Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 446 Today
» 1080 Yesterday
» 2734 Week
» 26695 Month
» 189749 Year
» 266336 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Preserved Locomotives


Type Class Number Name Company To Service Withdrawn Date Preserved Status Last Updated Link
Diesel Peak 44004 GREAT GABLE   26/09/1959 30/11/1980   Unknown  
Diesel Peak 44008 PENYGHENT   15/12/1959 30/11/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45015     24/11/1960 03/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45132     30/03/1961 11/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45133     26/07/1961 10/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45041 ROYAL TANK REGIMENT   25/06/1962 08/06/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45112 ROYAL ARMY ORDNANCE CORPS   08/03/1962 07/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45118 ROYAL ARTILLERYMAN   03/05/1962 08/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45105     09/03/1961 10/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45135 3RD CARABINIER   03/05/1961 09/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45060 SHERWOOD FORESTER   08/05/1961 08/12/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45108     30/09/1961 04/08/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45125     28/10/1961 07/05/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 45 45149     30/12/1961 14/09/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 46 46010     16/12/1961 04/11/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 46 46035     02/07/1962 01/11/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 46 46045     27/09/1962 01/11/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 40 40122     14/03/1958 18/04/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 40 97407 AUREOL   25/05/1959 04/04/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 40 40013 ANDANIA   01/06/1959 18/10/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 40 40106     13/10/1960 21/04/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 40 97408     20/02/1961 26/02/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 40 97406     10/03/1961 16/12/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 40 40145     17/05/1961 10/06/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50050 Fearless   07/10/1967 01/03/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50002 Superb   23/12/1967 09/09/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50007 SIR EDWARD ELGAR   12/03/1968 31/03/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50008 Thunderer   22/03/1968 05/06/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50015 Valiant   02/04/1968 05/06/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50017 Royal Oak   06/04/1968 01/09/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50019 Ramillies   23/04/1968 19/09/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50021 Rodney   01/05/1968 17/04/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50026 Indomitable   12/06/1968 11/12/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50027 Lion   10/06/1968 23/07/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50029 Renown   21/06/1968 25/03/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50030 Repulse   25/06/1968 08/04/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50031 Hood   01/07/1968 01/08/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50033 Glorious   19/07/1968 25/03/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50035 Ark Royal   30/09/1968 01/08/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50040 Centurion   25/09/1968 03/08/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50042 Triumph   30/09/1968 01/10/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50044 Exeter   11/10/1968 01/01/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 50 50049 Defiance   11/12/1968 01/08/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 42 D821 GREYHOUND   25/05/1960 03/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 42 D832 ONSLAUGHT   08/02/1961 16/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1010 WESTERN CAMPAIGNER   15/10/1962 28/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1013 WESTERN RANGER   13/12/1962 28/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1015 WESTERN CHAMPION   21/01/1963 13/12/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1023 WESTERN FUSILIER   23/09/1963 28/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1041 WESTERN PRINCE   10/10/1962 23/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1048 WESTERN LADY   15/12/1962 28/02/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 52 D1062 WESTERN COURIER   06/05/1963 22/08/1974   Unknown  
Steam 1361 1363     06/1910 20/11/1962   Unknown  
Steam 1366 1369     16/02/1934 11/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47401     28/09/1962 05/06/1992 1994-12-00 Operational 12/04/2012 www.47401project.co.uk/
Diesel 47/0 47402     13/11/1962 01/06/1992 1993-12-00 Operational 11/04/2012 www.elrdiesel.info/
Diesel 47/0 47417     10/04/1963 24/02/1992 1994-12-00 Unserviceable 11/04/2012 www.47401project.co.uk/
Diesel 47/0 47004     14/06/1963 31/08/2006 2006-06-00 Operational 11/04/2012 www.pogo.org.uk/railway/
Diesel 47/0 47449     23/03/1964 14/05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47029     29/07/1964 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47564     12/09/1964 01/11/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47059     19/12/1964 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47609     01/02/1965 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47613 NORTH STAR   13/02/1965 01/05/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47484 ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL   20/02/1965 01/06/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47105     06/12/1963 13/12/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47117     04/11/1965 17/07/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47540     17/03/1964 01/05/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47490     24/03/1964 01/07/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47605     19/08/1964 01/12/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47541     14/08/1964 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47492     08/09/1964 01/02/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47580     01/09/1964 01/04/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47579     23/10/1964 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/3 47306     26/11/1964 31/05/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47192     14/05/1965 18/05/1988   Operational 15/09/2011 www.preserved-diesels.co.uk/engines/47192_index.htm
Diesel 47/0 47205     24/08/1965 30/09/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 47/3 47367     26/08/1965 31/12/2002   Unknown  
Diesel 47/3 47376     01/09/1965 31/12/2002   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47232     19/10/1965 01/09/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47701     24/02/1966 01/12/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47596     02/03/1966 01/04/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47715     30/06/1966 01/03/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47503     06/07/1966 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47269     22/10/1965 01/04/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47270     30/10/1965 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47292     16/04/1966 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 47/0 47295     03/06/1966 31/01/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03018     14/04/1958 09/11/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03020     06/05/1958 03/12/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03022     27/05/1958 07/11/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2023     12/08/1958 04/07/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2024     19/08/1958 04/07/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03027     16/09/1958 31/01/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03037     09/02/1959 29/09/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2041     13/04/1959 01/02/1970   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2046     13/12/1958 03/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2051     27/01/1959 14/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03059     29/05/1959 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03062     03/07/1959 12/10/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03063     14/07/1959 26/11/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03066     17/08/1959 08/01/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03069     19/09/1959 27/11/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2070     02/10/1959 28/11/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03072     31/10/1959 08/03/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03073     05/11/1959 23/05/1989 1991-01-18 Operational 15/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=3&loco=03073
Diesel 03 03078     24/12/1959 08/01/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 03 97805     07/01/1960 03/06/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03081     05/02/1960 12/10/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03084     19/03/1959 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03089     05/05/1960 06/11/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03090     05/05/1960 18/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03094     28/06/1960 08/01/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03099     15/07/1960 10/02/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03112     09/12/1960 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03113     23/12/1960 03/08/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2117     04/09/1959 09/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2118     17/09/1959 18/06/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03119     25/09/1959 23/02/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03120     08/10/1959 23/02/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03128     07/01/1960 04/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2133     23/02/1960 07/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03134     29/02/1960 04/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2138     05/04/1960 24/06/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2139     11/04/1960 11/05/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03141     04/05/1960 07/07/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03144     19/01/1961 23/02/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03145     12/02/1961 07/07/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2148     24/05/1960 19/11/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03152     22/06/1960 02/10/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03158     22/08/1960 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03162     21/09/1960 23/05/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03170     21/11/1960 03/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2178     09/01/1962 30/09/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03180     01/02/1962 31/03/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2182     05/03/1962 11/05/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2184     09/04/1962 28/12/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03189     31/03/1961 16/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2192     05/05/1961 25/01/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03196     08/06/1961 12/06/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03197     15/06/1961 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2199     29/06/1961 18/06/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 3" engines D2203     19/07/1952 16/12/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 3" engines D2205     14/03/1953 07/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 3" engines D2207     14/02/1953 16/12/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2229     28/11/1955 31/12/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2245     12/11/1956 28/12/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2246     06/12/1956 08/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2267     20/01/1958 31/12/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2271     14/03/1958 31/12/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 6" engines D2272     28/03/1958 24/10/1970   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2279     15/02/1960 23/05/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2280     25/02/1960 14/03/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2284     25/03/1960 11/04/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2298     11/10/1960 28/12/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2302     31/10/1960 07/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2310     22/12/1960 01/02/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2324     26/04/1961 08/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2325     29/04/1961 08/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2334     25/07/1961 08/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 7" engines D2337     30/08/1961 15/07/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03371     31/12/1958 26/11/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 03 D2381     27/10/1961 18/06/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 03 03399     21/10/1961 05/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 06 06003     14/02/1959 01/02/1981   Unknown  
Diesel D2/12 D2511     28/08/1961 30/12/1967   Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Diesel 3' 4" engines 05001     13/05/1956 01/01/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 9" engines D2578     18/11/1958 07/07/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 9" engines D2587     10/11/1959 30/12/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 3' 9" engines D2595     30/01/1960 08/06/1968   Unknown  
Diesel D2/10 D2767     17/08/1960 24/06/1967   Operational 11/01/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=101&loco=D2767
Diesel D2/10 D2774     11/10/1960 24/06/1967   Operational 11/01/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=101&loco=D2774
Steam 2800 2807     10/1905 03/1963   Unknown  
Steam 2800 2818     12/1905 10/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 02 02003     25/10/1960 01/06/1975 1997-00-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=02003
Diesel 02 D2854     04/11/1960 28/02/1970 1988-05-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2854
Steam 2800 2857     05/1918 04/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 02 D2858     21/12/1960 28/02/1970 2002-06-00 Unserviceable 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2858
Steam 2800 2859     05/1918 12/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 02 D2860     13/09/1961 13/12/1970 1973-00-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2860
Diesel 02 D2866     10/11/1961 28/02/1970 1987-10-00 Under Restoration/Overhaul 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2866
Diesel 02 D2867     17/11/1961 12/09/1970 1995-03-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2867
Diesel 02 D2868     27/11/1961 31/12/1969 2001-00-00 Operational 19/09/2011 www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2868
Steam 2800 2873     11/1918 12/1964   Unknown  
Steam 2800 2874     11/1918 05/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 01 D2953     24/01/1956 19/06/1966   Unknown  
Diesel 01 D2956     30/03/1956 29/05/1966   Unknown  
Diesel 07 D2988     16/06/1962 06/05/1973   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07006     13/07/1962 02/07/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07007     21/07/1962 06/05/1973   Operational 03/07/2012  
Diesel 07 07009     21/08/1962 04/10/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07010     05/09/1962 04/10/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07011     22/09/1962 02/07/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07012     06/10/1962 02/07/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 07 07013     20/10/1962 02/07/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3000     01/11/1952 19/11/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3002     01/11/1952 17/07/1972   Unknown  
Electric AL1/A 81002     27/02/1960 01/10/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3003     14/11/1952 17/07/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3014     31/12/1952 01/10/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08011     21/03/1953 13/12/1991 1992-04-25 Operational 19/03/2011 www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 08 08012     21/03/1953 01/06/1973   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08015     16/05/1953 21/09/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08016     13/06/1953 18/05/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08021     03/10/1953 07/12/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08022     03/10/1953 17/03/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3035     28/11/1953 17/12/1972   Unknown  
Electric AL3/A 83012     03/07/1961 01/03/1989   Unknown  
Electric 84 84001     26/03/1960 01/01/1979   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08026     28/11/1953 04/07/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08032     27/03/1954 25/08/1974   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08041     17/07/1954 08/08/1978   Unknown  
Electric 82 82008     30/10/1961 01/12/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08046     11/09/1954 18/05/1980   Unknown  
Electric 85 85006     20/12/1961 01/11/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08048     22/08/1953 12/12/1977   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08054     21/11/1953 16/02/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08060     19/12/1953 24/06/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08064     23/01/1958 23/12/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3101     05/02/1955 31/05/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D3137     02/03/1955 02/07/1970   Unknown  
Electric 86 86259     15/01/1966 10/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08102     24/08/1955 14/03/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08108     23/09/1955 08/07/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08114     18/10/1955 06/11/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08123     15/11/1955 20/03/1984   Unknown  
Electric 86 86101     11/11/1965 12/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08124     15/11/1955 01/03/1981   Unknown  
Electric 86 86213     02/12/1965 09/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3193     22/11/1955 16/09/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08131     08/12/1955 15/03/1981   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08133     16/12/1955 21/09/1980   Unknown  
Steam 2251 3205     18/10/1946 05/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08164     12/01/1956 23/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08168     07/02/1956 14/03/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3255     08/06/1955 30/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 D3261     05/07/1956 30/12/1972   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08195     23/08/1956 25/09/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08202     06/10/1956 23/05/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08220     14/12/1956 30/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08238     20/05/1956 18/03/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08266     20/02/1957 17/03/1985   Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Diesel 08 08288     28/06/1957 21/01/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08296     31/05/1957 30/10/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08350     07/12/1957 17/01/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08359     28/03/1958 22/01/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D3452     22/11/1957 22/06/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08377     27/06/1957 26/06/1983   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D3476     24/12/1957 01/06/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D3489     03/04/1958 06/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08388     14/04/1958 20/07/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08423     15/08/1958 24/11/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08436     03/10/1958 10/01/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08443     07/11/1958 07/07/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08444     07/11/1958 02/11/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08445     14/11/1958 20/07/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08447     28/11/1958 11/11/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08471     13/11/1958 09/09/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08473     28/11/1958 17/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08476     17/12/1958 09/09/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08479     01/09/1958 08/11/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08481     19/09/1958 31/08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08490     14/11/1958 18/12/1985   Unknown  
Steam 5700 3650     12/1939 09/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08499     29/03/1958 01/06/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 09 09002     03/02/1959 25/09/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 09 09004     17/02/1959 31/07/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08556     30/10/1959 03/07/1990   Unknown  
Steam 5700 3738     09/1937 08/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08576     20/06/1959 30/04/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08590     05/10/1959 27/09/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08594     13/11/1959 20/07/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08598     02/05/1959 10/11/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08600     16/05/1959 30/07/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08602     30/05/1959 30/03/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08604     13/06/1959 16/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08613     22/08/1959 01/12/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08628     21/11/1959 31/08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08631     05/12/1959 11/12/1992   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3802     29/12/1938 08/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08635     26/12/1959 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3803     07/01/1939 07/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08643     30/01/1959 2001   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3814     11/03/1940 12/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08650     18/03/1959 01/08/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08652     26/03/1959 20/06/1992   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3822     25/04/1940 01/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08669     02/01/1960 23/05/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08678     01/08/1959 30/10/1988   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3845     25/04/1942 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3850     11/06/1942 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3855     01/10/1942 08/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08694     21/11/1959 30/09/2008   Unknown  
Steam 2800 3862     04/11/1942 02/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08700     20/01/1960 29/06/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08704     29/02/1960 05/11/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08764     17/03/1961 06/05/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08767     06/04/1961 31/01/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08769     04/03/1960 23/05/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08772     16/03/1960 14/01/1994   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08773     19/03/1960 20/07/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08774     26/03/1960 20/09/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08780     18/04/1960 01/03/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08809     09/07/1960 01/12/1993   Unknown  
Steam Star 4003 LODE STAR   02/1907 07/1951   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08846     16/05/1961 13/10/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08850     01/06/1961 11/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08871     17/11/1960 27/10/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08873     25/11/1960 01/12/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D4067     02/05/1961 13/12/1970   Unknown  
Steam Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE   11/08/1923 10/05/1960   Unknown  
Steam Castle 4079 PENDENNIS CASTLE   04/03/1924 05/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 10 D4092     02/05/1962 01/09/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08881     23/08/1961 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4110     10/1936 06/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 09 09025     04/01/1962 31/08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 09 09026     21/01/1962 01/10/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08885     18/01/1962 07/05/1993   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4121     12/1937 06/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08896     12/04/1962 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08911     08/08/1962 01/05/2004   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4141     28/08/1946 03/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08913     23/08/1962 01/11/2005   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4144     10/09/1946 06/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08915     11/09/1962 01/02/2004   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4150     05/06/1947 06/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08927     28/12/1962 01/06/2005   Unknown  
Steam 5101 4160     06/09/1948 06/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08933     05/05/1962 30/09/2008   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08936     17/05/1962 11/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08937     24/05/1962 23/12/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08943     19/06/1962 20/07/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 08 08947     28/08/1962 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4247     03/1916 04/1964   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4248     04/1916 05/1963   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4253     03/1917 04/1963   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4270     12/1919 09/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4200 4277     04/1920 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 4500 4555     09/1924 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam 4500 4561     10/1924 05/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4500 4566     10/1924 04/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 4588     03/1937 07/1962   Unknown  
Steam 5700 4612     02/1942 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 1400 1420     11/1933 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 1400 1442     04/1935 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam 1400 1450     07/1935 05/1965   Unknown  
Steam 1400 1466     28/02/1936 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4920 DUMBLETON HALL   03/1929 03/12/1965   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4930 HAGLEY HALL   05/1929 12/1963 1972-00-00 Static Exhibit 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam Hall 4936 KINLET HALL   06/1929 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4942 MAINDY HALL   07/1929 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4953 PITCHFORD HALL   08/1929 05/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4979 WOOTON HALL   02/1930 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 4983 ALBERT HALL   01/1931 12/1963   Unknown  
Electric 71 71001     01/1959 11/1977   Unknown  
Steam Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE   28/05/1934 28/12/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 24 24032     29/07/1959 17/07/1976   Unknown  
Steam Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE   13/03/1936 16/12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Castle 5051 EARL BATHURST   24/05/1936 24/05/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 24 24054     18/12/1959 01/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 24 24061     15/01/1960 01/08/1975   Unknown  
Steam Castle 5080 DEFIANT   25/05/1939 11/04/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 24 24081     19/03/1960 05/10/1980   Unknown  
Steam 5101 5164     11/1930 04/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25035     22/05/1963 15/03/1987   Unknown  
Steam 5101 5193     10/1934 06/1962   Unknown  
Steam 5101 5199     11/1934 03/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25057     21/06/1963 15/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25059     21/06/1963 20/03/1987   Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Diesel 25 25067     02/08/1963 12/12/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25072     17/09/1963 05/12/1985   Unknown  
Steam 5205 5224     05/1924 04/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25083     19/12/1963 01/07/1984   Unknown  
Steam 5205 5239     08/1924 04/1963   Unknown  
Steam 7200 5264     03/1926 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam 7200 7229     03/1926 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam 7200 5275     07/1926 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam 7200 7200     07/1926 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam 7200 5277     08/1926 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam 7200 7202     08/1926 06/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26007     30/07/1958 04/10/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26001     12/09/1958 04/10/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26002     02/10/1958 09/10/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26004     31/10/1958 24/11/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26010     06/01/1959 04/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26011     09/01/1959 24/11/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/0 26014     30/01/1959 09/10/1992   Unknown  
Steam 4300 5322     08/1917 04/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26024     08/05/1959 09/10/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26025     14/05/1959 04/10/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26035     24/07/1959 10/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26038     28/08/1959 19/10/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26040     11/09/1959 04/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 26/1 26043     02/10/1959 19/01/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27001     30/06/1961 08/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27005     30/08/1961 10/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27007     13/09/1961 28/01/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27024     17/01/1962 01/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27066     18/05/1962 01/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27050     20/06/1962 01/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27056     10/07/1962 01/02/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 27 27059     30/08/1962 01/07/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31018     10/10/1957 10/07/1976   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31101     16/10/1958 11/01/1993   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5521     12/1927 04/1962   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31418     12/03/1959 06/10/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31108     16/04/1959 27/09/1991   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5526     05/1928 06/1962   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31113     21/05/1959 30/07/2004   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5532     06/1928 07/1962   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31115     04/06/1959 01/02/2001   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5539     07/1928 04/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5541     08/1928 07/1962   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5542     07/1928 12/1961   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5552     11/1928 10/1960   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5553     11/1928 11/1961   Unknown  
Diesel 13/1 31139     15/10/1959 01/09/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31421     22/10/1959 01/03/1997   Unknown  
Steam 4575 5572     02/1929 04/1962   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31162     14/01/1960 01/05/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31163     14/01/1960 19/01/1999   Operational www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 14/2 31166     25/01/1960 19/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31179     24/03/1960 01/11/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31188     28/04/1960 24/01/1999   Unknown  
Steam 5600 5619     03/1925 06/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31206     07/07/1960 30/11/2006   Unknown  
Steam 5600 5637     09/1925 06/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31216     18/08/1960 01/03/1998   Unknown  
Steam 5600 5643     10/1925 07/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31235     27/10/1960 26/05/2000   Unknown  
Steam 5600 5668     06/1926 09/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31410     24/11/1960 30/06/2003   Unknown  
Diesel 28 D5705     05/12/1958 07/09/1968   Unknown  
Steam 5700 5764     06/1929 05/1960   Unknown  
Steam 5700 5775     09/1929 09/02/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5700 5786     01/1930 04/1958   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31270     01/06/1961 26/05/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31271     08/06/1961 01/05/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31414     14/09/1961 01/02/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31289     02/11/1961 01/03/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 14/2 31297     11/01/1962 01/02/1998   Unknown  
Steam Hall 5900 HINDERTON HALL   03/1931 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam Hall 5952 COGAN HALL   12/1935 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Hall 5967 BICKMARSH HALL   03/1937 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Hall 5972 OLTON HALL   04/1937 12/1963   Unknown  
Steam King 6000 KING GEORGE V   06/1927 04/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam King 6023 KING EDWARD II   06/1930 06/1962   Unknown  
Steam King 6024 KING EDWARD I   06/1930 06/1962   Unknown  
Steam 6100 6106     05/1931 12/1965   Unknown  
Steam 6400 6412     11/1934 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 6400 6430     03/1937 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam 6400 6435     04/1937 10/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33002     27/02/1960 01/09/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33008     21/05/1960 01/02/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 33/1 33102     25/06/1960 06/11/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33012     08/07/1960 01/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/1 33110     22/10/1960 01/09/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 33/1 33111     29/10/1960 24/06/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33018     12/11/1960 01/02/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 33/1 33117     17/12/1960 01/05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33034     24/04/1961 25/01/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33035     06/05/1961 01/10/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33046     29/07/1961 31/03/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33048     26/08/1961 13/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33052     30/09/1961 13/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33053     14/10/1961 01/01/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33057     04/11/1961 31/08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33063     06/01/1962 13/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/0 33065     13/01/1962 13/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 33/2 33201     02/02/1962 01/10/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 33/2 33202     09/02/1962 01/09/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 33/2 33208     23/03/1962 01/02/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37407     06/10/1965 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37403     22/10/1965 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37308     09/11/1965 01/01/2005   Unknown  
Steam 5600 6619     01/1928 03/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5600 6634     08/1928 04/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5600 6695     10/1928 07/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5600 6697     10/1928 05/1966   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37119     02/12/1960 01/12/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37003     28/12/1960 21/01/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37009     17/02/1961 01/03/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37023     20/07/1961 31/12/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37025     31/08/1961 01/02/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37029     03/10/1961 31/12/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37353     09/03/1962 04/03/1994 1994-03-04 Operational 14/08/2013  
Diesel 37 37037     04/05/1962 01/08/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37038     11/05/1962 01/03/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37075     24/09/1962 26/11/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37518     08/10/1962 01/12/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37099     14/12/1962 17/06/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37108     25/01/1963 01/09/1996   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37109     01/02/1963 01/01/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37116     01/03/1963 28/02/2007   Unserviceable www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 37 37679     25/04/1963 01/12/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37905     19/04/1963 01/12/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37142     17/05/1963 01/05/1997   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37146     10/06/1963 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37901     01/07/1963 01/11/1998   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37152     08/07/1963 01/12/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37372     26/06/1963 01/12/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37674     23/08/1963 01/01/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37175     20/09/1963 31/08/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37188     16/01/1964 31/03/2006   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37190     21/01/1964 01/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37906     08/11/1963 01/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37215     01/01/1964 16/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37216     02/01/1964 28/02/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37219     16/01/1964 31/08/2005   Operational www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 37 37227     19/02/1964 31/01/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37248     30/10/1964 01/02/2009   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37250     10/12/1964 31/12/2007   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37254     05/01/1965 31/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37255     06/01/1965 01/12/1999   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6960 RAVENINGHAM HALL   06/03/1944 06/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37263     27/01/1965 31/01/2004   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37264     29/01/1965 01/12/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37421     11/02/1965 01/04/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37418     18/03/1965 01/04/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37275     09/04/1965 01/01/1999   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37413     15/04/1965 01/12/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37424     03/05/1965 01/03/2000   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6984 OWSDEN HALL   25/02/1948 03/12/1965   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6989 WIGHWICK HALL   25/03/1948 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6990 WITHERSLACK HALL   08/04/1948 03/12/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 37 37294     08/07/1965 30/09/2008   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 6998 BURTON AGNES HALL   28/01/1949 12/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 35 - Stone D7017     08/01/1962 13/03/1975   Unknown  
Diesel 35 - Stone D7018     18/01/1962 16/03/1975   Unknown  
Steam Castle 7027 THORNBURY CASTLE   02/09/1949 28/12/1963   Unknown  
Diesel 35 - Stone D7029     17/04/1962 28/02/1975   Unknown  
Steam Castle 7029 CLUN CASTLE   05/1950 12/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 35 - Stone D7076     03/05/1963 06/05/1973   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25173     12/01/1965 19/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25185     03/03/1965 05/11/1984   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25191     29/03/1965 01/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25235     13/02/1964 01/03/1985   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25244     03/06/1964 21/07/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25262     23/04/1966 01/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25265     12/06/1966 18/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25278     12/08/1965 01/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25279     07/09/1965 18/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25283     30/10/1965 01/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25309     21/07/1966 01/09/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25313     23/11/1966 18/03/1987   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25321     25/02/1967 29/09/1986   Unknown  
Diesel 25 25322     25/02/1967 01/09/1991   Unknown  
Steam 5700 7714     05/1930 01/1959 1973-00-00 Unserviceable 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam 5700 7715     05/1930 05/1963   Unknown  
Steam 5700 7752     11/1930 11/1959   Unknown  
Steam 5700 7754     12/1930 01/1959   Unknown  
Steam 5700 7760     12/1930 12/1961   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7802 BRADLEY MANOR   01/1938 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7808 COOKHAM MANOR   03/1938 12/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7819 HINTON MANOR   02/1939 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7820 DINMORE MANOR   30/11/1950 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7821 DITCHEAT MANOR   30/11/1950 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7822 FOXCOTE MANOR   31/12/1950 11/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7827 LYDHAM MANOR   31/12/1950 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Manor 7828 ODNEY MANOR   31/12/1950 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Modified Hall 7903 FOREMARKE HALL   08/04/1949 06/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20050     18/06/1957 14/12/1980   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20001     08/07/1957 20/04/1988   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20007     19/09/1957 01/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20020     03/10/1959 01/10/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20031     20/01/1960 14/09/1990   Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Diesel 20 20035     18/09/1959 01/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20048     31/12/1959 01/11/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20059     12/05/1961 05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20063     05/06/1961 01/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20069     30/06/1961 20/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20087     26/09/1961 04/1995   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20096     26/10/1961 01/06/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20098     08/11/1961 24/06/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20110     10/01/1962 14/09/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20118     08/03/1962 03/03/2000   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20228     12/01/1966 01/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20137     12/04/1966 01/12/1992   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20139     26/04/1966 01/05/1991   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20154     15/08/1966 01/04/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20168     19/10/1966 01/05/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20169     25/10/1966 07/12/2001   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20177     18/11/1966 23/07/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20188     21/01/1967 01/01/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20189     21/01/1967 01/09/1990   Unknown  
Diesel 15 D8233     31/08/1960 16/02/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20205     22/04/1967 18/12/1989   Unknown  
Diesel 20 20214     20/05/1967 09/06/1993   Unknown  
Diesel 17/1 D8568     06/01/1964 06/10/1971   Operational www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/
Diesel 55 55022 ROYAL SCOTS GREY   28/02/1961 02/01/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55002 THE KING'S OWN YORKSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY   19/03/1961 02/01/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55009 ALYCIDON   21/07/1961 02/01/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55015 TULYAR   13/10/1961 02/01/1982   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55016 GORDON HIGHLANDER   27/10/1961 30/12/1981   Unknown  
Steam 9000 9017     03/1938 10/1960   Unknown  
Diesel 55 55019 ROYAL HIGHLAND FUSILIER   11/12/1961 31/12/1981   Unknown  
Steam 4300 7325     02/1932 04/1964   Static Exhibit 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam 9400 9400     02/1947 12/1959   Unknown  
Steam 9400 9466     29/02/1952 07/1964   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9500     24/07/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9502     27/07/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9504     08/08/1964 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9513     06/10/1964 10/03/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9516     21/10/1964 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9518     30/10/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9520     12/11/1964 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9521     20/11/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9523     01/12/1964 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9524     11/12/1964 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9525     13/01/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9526     06/01/1965 30/11/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9529     26/01/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9531     02/02/1965 30/12/1967   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9537     16/03/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9539     09/04/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9551     02/09/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9553     16/09/1965 01/04/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 14 D9555     22/10/1965 03/05/1969   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9600     28/02/1945 09/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9629     13/12/1945 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9642     03/04/1946 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9681     03/05/1949 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam 5700 9682     09/05/1949 08/1965   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12049     31/12/1949 03/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12052     31/03/1949 13/06/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12061     30/11/1949 09/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12077     31/10/1950 09/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12082     30/11/1950 03/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12083     30/11/1950 09/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12088     16/06/1951 11/05/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12093     08/09/1951 16/05/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12099     22/03/1952 17/07/1971   Unknown  
Diesel 11 12131     15/11/1952 16/04/1969   Unknown  
Diesel 12 15224     31/10/1949 31/10/1971   Unknown  
Diesel DELTIC DP1 DELTIC   24/10/1955 03/1961 1963-05-17 Unknown  
Electric EM1 76020     20/10/1951 07/1981   Unknown  
Electric ES1 26500     1902 14/09/1964   Unknown  
Electric EM2 27000 ELECTRA   28/12/1953 05/10/1968   Unknown  
Electric EM2 27001 ARIADNE   22/03/1954 05/10/1968   Unknown  
Electric EM2 27003 DIANA   05/08/1954 05/10/1968   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56040     15/02/1978 08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56301     01/06/1978 04/2009   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56086     07/12/1980 09/2008   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56097     04/10/1981 23/03/2002   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56098     18/10/1981 08/2005   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56101     21/12/1981 09/2008   Unknown  
Diesel 56 56302     25/09/1983 04/2009   Unknown  
Steam BRIT 70000 BRITANNIA   05/01/1951 28/05/1966   Unknown  
Steam BRIT 70013 OLIVER CROMWELL   30/05/1951 17/08/1968   Operational 06/09/2011  
Steam DUKE 71000 DUKE OF GLOUCESTER   22/05/1954 24/11/1962   Unknown  
Steam BR5 73050     04/1954 06/1968   Unknown  
Steam BR5 73082 CAMELOT   07/1955 19/06/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR5 73096     11/1955 11/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR5 73129     08/1956 12/1967   Operational 22/03/2013 http://www.midlandrailway-butterley.co.uk/home/
Steam BR5 73156     12/1956 11/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75014     11/1951 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75027     05/1954 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75029     05/1954 08/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75069     09/1955 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75078     01/1956 07/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/1 75079     01/1956 11/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/2 76017     06/1953 07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/2 76077     12/1956 12/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/2 76079     02/1957 12/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/2 76084     04/1957 12/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR2/1 78018     03/1954 11/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR2/1 78019     03/1954 11/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR2/1 78022     05/1954 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR2/1 78059     09/1956 11/1966   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80002     17/10/1952 01/03/1967   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80064     09/06/1953 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80072     03/11/1953 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80078     02/02/1954 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80079     05/03/1954 24/07/1965   Operational 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam BR4/3 80080     18/03/1954 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80097     09/12/1954 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80098     22/12/1954 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80100     31/01/1955 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80104     31/03/1955 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80105     19/04/1955 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80135     30/04/1956 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80136     11/05/1956 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR4/3 80151     18/01/1957 07/05/1967   Unknown  
Electric 87 87001 ROYAL SCOT   01/06/1973 01/06/2005   Unknown  
Electric 87 87035     09/10/1974 01/01/2005   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92134     30/06/1957 12/1966 1980-12-09 Under Restoration/Overhaul 23/06/2011 www.cvr-extra.wanadoo.co.uk/92134.htm
Steam BR9F 92203     30/04/1959 11/1967 1967-11-00 Operational 23/06/2011 www.eastsomersetrailway.com/stock.php?num=92203
Steam BR9F 92207     30/06/1959 12/1964   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92212     30/09/1959 30/01/1968   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92214     31/10/1959 09/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92219     31/01/1960 09/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92220 EVENING STAR   31/03/1960 03/1965   Unknown  
Steam BR9F 92240     31/10/1958 09/1965   Unknown  
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 46100 ROYAL SCOT   19/06/1930 13/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 46115 SCOTS GUARDSMAN   09/10/1927 01/01/1966   Unknown  
Steam Coronation (Semi) 46229 DUCHESS OF HAMILTON   09/1938 02/1964   Unknown  
Steam Coronation (Semi) 46233 DUCHESS OF SUTHERLAND   07/1938 02/1964   Operational 30/06/2011  
Steam Coronation (Semi) 46235 CITY OF BIRMINGHAM   07/1939 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam Crab 42700     19/06/1926 19/03/1966   Unknown  
Steam Crab 42765     12/08/1927 10/12/1966   Unknown  
Steam Crab 42859     21/03/1930 31/12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 4P-F 42500     28/03/1934 18/06/1962   Unknown  
Steam Jubilee 45593 KOLHAPUR   12/1934 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam Jubilee 45596 BAHAMAS   12/01/1935 23/07/1966   Unknown  
Steam Jubilee 45690 LEANDER   09/03/1936 03/1964   Unknown  
Steam Jubilee 45699 GALATEA   15/04/1936 21/11/1964   Unknown  
Steam Glen 256 GLEN DOUGLAS   09/1913 17/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam D40 62277 GORDON HIGHLANDER   10/1920 23/06/1958   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47279     08/1924 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47298     10/1924 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47324     06/1926 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47327     07/1926 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47357     07/1926 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47383     10/1926 10/1967   Static Exhibit 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam 3F-F 47406     12/1926 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47445     05/1927 04/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47493     02/1928 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 3F-F 47564     04/1928 03/1965   Unknown  
Steam 4F-B 43924     10/1920 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 4F-C 44027     11/1924 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam 4F-C 44123     07/1925 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam 4F-C 44422     10/1927 06/1965   Unknown  
Steam SDJ7F 53808     07/1925 03/1964   Unknown  
Steam SDJ7F 53809     07/1925 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Compound 41000     01/1902 09/1951   Static Exhibit 19/03/2011 www.nrm.org.uk/
Steam 1F-A 41708     06/1880 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2F-M 58850     12/1899 10/09/1960   Unknown  
Steam Coal Tank 58926     09/1888 10/1958 1958-00-00 Under Restoration/Overhaul 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk/
Steam Standard Passenger 55189     01/1908 29/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam 2MT-A 41241     09/1949 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT-A 41298     10/1951 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam 2MT-A 41312     05/1952 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam 2MT-A 41313     05/1952 24/10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Motor Tanks 30053     12/1905 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam USA 30064     1943 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam USA 30065     1943 06/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam USA 30070     1943 06/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam USA 30072     1943 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam B4 30096     11/1893 10/1963   Unknown  
Steam B4 30102     12/1893 09/1963   Unknown  
Steam Greyhounds 30120     08/1899 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam Motor Tanks 30245     04/1897 17/11/1962   Unknown  
Steam S15 30499     05/1920 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30506     10/1920 05/01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Beattie Tanks 30585     05/1874 29/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam Beattie Tanks 30587     06/1874 29/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam King Arthur 30777 SIR LAMIEL   06/1925 10/1961   Unknown  
Steam S15 30825     04/1927 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30828     07/1927 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30830     08/1927 07/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30841     07/1936 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam S15 30847     12/1936 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Lord Nelson 30850 LORD NELSON   08/1926 18/08/1962   Unknown  
Steam Schools 30925 CHELTENHAM   04/1934 30/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam Schools 30926 REPTON   05/1934 30/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam Schools 30928 STOWE   06/1934 17/11/1962   Unknown  
Steam P 31027     02/1910 03/1961   Unknown  
Steam O1 31065     09/1896 06/1961   Unknown  
Steam P 31178     02/1910 06/1958   Unknown  
Steam H 31263     05/1905 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam P 31323     07/1910 07/1960   Unknown  
Steam P 31556     02/1909 06/1961   Unknown  
Steam C 31592     02/1902 07/1963   Unknown  
Steam U Boats 31618     10/1928 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam U Boats 31625     03/1929 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam U Boats 31638     05/1931 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Coppernobs 31737     11/1901 10/1956   Unknown  
Steam U Boats 31806     06/1928 01/1964   Unknown  
Steam Mongolipers 31874     09/1925 03/1964   Unknown  
Steam Radials 32473     06/1898 27/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam Charlies 33001     03/1942 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35005 CANADIAN PACIFIC   12/1941 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35006 PENINSULAR & ORIENTAL S.N. CO.   12/1941 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35009 SHAW SAVILL   07/1942 09/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35010 BLUE STAR   08/1942 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35011 GENERAL STEAM NAVIGATION   12/1944 02/1966   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35018 BRITISH INDIA LINE   05/1945 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35022     10/1948 05/1966   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35025     11/1948 09/1964   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35027     12/1948 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35028     12/1948 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam Merchant Navy 35029     02/1949 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48151     09/1942 13/01/1968   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48173     06/1943 31/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48305     11/1943 13/01/1968   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48431     11/03/1944 06/05/1964   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48518     08/1944 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48624     12/1943 24/07/1965   Unknown  
Steam 8F 48773     06/1940 10/08/1968   Operational 19/03/2011 www.svr.co.uk/
Steam 21 51218     10/1901 09/1964 1964-00-00 Operational 22/03/2011 www.kwvr.co.uk
Steam COR1 3     01/01/1878 10/1948   Unknown  
Steam 3F-J 57566     08/1899 08/1963   Unknown  
Steam Tilbury Tanks 41966     05/1909 06/1956   Unknown  
Steam COR2 4     01/01/1921 10/1948   Unknown  
Steam LYR25 52044     08/1887 07/1959   Unknown  
Steam LYR27 52322     01/1896 08/1960   Unknown  
Steam LYR5 50621     02/1899 09/1954   Unknown  
Steam W_L 822     09/1902 08/1961   Unknown  
Steam W_L 823     09/1902 07/1962   Unknown  
Steam J69/1 68633     09/1904 24/11/1960   Static Exhibit 20/03/2011 www.nrm.org.uk/
Steam Duck Eight 49395     11/1921 11/1959   Unknown  
Steam J17 65567     05/1905 06/08/1962   Unknown  
Steam CarR 1338     05/1898 09/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32636     09/1872 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32640     03/1878 09/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32646     01/1877 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32650     12/1876 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32655     12/1875 05/1960   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32662     10/1875 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32670     12/1872 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Terriers 32678     07/1880 10/1963   Unknown  
Steam Q 30541     23/01/1939 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam T3 563     03/1893 08/1945   Unknown  
Steam 415 30583     03/1885 07/1961   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34007 WADEBRIDGE   08/1945 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34010 SIDMOUTH   09/1945 03/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34016 BODMIN   11/1945 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34023 BLACKMORE VALE   02/1946 07/1967   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34027 TAW VALLEY   04/1946 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34028 EDDYSTONE   04/1946 05/1964   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34039 BOSCASTLE   09/1946 05/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34046 BRAUNTON   11/1946 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34051 WINSTON CHURCHILL   12/1946 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34053 SIR KEITH PARK   01/1947 10/1965   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34058 SIR FREDERICK PILE   03/1947 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34059 SIR ARCHIBALD SINCLAIR   04/1947 05/1966   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34067 TANGMERE   09/1947 11/1963   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34070 MANSTON   11/1947 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34072 257 SQUADRON   04/1948 10/1964 1984-11-00 Under Restoration/Overhaul 29/12/2010 www.southern-locomotives.co.uk/34072/34072_Restoration.html
Steam Air Smoothed 34073 249 SQUADRON   05/1948 06/1964   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34081     09/1948 08/1964   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34092 CITY OF WELLS   09/1949 11/1964   Unknown  
Steam Rebuilt 34101     02/1950 07/1966   Unknown  
Steam Air Smoothed 34105     03/1950 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam 1008 50621     02/1889 09/1954   Unknown  
Steam Lobster 42968     24/01/1934 31/12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 4F-A 43106     10/04/1951 22/06/1968   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46428     04/12/1948 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46441     02/1950 04/1967   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46443     02/1950 03/1967   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46447     03/1950 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46464     06/1950 09/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46512     16/12/1952 12/1966   Unknown  
Steam 2MT 46521     19/02/1953 10/1966   Unknown  
Steam 4P-C 42073     17/11/1950 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam 4P-C 42085     27/02/1951 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 44767     12/1947 12/1967   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 44806     07/1944 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 44871     03/1945 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 44932     09/1945 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45000     03/1935 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45025     08/1934 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45110     06/1935 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45163     08/1935 05/1965   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45212     11/1935 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45231     08/1936 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45293     12/1937 08/1965   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45305     01/1937 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45337     04/1937 02/1965   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45379     07/1937 07/1965   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45407     09/1937 08/1968   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45428     10/1937 10/1967   Unknown  
Steam Black Five 45491     12/1943 07/1965   Unknown  
Steam Princess Royal 46201 PRINCESS ELIZABETH   03/11/1933 20/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam Princess Royal 46203 PRINCESS MARGARET ROSE   01/07/1935 20/10/1962   Unknown  
Steam A4 60009 UNION OF SOUTH AFRICA   29/06/1937 01/06/1966   Unknown  
Steam A4 60010 DOMINION OF CANADA   04/05/1937 29/05/1965   Unknown  
Steam A4 60008 DWIGHT D EISENHOWER   04/09/1937 20/07/1963   Unknown  
Steam A4 60007 SIR NIGEL GRESLEY   30/10/1937 01/02/1966   Unknown  
Steam A4 60019 BITTERN   18/12/1937 05/09/1966   Unknown  
Steam A4 60022 MALLARD   03/03/1938 25/04/1963   Unknown  
Steam A3 60103 FLYING SCOTSMAN   24/02/1923 15/01/1963   Unknown  
Steam A2 60532 BLUE PETER   25/03/1948 31/12/1966   Unknown  
Steam B1 61264     05/12/1947 21/11/1965 1976-07-00 Unknown 17/12/2012  
Steam B1 61306     05/04/1948 30/09/1967   Unknown  
Steam B12/3 61572     08/1928 20/09/1961   Unknown  
Steam Large Director 62660 BUTLER-HENDERSON   12/1919 11/1960   Unknown  
Steam Shire/Hunt 62712 MORAYSHIRE   20/02/1928 03/07/1961   Unknown  
Steam E4 62785     01/1895 12/1959   Unknown  
Steam E5 1463     05/1885 08/1927   Unknown  
Steam J15 65462     03/1912 16/09/1962   Unknown  
Steam J21 Simple 65033     03/1889 23/04/1962   Unknown  
Steam J27 65894     09/1923 09/1967   Unknown  
Steam J36 65243 MAUDE   12/1891 07/1966   Unknown  
Steam J52/2 68846     05/1899 05/1959   Unknown  
Steam J72 59     04/1951 10/1964   Unknown  
Steam J94 68077     01/1947 29/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam J94 68078     07/1946 10/03/1963   Unknown  
Steam K1 62005     10/06/1949 30/12/1967   Unknown  
Steam K4 61994 THE GREAT MARQUESS   07/1938 18/12/1961   Unknown  
Steam N2 69523     02/1921 16/09/1962   Unknown  
Steam N7/4 69621     03/1924 11/09/1962   Unknown  
Steam O4/1 63601     01/1912 16/06/1963 1963-06-23 Unserviceable 20/03/2011 www.nrm.org.uk/
Steam Q6 63395     12/1918 09/09/1967   Unknown  
Steam Q7 63460     10/1919 03/12/1962   Unknown  
Steam V2 60800 GREEN ARROW   13/06/1936 21/08/1962   Unknown  
Steam Y1/2 54     12/1933 06/1961   Unknown