 11/02/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 08/01/1990 | |||
D5589 | 11/02/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 31/03/1988 | |||
D5590 | 18/02/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 31/10/2003 | |||
D5591 | 18/02/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 01/01/2001 | |||
D5592 | 25/02/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 20/03/1992 | |||
D5593 | 25/02/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 14/04/1989 | |||
D5594 | 03/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5595 | 03/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 02/03/1987 | |||
D5596 | 10/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5597 | 10/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 27/04/1987 | |||
D5598 | 17/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 01/07/1989 | |||
D5599 | 17/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 23/06/2000 | |||
D5600 | 24/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 01/11/1995 | |||
D5601 | 24/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 03/03/2000 | |||
D5602 | 31/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 13/03/2003 | |||
D5603 | 31/03/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5604 | 07/04/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 08/07/1988 | |||
D5605 | 07/04/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 21/02/1991 | |||
D5606 | 14/04/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5607 | 14/04/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5608 | 21/04/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | 31/03/2000 | |||
D5609 | 21/04/1960 | Hornsey | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5610 | 28/04/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 03/03/2000 | |||
D5611 | 28/04/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 24/01/1999 | |||
D5612 | 05/05/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 26/05/1989 | |||
D5613 | 05/05/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5614 | 12/05/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5615 | 12/05/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 10/10/1982 | |||
D5616 | 19/05/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 04/01/1991 | |||
D5617 | 19/05/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 01/05/1995 | |||
D5618 | 26/05/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 01/02/1999 | |||
D5619 | 26/05/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 04/02/1988 | |||
D5620 | 02/06/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 26/02/1993 | |||
D5621 | 02/06/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 01/09/1996 | |||
D5622 | 09/06/1960 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 16/03/1990 | |||
D5623 | 09/06/1960 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 05/05/2000 | |||
D5624 | 16/06/1960 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 30/06/2007 | |||
D5625 | 16/06/1960 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 24/03/2000 | |||
D5626 | 23/06/1960 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 28/10/1988 | |||
D5627 | 23/06/1960 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5628 | 30/06/1960 | Ipswich | 4-digit route indicators | 01/03/1987 | |||
D5629 | 30/06/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 18/02/2000 | |||
D5630 | 07/07/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | 30/11/2006 | |||
D5631 | 07/07/1960 | Norwich Thorpe | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5632 | 14/07/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 13/03/1990 | |||
D5633 | 14/07/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 15/05/2003 | |||
D5634 | 21/07/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5635 | 21/07/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 01/01/1991 | |||
D5636 | 28/07/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 16/12/1991 | |||
D5637 | 28/07/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5638 | 11/08/1960 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 15/05/1983 | |||
D5639 | 11/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 04/06/1993 | |||
D5640 | 18/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 31/05/2006 | |||
D5641 | 18/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 01/03/1998 | |||
D5642 | 18/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 08/07/1993 | |||
D5643 | 25/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 20/04/1988 | |||
D5644 | 25/08/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 18/02/2000 | |||
D5645 | 01/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 01/03/1996 | |||
D5646 | 01/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5647 | 01/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 30/08/1991 | |||
D5648 | 08/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 13/10/1988 | |||
D5649 | 08/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 16/12/1991 | |||
D5650 | 15/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 30/06/2000 | |||
D5651 | 15/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 07/03/1989 | |||
D5652 | 22/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 03/01/1989 | |||
D5653 | 22/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 16/12/1988 | |||
D5654 | 29/09/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5655 | 29/09/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 10/08/2001 | |||
D5656 | 06/10/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 04/01/1991 | |||
D5657 | 06/10/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5658 | 13/10/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 22/01/1990 | |||
D5659 | 20/10/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 26/05/2000 | |||
D5660 | 20/10/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5661 | 27/10/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 11/06/1993 | |||
D5662 | 27/10/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 26/05/2000 | |||
D5663 | 03/11/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 01/07/1995 | |||
D5664 | 03/11/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 16/06/2000 | |||
D5665 | 10/11/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5666 | 10/11/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5667 | 17/11/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 17/01/1990 | |||
D5668 | 17/11/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 14/03/1982 | |||
D5669 | 24/11/1960 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 30/06/2003 | |||
D5670 | 05/01/1961 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 14/12/1998 | |||
D5671 | 13/10/1960 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 08/04/1991 | |||
D5672 | 24/11/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 31/05/1983 | |||
D5673 | 01/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 05/01/1987 | |||
D5674 | 01/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 01/09/1996 | |||
D5675 | 08/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5676 | 08/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 31/03/2000 | |||
D5677 | 15/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 16/12/1991 | |||
D5678 | 15/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 11/02/2000 | |||
D5679 | 22/12/1960 | Finsbury Park | 4-digit route indicators | 01/09/1993 | |||
D5680 | 22/12/1960 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 31/03/2000 | |||
D5681 | 05/01/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/01/1995 | |||
D5682 | 12/01/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/12/1979 | |||
D5683 | 19/01/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5684 | 26/01/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5685 | 02/02/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 10/09/1990 | |||
D5686 | 09/02/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/11/1998 | |||
D5687 | 16/02/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 02/03/1989 | |||
D5688 | 23/02/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 12/01/1990 | |||
D5689 | 02/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 05/01/1987 | |||
D5690 | 09/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 29/05/1983 | |||
D5691 | 16/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 30/11/2005 | |||
D5692 | 23/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 31/05/2006 | |||
D5693 | 30/03/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 10/08/2001 | |||
D5694 | 13/04/1961 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 08/04/1991 | |||
D5695 | 20/04/1961 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5696 | 04/05/1961 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 01/12/1992 | |||
D5697 | 11/05/1961 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 01/12/1995 | |||
D5698 | 18/05/1961 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 11/02/2000 | |||
D5699 | 27/04/1961 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 01/11/1991 | |||
D5800 | 01/06/1961 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 26/05/2000 | |||
D5801 | 08/06/1961 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5802 | 15/06/1961 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 15/08/1995 | |||
D5803 | 22/06/1961 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 12/04/2001 | |||
D5804 | 29/06/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/09/1991 | |||
D5805 | 06/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 31/01/2005 | |||
D5806 | 13/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 11/02/2000 | |||
D5807 | 20/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/02/1995 | |||
D5808 | 20/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 29/03/1989 | |||
D5809 | 27/07/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5810 | 03/08/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 24/10/1988 | |||
D5811 | 24/08/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 15/05/1989 | |||
D5812 | 31/08/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5813 | 07/09/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 17/01/1994 | |||
D5814 | 14/09/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/02/1999 | |||
D5815 | 21/09/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 03/11/1989 | |||
D5816 | 28/09/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 30/08/1989 | |||
D5817 | 05/10/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5818 | 12/10/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 20/12/1991 | |||
D5819 | 19/10/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 09/09/1987 | |||
D5820 | 26/10/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 08/04/1991 | |||
D5821 | 02/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/03/1992 | |||
D5822 | 09/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5823 | 16/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5824 | 23/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/07/1995 | |||
D5825 | 30/11/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 07/02/1990 | |||
D5826 | 07/12/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 09/11/1990 | |||
D5827 | 14/12/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 04/02/2000 | |||
D5828 | 28/12/1961 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/01/1996 | |||
D5829 | 04/01/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/12/1993 | |||
D5830 | 11/01/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/02/1998 | |||
D5831 | 18/01/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 06/07/1987 | |||
D5832 | 01/02/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 10/10/1990 | |||
D5833 | 15/02/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/05/1997 | |||
D5834 | 01/03/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5835 | 26/04/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5836 | 12/04/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/01/1996 | |||
D5837 | 19/04/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 14/01/2000 | |||
D5838 | 26/04/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 08/11/1991 | |||
D5839 | 03/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5840 | 10/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/03/1996 | |||
D5841 | 17/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5842 | 24/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/10/1995 | |||
D5843 | 31/05/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 08/04/1991 | |||
D5844 | 07/06/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5845 | 14/06/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 07/02/1989 | |||
D5846 | 21/06/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 14/01/1996 | |||
D5847 | 28/06/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 31/05/1983 | |||
D5848 | 05/07/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 19/09/1982 | |||
D5849 | 12/07/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/04/1998 | |||
D5850 | 18/07/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/11/1995 | |||
D5851 | 26/07/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5852 | 02/08/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/03/1996 | |||
D5853 | 23/08/1962 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 30/04/2007 | |||
D5854 | 23/08/1962 | Stratford | 4-digit route indicators | 28/04/1990 | |||
D5855 | 30/08/1962 | March | 4-digit route indicators | ||||
D5856 | 30/08/1962 | March | 4-digit route indicators | 30/11/2005 | |||
D5857 | 06/09/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 28/07/1989 | |||
D5858 | 20/09/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 08/06/1989 | |||
D5859 | 04/10/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 16/04/1993 | |||
D5860 | 11/10/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/01/1991 | |||
D5861 | 18/10/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators | 01/09/1991 | |||
D5862 | 25/10/1962 | Sheffield Darnall | 4-digit route indicators |
The following reports are available.
- Build dates and withdrawal dates of several classes combined
- Weight/Height/Length/Wheelbase/Wheel Diameter comparisons of locomotive classes
- Maximum speed of locomotive classes
- Diesel locomotive classes by Power Unit
- Western Region Diesel Hydraulics lifespan
- Class 52 'Western' Liveries
- Timelines graph of up to ten classes of locomotive
- Locomotive classes by longevity
- Individual locomotives by longevity
- LNWR 0-8-0/2-8-0 rebuilds
- Snapshot of All Locomotives by Class on a user defined date
- Great Western 4-6-0 identification
- Early Casualties - Diesel and Electric
- Robinson GCR Class 8K/8M 2-8-0 (LNER Class O4/O5/O1) and ROD derivatives
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) re-engine schedule: Mirrlees to English Electric
- Brush Type 2 (Class 30/31) headcode style
- NBL Type 2 (Class 21/29) re-engine schedule: MAN to Paxman
- Incidents of fires on diesel locomotives, 1961-1964
If there are any reports you would like to see, please contact me - see the Contact tab above.